Bob Argyropoulos
Bankruptcy Case California Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-Jan-1970
District Judge Leslie J. Tchaikovsky, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick D. Holden +1 415 442 0900
No Logo Almas C. Kotiya, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Bob Argyropoulos, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roni Rotholz +1 925 932 0193 +1 925 939 8434 RRotholz@aol.com
No Logo Bodega Farms, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy R. Rogers +1 415 591 1000 rrogers@winston.com
No Logo Bonnie L. Panigiris, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonardo D. Drubach +1 650 873 4955 zlaw578@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bonnie L. Panigiris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/1997 Bonnie L. Panigiris
No Logo Brant J. Smith, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Raymond +1 415 351 2265 bankruptcycenter@sbcglobal.net
No Logo BridgeSpan Corp., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William C. Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Lewis +1 650 322 3300 ecf@williamclewis.com
No Logo Bridgespan, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks and Raub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2004 David S. Caplan +1 650 321 1400

Toggle Switch Represented by Hance Scarborough Wright Ginsberg & Brusilow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Wright +1 972 788 1600 +1 972 239 0138

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Binder and Malter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gayle Green +1 408 295 1700 gayle@bindermalter.com
Space Gayle A. Zickgraff +1 408 295 1700

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2004 Penn Ayers Butler +1 415 398 4700 +4217 421 421 7879
No Logo Bryan K. Matheson, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Max Cline

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Cline +1 510 464 8068 max008120@yahoo.com
No Logo Building Operations Support Corp., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by The Fuller Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lars T. Fuller +1 408 295 5595 Fullerlawfirmecf@aol.com
No Logo Cache Computers, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Nancy W. Page

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy W. Page +1 510 839 5416
No Logo Carl Wayne Shaw, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellyn M. Lazar +1 707 579 8311 ellynmlazar@yahoo.com
No Logo Carolyn Whittle, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Georgene E. Pantelas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Georgene E. Pantelas +1 818 222 7150
No Logo Carone Brothers, Inc., A Calif. Corp., Debtor
No Logo Carrol D. Cummings, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Kahn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Srinoi G. Rousseau +1 408 983 4820
No Logo Casey R. Caster, Jr., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S.K. Shulman +1 408 971 3233 ikesh@aol.com
No Logo Catalin Pora, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Cbyon, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Murray and Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Walshe Murray +1 650 852 9000 jwmurray@murraylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gabriel Liao +1 310 788 9900 +1 310 788 3399 gliao@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Central Coast Provider Assn., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Kimble MacMichael & Upton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Eleazarian +1 559 435 5500
No Logo Cesar A. Dayco, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Max Cline

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Cline +1 510 464 8068 max008120@yahoo.com
No Logo Charles III Barker, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Dougherty Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space T. Kevin Dougherty +1 831 783 3440 Kevin@tkdougherty.com
No Logo Charles Rowland Morey, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl T. Voss +1 707 569 8295 vosslawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo Chhottu T. Kotiya, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Choo King Preston, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutton Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan L. Sutton +1 408 286 3290
No Logo Chris Bernard Robinson, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison J. Wood +1 510 986 0406 aj_wood10@yahoo.com
No Logo Chris E. Song, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonic.net

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick L. Forte +1 510 465 3328 plforte@sonic.net
No Logo Christodoulos Tsardoulias, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony P. Fritz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony P. Fritz +1 916 381 7868
No Logo Commercial Western Finance Corporation, A Calif. Corp., Debtor
No Logo Communications Broadband Multimedia, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael H. Lewis +1 415 296 1460 MH_LEWIS@PACBELL.NET
No Logo Condor Systems, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric E. Sagerman +1 213 615 1700 +1 213 615 1750 esagerman@winston.com
No Logo Consilient, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Cooper +1 510 834 6600 mcooper@wendel.com
No Logo Consolacion P. Dayco, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Max Cline

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Cline +1 510 464 8068 max008120@yahoo.com
No Logo Helen Argyropoulos, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roni Rotholz +1 925 932 0193 +1 925 939 8434 RRotholz@aol.com
No Logo Julie R. Cummings, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Kahn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Srinoi G. Rousseau +1 408 983 4820
No Logo Mary Tsardoulias, Debtor
No Logo Shonta Robinson, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison J. Wood +1 510 986 0406 aj_wood10@yahoo.com
No Logo Carol Wu, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Murphy +1 415 989 4100 +1 415 989 2235 emurphy@stromsheim.com
Space Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo Charles E. Sims, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Espinosa & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F. Goldsmith +1 415 888 2039 p.goldsmithlaw@prodigy.net
No Logo David Burchard, Trustee
No Logo Devin Derham-burk, Trustee
No Logo Edward F. Towers, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Sorensen +1 707 875 9284 lsorensen@stromsheim.com
No Logo John Kendall, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo John W. Richardson, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michelle K. Rubin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle K. Rubin +1 831 426 4280
No Logo Martha G. Bronitsky, Trustee
No Logo Michael H. Meyer, Trustee
No Logo Mohamed Poonja, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandi Meneely Colabianchi +1 415 986 5900 SColabianchi@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James A. Tiemstra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Tiemstra +1 510 987 8000 jat@tiemlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Isaacs +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 3895 misaacs@mckennalong.com
No Logo Raymond A. Carey, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ray H. Olmstead

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ray H. Olmstead +1 707 539 5551 rholmstead@rholmstead.com
No Logo Suzanne Decker, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Suzanne Decker +1 510 483 4303 suzannedecker@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert Flor, Jr. +1 510 834 6600 aflor@wendel.com
No Logo Tevis Thompson, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward G Schloss Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Sternberg +1 925 946 1400 DMSLaw@ix.netcom.com
