David J. Atteberry
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 02-21940
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Alma Aguirre, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert S. Bardwil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S Bardwil +1 916 446 5060
No Logo Claire G. Atteberry, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Louis J. Perkins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis J. Perkins +1 916 857 0776
No Logo David J. Atteberry, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Louis J. Perkins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis J. Perkins +1 916 857 0776
No Logo Donna Susanna Bellotti, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James F. Bunnell, II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Bunnell, II +1 530 368 2973
No Logo Ephriam D. Galloway, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ephriam D. Galloway
No Logo Feather River Industries, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of George C. Hollister

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C. Hollister +1 916 488 3400 +1 916 488 3401 mramjet@ix.netcom.com
No Logo Francisco Aguirre, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert S. Bardwil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S Bardwil +1 916 446 5060
No Logo Greg A. Walkup, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Lanahan & Reilley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric B. Simon +1 707 524 4200 +1 707 523 4610 esimon@lanahan.com
No Logo Joshua L. Connaughty, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mark Zimmerman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Zimmerman +1 559 584 7274
No Logo Joy Marie Jeffers, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Patrick Kavanagh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Kavanagh +1 661 322 5553
No Logo Larry Gene Bellotti, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James F. Bunnell, II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Bunnell, II +1 530 368 2973
No Logo Mayflower/tcla, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by griswoldlasalle.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond Carlson +1 559 584 6656 levinson@griswoldlasalle.com
No Logo Moving Forward Investments, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Investments, Moving Forward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2001 Moving Forward Investments

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Julia P. Gibbs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia P. Gibbs +1 916 646 2800
No Logo Nick Douglas Jeffers, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Patrick Kavanagh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Kavanagh +1 661 322 5553
No Logo Paradise Bakery, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven H. Felderstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Howard Felderstein +1 916 329 7400 sfelderstein@ffwplaw.com
No Logo The Bluffs Senior Housing Development, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Carl W. Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl W. Collins +1 209 521 8100
No Logo TJ Merrill, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Dennis Benjamin Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis B. Hill +1 916 434 2553 +1 916 434 2560 dennis@dbhilllaw.com
No Logo Frederick J. Lucksinger, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory J. Hughes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory J. Hughes +1 916 774 7506
No Logo Hank Spacone, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Rebecca U. Litteneker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca U. Litteneker +1 415 995 8475
No Logo James Edward Salven, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thornton Davidson +1 559 256 9800 +1 559 256 9799 rosatilaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey L. Wall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Wall +1 559 313 8202

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert A. Hawkins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Hawkins +1 559 255 0555
No Logo Jan P. Johnson, Trustee
No Logo John R. Roberts, Trustee
No Logo Kenny W. Flinn, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo M. Nelson Enmark, Trustee
No Logo Michael D. McGranahan, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony S. Guerriero

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2003 Anthony S Guerriero +1 209 948 0434

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James T.C. Nuss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T.C. Nuss +1 209 948 8200

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of T. Scott Belden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space T. Scott Belden +1 559 438 4374
No Logo Prem N. Dhawan, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mike K. Nakagawa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mike K. Nakagawa +1 916 923 2800
No Logo Thomas A. Aceituno, Trustee
No Logo Linda Esktrom Stanley, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Donna S. Tamanaha

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna S. Tamanaha +1 916 930 2100
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Judith C. Hotze

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith C. Hotze +1 916 930 2100
No Logo William T. Neary, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alicia M. Leonhard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia M. Leonhard +1 559 498 7400
No Logo Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditor, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert S. Bardwil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S Bardwil +1 916 446 5060
  Entries (201) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
Order Granting 899 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (mfrs) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
    Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Filed by Creditor Karin I. Farmer (mfrs) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/2/2004
      [898-1] Order Granting [897-1] Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Amount:$ 310.93). bres (Entered: 12/03/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
