Expansion Electronics, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case California Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-Jan-1970
District Judge Randall J. Newsome, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alec H. Dalziel, Responsible Ind

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Poppin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Poppin +1 415 398 6700 johnpoppin@poppinlaw.com
No Logo Craig L. Palmer, Responsible Ind
No Logo Doris Green, Responsible Ind
No Logo Evan C. Davis, Responsible Ind
No Logo Mark Larwood, III, Responsible Ind

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wayne H. Thomas +1 650 327 4200
No Logo Ramandeep Singh, Responsible Ind
No Logo Almas C. Kotiya, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Charles Rowland Morey, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl T. Voss +1 707 569 8295 vosslawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo Chhottu T. Kotiya, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Commercial Western Finance Corporation, A Calif. Corp., Debtor
No Logo Consilient, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Cooper +1 510 834 6600 mcooper@wendel.com
No Logo Consumer Direct Access, Debtor
No Logo Corona Networks, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Stinnett, Meyers and Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrance L. Stinnett +1 415 362 5045 tstinnett@gsmdlaw.com
No Logo Creative Spices, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert A. Dimino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Lee Hewitt +1 510 792 8811
No Logo Crown Vantage Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kim Martin Lewis +1 513 977 8200 kim.lewis@dinslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven E. Sherman +1 415 616 1100 sesherman@shearman.com
No Logo Crystal Editions Inc, Debtor
No Logo Cyberiq Systems, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Murray and Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M. Murray +1 650 852 9000 jmmurray@murraylaw.com
No Logo Dalziel Supply Co., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Poppin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Poppin +1 415 398 6700 johnpoppin@poppinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/1993 James Michael Sullivan +1 212 547 5477 +1 212 547 5444 jmsullivan@mwe.com
No Logo Daniel M. Andrews, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas R. Burns

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burns +1 415 543 9900 tom@tburnslaw.com
No Logo Dennis T. Flynn, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis T. Flynn

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/1998 Steven M. Olson +1 707 575 1800 smo@smolsonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/1997 Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo Dennis T. Marpuri, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Devor Nurseries, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Inc., DeVor Nurseries

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/10/1997 DeVor Nurseries, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kaufman and Logan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett L. Cecchini +1 415 392 6677
No Logo Donald Lee Bagley, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila Gropper Nelson +1 415 362 2221 +1 415 576 1422 shedoeslaw@aol.com
No Logo Dung Ngoc Do, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Christopher Alliotts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Alliotts +1 831 753 2200 Chris@DebtFreeMonterey.com
No Logo Dynabyte, Debtor
No Logo Edward D. Kellar, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Blumenfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/1994 Blumenfeld, Michael Joel +1 510 893 9900

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Murray and Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M. Murray +1 650 852 9000 jmmurray@murraylaw.com
No Logo EKO Reproductions, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wayne H. Thomas +1 650 327 4200
No Logo Elizabeth Marpuri, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Moran Law Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Cooper Moran +1 650 694 4700 ecf@moranlaw.net,renee@moranlaw.net
No Logo Elmark Homes, Inc, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Shane P. Landry, Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Replogle +1 415 362 4700 +1 415 781 6683 davidreplogle@hushmail.com
No Logo Emanuel J Cooper, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emanuel J Cooper
No Logo Enviromental Control Industries, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Levy and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Levy +1 707 253 0833
No Logo Erica Lorelei Bryant, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/23/2008 Judson Thomas Farley +1 408 476 1766 judsonfarley@sbcglobal.net
Space John Patrick Hannon, II +1 831 476 8005 +1 831 476 8984 jph3003@yahoo.com
Space Michael K. Mehr +1 831 425 5757 MMehr51@gmail.com
No Logo Evaline D. Russell, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evaline D. Russell
No Logo eWanted.com, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Binder and Malter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heinz Binder +1 408 295 1700 heinz@bindermalter.com
No Logo Exactly Vertical Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Darya S. Druch Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darya Sara Druch +1 510 465 1788 +1 510 874 7219 ecf@daryalaw.com
No Logo Expansion Electronics, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Binder and Malter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Malter +1 408 295 1700 michael@bindermalter.com
No Logo Fernando Campos, Jr., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Richard Seim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Seim +1 408 279 4435 mail@seimr.com
No Logo Financial Planners Equity Corporation, Debtor
No Logo Janeen F. Kellar, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Blumenfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/1994 Blumenfeld, Michael Joel +1 510 893 9900

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Murray and Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M. Murray +1 650 852 9000 jmmurray@murraylaw.com
No Logo Carol Wu, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Ken Lezak +1 510 835 8359 clezak@hotmail.com
Space Carol Wu +1 408 404 7039 cwu1@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mariam S. Marshall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mariam S. Marshall +1 510 835 8359
No Logo Charles E. Sims, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Isaacs +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 3895 misaacs@mckennalong.com
No Logo David Burchard, Trustee
No Logo Devin Derham-burk, Trustee
No Logo Donald G. Howell, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins, Mann & Everett, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/26/2001 Reid H. Everett +1 559 447 5700 reverett@pmelaw.com
No Logo Duncan H. Kester, Trustee
No Logo E. Lynn Schoenmann, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Stinnett, Davis & Linchey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Douglas Davis +1 415 362 5045 ddavis@gsmdlaw.com
Space Ann E. Soter +1 415 362 5045

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyers Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy Quon Bryant +1 415 362 7500 kquonbryant@mlg-pc.com
No Logo EDWARD M. WALSH, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Moira C. Walsh +1 650 342 9600

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurtz Ford & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald E. Johnson +1 541 484 1273 +1 541 683 1815 don@kfjllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeremy W. Katz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy W. Katz +1 415 394 5700 +1 415 394 5003

Toggle Switch Represented by Starnes, Becker and White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer A. Becker +1 510 601 4090
No Logo Jerome Robertson, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Milgrom +1 415 267 4000
No Logo John Billmeyer, Trustee