No Logo Chris D. Kuhner, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Chris D. Kuhner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris D. Kuhner +1 510 763 1000 c.kuhner@kornfieldlaw.com
No Logo Michael A. Isaacs, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Isaacs +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 3895 misaacs@mckennalong.com
No Logo Stromsheim and Associates, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo Crossroads, Responsible Ind
No Logo Cynthia Schaan, Responsible Ind
No Logo Lynelle Dahn, Responsible Ind
No Logo Miles Stover, Responsible Ind
No Logo Morgan, Stuart, Responsible Ind
No Logo Shirley L. Clayton, Responsible Ind
No Logo Linda Ekstrom Stanley, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF,, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark L. Pope +1 408 535 5525

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John S. Wesolowski +1 408 535 5525 john.wesolowski@usdoj.gov
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR,, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret H. McGee +1 510 637 3200 maggie.mcgee@usdoj.gov
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "U.S. Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Chan Ballinger +1 510 637 3200
Space Katherine A. Rosenblatt +1 408 535 5525
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson, Diamant & Brill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara L. Chenetz +1 310 277 7400
No Logo Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Danning Gill Diamond & Kollitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Gill +1 310 277 0077 1 +1 +1 +1 DAGILL@DGDK.com
  Entries (400) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: None
[762-1] Final Decree. (femp) (Entered: 10/03/1997)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: None
    Trustee's Report of Distribution. (femp) (Entered: 10/03/1997)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: None
      Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 4652.61 for Various . (plt) (Entered: 06/26/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 688 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Foundation Research LLC). (jd) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 688 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2025.57 . Filed by Creditor Foundation Research LLC .). (tt) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2025.57 . Filed by Creditor Foundation Research LLC . (RE: related document(s) 634 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 11/21/2010, Entered: None
              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 684 Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency). Service Date 11/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/21/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 11/21/2010, Entered: None
                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 685 Court Entry). Service Date 11/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/21/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                  Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 663 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,510.79 . Filed by Creditor Pinnacle Real Estate ., 674 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 682 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3626.44 . Filed by Creditor Legal Index Services , Fund Locator Asset Recovery Trust .). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3626.44 . Filed by Creditor Legal Index Services , Fund Locator Asset Recovery Trust . (RE: related document(s) 626 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 668 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Marion Cobin). (jd) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 670 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Keys Research, Creditor East Coast Abstracting). (jd) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                            Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 672 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Asset Recovery Trust, Creditor Donna Stovall). (jd) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 668 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $76.08 . Filed by Creditor Marion Cobin ., 676 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 9/12/2010, Entered: None
                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 676 Court Entry). Service Date 09/12/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/12/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 674 Court Entry). Service Date 08/25/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 672 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1062.44 . Filed by Fund Locator Asset Recovery Trust , Creditor Donna Stovall .). (ba) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1062.44 . Filed by Fund Locator Asset Recovery Trust , Creditor Donna Stovall . (RE: related document(s) 645 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 670 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2952.56 . Filed by Creditor East Coast Abstracting , Fund Locator Keys Research .). (ba) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2952.56 . Filed by Creditor East Coast Abstracting , Fund Locator Keys Research . (RE: related document(s) 622 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 668 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $76.08 . Filed by Creditor Marion Cobin .). (ba) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $76.08 . Filed by Creditor Marion Cobin . (RE: related document(s) 615 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 7/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 666 Final Decree). Service Date 07/17/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/17/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Final Decree . (jd) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged filed on behalf of Trustee, Mohamed Poonja. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed by Trustee Mohamed Poonja. (Attachments: # 1 Form 1# 2 Form 2)(U.S. Trustee (pv)) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 663 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,510.79 . Filed by Creditor Pinnacle Real Estate .). (ba) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,510.79 . Filed by Creditor Pinnacle Real Estate . (RE: related document(s) 659 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 660 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor Ameristar Information Network Ltd.). (jd) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 660 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4628.33 . Filed by Creditor Ameristar Information Network Ltd. , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (tt) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4628.33 . Filed by Creditor Ameristar Information Network Ltd. , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 577 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1510.79 For Pinnacle Real Estate Services Inc. (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Dana Ventura (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Meloday Abraham (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 673.88 For Simpson Title Recording Servies (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 367.37 For Record Check Sercices (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 192.92 For TLC Research (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 652.14 For Sanlapper Legal Services (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 54.35 For Barry Silver (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For Michael P. Molk (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 232.98 For L&D Abstractors (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1744.08 For American Title (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 168.47 For Charles C. Caison (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Dale Miller (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Monica Taylor (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1062.44 For Donna Stovall (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 40.76 For Daniel and Lyra Drake (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Carole Cannon (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.05 For Stacee Plotner (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Richard Rubenstein (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 84.23 For Teddy Bailey (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 86.95 For John Hargett (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Cathy Martin (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Janelle Shanfelder (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 92.39 For Barbara Boyce (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 217.38 For Erie County Title Services (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2025.57 For Foundation Research LLC (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 100.54 For Daniel Martin (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 43.48 For Carmen Gerrard (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 62.50 For William H. Gamble (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Theresa Cyrus (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For Cathy Davis (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 105.43 For Reliable Title Search, Inc. (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For April Cates (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 3626.44 For Legal Index Services, Inc. (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For Sweitzers Notary Services (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 94.56 For Bi-State Title Services (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 32.61 For Shore Abstract & Title Services, Inc. (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2952.56 For East Coast Abstracting (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 90.76 For Tailwind Ventures, Inc. (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 46.20 For Amy Beth Geiger (jd)Notice of (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 475.52 For Robert Schwartz (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Barbara Masters (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Jerry A. Stone (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.09 For Kelley Holland (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For Marion Cobin (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Marisol Ruiz (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 54.34 For Maureen Radtke (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 46.19 For Melissa Bell (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 40.76 For Record Search America (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Mobile Notary Service (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Frank Sykes (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 665.73 For The Final Step (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Cynthia Motlow (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 122.28 For Beth Kennedy (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 54.35 For Stephanie Zeitlin (jd) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT MODIFIED FILE DATE TO REFLECT PDF. Modified on 3/23/2010 (jd). (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Bernhard Clemens (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 32.61 For Brenda A. Armstrong (jd)CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT MODIFIED FILE DATE TO REFLECT PDF. Modified on 3/23/2010 (jd). (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1507.80 For Valley Abstract, CArd Investment Grp. (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 367.91 For Joe Klaczak (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 120.37 For Coast to Coast Research (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 122.27 For Jennifer Blimline (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For Deborah J. Verter (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 40.76 For James Ashlock (jd) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 114.12 For Alicia Williams (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For James W. Rankin Jr. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 106.87 For 24 Hour Record Retriever (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 149.45 For Susan Schneider (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 674.42 For Jackie Remington Stewart (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 81.52 For Race Enterprises, Inc. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 152.17 For Hoyt & Waller, PC (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 144.02 For Harris Communications/ Veronica Harros (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Wesley C. Kibler DBA Huds (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Amanda Andruzzi (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 171.87 For All County Abstract (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 51.63 For Catherine Tarbox (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Financial Safeguards Grou (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 114.12 For Michelle Doyle (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 95.10 For Zoe Barghout (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1033.64 For Bryant Safety (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.05 For Betsy Begens (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 510.84 For Quality Escrow Services Corp (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 380.41 For Law Office of Raymond Des Wetels (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 4628.33 For Ameristar Information Net Work (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Byron Pearce (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 163.04 For Rodney Schonland, Esq. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 16.30 For Kyle Williams (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 84.24 For Barbara Davis (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 46.19 For Erika Corella (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 79.34 For Advantage Research Corporation (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Jeanette Friedmann (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 46.20 For Mitchell Emswiler (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 62.50 For Propinquity (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Peter A. Molle (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 114.12 For James Barnes, Action Services (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Rick E. Lopez (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 54.34 For Joan J Myers DBA Rusty My (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.05 For Signet Consulting, Inc. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 152.17 For Michael Silver (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 114.12 For Hugh Nations (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 170.75 For Marjorie L Bell (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1508.07 For Florida Abstract Pro, Inc (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 84.23 For Richard E. Stewart (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 85.86 For Bucks Legal Services, Inc. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 86.95 For Integrity Research, LLC. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.09 For Theo C. Watkins Jr. (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Raoul J Larrinaga (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 62.50 For connie J. Adams (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Henry D Reiss (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For Kristen Roadfuss (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Heather Hall (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Lisa Gallin (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 84.23 For Jackson Abstractors Inc (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 485.30 For Wisconsin Title Inc-Fond (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 48.91 For Trovall Notary Services (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 76.08 For IDA Jeffers (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.04 For Joe Dowd (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 65.21 For Merlin Mitchell (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 65.21 For Kentucky Notary Services (acp) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 407 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3964.67 . Filed by Fund Locator James A.(ra) Tiemstra , Creditor Stewart Title Guaranty & Insurance Co. .). (tt) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 409 Court Entry, ). Service Date 03/04/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 407 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3964.67 . Filed by Fund Locator James A.(ra) Tiemstra , Creditor Stewart Title Guaranty & Insurance Co. .). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3964.67 . Filed by Fund Locator James A.(ra) Tiemstra , Creditor Stewart Title Guaranty & Insurance Co. . (RE: related document(s) 404 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 325.60 For Wells Fargo Home Mortgage (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 58.96 For UltraDNS Corporation (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 3964.67 For Stewart Title Guaranty & Insurance Co. (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2451.43 For Skysoft Enterprise (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 123.50 For OFSI (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 30.50 For Michael Holland (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 5.97 For Jamesia Mobley (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 24.03 For Joe Evans (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2004.90 For Susan Lee Dau (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 8.01 For Mike Coyne (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 114.36 For Daniel F. Cancro (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 46.90 For Becky Taylor (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 23.79 For Bank Serv (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 104.70 For Anil Dindigal (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1661.32 For American Express (be, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (Related Doc # 329 ) (clc) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 334 Final Decree). Service Date 04/05/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Final Decree . (jd) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee Carol Wu. (U.S. Trustee (pv)) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 331 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/11/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 329 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3,758.05 . Filed by Fund Locator Adams & Cohen , Creditor The Taylor Group .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3,758.05 . Filed by Fund Locator Adams & Cohen , Creditor The Taylor Group . (RE: related document(s) 317 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 327 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 01/16/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (Related Doc # 325 ) (er, ) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 325 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $22327.66 . Filed by Creditor DB Surgical .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $22327.66 . Filed by Creditor DB Surgical . (RE: related document(s) 314 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 323 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 01/07/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (Related Doc # 321 ) (er, ) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 321 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1618.85 . Filed by Creditor GeoTec, Inc. .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1618.85 . Filed by Creditor GeoTec, Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 310 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 83.87 For Kinko's, Inc. (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,455.86 For Carl Zeiss Strasse 22 (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2120.90 For Integrated Communications Consultants Corp. (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 3758.05 For Taylor, Inc. (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 785.28 For Diversified Financial Services (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 10665.84 For Cardinal Health (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 22327.66 For DB Surgical, Inc. (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 33.73 For Bio Space (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 89.46 For Viking Office Products (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 179.90 For Pacific Bell (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,618.85 For Geo Tec Incorporated (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 143.75 For Amazin Graphics (er, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds (RE: related document(s) 306 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Cobble & Company). (lb) Modified on 12/14/2010 (lb). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 306 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $23703.36 . Filed by Creditor Cobble & Company .). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $23703.36 . Filed by Creditor Cobble & Company . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 302 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Kyle Lind). (lb) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 300 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator John Costello, Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner). (lb) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 302 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $625.83 . Filed by Creditor Kyle Lind .). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $625.83 . Filed by Creditor Kyle Lind . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 300 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $574.69 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner , Fund Locator John Costello .). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $574.69 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner , Fund Locator John Costello . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 287 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey). (lb) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC ., 290 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 295 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust). (lb) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 295 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13,909.36 . Filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust .). (tt) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13,909.36 . Filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 292 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu). (lb) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 292 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $389.91 . Filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu .). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $389.91 . Filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 290 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/20/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds In The Amount of $630.57 (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor John Polito). (lb, ) Modified on 2/11/2009 (lb, ). (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 284 Final Decree). Service Date 01/28/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Final Decree . (lb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John Kendall. (U.S. Trustee (mp), ) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 280 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator John Costello, Creditor Daniel Racanelli). (lb, ) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 280 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $576.40 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Racanelli , Fund Locator John Costello .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $576.40 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Racanelli , Fund Locator John Costello . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 12/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 278 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 12/14/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds to Brian Falkenhainer (Related Doc # 276 ) (trw, ) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 276 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4892.77 . Filed by Creditor Brian C. Falkenhainer .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4892.77 . Filed by Creditor Brian C. Falkenhainer . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 261 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor David Michael Barnes). (lb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 273 Court Entry). Service Date 11/20/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 268 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins). (am, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 268 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13903.79 . Filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13903.79 . Filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Tao Ye). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 264 Court Entry, ). Service Date 10/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application, Complete Trustee Notice (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 261 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $605.91 . Filed by Creditor David Michael Barnes , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $605.91 . Filed by Creditor David Michael Barnes , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 250 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 248 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group, Creditor Emptoris). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $992.49 . Filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez ., now known as Frances A. Mendez Kloes). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $992.49 . Filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez , now known as Frances A. Mendez Kloes . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4,841.02 . Filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4,841.02 . Filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 250 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $932.48 . Filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport .). (Taylor, Toni) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $932.48 . Filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 248 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7033.92 . Filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group , Creditor Emptoris for diCarta Inc. .). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 9/8/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7033.92 . Filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group , Creditor Emptoris for diCarta Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 9/8/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 245 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor James O'Reilly). (lb, ) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 245 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3414.86 . Filed by Creditor James O'Reilly .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3414.86 . Filed by Creditor James O'Reilly . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk for Creditors:O'Reilly, James $2,449.40, Ye, Tao $2,023.15, Kneubuhl, Joshua $2,824.87, Brian Falkenhainer $2,824.87, Iquantic $1,449.23, Davenport, Timothy G $932.48, Xu, Xiubo $389.91, Mendez, Frances a $992.49, Ford, Seth Bruce $401.02, Dicarta, Inc $7,033.92, CRI $7,737.79, Jansky, Richard $788.69, Innovative $2,139.51, Stoner, Daniel $574.69, RC Design $199.37, Fragomen, Del Rey $1,866.77, Silver & Lee Associates $2,693.84, PCR $9,296.11, Barnes, David M $605.91, Intelligence Data, Inc $890.76, O'Reilly, James $965.46, Ye, Tao $596.40, Kneubuhl, Joshua $2,016.15, Brian Falkenhainer $2,067.90. (am, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order, To Pay Unclaimed Funds Of $ 615.35 To Robin Smoot . (ta) (Entered: 08/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [197-1] Final Decree. (femp) (Entered: 02/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Report of Distribution. (ta) (Entered: 02/03/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/13/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [194-1] Application To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 1,869.51 To the Clerk, U. S. Bankruptcy Court. (State of Oregon, Public Utility Commission $23.86; State of oregon, Public Utility Commission $883.69; Arnold Olson $623.47; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan $338.49) by Raymond A. Carey . (jb) (Entered: 10/15/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/13/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application Filed By Trustee Raymond A. Carey To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 1,869.51 To the Clerk, U. S. Bankruptcy Court. (State of Oregon, Public Utility Commission $23.86; State of oregon, Public Utility Commission $883.69; Arnold Olson $623.47; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan $338.49) (jb) (Entered: 10/15/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2583.46 For David A. Clark, M.D. (er) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2583.46 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor David Allen Clark . Creditor was paid on February 10, 2003 (RE: related document(s) 162 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [165-1] Final Decree. (be) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Report of Distribution. (be) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Trustee John W. Richardson of [155-1] Asset Report . (be) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 16.22 for Doctors on Duty . (be) (Entered: 09/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Directing Payment of Funds to Creditor/Claimant. (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 154 Final Decree). Service Date 12/22/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Re-Closing Case. (jaw, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Decree . (jkw, ) Modified on 12/20/2006 GENERATED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.