Imaginarium Inc.
Bankruptcy Case California Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-Jan-1970
District Judge Leslie J. Tchaikovsky, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Acushnet Company, Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Afco Acceptance Corporation, Petitioning Creditor
Officially listed as "AFCO Acceptance Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy R. Rogers +1 415 591 1000 rrogers@winston.com
No Logo Big Boy, Inc., Petitioning Creditor
No Logo Career Consociates Inc., Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy R. Rogers +1 415 591 1000 rrogers@winston.com
No Logo Foot-joy, Inc., Petitioning Creditor
Officially listed as "Foot-Joy Incorporated"
No Logo Mellon U.S. Leasing, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy R. Rogers +1 415 591 1000 rrogers@winston.com
No Logo Alexandra Benny, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra Benny
No Logo Benjamin C Paton, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Shane P. Landry, Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Replogle +1 415 362 4700 +1 415 781 6683 davidreplogle@hushmail.com
No Logo Enviromental Control Industries, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Levy and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Levy +1 707 253 0833
No Logo Expansion Electronics, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Binder and Malter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Malter +1 408 295 1700 michael@bindermalter.com
No Logo Fernando Campos, Jr., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Richard Seim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Seim +1 408 279 4435 mail@seimr.com
No Logo Fish Rap Publishing Group, a California Corp., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Cooper +1 510 834 6600 mcooper@wendel.com
No Logo Fisherman Investors, LTD., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew Henwood +1 408 279 2730 dfhenwood@aol.com
No Logo Florence Ravioli And Distributing Co, Florence Ravaioli And Distributing Company, Inc, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Stinnett, Meyers and Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrance L. Stinnett +1 415 362 5045 tstinnett@gsmdlaw.com
No Logo FM Productions, CA Corp., Debtor
No Logo Fortel Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffry A. Davis +1 858 314 1500 +1 858 314 1501 jadavis@mintz.com
No Logo G, And J., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan D. Pedlar +1 310 228 5600

Toggle Switch Represented by Stutman, Treister & Glatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2007 Gina Marie Najolia +1 310 228 5600 +1 310 228 5788
No Logo Gabriel O. Cisneros, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce Lindsey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Lindsey +1 831 757 1013 ecf@brucelindsey.com
No Logo Gen-Con, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles B. Greene +1 408 279 3518 cbgatty@aol.com
No Logo George Benny, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Benny
No Logo George M Jewell, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Delphine S. Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harvey W. Hoffman +1 707 575 8888
No Logo Golf Country, Inc., Debtor
Officially listed as "Golf Country, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Campeau Goodsell Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth J. Campeau +1 408 295 9555 kcampeau@campeaulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward A. Kent Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/1992 Edward A. Kent, Jr. +1 650 320 8700
No Logo Hanns Kornell Champagne Cellers, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bronson, Bronson & McKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bronson, Bronson and McKinnon +1 415 986 4200

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kaufman and Logan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/26/1991 Garrett L. Cecchini +1 415 392 6677
No Logo Hermitage Health Care, a Calif. Corp., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Abbey, Weitzenberg, Warren & Emery

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy W. Hoffman +1 707 542 5050 ecftwh@abbeylaw.com
No Logo Imaginarium, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard Rice Nemerovski Canady Falk & Rabkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary M. Kaplan +1 415 434 1600 +1 415 217 5910 gmkaplan@howardrice.com
No Logo Inlight Communications, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg S. Kleiner +1 415 693 2000 kleinergs@cooley.com
No Logo Laura E Jewell, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Delphine S. Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harvey W. Hoffman +1 707 575 8888
No Logo Ofelia H. Cisneros, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce Lindsey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Lindsey +1 831 757 1013 ecf@brucelindsey.com
No Logo Alvaro Anzoategui, Responsible Ind

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles B. Greene +1 408 279 3518 cbgatty@aol.com
No Logo Doris Green, Responsible Ind
No Logo Leslie Breckenridge, Responsible Ind

Toggle Switch Represented by Abbey, Weitzenberg, Warren & Emery

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy W. Hoffman +1 707 542 5050 ecftwh@abbeylaw.com
No Logo Luigi Martinelli, President of Florence Ravioli and Distributing Company, Inc., Responsible Ind
No Logo Mary A. Rorabaugh, Responsible Ind

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary A. Rorabaugh
No Logo Richard . Patane, Responsible Ind
No Logo Andrea A. Wirum, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Ellis +1 415 983 1000 michael.ellis@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Brian A. Holt, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Cooper +1 510 834 6600 mcooper@wendel.com
No Logo Charles E. Sims, Trustee
No Logo David Bradlow, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Isaacs +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 3895 misaacs@mckennalong.com
Space Nhung Le +1 415 356 4600 nle@luce.com
No Logo David Burchard, Trustee
No Logo Devin Derham-burk, Trustee
No Logo E. Lynn Schoenmann, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alexander Kahn +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 MKAHN@FLK.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard Rice Nemerovski Canady Falk & Rabkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schon, Steven Elliot +1 415 434 1600

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nhung Le +1 415 356 4600 nle@luce.com
Space Charles Patrick Maher +1 415 356 4600 cmaher@luce.com
No Logo Edward F. Towers, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald S. Beacher +1 415 227 0900
No Logo EDWARD M. WALSH, Trustee
No Logo John Kendall, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo John M. England, Trustee
No Logo Lois I. Brady, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stromsheim and Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reidun Stromsheim +1 415 989 4100 rstromsheim@stromsheim.com
No Logo Mohamed Poonja, Trustee