        Application Filed By Robert Romero To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Amount:$ 310.93). bres (Entered: 11/18/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/30/2004
          [896-1] Order Granting [894-1] Motion/Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Ricardo Uribe ( Amount:$ 920.58). msts (Entered: 08/30/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/30/2004
            [895-1] Order Granting [893-1] Application For Payment Of Unclaimed Dividends ( Amount:$ 1,258.58). by Jennifer Roe msts (Entered: 08/30/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
              Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends ( Amount:$ 920.58). . mfrs (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                Application Filed By Creditor Jennifer Roe For Payment Of Unclaimed Dividends ( Amount:$ 1,258.58). tjas (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None
                  [892-1] Final Decree tjas (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/18/2004
                    [891-1] Order Granting [888-1] Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Estate ( Amount:$ 4,460.31). by Ruben Guttierez mans (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/18/2004
                      [890-1] Order Granting [887-1] Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Estate ( Amount:$ 2,016.84). by Vanessa Millwee mans (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/18/2004
                        [889-1] Order Granting [886-1] Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Estate ( Amount:$ 6,812.17). by Bradley B. Landin mans (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                          Application Filed By Creditor Ruben Guttierez To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Estate ( Amount:$ 4,460.31). bres (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                            Application Filed By Creditor Vanessa Millwee To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Estate ( Amount:$ 2,016.84). bres (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                              Application Filed By Creditor Bradley B. Landin To Pay Unclaimed Dividends To Estate ( Amount:$ 6,812.17). bres (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None
                                [885-1] Notice of Filing Trustee's Final Account and Request for Entry of Final Decree ; Request for Hearing Due by 5/15/04 tjas (Entered: 04/19/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: None
                                  [884-1] Trustee's Final Account and Request for Entry of Final Decree. tjas (Entered: 04/15/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None
                                    [883-1] Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends For Various Parties. tjas (Entered: 02/19/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                      Order Granting 521 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (tsef) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                        Order Granting 506 Motion/Application for Authority to Distribute Settlement Funds From Sunkist [JES-8] (tsef) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                          Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $ 4014.60 Filed by Creditors Debra Cemo Holworth, John F. Cemo (tsef) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                            Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 506 Motion/Application for Authority to Distribute Settlement Funds From Sunkist [JES-8] GRANTED (gpaf) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 518 Declaration (tsef) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                Declaration of James Salven in support of 516 Motion/Application for Compensation for Robert A. Hawkins, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $4800.00, Expenses: $1279.34. (tsef) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 516 Motion/Application for Compensation for Robert A. Hawkins, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $4800.00, Expenses: $1279.34. (tsef) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Amended Motion/Application for Compensation for Robert A. Hawkins, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $4800.00, Expenses: $1279.34. Filed by Attorney Robert A. Hawkins (tsef) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 511 Amended Motion/Application for Compensation [JTW-3] for Janzen, Tamberi and Wong, Accountant(s), Fee: $2306.00, Expenses: $0.00.., 512 Declaration, 513 Document, 514 Exhibit(s) (tsef) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Exhibit(s) in support of 511 Amended Motion/Application for Compensation [JTW-3] for Janzen, Tamberi and Wong, Accountant(s), Fee: $2306.00, Expenses: $0.00.. (tsef) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Document - Trustee's Statement Re Receipt of Certified Public Accountants' Bill and Statement of No Objection Filed by Accountant Janzen, Tamberi and Wong [JTW-3] (tsef) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Declaration of Christopher A. Ratzlaff in support of 511 Amended Motion/Application for Compensation [JTW-3] for Janzen, Tamberi and Wong, Accountant(s), Fee: $2306.00, Expenses: $0.00.. (tsef) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Amended Motion/Application for Compensation [JTW-3] for Janzen, Tamberi and Wong, Accountant(s), Fee: $2306.00, Expenses: $0.00.. 