(jkw, ). (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee Tevis Thompson. (U.S. Trustee (sp), ) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 69.77 For Eltech Electronics . (jkw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,231.34 For International Business Machine . (jkw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 7.56 For MFS Intelenet Inc. . (jkw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1.17 For Linda De Bene Inc. . (jkw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1.60 For Morrison Express Corp. . (jkw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 5.26 For Kalex Circuit Board Co. . (jkw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ $19.35 For Chartered Electronics Ind. . (pl, ) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 7.77 For First Portland Leasing Corp. . (pl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 45.20 For ULSL Systems, Inc. . (pl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 66.50 For Alliance Semiconductor . (pl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 3.05 For King Kong Freight Systems, Inc. . (pl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ .66 For Summit Components . (pl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 139 Order on Motion to Reopen Chapter 7/13 Case). Service Date 04/13/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion To Reopen Chapter 7 (Related Doc # 138 ) (pl, ) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case and Appointment of Trustee. Fee Waived. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee /Oak (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Trustee in Support of Application) (McGee, Margaret) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Decree . (sf, ) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Report of Distribution. . (plt, ) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order for Payment of Unclaimed Dividends. $2,538.85 to Eltech Electronics. (trw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 20.36 For Rauch Milliken Ints, Inc. . (trw, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2,538.85 For Eltech Electronics c/o Pillsbury, Madison & Sutro . (trw, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 191.52 For Kalex Circuit Board Co. c/o MSC Intl . (trw, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 120 ). fees awarded: $25415.01, expenses awarded: $219.91 for Tevis Thompson (rba, ) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 704.01 For Chartered Electronics, Ind. . (trw, ) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 24.21 For Summit Components . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,644.60 For ULSI Systems, Inc. . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 111.26 For King Kong Freight System, Inc. . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 274.95 For MFS Intelenet, Inc. . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Authorizing Payment of Unclaimed Bankruptcy Dividend . (cvc, ) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (aw, ) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [120-1] Final Decree. (dc) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Trustee's Report of Distribution. (dc) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Unclaimed Dividends filed by Trustee Edward F. Towers. (dc) (Entered: 02/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES: HEARING DROPPED ON 4/5/07 AT 3:00 P.M.. NO APPEARANCES. MATTER WAS TAKEN OFF THE CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF DEBTORS' ATTORNEY PRIOR TO THE HEARING. (RE: related document(s) 89 Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case . Fee Amount $260, Motion Re Accounting of Distribution of Funds; Declaration of Attorney Roni Rotholz Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jaw, )). (hb, ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Re-Closing Case. (jaw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Joanne M. LaFreniere in support of (RE: related document(s) 92 Response, ). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Motion to Re-Open Re Accounting of Distribution of Funds (RE: related document(s) 89 Motion to Reopen Chapter 7/13 Case, Motion Miscellaneous Relief). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Errata to Exhibit "A" Attached to Declaration of Robert Eisenberg in Support of "Emergency Motion for Order (a) Authorizing Debtors to Enter Into Technology Escrow and License Arrangement in the Ordinary Course of Business, and (b) Establlishing Procedures for Approval of Escrow and License Arrangements" Filed by Debtor Condor Systems, Inc. (ol) (Entered: 12/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Reopen Case, Order To Set Hearing on Debtors' Request for Claification Re Accounting (RE: related document(s) 89 Motion to Reopen Chapter 7/13 Case, Motion Miscellaneous Relief filed by Debtor Bob Argyropoulos, Debtor Helen Argyropoulos). Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2007 at 03:00 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Tchaikovsky. (jaw, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case . Fee Amount $260, Motion Re Accounting of Distribution of Funds; Declaration of Attorney Roni Rotholz Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jaw, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Decree . (jaw, ) Modified on 4/27/2006 NEF WAS NOT SENT.(jaw, ). (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Motion Re: [86-1] Motion To Dismiss Case by David Burchard Scheduled For 1:00 1/10/01 at San Francisco Courtroom 22 (femp) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion By Trustee David Burchard To Dismiss Case . (femp) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Dropped RE: [80-1] Motion To Dismiss Case by David Burchard . (ql) (Entered: 09/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Withdrawal of Document Filed by Trustee David Burchard RE: [80-1] Motion To Dismiss Case by David Burchard . (ql) (Entered: 09/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 79 Order on Application for Compensation, ). Service Date 09/23/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application for Compensation and Reimbursement for John Kendall , Trustee Chapter 7, Fee: $21305.40, Expenses: $116.18. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Related Doc # 68 ). fees awarded: $21305.40, expenses awarded: $116.18 for John Kendall (jal, ) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application for Compensation of Broker/Real Esate Agent for Anne Bruff, Realtor, Fee: $16,500.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Related Doc # 65 ). fees awarded: $16500.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 for Anne Bruff (jal, ) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Final Application for Compensation for Reidun Stromsheim, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $16,898.50, Expenses: $843.55. Filed by Attorney Reidun Stromsheim (Related Doc # 57 ). fees awarded: $18620.00, expenses awarded: $843.55 for Reidun Stromsheim (jal, ) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Final Application for Compensation together with Proof of Service for Jay D. Crom, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $14,238.50, Expenses: $137.24. Filed by Tr Accountant Jay D. Crom (Related Doc # 63 ). fees awarded: $14238.50, expenses awarded: $137.24 for Jay D. Crom (jal, ) (Entered: 09/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES: HEARING HELD 9/8/05 AT 3:00 P.M. APPEARING: JOHN KENDALL - TRUSTEE, REIDUN STROMSHEIM - ATTORNEY FOR TRUSTEE, JAY CROM - ACCOUNTANT FOR TRUSTEE, ANN BRUFF - REALTOR FOR TRUSTEE. 1) TRUSTEE'S FINAL ACCOUNT AND FEES AND EXPENSES APPROVED. 2) STROMSHEIM & ASSOC., ATTORNEYS FOR TRUSTEE: THE FEES AMOUNTS ARE DIFFERENT ON THE APPLICATION AND ON THE NOTICE. MS. STROMSHEIM STATES THE CORRECT AMOUNT IS THE ONE ON THE NOTICE. MS. STROMSHEIM TO SUBMIT A FORM OF ORDER WITH THE CORRECT AMOUNT. 3) BACHECKI, CROM & CO., ACCOUNTANTS FOR TRUSTEE: THE DECLARATION ATTESTING TO THE TRUTH SHOULD BE SIGNED BY AN INDIVIDUAL. 4) WELLS & BENNET, REALTORS FOR TRUSTEE: 2016 STATEMENT TO BE SUBMITTED. (RE: related document(s) 70 Notice of Filing of Trustee's Final Report and Hearing on Application(s) for Compensation. . Final Meeting to be held on 9/8/2005 at 03:00 PM Oakland Room 201 - Tchaikovsky (jjd, ), 65 Application for Compensation of Broker/Real Esate Agent for Anne Bruff, Realtor, Fee: $16,500.