Nguyen v. Hybrid Networks, Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:98-cv-20888
District Judge Ronald M. Whyte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Bandiera +1 619 231 1058

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly C. Epstein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 e_file_sf@csgrr.com
v.
No Logo Carl S. Ledbetter, Defendant
No Logo LEGAL SERVICES DEPT, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coopers & Lybrand"
No Logo Dan E. Steimle, Defendant
No Logo Douglas M. Leone, Defendant
No Logo Gary M. Lauder, Defendant
No Logo Gustavo Ezcurra, Defendant
No Logo Howard L. Strachman, Defendant
No Logo Hybrid Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo James R. Flach, Defendant
No Logo Stephen E. Halprin, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff of change of address [5:98-cv-20888] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Plaintiff [22-2] order [5:98-cv-20888] (scu, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/16/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte : Case Management Statement is due 10:30 12/7/01 ; Case Management Conference set for 11/30/01 ; (cc: all counsel) [5:98-cv-20888] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None
        MINUTES: ( C/R Lee-Anne Shortridge) ( Hearing Date: 3/23/01) Dft's motion to dismiss; pltf's motion to strike under submission [5:98-cv-20888] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/13/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: None
          SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MINUTES: ( C/R Lee-Anne Shortridge) ( Hearing Date: 8/13/99) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/18/1999)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
            JUDGMENT: by Judge Ronald M. Whyte dismissing case ; appeal filing ddl 9/15/99 ( Date Entered: 8/16/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/16/1999)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER approving plan of allocation by Judge Ronald M. Whyte ( Date Entered: 8/16/99) (cc: all counsel) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/16/1999)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Plaintiff of change of address [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/11/1999)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: None
                  REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 12/4/98 ( C/R: Lee-Anne Shortidge) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/13/1999)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: None
                    MINUTES: Plaintiff's motion to appoint lead plaintff and lead counsel ( C/R Lee-Anne Shortridge) ( Hearing Date: 12/4/98) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/17/1998)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte consolidating cases ( Date Entered: 12/15/98) (cc: all counsel) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/15/1998)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Plaintiff in support of memorandum [12-1] [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/24/1998)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: None
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff in support of motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of co-lead counsel [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/24/1998)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by defendant Coopers & Lybrand [10-2] order [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/22/1998)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte extending time to answer ( Date Entered: 10/20/98) (cc: all counsel) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/20/1998)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: None
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Hybrid Networks, Inc, defendant Coopers & Lybrand on 8/31/98 [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/16/1998)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: None
                                  PROOF OF SERVICE of Scheduling order extending time to answer to 10/21/98 [7-1], order [7-2] [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte : extending time to answer to 10/21/98 (cc: all counsel) [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/30/1998)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of publication by Plaintiff [5:98-cv-20888] (gm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/04/1998)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Plaintiff Tony Nguyen of related case(s) C98-2731-SI filed 7/10/98 Rpsemberg-v-Nationsbanc Montgomery Securities, Inc. et al [5:98-cv-20888] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of pendency of other action in California Superior Court by Plaintiff Tony Nguyen [5:98-cv-20888] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE to Preserve documents by Plaintiff Tony Nguyen [5:98-cv-20888] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER RE COURT PROCEDURE and SCHEDULE by Judge Ronald M. Whyte : 10/13/98 last day to file proof or waiver of servie, 60 days after publication of notice, last day to file motion to serve as lead plaintif.. (cc: all counsel) (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT yes Summons(es) issued; Fee status pd entered on 8/28/98 in the amount of $ 150.00 ( Receipt No. 49366); jury demand [5:98-cv-20888] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?