459 Amended Motion/Application Filed by Accountant Janzen, Tamberi and Wong (tsef) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 507 Notice of Hearing [JES-8] (crof) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 506 Motion/Application for Authority to Distribute Settlement Funds From Sunkist [JES-8] (crof) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Declaration of James E. Salven in support of 506 Motion/Application for Authority to Distribute Settlement Funds From Sunkist [JES-8] (crof) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 506 Motion/Application for Authority to Distribute Settlement Funds From Sunkist [JES-8] to be held on 7/27/2011 at 09:00 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (crof) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Motion/Application for Authority to Distribute Settlement Funds From Sunkist [JES-8] Filed by Trustee James Edward Salven (crof) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Granting 504 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (tsef) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $530.67 Filed by Creditor Betty Natzke (tsef) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Order Granting 502 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (tsef) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $ 12,801.92 Filed by Creditor Dale F. Hester, Inc. (maaf) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends (tsef) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $ 2941.12 Filed by Creditor Penny S. McGinness (shbs) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order Granting 498 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (shbs) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $1407.07 Filed by Creditor Greg Blackwell (shbs) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing of Final Decree as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/23/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Bankruptcy case closed. Final Decree as transmitted to BNC for Service. (smis) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application to be Discharged Combined with Order Fixing Deadline for Filing Objections Thereto as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Filing Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application to be Discharged Combined with Order Fixing Deadline for Filing Objections Thereto as Transmitted to BNC for Service (Gordon, Bob) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged filed on behalf of Trustee Frederick J. Lucksinger. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Gordon, Bob) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Order Granting 488 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (jdas) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order Granting 486 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (jdas) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Order Granting 485 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (jdas) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order Granting 487 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (jdas) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $521.34 Filed by Creditor Kevin A. Lesch (jdas) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $1926.41 Filed by Creditor John Chiarella (jdas) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $1005.17 Filed by Creditor Antonio Fregoso (jdas) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $1407.07 Filed by Creditor Broadmore Builders, Inc. (jdas) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Order Granting 478 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (kwis) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order Granting 477 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (kwis) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order Granting 479 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (kwis) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Order Granting 480 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (kwis) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (Creditor: Robert Diggle $1,407.06) (jdas) Modified on 9/15/2010 (kces). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (Creditor: Jeffrey Lenches $1,407.07) (jdas) Modified on 9/15/2010 (kces). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (Creditor: Douglas Allen $1,407.07)(jdas) Modified on 9/15/2010 (kces). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (Creditor: Feather River Co, LLC $8,111.82)(jdas) Modified on 9/15/2010 (kces). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends (jdas) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (cwam) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Order Granting 390 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds for Creditor John and Judy Machado (cwam) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds for Creditor John Machado and Judy Machado Filed by Interested Party The Financial Resources Group, Inc. (lsom) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Order Closing Case/Final Decree (lsom) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service of Notice of Filing Final Account as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 03/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Final Account as Transmitted to BNC for Service (lsom) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Final Account and Request for Entry of Final Decree (lsom) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 384 Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends (lsom) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends (lsom) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Final Decree. Bankruptcy case closed. (sges) Modified on 1/4/2007 (sges). (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting 205 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] (dhes) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting 201 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-12] (dhes) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting 209 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-14] (dhes) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 209 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-14] GRANTED (sges) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 205 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] for Julia P. Gibbs, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $43,454.80, Expenses: $0.00. GRANTED (sges) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 201 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-12] for Gerald D. Muto, Examiner, Fee: $38725.93, Expenses: $0.00. GRANTED (sges) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Turn-Over of Unclaimed Funds/Dividends for Joyce R. Kennedy (sges) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Document - Quarterly Postconfirmation Report Ending June 30, 2006 Filed by Debtor Moving Forward Investments (stps) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Document - Quarterly Postconfirmation Report Ending March 31, 2006 Filed by Debtor Moving Forward Investments (stps) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Document - Quarterly Postconfirmation Report Ending December 30, 2005 Filed by Debtor Moving Forward Investments (stps) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Document - Quarterly Postconfirmation Report Ending September 30, 2005 Filed by Debtor Moving Forward Investments (stps) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 210 Notice of Hearing, 209 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-14] (stps) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 206 Notice of Hearing,, 205 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] for Julia P. Gibbs, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $43,454.80, Expenses: $0.00., 207 Declaration (stps) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (sges) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (sges) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE DELETED - REQUESTED IN ERROR Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (sges) Modified on 9/27/2006 (sges). (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil Minute Order Denying 191 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-11] (sges) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Civil Minute Order Dismissing 188 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-10] (sges) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Entry as Transmitted to BNC for Service (sges) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Civil Minute Order Dismissing 184 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-9] (sges) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service Re: 209 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-14] (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 209 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-14] to be held on 10/23/2006 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Renewed Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-14] Filed by Examiner Gerald D. Muto (sges) Modified on 9/26/2006 (sges). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service Re: 205 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] for Julia P. Gibbs, Counsel to the Plan Administrator and Former Counsel to Debtor, Fee: $43,454.80, Expenses: $0.00. (sges) Modified on 9/26/2006 (sges). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Julia P. Gibbs in support of 205 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] for Julia P. Gibbs, Counsel to the Plan Administrator and Former Counsel to Debtor, Fee: $43,454.80, Expenses: $0.00. (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Re: 205 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] for Julia P. Gibbs, Counsel to Plan Administrator and Former Counsel to Debtor, Fee: $43,454.80, Expenses: $0.00. to be held on 10/23/2006 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Renewed Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-13] for Julia P. Gibbs, Counsel to Plan Administrator and Former Counsel to Debtor, Fee: $43,454.80, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney Julia P. Gibbs (sges) Modified on 9/26/2006 (sges). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 201 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-12] for Gerald D. Muto, Examiner, Fee: $38725.93, Expenses: $0.00., 203 Declaration, 202 Notice of Hearing (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Gerald D. Muto in support of 201 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-12] for Gerald D. Muto, Examiner, Fee: $38725.93, Expenses: $0.00. (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 201 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-12] for Gerald D. Muto, Examiner, Fee: $38725.93, Expenses: $0.00. to be held on 10/23/2006 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Renewed Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-12] for Gerald D. Muto, Examiner, Fee: $38725.93, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney Julia P. Gibbs (sges) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 184 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-9] for Gerald D. Muto, Examiner, Fee: $38725.93, Expenses: $0.00. DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICED (sges) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 191 Motion/Application for Final Decree and to Close Case [JPG-11] DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (sges) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 188 Motion/Application for Compensation [JPG-10] for Julia P. Gibbs, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $43454.80, Expenses: $0.00. DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (sges) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [115-1] Final Decree shbs (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [114-1] Notice of Filing Trustee's Final Account and Request for Entry of Final Decree ; Request for Hearing Due by 4/23/05 shbs (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [113-1] Trustee's Final Account and Request for Entry of Final Decree. lpas (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [112-1] Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends For Thermo Biostar And Christina Fa. gfas (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting 78 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (cwaf) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting 77 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (cwaf) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting 76 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (cwaf) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting 75 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (cwaf) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting 74 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (cwaf) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Filed by Interested Party Lynda Bagley Doye (maaf) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Filed by Interested Party Lynda Bagley Doye (maaf) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Filed by Interested Party Lynda Bagley Doye (maaf) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Filed by Interested Party Lynda Bagley Doye (maaf) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Filed by Interested Party Lynda Bagley Doye (maaf) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service