No Logo Paul Mansdorf, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeremy W. Katz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy W. Katz +1 415 394 5700 +1 415 394 5003
No Logo Raymond A. Carey, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David N. Chandler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Chandler +1 707 528 4331 dchandler1747@yahoo.com
No Logo Sara L. Kistler, Trustee
No Logo Suzanne Decker, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Walter Slaby +1 650 988 8500 +1 415 494 1417

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendel Rosen Black & Dean LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C. Wurms +1 510 834 6600 jwurms@wendel.com
No Logo Tevis Thompson, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie R. Tuan +1 415 362 5045

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyers Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy Quon Bryant +1 415 362 7500 kquonbryant@mlg-pc.com
No Logo William Broach, Trustee
No Logo Anthony G. Sousa, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Mark St. Angelo, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A. Cutler +1 415 705 3333 patricia.cutler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF,, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nanette Dumas +1 408 535 5525 +1 408 535 5532 Nanette.Dumas@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by David Burchard, Chapter 13 Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward G. Myrtle +1 650 345 7801 administrator@burchardtrustee.com
No Logo Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark L. Pope +1 408 535 5525
No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee
No Logo Darlene Ervin, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip J. Nicholsen +1 415 364 4000 nicholsenlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Diane C. Brabetz, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip J. Nicholsen +1 415 364 4000 nicholsenlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Jennifer Raymand, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip J. Nicholsen +1 415 364 4000 nicholsenlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Malkit Singh, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip J. Nicholsen +1 415 364 4000 nicholsenlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrence V. Ponsford +1 415 434 9100 tponsford@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Wood Herron & Evans, LLP, Creditor Committee
Officially listed as "Thomas W. Humphrey"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip J. Nicholsen +1 415 364 4000 nicholsenlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Michael A. Isaacs, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Alan Isaacs +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 3895 misaacs@mckennalong.com
No Logo Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP, Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP, Trustee Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Ellis +1 415 983 1000 michael.ellis@pillsburylaw.com
  Entries (351) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: None
Order for Payment of Unclaimed Dividends. (femp) (Entered: 11/03/2000)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1966 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
    Order for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Signed by Judge Thomas Carlson (dc) (Entered: 10/25/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: None
      Order For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $572.59 . (dc) (Entered: 09/13/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None
        Order For Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $805.00 . (femp) (Entered: 08/14/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: None
          Order For payment of unclaimed funds in the amount of $620.00 . (ac) (Entered: 08/08/2000)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None
            (Proposed) Order For Payment Of Unclaimed Funds . (dc) (Entered: 05/16/2000)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1961 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: None
              Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [1961-1] Notice of # of Notices: 2. (femp) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1960 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: None
                Notice RE: Failure To Perfect Appeal. Notice of Appeal Filed On May 29, 1992. (femp) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: None
                  [1959-1] Final Decree. (kj) (Entered: 01/26/1999)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1958 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None
                    Trustee's Report of Distribution. (kj) (Entered: 01/26/1999)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1957 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: None
                      Notice Of Unclaimed Dividends Of $5283.84 By Trustee Charles E. Sims (ql) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1956 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None
                        Clarification of Payment by Reidun Stromsheim From the Benny Estate by Debtor Alexandra Benny (n/o) (ljl) (Entered: 07/01/1998)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1955 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: None
                          Order approving Trustee's Report. payment to Charles E. Sims of $1872.86 in fees and $232.16 in expenses (femp) (Entered: 05/05/1998)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1954 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: None
                            Return of Record from District Court Re: Judgment No. C 94-0501SBA (MEJ) . (ljl) (Entered: 04/30/1998)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1953 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: None
                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of See List Attached. (kj) (Entered: 04/28/1998)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1952 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: None
                                Order Granting [1944-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 2495.00, Expenses: $ 149.50) by Bachecki, Crom and Co. payment to Bachecki, Crom & Co. of $2495.00 in fees and $149.50 in expenses . (femp) (Entered: 04/20/1998)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1951 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: None
                                  Duplicate Document - Docketed In Error (db) (Entered: 04/25/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1950 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: None
                                    Order Granting [1945-1] Application For Compensation (From 1994)( Fees: $ 19324.19, Expenses: $ 127.75) by Reidun Stromsheim payment to Reidun Stromsheim of $14176.69 in fees and $127.75 in expenses . (ljl) (Entered: 04/17/1998)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1949 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: None
