Friskit, Inc. v. Realnetworks, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-05085

Tags
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 3:48 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Friskit, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baniak Pine & Gannon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael H Baniak +1 312 673 0360
TERMINATED: 01/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Arnold Pine +1 312 673 0360 +1 312 673 0361
TERMINATED: 01/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW F. PRATT
TERMINATED: 01/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANUJ K. WADHWA +1 312 673 0360

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diana Chen
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor DeGyarfas +1 213 972 4500 +1 213 486 0065 vdegyarfas@foley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth S Klein +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 kkleine@foleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Robinson +1 213 972 4500 +1 213 486 0065 wrobinson@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Krista L. Mitzel +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 mitzelk@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEYERS WOLIN, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott H. Kaliko +1 201 831 0575 +1 201 962 3572 scott.kaliko@kalikolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PECKAR & ABRAMSON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis Jude Torrence +1 415 837 1968 +1 415 837 1320

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant Edward Kinsel +1 310 788 3215 +1 310 843 1273 Gkinsel@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse L Miller +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 jessemiller@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Torrens McKeeman +1 415 397 2823 +1 415 397 8549 mmckeeman@seyfarth.com
TERMINATED: 03/21/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth L Wilton +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219 kwilton@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven William Flanders +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 flanders@turnerboyd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD & OLIVO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M Hill +1 212 697 6262 hilld@wardolivo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W Olivo, Jr. +1 212 697 6262 +1 212 972 5866 olivoj@wardolivo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Franklin Ward +1 908 277 3333 +1 212 972 5866 wardj@wardolivo.com
No Logo Listen.com, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 dgupta@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Realnetworks, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 dgupta@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
v.
No Logo Listen.com, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 dgupta@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. David Donoghue +1 312 704 7700 +1 312 558 1195
TERMINATED: 02/25/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd C. Jacobs +1 312 704 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Heekyong Chae MacLeod +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 macleodh@howrey.com
TERMINATED: 05/02/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R Stewart +1 415 848 4907 +1 415 848 4900 stewartd@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Toji Calabro +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 tojicalabro@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Realnetworks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deepak Gupta +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 dgupta@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. David Donoghue +1 312 704 7700 +1 312 558 1195
TERMINATED: 02/25/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd C. Jacobs +1 312 704 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Heekyong Chae MacLeod +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 macleodh@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Toji Calabro +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 tojicalabro@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Friskit, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diana Chen
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth S Klein +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 kkleine@foleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Robinson +1 213 972 4500 +1 213 486 0065 wrobinson@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaliko & Yeager, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott H. Kaliko +1 201 831 0575 +1 201 962 3572 scott.kaliko@kalikolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse L Miller +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 jessemiller@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven William Flanders +1 650 521 5930 +1 650 521 5931 flanders@turnerboyd.com
  Entries (831) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 Appeal Remark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Costs Taxed
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Order on Motion to Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Reply Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Certificate Of Service.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Notice of Appeal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Motion to Strike
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Exhibits
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Proposed Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Declaration in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Declaration in Support
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Objection
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Bill of Costs
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Clerks Judgment
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Brief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Brief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Brief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Response - non motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Objection
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Objection
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Objection
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 6/16/2007, Entered: 6/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Motion for Service by Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 2/15/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Certification of Mediation Session
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 1/15/2007, Entered: 1/15/2007 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Order Referring Case to Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 411 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?