David NMN Romo
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-21788
District Judge Christopher M. Klein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo August B. Landis, U.S. Trustee

Represented by Law Offices of Vikas Kumar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vikas Kumar +1 916 930 2100
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo David NMN Romo, Debtor

Represented by Law Offices of D. Randall Ensminger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Randall Ensminger +1 916 434 0220
No Logo John R. Roberts, Trustee

Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo Stacey Marie Romo, Joint Debtor

Represented by Law Offices of D. Randall Ensminger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Randall Ensminger +1 916 434 0220
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 77 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 61 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2]. MOTION/APPLICATION/OBJECTION WITHDRAWN (tjas) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 76 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
    Declaration of Thomas C. Dashiell Re: 61 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2] (rlos) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
      Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 61 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2] continued; Hearing to be held on 7/26/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
        Certificate/Proof of Service of 73 Exhibit(s) [JRR-2] (rlos) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
          Supplemental Exhibit(s) in support of 68 Opposition/Objection [JRR-2] (rlos) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
            Certificate/Proof of Service of 71 Exhibit(s) [JRR-2] (rlos) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
              Exhibit(s) in support of 68 Opposition/Objection [JRR-2] (rlos) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Verdell Small (rlos) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                  Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditors Marvin Wirkkala, Barbara Wirkkala (wlos) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 61 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2], 62 Notice of Hearing, 63 Exhibit(s) (rlos) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                      Exhibit(s) to 61 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2] (rlos) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                        Notice of Hearing Re: 61 Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2] to be held on 7/12/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (rlos) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 61 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                          Motion/Application to Sell [JRR-2] Filed by Trustee John R. Roberts (rlos) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 70 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?