                                      Ch Involuntary Illegal Ch 7 Objection to Abandonment of Property by the Trustee extension of time by Debtor George Benny, Debtor Alexandra Benny (ljl) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: None
                                        Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [0-0] Final Account and Meeting # of Notices: 10. (ljl) (Entered: 03/06/1998)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1947 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Change of Address of Creditor, Winzler and Kelly Cosulting Engineers. (ljl) (Entered: 03/05/1998)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1946 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None
                                            Application By Trustee Charles E. Sims For Compensation ( Fees: $ 1872.86, Expenses: $ 232.16) . (ljl) (Entered: 03/03/1998)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1945 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/16/1998
                                              Supplemental Final Application By Reidun Stromsheim for Trustee Charles E. Sims For Compensation (From 1994)( Fees: $ 19324.19, Expenses: $ 127.75) . (ljl) (Entered: 01/27/1998)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1944 Filed: 1/21/1998, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/16/1998
                                                Final Application By Trustee's Accountant Bachecki, Crom and Co. For Compensation ( Fees: $ 2495.00, Expenses: $ 149.50) . (ljl) (Entered: 01/21/1998)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1943 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                  Order for Payment of Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 7,306.41 for McJunkin Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 05/20/1997)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1942 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: None
                                                    Order Granting [1940-1] Application To Employ Jay D. Crom, Accountant by Charles E. Sims Trustee's Accountant Bachecki, Crom and Co. . (ljl) (Entered: 11/27/1996)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1941 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration filed by Jay D. Crom in Support of [1940-1] Application To Employ Jay D. Crom, Accountant by Charles E. Sims . (ljl) (Entered: 11/26/1996)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1940 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/27/1996
                                                        Application By Trustee Charles E. Sims To Employ Jay D. Crom, Accountant . (ljl) (Entered: 11/26/1996)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1939 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                          Order Granting [1937-1] Application To Employ Law Offices of Reidun Stromsheim by Charles E. Sims . (femp) (Entered: 10/30/1996)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1938 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                            Declaration filed by Trustee Charles E. Sims of Proposed Counsel . (kj) (Entered: 10/28/1996)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1937 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/29/1996
                                                              Application By Trustee Charles E. Sims To Employ Law Offices of Reidun Stromsheim . (kj) (Entered: 10/28/1996)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1936 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: None
                                                                Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond, For Charles Sims . (femp) (Entered: 10/08/1996)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1935 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                  Order Dismissing Appeal Case. (db) (Entered: 06/25/1996)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1934 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion by Debtor George Benny, Debtor Alexandra Benny requesting determination of appropriate jurisdiction for this matter; motion requesting jury trial and forma pauperis declaration . (lwl) (Entered: 03/15/1996)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion By Debtor George Benny, Debtor Alexandra Benny To Compel the United States Trustee to produce documents and provide information pertaining to the subject bankruptcy . (lwl) (Entered: 03/15/1996)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1469
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 1280 Order for Payment of Dividends.). Service Date 12/21/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds. $10,238.70 to Jakks Pacific Inc. . (trw, ) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Release Unclaimed Funds in the Amount of $9.199.93 to Irwin Toy (jkw, ) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Order for Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $3,584.84 to Chasco Products, Inc.. (trw, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 7/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 1276 Order for Payment of Dividends.). Service Date 07/30/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds. (rba, ) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order (RE: related document(s) 1274 Order). Service Date 04/08/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds. (rba, ) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript, Date of Hearing: 8/9/1996 . (jjd, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript, Date of Hearing: 6/26/1996 . (jjd, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Euler Hermes ACI (rba, ) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order to Release Unclaimed Funds to Gamewright c/o Keys Research. (cj, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Authorizing Payment of Claim from Returned Funds to Allpoints Warehousing Company (RE: related document(s) 1261 Order for Payment of Dividends.). (cj, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Current Address of Creditor Allpoints Warehousing Company Filed by Nancy G. Farage, Esq. with certificate of service . (cj, ) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order for Payment of Dividends. $3,782.34 paid to Ruth Saltzman, Harold Saltzman and Deborah Saltzman c/o Keys Research. (trw, ) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order for Payment of Dividends. $1,894.90 to Kids Only c/o The Financial Resources Group. (trw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order for Payment of Dividends. $16,026.04 paid to Lyons Group. (trw, ) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order for Payment of Dividends. $1,515.02 to Lifeline Industries, Inc. c/o The Finders Group. (trw, ) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1263 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order for Unclaimed Funds. (RE: related document(s) 1254 Unclaimed Dividend). Payment of $4,243.29 to Harper Collins Publishers c/o Keys Research. (trw, ) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order for Payment of Unclaimed Funds (RE: related document(s) 1254 Unclaimed Dividend). $1,274.44 paid to Toysense, Inc. c/o The Financial Resources Group. (trw, ) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order for Payment of Dividends. Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $7,072.49 to Allpoints Warehousing Equipment Co.. (trw, ) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1260 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order for Payment of Dividends. . (trw, ) Modified on 4/7/2010 (tt). Application filed by creditor Arrow Marketing & Development, Fund Locator, Keys Research, $1590.00. (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order for Payment of Dividends. Great American Fun Corp for $2,857.04 . (trw, ) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order for Payment of Dividends. Wilson's Art Studio for $5,894.15. (trw, ) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order , To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 1,901.62 To Colorama Creations . (trw) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order , To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 4,247.20 To Harper Collins Publisher (RE: William Morrow and Co.) . (trw) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Granting [1255-1] Motion Release of Unclaimed Funds . (cj) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 157,519.33 for Various Creditors (trw) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee David A. Bradlow. (U.S. Trustee (pv), ) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 98.52 For Cal Steam (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 579.20 For RMS (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 371.04 For US Foodservice Contract (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1145 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1002.75 For Stockton Iron Works, Inc. (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 8.23 For Intercraaft (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 40.97 For Concrete Structures (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 95.42 For Concrete Structures (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 13.14 For Guinn Masonry Construction (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 470.08 For Hard Rock Concrete (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 50.00 For Sign Classics (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 24.17 For Triad Millworks (jd, ) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 837 Final Decree). Service Date 01/02/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (mw, ) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee E. Lynn Schoenmann. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 Distribution Report)(U.S. Trustee (pm), ) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 11/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 834 Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency). Service Date 11/15/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 830 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $26,042.13 . Filed by Creditor Danka Services , Fund Locator Receivable Management Services .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 832 Court Entry, ). Service Date 10/09/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 830 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $26,042.13 . Filed by Creditor Danka Services , Fund Locator Receivable Management Services .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $26,042.13 . Filed by Creditor Danka Services , Fund Locator Receivable Management Services . (RE: related document(s) 829 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 26,042.13 For Danka Services c/o Holland Knight (mw, ) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 11,222.60 For Recall Total Information Manager, Investigative Group International, Apollo Media, Jung Schirdewahn & Gernhardt, Fischbein Badillo, Applied Solutions Inc., G Breuer, LLoyd Wise And Company, Congon & Crome Inc. Dreszer & Partners, Brigard & Castro. (mw, ) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk (mw, ) Modified on 7/14/2008 ERROR: Please Disregard Duplicate Entry, See Document #828 (dc, ). (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order For Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $2596.23 to be paid to Ralph Powers Fravel, John William Fravel, and the Ann J. Hallberg Trust FBO Anna Thoreen (Tory Fravel) . (dmb) (Entered: 09/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order For Payment of Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $9786.92 to be paid to Ralph Powers Fravel, John William Fravel, and the Ann J. Hallberg Trust FBO Anna Thoreen (Tory Fravel) . (dmb) (Entered: 09/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order , To Pay Unclaimed Dividends Of $ 2950.03 To Robert Carrillo . (db) (Entered: 04/05/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order To Show Cause with Certificate of Mailing, # of Notices: 3. RE: Regarding Closing of Case ; Show Cause Hearing Set For 3:00 3/28/97 AT San Francisco Courtroom 23 (dmb) (Entered: 02/28/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 12/21/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [405-1] Final Decree Order # of Notices: 147. (dmb) (Entered: 01/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [405-1] Final Decree. (dmb) (Entered: 12/19/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Service By Daniel M. Linchey for Trustee Edward M. Walsh Of [403-1] Application For Final Decree. by Edward M. Walsh . (kj) (Entered: 12/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application Filed By Trustee Edward M. Walsh For Final Decree. (kj) (Entered: 12/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $9,320.80 to the order of Independent Nursing Service c/o The Financial Resources Group, Inc. (jmc) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 388 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Creditor Independent Nursing Services , Fund Locator The Financial Resources Group, Inc. ., 390 Court Entry, 391 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 387 Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency, ). Service Date 12/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 391 Court Entry, ). Service Date 12/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 390 Court Entry, ). Service Date 12/12/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 388 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Creditor Independent Nursing Services , Fund Locator The Financial Resources Group, Inc. .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Creditor Independent Nursing Services , Fund Locator The Financial Resources Group, Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 376 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Failure to Cure Deficiency (RE: related document(s) 384 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Fund Locator The Financial Resources Group, Inc. , Creditor Independent Nursing Services ., 383 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Fund Locator Keys Research, Creditor Independent Nursing Services .