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kendall, John), 63 Final Application for Compensation together with Proof of Service for Jay D. Crom, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $14,238.50, Expenses: $137.24. Filed by Tr Accountant Jay D. Crom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Crom, Jay), 68 Application for Compensation and Reimbursement for John Kendall , Trustee Chapter 7, Fee: $21305.40, Expenses: $116.18. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jjd, ), 57 Final Application for Compensation for Reidun Stromsheim, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $16,898.50, Expenses: $843.55. Filed by Attorney Reidun Stromsheim (Stromsheim, Reidun), 69 Trustee's Final Report. (Attachments: # 1 Required Information for Noticing and Bank Statements)(jjd, )). (hb, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Anne Bruff in support of Fee Application (RE: related document(s) 65 Application for Compensation). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Stromsheim, Reidun) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Declaration of Jay D. Crom in support of (RE: related document(s) 63 Final Application for Compensation together with Proof of Service for Jay D. Crom, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $14,238.50, Expenses: $137.24.). Filed by Tr Accountant Jay D. Crom (Crom, Jay) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 74 Order on Motion to Abandon). Service Date 08/21/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion to Abandon Two Real Properties (Undeveloped land located at 45th and 46th Avenue, Oakland, CA; and 2313 Saddleback Drive, Danville, CA) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Related Doc # 66 ) (jal, ) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Joanne M. LaFreniere in support of (RE: related document(s) 72 Motion for Entry of Default, ). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Entry of Default Approving and Authorizing Trustee's Motion to Abandon Two Real Properties (RE: related document(s) 66 Motion to Abandon filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Final Account. (RE: related document(s) 70 Final Meeting Sched/Resched). Service Date 08/12/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Trustee's Final Report and Hearing on Application(s) for Compensation. . Final Meeting to be held on 9/8/2005 at 03:00 PM Oakland Room 201 - Tchaikovsky (jjd, ) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Final Report. (Attachments: # 1 Required Information for Noticing and Bank Statements)(jjd, ) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation and Reimbursement for John Kendall , Trustee Chapter 7, Fee: $21305.40, Expenses: $116.18. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jjd, ) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Abandonment of Two Real Properties (Undeveloped land located at 45th and 46th Avenue, Oakland, CA; and 2313 Saddleback Drive, Danville, CA) (w/proof of service & service list)., Notice and Opportunity for Hearing (RE: related document(s) 66 Motion to Abandon Two Real Properties (Undeveloped land located at 45th and 46th Avenue, Oakland, CA; and 2313 Saddleback Drive, Danville, CA) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne)). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Abandon Two Real Properties (Undeveloped land located at 45th and 46th Avenue, Oakland, CA; and 2313 Saddleback Drive, Danville, CA) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation of Broker/Real Esate Agent for Anne Bruff, Realtor, Fee: $16,500.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kendall, John) (Entered: 07/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Jay D. Crom in support of Final Application for Compensation and Expense Reimbursement (RE: related document(s) 63 Application for Compensation Filed by Tr Accountant Jay D. Crom (Crom, Jay) Modified on 7/13/2005 CREATED DOCKET RELATIONSHIP TO DOC #63.(jal, ). (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Final Application for Compensation together with Proof of Service for Jay D. Crom, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $14,238.50, Expenses: $137.24. Filed by Tr Accountant Jay D. Crom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Crom, Jay) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Document Supplement to Application for Final Compensation (w/certification & proof of service) in (RE: related document(s) 57 Application for Compensation). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Stromsheim, Reidun) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application for Custody of Claims (Related Doc # 38 ) (cld, ) Modified on 6/2/2005 ORDER RE-DOCKETED IN ERROR(cld, ). (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application for Custody of Claims until June 22, 2005 (Related Doc # 59 ) (lf, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Custody of Claims Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Kendall, John) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Reidun Stromsheim in support of (RE: related document(s) 57 Application for Compensation). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Stromsheim, Reidun) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Application for Compensation for Reidun Stromsheim, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $16,898.50, Expenses: $843.55. Filed by Attorney Reidun Stromsheim (Stromsheim, Reidun) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Withdrawal of Documents re Objection to Claims of Exemption (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Claim). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s) 54 Motion for Relief from Stay and Declaration of Tarsha Rucker in Support Thereon RS #ASW-126, Fee Amount $150,. Filed by Creditor MTGLQ Investors L.P. and Ocwen Federal Bank as its Servicing Agent (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tarsha Rucker in Support of Motion# 2 RS Cover Sheet # 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6) (Wolf, Alan)). Hearing scheduled for 2/18/2005 at 11:00 AM at Oakland Room 201 - Tchaikovsky. Filed by Creditor MTGLQ Investors L.P. and Ocwen Federal Bank as its Servicing Agent (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wolf, Alan) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Relief from Stay and Declaration of Tarsha Rucker in Support Thereon RS #ASW-126, Fee Amount $150,. Filed by Creditor MTGLQ Investors L.P. and Ocwen Federal Bank as its Servicing Agent (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tarsha Rucker in Support of Motion# 2 RS Cover Sheet # 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6) (Wolf, Alan) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Notice Filed by Creditor OCWEN Federal Bank FSB (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wolf, Alan) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Order Authorizing Additional Time to Complete Debtors' Re-Finance of Property in Lieu of Proposed Sale (RE: related document(s) 51 Order). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jal, ) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Authorizing Additional Time to Complete Debtors' Re-Finance of Property in Lieu of Proposed Sale (2313 Saddleback Dr. Danville, CA). (jal, ) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 48 Order on Motion for Entry of Default). Service Date 11/12/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 47 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 11/10/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Authorizing Debtors' Refinance of Property in Lieu of Proposed Sale (Related Doc # 43 ) (jal, ) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Employ Bachecki, Crom and Co. LLP as Accountant (Related Doc # 46 ) (jal, ) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Employ Bachecki, Crom & Co., LLP as Accountant Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Kendall, John) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Joanne M. LaFreniere in support of (RE: related document(s) 43 Motion for Entry of Default, ). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of John T. Kendall in support of (RE: related document(s) 43 Motion for Entry of Default, ). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Entry of Default Authorizing Debtors' Refinance of Property in Lieu of Proposed Sale (RE: related document(s) 42 Notice filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Regarding Debtors' Re-Finance of Property in Lieu of Proposed Sale and Notice of Opportunity to Request Hearing (2313 Saddleback Dr.) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Objection to Trustee's Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Certain Liens, including Tax Liens (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Including Tax Liens Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jal, )). Hearing scheduled for 10/1/2004 at 09:00 AM at Oakland Room 201. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (LaFreniere, Joanne) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 39 Order). Service Date 09/02/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting (RE: related document(s) 38 Application for Custody of Claims filed by Trustee John Kendall). (jal, ) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Custody of Claims Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Kendall, John) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and Order to Reconvert Case from Chapter 13 Back to a Case Under Chapter 7. (jal, ) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service of Stipulation and Order to Reconvert Cast From Chapter 13 Back to a Chase Under Chapter 7 Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jal, ) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 13 (Related Doc # 31 ) Trustee John Kendall removed from the case. Trustee Martha G. Bronitsky added to the case. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 9/15/2004. Chapter 13 Plan due by 8/31/2004. (jal, ) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Roni Rotholz (RE: related document(s) 33 Objection to Sale of Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Request for Hearing). Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jal, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection , Request for Hearing Regarding (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens). Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jal, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s) 31 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 13). Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jal, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 13 Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jal, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of John T. Kendall in Support of (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Including Tax Liens). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jal, ) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Intent to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens and Notice of Opportunity to Overbid . Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jal, ) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Including Tax Liens filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (jal, ) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Document: Trustee's Withdrawal of No Asset Report. (RE: related document(s) Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution,, ). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Kendall, John) (Entered: 07/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Debtor(s) to Appear at Continued Meeting of Creditors . (RE: related document(s) 25 Notice of Order). Service Date 06/26/2004. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Order (RE: related document(s) Meeting of Creditors Continued). (mhi, ) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting: 23 Amended application for Order Authorizing Examination Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (mhi, ) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended application for Order Authorizing Examination Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (With Proof of Service) (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion for Examination filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Stromsheim, Reidun) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for 2004 Examination of Bob and Helen Argyropoulos (With Proof of Service) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Stromsheim, Reidun) (Entered: 06/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting: 15 Application to Employ Stromsheim and Associates as Counsel (mhi, ) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting: 13 Application to Employ Anne Bruff as Real Estate Broker (mhi, ) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Possible Dividend. Service Date 05/26/2004. (Related Doc # 18 ) (Admin.) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Possible Dividends . Proofs of Claims due by 8/24/2004 (mhi, ) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Objection and Objection to Claims of Exemption Filed by Trustee John Kendall . (mhi, ) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Reidun Stromsheim Filed by Trustee John Kendall in Support RE: 15 Application to Employ Stromsheim and Associates as Counsel (mhi, ) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Employ Stromsheim and Associates as Counsel Filed by Trustee John Kendall (mhi, ) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos , Trustee John Kendall Extending Time to Object to the Debtor's Discharge (mhi, ) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Employ Anne Bruff as Real Estate Broker Filed by Trustee John Kendall (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Listing Agreement# 2 Declaration # 3 Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Kendall, John) (Entered: 05/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trustee's Request for Notice of Possible Dividends. (Kendall, John) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Appear and Notice of Intent to Dismiss. Service Date 04/16/2004. (Related Doc # 10 ) (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Order (RE: related document(s) Debtor (s) DID NOT Appear. ). (trw, ) (Entered: 04/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 375.00 (jal, ) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Schedules D and F . Fee Amount $26, Schedules A - J (RE: related document(s) 6 Order to File Missing Documents). Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (jal, ) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order and Notice of Failure to File Required Documents. Service Date 03/31/2004. (Related Doc # 6 ) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order and Notice Regarding Failure of the Debtor(s) to File Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents . Non-Compliance (Documents) due by 4/12/2004 (lw, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Related Cases RE: [1-1] Voluntary Petition By Debtor Condor Systems, Inc. Case Number 01-55472 and CEI Systems, Inc. Case Number 01-55473. (ol) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Service Date 03/14/2004. (Related Doc # 3 ) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) . (lw, ) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtors Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos (lw, ) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $209, Filed by Bob Argyropoulos , Helen Argyropoulos . Order Meeting of Creditors due by 3/26/2004. Incomplete Filings due by 3/26/2004. (oe, ) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 431 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?