Consilient, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case California Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-Jan-1970
District Judge Randall J. Newsome, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chris D. Kuhner, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Chris D. Kuhner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris D. Kuhner +1 510 763 1000 c.kuhner@kornfieldlaw.com
No Logo Consilient, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Cooper +1 510 834 6600 mcooper@wendel.com
No Logo John Kendall, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Chris D. Kuhner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris D. Kuhner +1 510 763 1000 c.kuhner@kornfieldlaw.com
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (172) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds (RE: related document(s) 306 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Cobble & Company). (lb) Modified on 12/14/2010 (lb). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 306 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $23703.36 . Filed by Creditor Cobble & Company .). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $23703.36 . Filed by Creditor Cobble & Company . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 302 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Kyle Lind). (lb) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 304 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 300 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator John Costello, Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner). (lb) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 302 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $625.83 . Filed by Creditor Kyle Lind .). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $625.83 . Filed by Creditor Kyle Lind . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 300 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $574.69 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner , Fund Locator John Costello .). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 300 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $574.69 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner , Fund Locator John Costello . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 287 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey). (lb) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC ., 290 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 295 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust). (lb) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 295 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13,909.36 . Filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust .). (tt) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13,909.36 . Filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 292 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu). (lb) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 292 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $389.91 . Filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu .). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $389.91 . Filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 290 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/20/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                      Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds In The Amount of $630.57 (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor John Polito). (lb, ) Modified on 2/11/2009 (lb, ). (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 284 Final Decree). Service Date 01/28/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                Final Decree . (lb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John Kendall. (U.S. Trustee (mp), ) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 280 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator John Costello, Creditor Daniel Racanelli). (lb, ) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 280 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $576.40 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Racanelli , Fund Locator John Costello .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $576.40 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Racanelli , Fund Locator John Costello . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 12/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 278 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 12/14/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds to Brian Falkenhainer (Related Doc # 276 ) (trw, ) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 276 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4892.77 . Filed by Creditor Brian C. Falkenhainer .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4892.77 . Filed by Creditor Brian C. Falkenhainer . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 261 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor David Michael Barnes). (lb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 273 Court Entry). Service Date 11/20/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 268 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins). (am, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 268 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13903.79 . Filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13903.79 . Filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Tao Ye). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 264 Court Entry, ). Service Date 10/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/12/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application, Complete Trustee Notice (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 261 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $605.91 . Filed by Creditor David Michael Barnes , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $605.91 . Filed by Creditor David Michael Barnes , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 250 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 248 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group, Creditor Emptoris). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $992.49 . Filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez ., now known as Frances A. Mendez Kloes). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $992.49 . Filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez , now known as Frances A. Mendez Kloes . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4,841.02 . Filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4,841.02 . Filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 250 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $932.48 . Filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport .). (Taylor, Toni) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $932.48 . Filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 248 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7033.92 . Filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group , Creditor Emptoris for diCarta Inc. .). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 9/8/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7033.92 . Filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group , Creditor Emptoris for diCarta Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 9/8/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 245 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor James O'Reilly). (lb, ) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 245 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3414.86 . Filed by Creditor James O'Reilly .