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 385 Court Entry, ). Service Date 07/24/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Fund Locator The Financial Resources Group, Inc. , Creditor Albert Sprague for Independent Nursing Services . (RE: related document(s) 376 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9320.80 . Filed by Keys Research, Creditor Delia Jauregui for Independent Nursing Services . (RE: related document(s) 376 Unclaimed Dividend, ). (Taylor, Toni) Modified on 7/22/2008 (Taylor, Toni). (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Final Decree. (RE: related document(s) 381 Notice). Service Date 01/26/2007. (Admin.) Modified on 2/5/2007 to correct docket text only (kl, ). (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to creditors regaridng Final Decree. (kl, ) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final Decree . (kl, ) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee Sara L. Kistler. (U.S. Trustee (pv), ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Authorizing Payment of Unclaimed Bankruptcy Dividend. (RE: related document(s) 377 Peitiion for Unclaimed Dividend). (kl, ) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Petition for Unclaimed Funds. Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1528.22 For Catherine Ann Lonergan . (kl, ) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Total Amount of $11,624.91. Gino's Wholesale Jewlers in the amount of $57.00; Joyce Pureco in the amount of $150.65; Huria Tesfasilasie in the amount of $141.79; Catherine A. Lonergan in the amount of $1,528.22, Julie Renee Skinner in the amount of $358.08 Barbara Fomin in the amount of $68.37; Independent Nursing in the amount of $9,320.80. (jmc, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend to Joseph Lewis, c/o The Financial Resources Group, Inc. in the amount of $1082.29. (With Court's Certificate of Mailing) (Related Doc # 354 ) (lj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend to Joseph Lewis, c/o The Financial Resources Group, Inc. in the amount of $1082.29 . (lj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [353-1] Final Decree. (kl) (Entered: 03/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trustee's Report of Distribution. (kl) (Entered: 03/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 98.34 filed by Trustee Raymond A. Carey . (kl) (Entered: 03/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Unclaimed Dividends ($ 699.46) Into Court Registry. (vj) (Entered: 12/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividends ($ 7.79) (vj) (Entered: 11/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By Trustee Raymond A. Carey Of (Porposed) Order Re: Application For Ex Parte Relief by David N. Chandler, and [347-2] Application For Allowance of Supplemental Fee Compensation ( Fees: $ 500.00, ) by David N. Chandler . (kl) (Entered: 10/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/16/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting [347-1] Application For Ex Parte Relief by David N. Chandler Granting [347-2] Application For Allowance of Supplemental Fee Compensation ( Fees: $ 500.00, ) by David N. Chandler payment to David N. Chandler of $500.00 in fees . (kl) (Entered: 10/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Trustee's Application and Order For Custody of Claims. In Custody Until: 8/8/95. (femp) (Entered: 07/25/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 245 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 08/25/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Pay Unclaimed Funds (Related Doc # 243 ) (nw) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 243 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2988.81 . Filed by Creditor Elliott Alber .). (ba) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2988.81 . Filed by Creditor Elliott Alber . (RE: related document(s) 192 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 222 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Keys Research, Creditor John Nicholas Ucovich). (acc) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 222 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2336.53 . Filed by Creditor John Nicholas Ucovich , Fund Locator Keys Research ., 224 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 235 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Access Telecomm Systems, Inc.). (jaw) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 235 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3706.62 . Filed by Creditor Access Telecomm Systems, Inc. ., 237 Court Entry). (tt) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 237 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/20/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 235 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3706.62 . Filed by Creditor Access Telecomm Systems, Inc. .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $3706.62 . Filed by Creditor Access Telecomm Systems, Inc. . (RE: related document(s) 200 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 227 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor Jeffrey John Bauer). (pl, ) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 231 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor James Alexander Pinyan). (jaw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 231 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $586.66 . Filed by Creditor James Alexander Pinyan .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $586.66 . Filed by Creditor James Alexander Pinyan . (RE: related document(s) 193 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 229 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/15/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 227 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2570.19 . Filed by Creditor Jeffrey John Bauer , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2570.19 . Filed by Creditor Jeffrey John Bauer , Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC . (RE: related document(s) 198 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 224 Court Entry, ). Service Date 02/07/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 220 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Keys Research, Creditor Jung Wan An). (jaw, ) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 222 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2336.53 . Filed by Creditor John Nicholas Ucovich , Fund Locator Keys Research .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2336.53 . Filed by Creditor John Nicholas Ucovich , Fund Locator Keys Research . (RE: related document(s) 205 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 220 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2452.14 . Filed by Creditor Jung Wan An , Fund Locator Keys Research .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $2452.14 . Filed by Creditor Jung Wan An , Fund Locator Keys Research . (RE: related document(s) 204 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 216 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC, Creditor Tam Doan). (jaw, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 214 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor Anthony R. Cook). (jaw, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 216 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1044.90 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Tam Doan .