of Final Decree as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bankruptcy Case Closed. Final Decree as Transmitted to BNC for Service (hgof) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Trustee's Final Report and Account (hgof) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting 68 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds for Creditor Lynda Bagley Doye (hgof) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting 67 Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds for Creditor Del and Lynda Doye (hgof) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds for Creditor Lynda Bagley Doye (hgof) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion/Application for Payment of Unclaimed Funds for Creditor Del and Lynda Doye (hgof) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends (hgof) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service of Discharge of Debtor as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discharge of Debtor as Transmitted to BNC for Service (hgof) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends (hgof) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Preliminary Trustee's Final Report and Account (dmof) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends (hgof) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [60-1] Minutes - Hearing Held Re: [56-1] Application For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds by David J. Atteberry, Claire G. Atteberry GRANTED IN PART. jlas (Entered: 08/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [59-1] Memorandum Re: Matter Not Placed On Calendar RE: [56-1] Application For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds by David J. Atteberry, Claire G. Atteberry jlas (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [58-1] Certificate Of Service Of [56-1] Application For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds by David J. Atteberry, Claire G. Atteberry, [57-1] Notice of Hearing . sges (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Hearing RE: [56-1] Application For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds by David J. Atteberry, Claire G. Atteberry Scheduled For 9:00 7/20/04 at Dept A,Sacramento Courtroom 28 sges (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application Filed By Debtor Claire G. Atteberry, Debtor David J. Atteberry For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds sges (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [55-1] Order to Close Case. user (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Approving Final Report and Discharging Trustee. user (Entered: 09/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [53-1] Certificate Of Service Of Summary RE: [51-1] Chapter 12/13 Report . user (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [52-1] Certificate Of Service Of [51-1] Chapter 12/13 Report . user (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [51-1] Trustee's Final Report and Account user (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [50-1] Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends For Debtors $400.00 user (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [49-1] Turn-Over of Unclaimed Dividends For Debtors, David J. Atteberry And Claire G. Atteberry. nkrs (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [48-1] Order Conditionally Granting [47-1] Application To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} by Jan P. Johnson user (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application Filed By Trustee Jan P. Johnson To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} user (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [46-1] Minutes - Hearing Held Re: [41-1] Motion To Avoid Lien Of Northern California Collection Service {LJP-4} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry . DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE user (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [45-1] Certificate Of Service Of [44-1] Notice Of Filed Claims. user (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [44-1] Notice Of Filed Claims user (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [43-1] Declaration of Claire G. Atteberry In Support of [41-1] Motion To Avoid Lien Of Northern California Collection Service {LJP-4} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry user (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Hearing RE: [41-1] Motion To Avoid Lien Of Northern California Collection Service {LJP-4} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry Scheduled For 9:00 11/5/02 at Dept A,Sacramento Courtroom 28 user (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion by Debtor David J. Atteberry, Debtor Claire G. Atteberry To Avoid Lien Of Northern California Collection Service {LJP-4} . user (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [40-1] Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: [39-1] Order stps (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [39-1] Order Conditionally Granting [29-1] Motion To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} by Jan P. Johnson THE DEBTORS HAVE SIXTY DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED CHAPTER 13 PLAN AND MOTION TO CONFIRM SECOND AMENDED PLAN AND/OR FILE OBJECTIONS TO ANY DISUPTED CLAIMS AND OR FILE ANY NECESSARY MOTIONS TO AVOID LIENS OR THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED. stps (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [38-1] Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: [37-1] Order stps (Entered: 10/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [37-1] Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part [24-1] Objection To Claim Of Kristine Cherrington {LJP-3} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry stps (Entered: 10/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [36-1] Minutes - Hearing Held Re: [29-1] Motion To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} by Jan P. Johnson . GRANTED IN PART; THE DEBTORS HAVE 60 DAYS TO OBTAIN CONFIRMATION OF AN AMENDED/MODIFIED PLAN user (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [35-1] Minutes - Hearing Held Re: [24-1] Objection To Claim Of Kristine Cherrington {LJP-3} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry . SUSTAINED IN PART user (Entered: 