No Logo John Kendall, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo John M. England, Trustee
No Logo John W. Richardson, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Patrick Maher +1 415 356 4600 cmaher@luce.com
No Logo Michael H. Meyer, Trustee
No Logo Patricia A. Cutler, Trustee
No Logo Paul Mansdorf, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeremy W. Katz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy W. Katz +1 415 394 5700 +1 415 394 5003
No Logo Raymond A. Carey, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2002 Charles Patrick Maher +1 415 356 4600 cmaher@luce.com
No Logo Robert M. Damir, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis D. Miller +1 415 227 0900
No Logo Suzanne Decker, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Suzanne Decker +1 510 483 4303 suzannedecker@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert Flor, Jr. +1 510 834 6600 aflor@wendel.com
Space Valery Loumber +1 510 834 6600
Space Jeffrey C. Wurms +1 510 834 6600 jwurms@wendel.com
No Logo Tevis Thompson, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas E. Moseley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Sternberg +1 925 946 1400 DMSLaw@ix.netcom.com
No Logo William Broach, Trustee
No Logo Chris D. Kuhner, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Chris D. Kuhner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris D. Kuhner +1 510 763 1000 c.kuhner@kornfieldlaw.com
No Logo Kornfield Paul and Nyberg, Trustee Attorney
Officially listed as "Kornfield Paul & Nyberg, P.C."
No Logo Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray, Cary, Ware & Freidenrich, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lillian G. Stenfeldt +1 650 833 2000
No Logo Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray, Cary, Ware & Freidenrich, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lillian G. Stenfeldt +1 650 833 2000
No Logo Unsecured Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Isaacs +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 3895 misaacs@mckennalong.com
No Logo Daniels, Phillips, et al, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Werdel and Werdel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/1997 Charles C. Werdel +1 805 834 5930
No Logo George P. Marciel, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Glassberg, Pollak and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/1997 Robert L. Pollak +1 415 291 8320 +1 415 291 8111 rlpollak@glassberg-pollak.com
No Logo JERRY F TWOMEY, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Glassberg, Pollak and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/1997 Robert L. Pollak +1 415 291 8320 +1 415 291 8111 rlpollak@glassberg-pollak.com
No Logo Linda Ekstrom Stanley, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Minnie Loo +1 510 637 3200 minnie.loo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Linda Ekstrom Stanley, United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF,, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nanette Dumas +1 408 535 5525 +1 408 535 5532 Nanette.Dumas@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Minnie Loo +1 510 637 3200 minnie.loo@usdoj.gov
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
No Logo William T. Neary, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (321) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2308 Filed: 4/16/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2307 Court Entry). Service Date 04/16/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2306 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2305 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $956.90 . Filed by Creditor MCN Energy Group Inc. dba DTE Enterprises, Inc.). (bja) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2305 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $956.90 . Filed by Creditor MCN Energy Group Inc. dba DTE Enterprises, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2304 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2303 Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency). Service Date 02/03/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2303 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
          Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 2293 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1790.89 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC ., 2301 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2302 Filed: 12/31/2010, Entered: None
            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2301 Court Entry). Service Date 12/31/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/31/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2300 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2293 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1790.89 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC ., 2298 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2299 Filed: 11/21/2010, Entered: None
                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2298 Court Entry). Service Date 11/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/21/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2297 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2293 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1790.89 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company collecting for GE Betz, f/k/a Betz Dearborn , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC ., 2295 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2296 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2295 Court Entry). Service Date 09/16/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2294 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2293 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1790.89 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Attachments: # 1 Additional Supplemental Documents# 2 Additional Supplemental Documents) (ba) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2293 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1790.89 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company collecting for GE Betz, Inc. f/n/a Betz Dearborn Inc., Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2292 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                          Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds (Related Doc # 2289 ) (cog) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2291 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                            Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 2287 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Clariant Corp.). (cog) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2290 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2289 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $907.03 . Filed by Creditor Clariant Corp. .). (ba) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2289 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $907.03 . Filed by Creditor Clariant Corp. . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2288 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1156.14 . Filed by Creditor Clariant Corp. .). (ba) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2287 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1156.14 . Filed by Creditor Clariant Corp. . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2286 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2285 Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency). Service Date 04/16/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2285 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 2274 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1066.49 . Filed by Creditor Bayer Corp. dba Lanxess .). (tt) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2284 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 2269 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Stone Container Corporation). (pl) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2283 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2269 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,156.48 . Filed by Creditor Stone Container Corporation ., 2271 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2282 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2269 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,156.48 . Filed by Creditor Stone Container Corporation .). (ba) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2281 Filed: 3/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 2278 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Norfolk Southern Railway Company). (pl) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2280 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2277 Court Entry). Service Date 03/10/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2279 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2278 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $213.28 . Filed by Creditor Norfolk Southern Railway Company .). (ba) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2278 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $213.28 . Filed by Creditor Norfolk Southern Railway Company . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2275 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2274 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1066.49 . Filed by Creditor Bayer Corp. .). (ba) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2274 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1066.49 . Filed by Creditor Bayer Corp. . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2273 Filed: 2/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2271 Court Entry). Service Date 02/20/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2272 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 2267 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor David Tomlinson). (pl) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2270 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2269 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,156.48 . Filed by Creditor Stone Container Corporation .). (ba) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2269 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,156.48 . Filed by Creditor Stone Container Corporation . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2268 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2267 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $102.10 . Filed by Creditor David Tomlinson .). (tt) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2267 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $102.10 . Filed by Creditor David Tomlinson . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2266 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 2262 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Hercules Incorporated). (pl) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2265 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 2252 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Beloit Corporation). (pl) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2264 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2261 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 01/28/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2263 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2262 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $8597.15 . Filed by Creditor Hercules Incorporated .). (tt) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2262 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $8597.15 . Filed by Creditor Hercules Incorporated . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2010 Incorrect PDF removed, correct PDF added. (tt). Modified on 2/3/2010 (tt). (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2261 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividends In The Sum Of $133.71 To The Order Of Penford Products Co. (Related Doc # 2255 ) (tl) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2260 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1646.74 . Filed by Creditor Beloit Corporation ., 2254 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2259 Filed: 1/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2257 Court Entry). Service Date 01/23/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/23/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2258 Filed: 1/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2254 Court Entry). Service Date 01/23/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/23/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2256 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2255 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $133.71 . Filed by Creditor Penford Products Co. .). (tt) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2255 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $133.71 . Filed by Creditor Penford Products Co. . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2253 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 2252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1646.74 . Filed by Creditor Beloit Corporation .). (tt) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2252 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1646.74 . Filed by Creditor Beloit Corporation . (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2251 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Ex Parte Order Terminating The Liquidating Trust (pl) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2250 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Document: / Liquidating Trust Termination Certificate. Filed by Trustee Other Prof Jeffrey H. Beck (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Liquidating Trust Termination Certificate# 2 Exhibit B to Liquidating Trust Termination Certificate) (Singer, Pamela) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2249 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                      Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Motion for Order Preserving the Status Quo re Docket Nos. 2237, 2239 and 2246 (RE: related document(s) 2237 Motion Miscellaneous Relief filed by Creditor Huguette Laflamme, Creditor Richard Duchesne, Creditor United Steelworkers of America, 2239 Motion Miscellaneous Relief filed by Creditor Huguette Laflamme, Creditor Richard Duchesne). Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme, United Steelworkers of America (Raisner, Christian) Modified on 1/12/2010 ERROR: INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THE CORRECT EVENT IS: MISCELLANEOUS > WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT (pl). (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2248 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Exhibit A1 to Notice of Turnover of Trust Funds to the Clerk of the Court (RE: related document(s) 2247 Notice of Unclaimed Dividend). (pl) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2247 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Turnover of Trust Funds to the Clerk of the Court (pl) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2246 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Response to Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Trust Termination Certificate and to Response of Liquidating Trustee to Ex Parte Motion; Declaration of Raisner (Exhibit A Redacted) (RE: related document(s) 2239 Motion Miscellaneous Relief). Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme, United Steelworkers of America (Raisner, Christian) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2245 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Withdrawal of Documents Filed Inadvertently with Information that Should Have Been Redacted (RE: related document(s) 2244 Response). Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme, United Steelworkers of America (Raisner, Christian) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2244 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Response to Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Trust Termination Certificate and To Response of Liquidating Trustee to Ex Parte Motion; Declaration of Christian L. Raisner (RE: related document(s) 2239 Motion Miscellaneous Relief, 2245 Withdrawal of Documents ). Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme, United Steelworkers of America (Raisner, Christian) Modified on 1/4/2010 DOCKET RELATIONSHIP TO DOCUMENT 2245 WAS ADDED BY THE COURT (pl). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2243 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Response to /Preliminary, Partial Response of the Liquidating Trustee to Ex Parte Motion for Order Preserving the Status Quo Until Pension Claimants' Objection to the Proposed Ex Parte Order Terminating the Liquidating Trust May Be Heard (RE: related document(s) 2239 Motion Miscellaneous Relief). Filed by Trustee Other Prof Jeffrey H. Beck (Singer, Pamela) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2242 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Withdrawal of Documents /Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Trust Termination Certificate (RE: related document(s) 2236 Document). Filed by Trustee Other Prof Jeffrey H. Beck (Singer, Pamela) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2241 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Preserving the Status Quo Until Pension Claimants' Objection to the Proposed Ex Parte Order Terminating the Liquidating Trust May Be Heard (RE: related document(s) 2239 Motion Miscellaneous Relief). Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Raisner, Christian) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2240 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice Regarding Ex Parte Motion for Order Preserving the Status Quo Until Pension Claimants' Objections to the Proposed Ex Parte Order Terminating the Liquidating Trust May Be Heard (RE: related document(s) 2239 Motion Miscellaneous Relief).). Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme (Raisner, Christian) Modified on 12/29/2009 LINKAGE WAS CORRECTED BY THE COURT (pl). (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2239 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Motion for Order Preserving the Status Quo Unitl Pension Claimants' Objection to the Proposed Ex Parte Order Terminating the Liquidating Trust May be Heard Filed by Creditors Richard Duchesne, Huguette Laflamme (Raisner, Christian) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2238 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Adversary case 09-04594. 72 (Injunctive relief - other), 91 (Declaratory judgment), 14 (Recovery of money/property - other) Complaint by Huguette Laflamme, Richard Duchesne against Hartford Life Insurance Com pany, Jeffrey H. Beck. Fee Amount $250. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 3)# 3 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 3)# 4 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 3)# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 AP Cover Sheet # 11 Summons to be Issued) (Raisner, Christian) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Order for Payment of Dividends [Fremont Premium Corporation, c/o The Financial Resources Group, Inc. $678.26]. (femp) (Entered: 11/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                [670-1] Final Decree. (femp) (Entered: 08/20/1996)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. (femp) (Entered: 08/20/1996)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/20/1996
                                                                                                                                    Order Granting, Order On Report Of Unclaimed Funds To Be Paid Into Court [668-1] Report by John T. Kendall . (femp) (Entered: 05/23/1996)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      [645-1] Final Decree. (tm) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Report of Distribution. (tm) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 1,213.27 for The Door Shop, Inc. . (sk) (Entered: 10/26/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Order , To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 1248.58 To Regency Idustries, Inc. . (kj) (Entered: 10/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              [515-1] Final Decree. (femp) (Entered: 03/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Trustee's Report of Distribution. (femp) (Entered: 03/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Application By Trustee Edward M. Walsh To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 7,153.67 To estate ninety days after final distribution; payment representing unclaimed disbursements claim No. 3,23,31,39,90,93,99,144,61,179 total 7,163.67 . (femp) (Entered: 12/31/1997)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Final Decree . (trw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Trustee's Report of Distribution. (db, ) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order for Payment of Dividends. $10,301.87 paid to First Banks, Inc. (trw, ) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ .84 For BFI . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 6.21 For Ace Hardware . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 41.81 For Motivational Systems . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 379.38 For Inland Engineering . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 78.97 For Wenco Distributors . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 58.87 For Oakley Contractors . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 13.73 For Homebuyer's Monthly . Filed by Trustee Tevis T. Thompson Jr. (trw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 407.78 for Scotsdale Insurance Co. (trw) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 2.45 for Kenneth Campbell Associates (trw) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting [459-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 4,395.50, Expenses: $ 109.43) by David M. Sternberg payment to David M. Sternberg of $4395.50 in fees and $109.43 in expenses . (jal) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of David M. Sternberg filed by David M. Sternberg for Trustee Tevis T. Thompson in Support of [Proposed] Order re: [459-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 4,395.50, Expenses: $ 109.43) by David M. Sternberg . (jal) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 10,301.87 for First Commercial Bank (trw) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 1,881.19 for Various Creditors (trw) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Appointment of Successor Trustee and Approval of Bond . Trustee Carol Wu added to the case.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service)(Dowell, Edwina (lk)) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer of Claim. (#188). Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Nel Americas Inc (Claim No. 188) To Flextronics Corporation. Filed by Interested Party Flextronics Corporation. (Heck, Gaye) ERROR: NO CASE NUMBER OR DEBTOR'S NAME REFLECTED ON PDF. NO AMOUNT ENTERED REFLECTING PROOF OF CLAIM ON PDF. NOTICE WAS NOT GENERATED. Modified on 5/27/2010 (kn). (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer of Claim. (#187). Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Natsteel Electronics Manunfacturing Inc (Claim No. 187) To Flextronics Corporation. Filed by Interested Party Flextronics Corporation. (Heck, Gaye) ERROR: NO CASE NUMBER OR DEBTOR'S NAME REFLECTED ON PDF. NO AMOUNT ENTERED REFLECTING PROOF OF CLAIM ON PDF. NOTICE WAS NOT GENERATED. Modified on 5/27/2010 (kn). (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 5/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Reassignment of Case. (RE: related document(s) 449 Case Reassignment). Service Date 05/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Charles Novack added to case. Involvement of Judge Marilyn Morgan Terminated.(Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Disallowing Objection of Claim #310 (RE: related document(s) 439 Granting Objection filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker). (aw) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Disallowing Claim #301 (RE: related document(s) 440 Objection filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker, 445 Motion to Disallow Claims filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker). (aw) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Motion to Disallow Claims No. 301 [CHASE MANHATTAN] 440 Objection Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) ERORR: LINKAGE. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT ADDED LINKAGE. Modified on 4/24/2009 (aw). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Motion to Disallow Claims No. 310 [SOLITON SYSTEMS KK] Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Disallow Claims No. 310 [Soliton Systems KK] Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Disallow Claims No. 301 [Chase Manhattan] Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final Application for Compensation of Accountants Fees and Expenses for Michael R. Gabrielson, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $2,702.50, Expenses: $120.17. Filed by Trustee Accountant Michael R. Gabrielson (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Trustee Certification# 2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service) (Gabrielson, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to Secured Claim of Chase Manhattan and Notice Thereof [Claim No. 301] Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) ERROR: WRONG EVENT CODE SELECTED. Modified on 3/12/2009 (aw). (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Unsecured Claim of Soliton Systems KK and Notice Thereof [Claim No. 310] Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) ERROR: WRONG EVENT CODE SELECTED. Modified on 3/12/2009 (aw). (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 436 Order on Application for Compensation). Service Date 12/05/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 430 ). fees awarded: $47814.50, expenses awarded: $903.48 for Jeffrey C. Wurms (aw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 429 ). fees awarded: $5856.50, expenses awarded: $149.20 for Michael R. Gabrielson (aw, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service for Proposed Order Approving Fifth Interim Fees and Expenses of Accountant for Trustee (RE: related document(s) 429 Fifth Application for Compensation of Accountant's Fees and Expenses for Michael R. Gabrielson, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $5,856.50, Expenses: $149.20.). Filed by Trustee Accountant Michael R. Gabrielson (Gabrielson, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s) 429 ?Fifth Application for Compensation, 430 Fifth Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Counsel for Trustee for Jeffrey C. Wurms, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $48,642.50, Expenses: $903.48. Filed by Attorney Jeffrey C. Wurms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey)). Hearing scheduled for 12/2/2008 at 11:30 AM at SanJose Courtroom 3070 - Morgan. Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Wurms, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/12/2008 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT ADDED LINK TO DOCUMENT #429. (be, ). (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Document: Errata to Fifth Interim Application for Approval of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Professionals. (RE: related document(s) 430 Application for Compensation, ). Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s) 429 Fifth Application for Compensation, 430 Fifth Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Counsel for Trustee for Jeffrey C. Wurms, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $48,642.50, Expenses: $903.48. Filed by Attorney Jeffrey C. Wurms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey)). Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2008 at 11:30 AM at SanJose Courtroom 3070 - Morgan. Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Wurms, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/12/2008 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT ADDED LINK TO DOCUMENT #429. (be, ). (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Trustee re Counsel's Request for Fees (RE: related document(s) 430 Application for Compensation, ). Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fifth Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Counsel for Trustee for Jeffrey C. Wurms, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $48,642.50, Expenses: $903.48. Filed by Attorney Jeffrey C. Wurms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Certificate of Service) (Wurms, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fifth Application for Compensation of Accountant's Fees and Expenses for Michael R. Gabrielson, Trustee's Accountant, Fee: $5,856.50, Expenses: $149.20. Filed by Trustee Accountant Michael R. Gabrielson (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Trustee Certification# 2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service) (Gabrielson, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Entering Default and Order On Claim No. 82 (RE: related document(s) 425 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker). (aw, ) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Entry of Default (RE: related document(s) 425 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker). Filed by Trustee Suzanne Decker (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Decker, Suzanne) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 1/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 424 Final Decree). Service Date 01/10/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final Decree . (rdr) COURT ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY . Modified on 1/8/2010 (rdr). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (rdr) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John W. Richardson. (U.S. Trustee (pv)) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 8967.83 For All-American Rose Selections (er) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 38.54 For AT&T Credit Corp. (er) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 59.62 For AT&T Credit Corp. (er) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 13.23 For AT&T Credit Corp. (er) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 8.53 For AT&T Credit Corp. (er) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 22.52 For AT&T Credit Corp. (er) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (lj, ) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Report of Distribution. . (lj, ). (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 22804.81 for debtor, Dennis T. Flynn . (lj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds (RE: related document(s) 306 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Cobble & Company). (lb) Modified on 12/14/2010 (lb). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 306 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $23703.36 . Filed by Creditor Cobble & Company .). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $23703.36 . Filed by Creditor Cobble & Company . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 302 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Kyle Lind). (lb) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 300 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator John Costello, Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner). (lb) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 302 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $625.83 . Filed by Creditor Kyle Lind .). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $625.83 . Filed by Creditor Kyle Lind . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 300 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $574.69 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner , Fund Locator John Costello .). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $574.69 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Merle Stoner , Fund Locator John Costello . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 287 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey). (lb) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC ., 290 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 295 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust). (lb) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 295 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13,909.36 . Filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust .). (tt) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13,909.36 . Filed by Creditor Jenkins Family Trust . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 292 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu). (lb) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 292 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $389.91 . Filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu .). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $389.91 . Filed by Creditor Xiubo Xu . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (tt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 290 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/20/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds In The Amount of $630.57 (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor John Polito). (lb, ) Modified on 2/11/2009 (lb, ). (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 287 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1866.77 . Filed by Creditor Fragomen, Del Rey Bernsen & Lowey , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 284 Final Decree). Service Date 01/28/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Decree . (lb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John Kendall. (U.S. Trustee (mp), ) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 280 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator John Costello, Creditor Daniel Racanelli). (lb, ) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 280 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $576.40 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Racanelli , Fund Locator John Costello .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $576.40 . Filed by Creditor Daniel Racanelli , Fund Locator John Costello . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 12/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 278 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 12/14/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds to Brian Falkenhainer (Related Doc # 276 ) (trw, ) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 276 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4892.77 . Filed by Creditor Brian C. Falkenhainer .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4892.77 . Filed by Creditor Brian C. Falkenhainer . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 261 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor David Michael Barnes). (lb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 273 Court Entry). Service Date 11/20/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 271 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $630.57 . Filed by Creditor John Polito 2 . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 268 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins). (am, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 268 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13903.79 . Filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13903.79 . Filed by Creditor Anthony Cook Jenkins . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Tao Ye). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 264 Court Entry, ). Service Date 10/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application, Complete Trustee Notice (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 261 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $605.91 . Filed by Creditor David Michael Barnes , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $605.91 . Filed by Creditor David Michael Barnes , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 250 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 248 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group, Creditor Emptoris). (lb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2619.55 . Filed by Creditor Tao Ye . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $992.49 . Filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez ., now known as Frances A. Mendez Kloes). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $992.49 . Filed by Creditor Frances A. Mendez , now known as Frances A. Mendez Kloes . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 252 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4,841.02 . Filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4,841.02 . Filed by Creditor Joshua David Kneubuhl . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 250 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $932.48 . Filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport .). (Taylor, Toni) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $932.48 . Filed by Creditor Timothy Gregg Davenport . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 248 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7033.92 . Filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group , Creditor Emptoris for diCarta Inc. .). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 9/8/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7033.92 . Filed by Fund Locator The Locator Services Group , Creditor Emptoris for diCarta Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 9/8/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 245 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor James O'Reilly). (lb, ) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 245 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3414.86 . Filed by Creditor James O'Reilly .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3414.86 . Filed by Creditor James O'Reilly . (RE: related document(s) 243 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk for Creditors:O'Reilly, James $2,449.40, Ye, Tao $2,023.15, Kneubuhl, Joshua $2,824.87, Brian Falkenhainer $2,824.87, Iquantic $1,449.23, Davenport, Timothy G $932.48, Xu, Xiubo $389.91, Mendez, Frances a $992.49, Ford, Seth Bruce $401.02, Dicarta, Inc $7,033.92, CRI $7,737.79, Jansky, Richard $788.69, Innovative $2,139.51, Stoner, Daniel $574.69, RC Design $199.37, Fragomen, Del Rey $1,866.77, Silver & Lee Associates $2,693.84, PCR $9,296.11, Barnes, David M $605.91, Intelligence Data, Inc $890.76, O'Reilly, James $965.46, Ye, Tao $596.40, Kneubuhl, Joshua $2,016.15, Brian Falkenhainer $2,067.90. (am, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 199 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 11/17/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend to Nortel Networks LTD (Related Doc # 192 ) . (kd) Modified on 11/17/2010 (tt). (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Reassignment of Case. (RE: related document(s) 197 Case Reassignment). Service Date 11/12/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Charles Novack added to case. Involvement of Judge Marilyn Morgan Terminated (tm) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 192 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13956.50 . Filed by Fund Locator American Property Locators, Inc. , Creditor Nortel Networks ., 194 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 194 Court Entry). Service Date 08/25/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 192 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13956.50 . Filed by Fund Locator American Property Locators, Inc. , Creditor Nortel Networks .). (ba) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $13956.50 . Filed by Fund Locator American Property Locators, Inc. , Creditor Nortel Networks . (RE: related document(s) 181 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend. Application filed by GE Capital Commercial Inc., collecting for Citicorp Vendor Finance (Related Doc # 186 ) (rdr) Modified on 2/18/2010 (tt). (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 186 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2170.73 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company , collecting for Citicorp Vendor Finance, Fund Locator The Locator Services Group ., 188 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 188 Court Entry). Service Date 01/29/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 186 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2170.73 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company ,collecting for Citicorp Vendor Finance, Fund Locator The Locator Services Group .). (tt) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2170.73 . Filed by Creditor General Electric Company , Fund Locator The Locator Services Group . (RE: related document(s) 167 Notice). (tt) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 184 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 01/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend to Linda Testo, collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson. (Related Doc # 181 ) (tl) Modified on 1/20/2010 (tt). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 181 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9987.14 . Filed by Creditor Linda Testo .).Linda Testo collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson (tt) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 181 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9987.14 . Filed by Creditor Linda Testo .). Linda Testo collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson (tt) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9987.14 . Filed by Creditor Linda Testo .Linda Testo collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson (RE: related document(s) 179 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John Kendall. (U.S. Trustee (mp), ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 13677.64 For Albert Lawson, Endjang Tanumihardja, Sears Roebuck & Co. (vmb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend to Ravi Rastogi in the amount of $6,064.07. (Related Doc # 176 ) (rdr) Modified on 8/4/2009 (tt). (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 176 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $6064.07 . Filed by Creditor Ravi Rastogi .). (tt) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2009 (tt). Modified on 8/4/2009 (tt). INCORRECT PDF REMOVED, CORRECT PDF ATTACHED. (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $6064.07 . Filed by Creditor Ravi Rastogi . (RE: related document(s) 172 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) ERROR: AMOUNT ENTERED DOES NOT MATCH AMOUNT ON PDF. Modified on 8/3/2009 (jes). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2009 (tt). Modified on 8/4/2009 (tt).INCORRECT PDF REMOVED, CORRECT PDF ATTACHED. (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 66.63 For Airborne Express (rdr) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 54.50 For Taylor Made Leasing (rdr) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 17.12 For SBC (rdr) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 6064.07 For Ravi Rostogi (rdr) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 19.35 For Cintas (rdr) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 735.09 For Brobeck (rdr) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 180.33 For Gnazzo Thill (rdr) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 156 Court Entry, 160 Court Entry, 167 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9,041.91 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney collecting for creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis.). (bja) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9,041.91 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney collecting for creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis , (RE: related document(s) 146 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 165 Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency). Service Date 04/30/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 154 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9041.91 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney ., 158 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9041.91 . Filed by Creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis .). (tt) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 162 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Canon Financial Services Inc.). (dc) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 162 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4861.69 . Filed by Creditor Canon Financial Services Inc. .). (tt) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $4861.69 . Filed by Creditor Canon Financial Services Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 146 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 160 Court Entry). Service Date 04/29/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 900.14 For K. Hogan Company (dmk) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 158 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9041.91 . Filed by Creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis .). (tt) (Entered: 04/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9041.91 . Filed by Creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis . (RE: related document(s) 146 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 04/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 156 Court Entry, ). Service Date 12/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 154 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9041.91 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney collecting for creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9041.91 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney collecting for creditor Burns Doane Swecker & Mathis . (RE: related document(s) 146 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 151 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC (Dilks & Knopik is incorrect. The correct fund locator is Asset Recovery Trust.), Creditor Jeff Wakabayashi). (ac, ) Modified on 2/19/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 151 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1308.57 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC (Dilks & Knopik is incorrect. The correct fund locator is Asset Recovery Trust.) , Creditor Jeff Wakabayashi .). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 2/19/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1308.57 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC (Dilks & Knopik is incorrect. The correct fund locator is Asset Recovery Trust) , Creditor Jeff Wakabayashi . (RE: related document(s) 146 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 2/19/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 149 Final Decree). Service Date 01/18/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Final Decree . (ac, ) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee E. Lynn Schoenmann. (U.S. Trustee (pm), ) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order to pay unclaimed funds. In the amount of $3206.83 to Jill Pauli (RE: related document(s) 146 Unclaimed Dividend). (ac, ) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 22,403.24 For Worldwide Express et. al. . (mw, ) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [119-1] Final Decree. (femp) (Entered: 06/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Report of Distribution. (femp) (Entered: 06/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order to Pay uncalimed funds . (jjg, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (jjg, ) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Report of Distribution. (jjg, ) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk. East West Graphics, Inc. $1012.59, Rachel Powers $143.56, Winstar $324.78, Datamark Ltd $868.82, Seth Sobotka $637.13. (ac, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 5102.17 for Various (femp) (Entered: 07/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 96 Final Decree). Service Date 06/27/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Final Decree. (klr) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account . (Derham-Burk, Devin (harbor)) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1900.00 For Erica Lorelei Bryant (bg) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 82 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2253.75 . Filed by Creditor Spiegel Creditor Trust ., 84 Court Entry). (tt) Modified on 5/11/2011 (tt).COURT ERROR. DUPLICATE ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD. (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 84 Court Entry). Service Date 04/16/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 82 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2253.75 . Filed by Creditor Spiegel Creditor Trust, collecting for Newport News.). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supporting Documents) (bja) Modified on 3/25/2011 (bja). Modified on 3/25/2011 (bja). (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2253.75 . Filed by Creditor Spiegel Creditor Trust, collecting for Newport News. (RE: related document(s) 53 Unclaimed Dividend, 54 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) Modified on 3/25/2011 (bja). (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds. (cog) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 79 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,483.20 . Filed by Creditor AT&T Broadband , Fund Locator TLSG Ltd. .). (bja) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,483.20 . Filed by Creditor AT&T Broadband , Fund Locator TLSG Ltd. . (RE: related document(s) 44 Unclaimed Dividend, 45 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (Related Doc # 73 ) (pw) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 73 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2253.75 . Filed by Creditors First Cons Nat'l Bank , Spiegel Creditor Trust ., 75 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 75 Court Entry). Service Date 12/12/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Trustee's Report of Distribution. (ql) (Entered: 01/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 73 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2253.75 . Filed by Creditors First Cons Nat'l Bank , Spiegel Creditor Trust .). (bja) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2253.75 . Filed by Creditor Spiegel Creditor Trust (sucessors in interest) to Creditor First Cons Nat'l Bank . (RE: related document(s) 49 Unclaimed Dividend, 50 Unclaimed Dividend). (bja) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds to creditor Bank of America NT & SA (Related Doc # 65 ) (cog) Modified on 2/3/2010 (tt). (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 65 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1301.12 . Filed by Creditor Bank of America NT & SA , Fund Locator American Property Locators ., 67 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 68 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 11/14/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 67 Court Entry). Service Date 11/14/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds to NCOP Lakes, Inc., successor to Great Lakes Collection Bureau (Related Doc # 58 ) (cog) Modified on 11/13/2009 (tt). (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 65 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1301.12 . Filed by Creditor Bank of America NT & SA , Fund Locator American Property Locators .). (tt) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1301.12 . Filed by Creditor Bank of America NT & SA , Fund Locator American Property Locators . (RE: related document(s) 47 Unclaimed Dividend, 48 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (Related Doc # 62 ) (pw) Modified on 8/13/2009 (tt).Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the amount of $1775.02 filed by creditor Plaza Associates. (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 62 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,775.02 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Plaza Associates .). (tt) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1,775.02 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Plaza Associates . (RE: related document(s) 42 Unclaimed Dividend, 43 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 60 Court Entry, ). Service Date 09/07/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged filed on behalf of Trustee, Paul J. Mansdorf. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed by Trustee Paul Mansdorf. (U.S. Trustee (mp)) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ $4,526.95 For Expansion Electronics,Inc (lb) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 56 Final Decree). Service Date 08/14/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Decree . (pw, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John Kendall. (U.S. Trustee (sp), ) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 384.75 For Newport News (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1869.00 For Newport News (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 384.95 For Great Lakes Coll Bureau (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1870.00 For Great Lakes Coll Bureau (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 384.75 For First Cons Nat'l Bank (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1869.00 For First Cons Nat'l Bank (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 222.12 For Bank of America NT & SA (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1079.00 For Bank of America NT & SA (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 148.00 For Salvatore Spinelli Esq. (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 253.20 For AT & T Broadband (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1230.00 For AT & T Broadband (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 303.02 For Plaza Assoc. (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1472.00 For Plaza Assoc. (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 74.93 For Telecheck Recov Dept. (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 364.00 For Telecheck Recov Dept. (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 40.55 For RiteAid Corp (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 197.00 For RiteAid Corp (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 775.41 For Heather Dean (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 3766.64 For Heather Dean (jkw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account . (Derham-Burk, Devin (harbor)) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1461.99 For VIK Distributors (lub) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 815.46 For VIK Distributors (lub) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Decree . (oe, ) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Report of Distribution. . (oe, ) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2,342.01 For APM and Oak Harbor . (trw, ) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Approving Final Report and Account, Order Discharging Trustee for Dismissed Case. (ka) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summary of Trustee's Final Account with Certificate of Service.. (Meyer, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (case dismissed)(with proof of service). (Meyer, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,375.00 For Debtor, Charles Rowland Morey . (ka) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Dismissal. (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Dismissal). Service Date 04/21/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Dismissal (RE: related document(s) 11 Order to Dismiss Case). (dp) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Dismissing Case . (dp) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Charles Rowland Morey. (Voss, Carl) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Confirmation of Plan (with proof of service) Filed by Trustee Michael H. Meyer (Meyer, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Schedules Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Charles Rowland Morey (Voss, Carl) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order For Payment From Unclaimed Funds In The Amount of $4,757.06 To International Tracing Co. . (femp) (Entered: 11/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds Of $ $17,008.53 To The Order Of Tandon Corporation c/o International Tracing Company, 16300 Chaney, Stilwell, KS 66085-9266. (se) (Entered: 02/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds Of $ 18,804.95 To The Order Of Tandon Corporation c/o International Tracing Company 16300 Chaney, Stilwell, KS 66085-9266. . (se) (Entered: 02/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [1-1] Final Decree. (se) (Entered: 10/18/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 278 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?