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1044.90 . Filed by Fund Locator Dilks & Knopik, LLC , Creditor Tam Doan . (RE: related document(s) 199 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 214 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1822.50 . Filed by Creditor Anthony R. Cook .). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $1822.50 . Filed by Creditor Anthony R. Cook . (RE: related document(s) 197 Unclaimed Dividend). (Taylor, Toni) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Adam Wengrow (jaw, ) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 211 Final Decree). Service Date 12/23/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (jaw, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee Tevis Thompson. (U.S. Trustee (sp), ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,144.74 For Pentagon Mechanical, Inc. (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 539.73 For La Quinta Inns, Inc. (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 86.36 For Eaden Saw (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 4,076.86 For NexTrend Technology Inc. (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2,336.53 For John Ucovich (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2,452.14 For Jung An (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 231.31 For Kathleen Egge (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 83.44 For Shotgun Delivery (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 7,710.38 For Aisys Corporation (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 3,706.62 For Access Telecomm Systems, Inc. (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,044.90 For Tam Doan (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [198-1] Final Decree. (jd) (Entered: 06/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Report of Distribution. (jd) (Entered: 06/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 214.3 for City of Sunnyvale, $39.91 for Bay Area Supply, $1410.99 for Dynasty, $6216.06 for Douglas Sports Inc, $177.84 for Telecredit Services, $5233.91 Daiwa Corp, $270.76 for Printing Inc, $2879.39 for Evergood Lea Co. (jd) (Entered: 02/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 43.37 For Sales Tax Solutions (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 95.57 For Quater (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 586.66 For Jim Pinyan (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2,824.87, $163.94 For Elliot Alber (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 5,689.97 For Impact Technologies, LLC (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 1,678.90 For George Zhi Wang (jaw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 184 Order on Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend). Service Date 01/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend to Linda Testo, collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson. (Related Doc # 181 ) (tl) Modified on 1/20/2010 (tt). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 181 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9987.14 . Filed by Creditor Linda Testo .).Linda Testo collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson (tt) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 181 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9987.14 . Filed by Creditor Linda Testo .). Linda Testo collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson (tt) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $9987.14 . Filed by Creditor Linda Testo .Linda Testo collecting for deceased creditor Albert Lawson (RE: related document(s) 179 Unclaimed Dividend). (tt) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trustee's Report of Distribution. The UST has reviewed the Trustee's Distribution Report and submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for filing. Filed by Trustee John Kendall. (U.S. Trustee (mp), ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 13677.64 For Albert Lawson, Endjang Tanumihardja, Sears Roebuck & Co. (vmb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [175-1] Final Decree. (mg) (Entered: 06/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Service By Mail By Trustee Edward Towers Of [173-1] Notice of Unclaimed Dividends. (femp) (Entered: 08/25/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 165.57 for Mariko Kimura, $60.88 for David Patrick Eagle, $217.18 for Hartmann Studios, $90.26 for ATS Communications, Inc., $6.21 For Automated Entertainment Stage Productions Design, $7.68 for Golden West Blue Print and Supply, $68.54 for Ushio America Inc., $85.02 for McMaster-Carr Supply Co., $11.02 for Sandra L. Turner, $458.06 for Fregosi & Company Paints, $299.87 for Bernard Brown . (femp) (Entered: 08/25/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers [171-1] RE Trustee's Final Report RE Final Distribution . (femp) (Entered: 02/26/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Report RE Final Distribution. (femp) (Entered: 02/26/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Unclaimed Dividends By Trustee Edward Towers. (dmb) (Entered: 02/19/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 150 Final Decree). Service Date 05/07/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Final Decree . (mw) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged filed on behalf of Trustee, Andrea Wirum. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed by Trustee Andrea A. Wirum. (U.S. Trustee (pm)) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Unclaimed Dividend Turned Over to the Clerk in the Amount of $ 2,531.88 For (Please See Attached Notice Of Unclaimed Dividend) (mw) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [116-1] Final Decree. (lb) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [115-1] Trustee's Final Report and Account. (lb) (Entered: 09/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 2200.00 for National Advertisng Co. . (aw) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 2374.00 for KLFA Radio . (aw) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 1174.00 for KTGE Radio Tigre . (aw) (Entered: 08/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Change of Address of attorney Robert Newell Jr.. (lf) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Courts Certificate of Mailing Re: [0-1] Notice of # of Notices: 343. (lbo) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Unclaimed Dividends turned over to the Clerk In the Amount of $ 5102.17 for Various (femp) (Entered: 07/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend (RE: related document(s) 82 Granting Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend filed by Creditor The Money Store Investment Corp.). (dc) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 82 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7146.20 . Filed by Creditor The Money Store Investment Corp. ., 84 Court Entry). (ba) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 84 Court Entry). Service