09/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Support/Attachment By Debtor Claire G. Atteberry, Debtor David J. Atteberry To [33-1] Supplemental Declaration . jlas (Entered: 09/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [33-1] Supplemental Declaration of Claire G. Atteberry In Support of [24-1] Objection To Claim Of Kristine Cherrington {LJP-3} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry user (Entered: 09/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [32-1] Proof of Service Of [29-1] Motion To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} by Jan P. Johnson, [30-1] Notice of Hearing, [31-1] Declaration stps (Entered: 08/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [31-1] Declaration of Karin Bruce In Support of [29-1] Motion To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} by Jan P. Johnson stps (Entered: 08/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Hearing RE: [29-1] Motion To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} by Jan P. Johnson Scheduled For 1:30 9/25/02 at Dept A,Sacramento Courtroom 28 stps (Entered: 08/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion By Trustee Jan P. Johnson To Dismiss Case {JPJ-1} stps (Entered: 08/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [28-1] Minutes - Hearing Re: [24-1] Objection To Claim Of Kristine Cherrington {LJP-3} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry Continued For 9:00 9/24/02 at Dept A,Sacramento Courtroom 28 nkrs (Entered: 08/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [27-1] Minutes - Hearing Held Re: [22-1] Objection To Claim Of Northern California Collection Svc. Claim Number 1 {LJP-2} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberr. OBJECTION WAS OVERRULED. nkrs (Entered: 08/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [26-1] Minutes - Hearing Held Re: [19-1] Motion To Confirm Amended Plan. {LJP-1} by David J. Atteberry, Claire G. Atteberry . MOTION WAS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. user (Entered: 08/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [25-1] Declaration of Claire G. Atteberry In Support of [24-1] Objection To Claim Of Kristine Cherrington {LJP-3} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry maws (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Hearing And Objection To Claim Of Kristine Cherrington {LJP-3} Filed By Debtor David J. Atteberry, Debtor Claire G. Atteberry Doc. No. [24-1] maws (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [23-1] Declaration of Claire G. Atteberry In Support of [22-1] Objection To Claim Of Northern California Collection Svc. Claim Number 1 {LJP-2} by Claire G. Atteberry, David J. Atteberry maws (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Hearing And Objection To Claim Of Northern California Collection Svc. Claim Number 1 {LJP-2} Filed By Debtor David J. Atteberry, Debtor Claire G. Atteberry Doc. No. [22-1] maws (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [21-1] Proof of Service Of [20-1] Objection by Jan P. Johnson jlas (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection By Trustee Jan P. Johnson To [19-1] Motion To Confirm Amended Plan. {LJP-1} by David J. Atteberry, Claire G. Atteberry . jlas (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion By Debtor Claire G. Atteberry, Debtor David J. Atteberry To Confirm Amended Plan. {LJP-1} jlas (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended [8-1] Chapter 13 Plan Filed By Debtor Claire G. Atteberry, Debtor David J. Atteberry jlas (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Interim Report. maws (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [16-1] Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Meeting Held and Debtor Examined 9:00 6/27/02 . jlas (Entered: 07/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [15-1] Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Meeting Continued To 9:00 6/27/02 At Meeting Room 7-B jlas (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [14-1] Amended Summary and Schedule(s) B-F,H,I, Statement Of Financial Affairs jlas (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [13-1] Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Meeting Continued To 9:00 6/6/02 At Meeting Room 7-B user (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [12-1] Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Meeting Continued To 10:30 5/16/02 At Meeting Room 7-B jlas (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [11-1] Proof of Service Of [7-1] Schedules, [8-1] Chapter 13 Plan, [9-1] Amended Schedules jlas (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [10-1] Proof of Service Of [6-1] First Meeting, [7-1] Schedules, [8-1] Chapter 13 Plan, [9-1] Amended Schedules, [9-1] Amended Matrix jlas (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Matrix. stps (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Chapter 13 Plan. user (Entered: 03/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [7-1] Summary and Schedule(s) A,B,C,D,G,H,I,J,Declaration; Statement Of Financial Affairs. user (Entered: 03/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [6-1] Notice Of Commencement Of Case Under Chapter 13, Meeting Of Creditors And Fixing Of Dates. First Meeting Scheduled For 1:00 4/4/02 At Meeting Room 7-B ;Last Day to File Proofs Of Claim: 7/3/02 maws (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request by Creditor Payless Cashways, Inc. For Notice. nkrs (Entered: 03/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [4-1] Master Address List. auto (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [3-1] Notice to Debtor and Debtor's Attorney of Incomplete Filing auto (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Designation Of Trustee auto (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Voluntary Petition missing documents: Summary Of Schedules Schedule A - Real Property Schedule B - Personal Property Schedule C - Exempt Property Schedule D - Secured Creditors Sch G-Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases Schedule H - Codebtors Sch I - Current Income Of Individual Schedule J - Current Expenditures Statement of Financial Affairs Due on 3/8/02 Chapter 13 Plan due on 3/8/02 ( Fee $ 185 Receipt # 2-2-003399) auto (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 213 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?