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3414.86 . Filed by Creditor James O'Reilly . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk for Creditors:O'Reilly, James $2,449.40, Ye, Tao $2,023.15, Kneubuhl, Joshua $2,824.87, Brian Falkenhainer $2,824.87, Iquantic $1,449.23, Davenport, Timothy G $932.48, Xu, Xiubo $389.91, Mendez, Frances a $992.49, Ford, Seth Bruce $401.02, Dicarta, Inc $7,033.92, CRI $7,737.79, Jansky, Richard $788.69, Innovative $2,139.51, Stoner, Daniel $574.69, RC Design $199.37, Fragomen, Del Rey $1,866.77, Silver & Lee Associates $2,693.84, PCR $9,296.11, Barnes, David M $605.91, Intelligence Data, Inc $890.76, O'Reilly, James $965.46, Ye, Tao $596.40, Kneubuhl, Joshua $2,016.15, Brian Falkenhainer $2,067.90. (am, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 87 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 86 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 85 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 84 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 83 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 82 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 81 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 80 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 79 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Regarding (RE: related document(s) 78 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee John Kendall). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application for Custody of Claims (Related Doc # 77 ) (vmb, ) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Order Regarding: (RE: related document(s) 75 Order on Application to Compromise Controversy). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Compromise Controversy with (Related Doc # 73 ) (vmb, ) (Entered: 08/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Vivian H. Rhoe in Support of (RE: related document(s) 73 Application to Compromise Controversy). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Compromise Controversy with American Management Systems Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Compromise of Controversy with American Management Systems, Inc.. Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Creditor Request for Notice Filed by Creditor American Express Travel Related Services, Inc. (vmb, ) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Compromise Controversy with (Related Doc # 66 ) (vmb, ) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 59 ). Granting for Michael Q. Eagan, fees awarded: $60,000.00, expenses awarded: $ (vmb, ) (Entered: 05/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 58 ). Granting for Eric A. Nyberg, fees awarded: $66,930.82, expenses awarded: $2417.57 (vmb, ) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Chris D. Kuhner in Support of (RE: related document(s) 66 Application to Compromise Controversy with Oak Hill Venture Partners, FW Ventures V, L.P., FW Ventures IX, L.P., Consilient Funding, L.P., Ray Conley, Michael Spence, Sitelet Software Corp. (Formerly) known as Software Holdings, Inc. and eGain Communications (collectively the OHVP Parties) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, )). Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Compromise Controversy with Oak Hill Venture Partners, FW Ventures V, L.P., FW Ventures IX, L.P., Consilient Funding, L.P., Ray Conley, Michael Spence, Sitelet Software Corp. (Formerly) known as Software Holdings, Inc. and eGain Communications (collectively the OHVP Parties) Filed by Trustee John Kendall (vmb, ) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Chris D. Kuhner on behalf of John Kendall against Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. . Fee Amount $0.00 . (lbo, ) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Held Minutes: 1) Applications For Compensation Filed by Michael Eagan Approved as Requested, Order Signed in Court. 2) Application for Compensation Filed by Kornfield, Paul & Nyberg Fees Approved in the amount of $66,930.82 & Costs in the amount of $2717.57. Form of Order to be Submitted.(RE: related document(s) 58 Application for Compensation, 59 Application for Compensation filed by Spec. Counsel Michael Q. Eagan, 60 Notice of Hearing, ). (vmb, ) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Trustee John T. Kendall Re: [59-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 60000, ) by Michael Q. Eagan . (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Trustee John T. Kendall Re: [58-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 70513.25, Expenses: $ 2417.57) by Eric A. Nyberg . (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Chris D. Kuhner filed by Eric A. Nyberg for Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [59-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 60000, ) by Michael Q. Eagan . (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing RE: [58-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 70513.25, Expenses: $ 2417.57) by Eric A. Nyberg set For 2:00 4/23/03 at Oakland Room 220, [59-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 60000, ) by Michael Q. Eagan set For 2:00 4/23/03 at Oakland Room 220 (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application By Special Counsel Michael Q. Eagan For Compensation ( Fees: $ 60000, ) . (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application By Eric A. Nyberg for Trustee John T. Kendall For Compensation ( Fees: $ 70513.25, Expenses: $ 2417.57) . (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Compromise of Controversy With Oak Hill Venture Partners, FW Ventures V, FW Ventures IX, Consilient Funding, RAy Conley, Michael Spence, Sitelet Software Corp. and eGain Communications Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Kurt M. Anderson for Creditor Sunrise International Leasing Corp.. (plt) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Substitute Attorney Peter G. Bertrand For Old Attorney: John D. Fredericks. Involvement of attorney John D. Fredericks for Software Holdings, Inc. terminated. (plt) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request by Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. For Notice. (plt) (Entered: 12/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting [51-1] Application To Employ Special Counsel by John T. Kendall Special Counsel Michael Q. Eagan . (plt) (Entered: 12/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Chris D. Kuhner filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [51-1] Application To Employ Special Counsel by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 12/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application By Trustee John T. Kendall To Employ Special Counsel . (plt) (Entered: 12/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [49-1] Motion For Approval of Litigation Finance Agreement by John T. Kendall, [49-2] Motion Granting Priority Lien by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 12/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion By Trustee John T. Kendall For Approval of Litigation Finance Agreement , Granting Priority Lien (plt) (Entered: 12/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting [47-1] Application For Production of Documents: Certain Banking Records by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Production of Documents: Certain Banking Records (plt) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting [45-1] Application For Production of Documents: Described in Exhibit A by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Production of Documents: Described in Exhibit A (plt) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opinion RE: [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. With Certificate of Mailing. (plt) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By John D. Fredericks for Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. Of [41-1] Response To [35-1] Response To [32-1] Response To [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall, [24-1] Declaration filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall by John T. Kendall by Software Holdings, Inc. by John T. Kendall by Software Holdings, Inc. . (plt) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief/Memorandum By Jonathan Hare In Opposition To [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. . (plt) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply By Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. To [35-1] Response To [32-1] Response To [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall, [24-1] Declaration filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall by John T. Kendall by Software Holdings, Inc. by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Order Granting [38-1] Amended Application For Examination and Production of Documents of Trilogy Advisors Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (wc) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Order Granting [37-1] Amended Application For Examination and Production of Documents of Software Holdings Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (wc) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/5/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination and Production of Documents of Trilogy Advisors Under Rule 2004 (wc) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/5/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination and Production of Documents of Software Holdings Under Rule 2004 (wc) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By Trustee John T. Kendall Of [29-1] Order Granting [20-1] Application For Examination of Oak Hill Venture Partners Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall, [30-1] Order Granting [21-1] Application For Examination of F.W. Ventures IX Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall, [28-1] Order Granting [19-1] Application For Examination of Consilient Funding Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall, [25-1] Order Granting [16-1] Application For Examination of F.W. Ventures V Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (wc) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response By Trustee John T. Kendall To [32-1] Response To [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall, [24-1] Declaration filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall by John T. Kendall by Software Holdings, Inc. . (plt) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Held Re: [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. .MINUTES OF PROCEEDING: Briefs to be submitted by all parties. Brief's to be five page maximimum for each parties. After submitted, the court will decide as to oral ruling or written decision. Mr. Novacks brief to be filed w/in 7 days, Mr. Oliner 7 days thereafter, Mr. Hare to file his brief w/in 14 days. (plt) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response By Interested Party Jonathan Hare To [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. . (plt) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply By Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. To [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall, [24-1] Declaration filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting [22-1] Application For Examination of Software Holdings Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting [21-1] Application For Examination of F.W. Ventures IX Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting [20-1] Application For Examination of Oak Hill Venture Partners Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting [19-1] Application For Examination of Consilient Funding Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting [18-1] Application For Examination of SG Cowen Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting [17-1] Application For Examination of Trilogy Advisores Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting [16-1] Application For Examination of F.W. Ventures V Under Rule 2004 by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [23-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum By Trustee John T. Kendall In Opposition To [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. . (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of Software Holdings Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of F.W. Ventures IX Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of Oak Hill Venture Partners Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of Consilient Funding Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of SG Cowen Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of Trilogy Advisores Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application Filed By Trustee John T. Kendall For Examination of F.W. Ventures V Under Rule 2004 (plt) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of John Fredericks filed by Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. in Support of [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. . (dp) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Motion Re: [13-1] Motion For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) by Software Holdings, Inc. set For 4:00 5/23/02 at Oakland Room 220 (dp) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion By Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. For Relief From Stay, RS # 02-0521 ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 040026333) . (dp) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Linda Johannsen for Creditor Preston, Gates and Ellis (plt) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Possible Dividends with Certificate of Mailing. Number of Notices: 202 (plt) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Trustee's Request For Notice of Possible Dividend. Last Day to File Proofs of Claim: 6/20/02 (plt) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [9-1] First Meeting Held. (plt) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request by Creditor Software Holdings, Inc. For Notice. (cr) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Financial Affairs. (cr) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting [4-1] Application To Employ Eric A. Nyberg as Attorney for Trustee by John T. Kendall . (cr) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Proposed Attorney filed by Trustee John T. Kendall in Support of [4-1] Application To Employ Eric A. Nyberg as Attorney for Trustee by John T. Kendall . (plt) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application By Trustee John T. Kendall To Employ Eric A. Nyberg as Attorney for Trustee . (plt) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [3-1] Order for Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Service Re: [0-0] First Meeting . ( # of Notices: 191) (plt) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Matrix. (oe) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Voluntary Petition Order for Mtg of Creditors Due On 2/7/02 ( Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # 40023422) (oe) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?