Date 03/10/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supporting Documents for Unclaimed Dividends Application (RE: related document(s) 82 Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7146.20 . Filed by Creditor The Money Store Investment Corp. .). (ba) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Pay Unclaimed Dividend in the Amount of $7146.20 . Filed by Creditor The Money Store Investment Corp. . (RE: related document(s) 81 Unclaimed Dividend). (ba) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Unclaimed Dividends Turned Over to the Clerk ( Please See Attached PDF File) For City Guide, and Gelati Celeasti et al . (dc) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order to release unclaimed funds in the amount of $9646.20 due to Northern California Produce, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 79 Order). (ac, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Release Unclaimed Funds in the amount of $9646.20 for Northern California Produce, Inc., aka NCP Trucking, Inc. (gg, ) Modified on 1/26/2007 (ac, ). (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 77 Final Decree). Service Date 05/21/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final Decree . (ql, ) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds To Richard Patane . (ql, ) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Pay Unclaimed Funds . (dmb, ) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/11/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing RE: [63-1] Order to pay a portion of secured claim By Trustee Edward Towers. (lwl) (Entered: 05/18/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/5/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of intention By Trustee Edward Towers to abandon and destroy personal property of the estate. (lwl) (Entered: 05/18/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting [62-1] Application To Pay A Portion Of Secured Claim by William J. Lafferty . (femp) (Entered: 05/05/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/28/1994, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/3/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By William J. Lafferty for Debtor FM Productions, CA Corp. Of [62-1] Application To Pay A Portion Of Secured Claim by William J. Lafferty . (femp) (Entered: 05/02/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/2/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [61-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 11/03/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting [58-1] Application To Compromise Controversy With The Rabin Brothers by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration filed by Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers in support of [58-1] Application To Compromise Controversy With The Rabin Brothers by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 10/19/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 10/18/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/25/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [58-1] Application To Compromise Controversy With The Rabin Brothers by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 10/19/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Order RE: [56-1] Order . (femp) (Entered: 09/29/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting [53-1] Application Authority to Compromise Accounts Receivable by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 09/17/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [55-1] Notice of by Thomas E. Carlson . (femp) (Entered: 09/17/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/8/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration filed by Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers in Support of [53-1] Application Authority to Compromise Accounts Receivable by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 09/13/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/8/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/15/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [53-1] Application Authority to Compromise Accounts Receivable by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 09/13/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [52-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 09/13/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/31/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting [49-1] Application For Administrative Expenses by Ronald S. Beacher . (kj) (Entered: 09/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Lynne M. Higgs filed by Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers in Support of [49-1] Application For Administrative Expenses by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 08/24/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/31/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [49-1] Application For Administrative Expenses by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 08/24/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice RE: [47-1] Motion To Pay Chapter 7 Administrative Expense Claims by Edward Towers By Trustee Edward Towers (femp) (Entered: 08/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion By Trustee Edward Towers To Pay Chapter 7 Administrative Expense Claims of Stephen J. Swanson, Elizabeth Latham & Sandy Turner. (femp) (Entered: 08/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers Of [46-1] Notice of by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 08/03/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [45-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 06/25/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [44-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 06/25/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting [41-1] stipulation for rejection of lease and settlement of claim for administrative rent by Edward Towers, Harold J. Freemon . (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting [39-1] Application Subordination of Lien to Chapter 7 Administrative Expenses by Ronald S. Beacher . (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/9/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Service By Jacqueline S. Dailey for Creditor Harold J. Freemon Of [41-1] stipulation by Edward Towers, Harold J. Freemon . (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/3/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bond of Trustee and Approval In Amount of $ 1,100,000.00 With The Continental Insurance Co. As Surety. (Bond # BNS1449630) Duplicate original (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/2/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/9/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for order approving stipulation Filed By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Re Subordination of Lien to Chapter 7 Administrative Expenses (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/2/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [38-1] stipulation by Federal Deposit Insurance Corp., Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [37-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Meeting Held (femp) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [35-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 06/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/21/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Service By Accountant Charles Duck Of [34-1] Entry of Order Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 06/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/13/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting [29-1] Application To Employ Charles Duck Jr. as accountant by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 05/18/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/6/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers Of [32-1] Notice of by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 05/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of proposed accountant filed by Trustee Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 05/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of intent to employ accountant RE: [29-1] Application To Employ Charles Duck Jr. as accountant by Edward Towers By Trustee Edward Towers (femp) (Entered: 05/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/13/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application By Trustee Edward Towers To Employ Charles Duck Jr. as accountant . (femp) (Entered: 05/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting [21-1] Motion To Sell Personal Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens by FM Productions, CA Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 04/29/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate Of Service By Ronald S. Beacher for Trustee Edward Towers Of [25-1] Consent by Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 04/28/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting [23-1] Application To Employ Counsel for Trustee by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 04/28/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent of the Creditor Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. as successor in interest to Financial Center Bank in Support of [21-1] Motion To Sell Personal Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens by FM Productions, CA Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 04/26/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Proposed Counsel Ronald S. Beacher Regarding [23-1] Application To Employ Counsel for Trustee by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 04/26/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/26/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers Of [23-1] Application To Employ Counsel for Trustee by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 04/26/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Inventory of Assets to be sold pursuant to motion to sell personal property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens filed by Trustee Edward Towers (femp) (Entered: 04/21/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/16/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/22/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers Of [21-1] Motion To Sell Personal Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens by FM Productions, CA Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 04/19/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers Of [20-1] Motion To Sell Personal Property of Estate Free and Clear of Liens by Edward Towers, [20-1] Motion Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 04/16/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/9/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting [17-1] Application To Shorten Time For service And A Hearing Date by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 04/16/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Ronald S. Beacher in Support of [17-1] Application To Shorten Time For service And A Hearing Date by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 04/16/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/1993, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/9/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Service By Trustee Edward Towers Of [17-1] Application To Shorten Time For service And A Hearing Date by Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 04/16/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate Of Service By Jacqueline S. Dailey for Creditor Harold J. Freemon Of [16-1] Request Notice of by Harold J. Freemon . (femp) (Entered: 04/09/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request by Creditor Scenic and Title Artists Local 816 For Notice. (femp) (Entered: 04/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By William J. Lafferty for Debtor FM Productions, CA Corp. Of [14-1] Request Notice of . (femp) (Entered: 04/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Scott D. Huges for Creditor Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. Of [12-1] Request Notice of by Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 04/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/25/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request by Creditor Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. For Notice. (femp) (Entered: 04/01/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order for Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Service Re: [0-0] First Meeting . ( # of Notices: 223) (femp) (Entered: 03/31/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Financial Affairs. (femp) (Entered: 03/25/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summary of Schedules A-H, completion of petition. (femp) (Entered: 03/25/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing by Washington D.C. Re: [8-1] Trustee Appointment . ( # of Notices: 4) (femp) (Entered: 03/15/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond, For Edward Towers . (femp) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/4/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Creditor Matrix Cover Sheet. (femp) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure of Compensation By Attorney For Debtor In the Amount of $ 2,150.00. (femp) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent to Corporate Petition filed by Debtor FM Productions, CA Corp. (femp) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Thomas H. Mendenhall filed by William J. Lafferty for Debtor FM Productions, CA Corp. in Support of [2-1]Ex Parte Motion For Exemption From Bankryptcy Rule 1007(a)(1) by FM CA Corp., [2-2] Motion For Authorization to Submit List of Creditors on Magnetic Tape by FM Productions, CA Corp. . (femp) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion By Debtor FM Productions, CA Corp. For Exemption From Bankryptcy Rule 1007(a)(1) ,and For Authorization to Submit List of Creditors on Magnetic Tape (femp) (Entered: 03/11/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Voluntary Petition missing documents: Schedules A-H Statement of Financial Affairs Matrix Due on 3/18/93 Order for Mtg of Creditors Due On 4/12/93 ( Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 198353) (femp) (Entered: 03/04/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 277 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?