Air Crash Off Point, et al v. Alaska Airlines, Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 00-cv-01343
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 10:17 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adolfo Chavez Flores, Plaintiff
No Logo Alan Clemetson, Plaintiff
No Logo Aldo Raul Quintero, Plaintiff
No Logo Alexander Individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Harry Stasinos, deceased, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LISH WHITSON PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lish Whitson

Toggle Switch Represented by skes-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Gerard Stolpman +1 562 435 8300 +1 562 435 8304 stolpman@skes-law.com
No Logo Alice Lillian Baldridge, Plaintiff
No Logo Allison Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Anita Cuthbertson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Clark Aristei +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444
Space Mary Schiavo +1 310 207 3233
No Logo Anne Wilkie, Plaintiff
No Logo Arthur Ost, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KNAPP & VIOLA, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Stephen Viola, Esq. +1 650 343 6400 lviola@violaw.com
No Logo Berenice Kolber, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Ki Tze , +1 415 356 4600 +1 415 356 4610 ktze@luce.com
No Logo Beth Michelle Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty H. Knudson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin & Martin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aram Kouyoumdjian , +1 213 388 4747 +1 213 388 6655 akouyoumdjian@martin-martin.net
No Logo Bill Gregory, Plaintiff
No Logo Bonnie Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grey & Nevin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Joseph Grey +1 415 457 6444
No Logo Bonnie Tansky, Plaintiff
No Logo Brad Whitworth, Plaintiff
No Logo Candelario Estrada-Pena, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James S. Rogers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Rogers +1 206 621 8525

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Paula James Wyatt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula James Wyatt +1 361 857 2727

Toggle Switch Represented by Panish Shea & Boyle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Joseph Panish +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699 bpanish@gbpwlaw.com
No Logo Carlene Oliver, Plaintiff
No Logo Caryn Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer Thomas Malysiak +1 916 868 2200 +1 916 585 2654
No Logo Casey Craig Stokes, Plaintiff
No Logo Chris Wilkie, Plaintiff
No Logo Cory Karlsson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank M Pitre +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 fpitre@cpmlegal.com
No Logo David Mills, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Duplan Campbell +1 206 359 8414 +1 206 359 9000 bcampbell@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by University of California, Los Angeles

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles S. Kim +1 310 788 9900 sulki@ucla.edu
No Logo Dolores Shanks, Plaintiff
No Logo Earlene Shaw, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Baldridge, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Bryant, Plaintiff
No Logo Estate of Gabriela Chavez Garcia de Estrada, Plaintiff
No Logo Estate of Rodrigo L. Laigo and Naomi H. Laigo, Plaintiff
No Logo Frances Han Nivolo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Hal Hardin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Sunmin Yee +1 510 839 1200 asyee@aol.com
No Logo Fred Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Frederick Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Gabriel Poll, Plaintiff
No Logo George Voronoff, Plaintiff
No Logo Gilbert Manning, Plaintiff
No Logo Gregory B. Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buskirk Law Offices, Inc., P.S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Buskirk +1 360 692 3838
No Logo Hailey Frances Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis H Walters +1 206 223 1313 +1682710 +16 682 7100 dwalters@karrtuttle.com
No Logo Helen Clemetson, Plaintiff
No Logo Holly A. Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Irene Bernard, Plaintiff
No Logo James Long, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elliott Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Elliott +1 503 648 3146
No Logo James Theodore Luque, Plaintiff
No Logo Janet K. Crane, Plaintiff
No Logo Janis Ost Ford, Plaintiff
No Logo Jason Poll, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeff Hatleberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nurenberg, Plevin, Heller & McCarthy Co., LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie R. Lebovitz +1 216 621 2300 +1 216 771 2242 jlebovitz@nphm.com
No Logo Jeff Whitworth, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeffrey R. Knight, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by mrnam.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fredric D. Reed +1 206 624 6271
No Logo Jennifer L. Knight, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesse J. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph W. Carcione, Jr. +1 650 367 6811 +1 650 367 0367 ccdlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgetown University Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Rubin +1 202 662 9388

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian S. Koukoutchos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian S. Koukoutchos +1 504 626 4409

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jonathan Massey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Massey +1 202 686 0457

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph E. Carcione,Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary W. Dolinski +1 650 367 6811

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence H. Tribe +1 617 495 4621 larry@tribelaw.com
No Logo Joan Margiotta, Plaintiff
No Logo Joanne Jamieson, Plaintiff
No Logo Joe Savoie, Plaintiff
No Logo John Digel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krutch Lindell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas William Bingham +1 202 682 1505
No Logo Jon Goslee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowles & Verna

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P Verna +1 925 935 3300 +1 925 935 0371 mverna@bowlesverna.com
No Logo Jovanna Luque, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Callaway & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Wolf +1 415 541 0300
No Logo Julie D. Friedmann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Law Offices, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Anthony Clifford +1 312 899 9090 +1 312 251 1160 rac@cliffordlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Goodman +1 415 421 6140 +1 415 398 5030 wgoodman@kasowitz.com
Space Marcus Sanders Topel +1 415 421 6140 +1 415 398 5030 mtopel@kasowitz.com
No Logo Julie Fisher, Plaintiff
No Logo Julie Serrano, Plaintiff
No Logo Julio Bermudez, Plaintiff
No Logo Karin Wigen, Plaintiff
No Logo Katharine Voronoff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Patrick Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Patrick Collins +1 415 922 5454 +1 415 346 8987 Jim@jpcollinslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Reilly & Danko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry O'Reilly +1 650 358 5901 +1 650 358 2575 toreilly@oreillylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Danko Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Danko, Esq. +1 650 342 6100 +1 650 342 3843 mdanko@dankolaw.com
No Logo Kathleen Manning, Plaintiff
No Logo Kathryn J. Janosik, Plaintiff
No Logo Keith Whitworth, Plaintiff
No Logo Lawrence Baldridge, Sr., Plaintiff
No Logo Lawrence C. Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlene L. Sipe, Deceased, Plaintiff
No Logo Lindsay Dawn Stokes, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Champion, Plaintiff
No Logo Lois D. Roesle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Poswall, White, Kouyoumdjian & Cutler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Poswall +1 916 449 1300
No Logo Lorna Tamara Donaghy, Plaintiff
No Logo Malcolm Estate of Malcolm Branson, by and through Karin Wigen, personal representative, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David George

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David George +1 907 586 1328

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillip Paul Weidner & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Paul Weidner +1 907 276 1200
No Logo Margery Ann Thorgrimson, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Guadalupe Quintero Luna, Plaintiff
No Logo Marilyn Thompson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Steinle Eric.Steinle@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susie Injijian ,. +1 510 267 0500 sinjijian@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sterns & Walker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald C. Sterns +1 510 267 0500 +1 510 267 0506 sterns@trial-law.com
No Logo Mark Luque, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Wilkie, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Galvin, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Donaghy, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Douglas Stokes, Plaintiff
No Logo Montserrat Gomez De Barragan, Plaintiff
No Logo Neil Wilkie, Plaintiff
No Logo Nichelle M. Husby, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Nina Frances Hanning, Plaintiff
No Logo Nora Dulce Gomez Quintero, Plaintiff
No Logo Paige Hodges Stockley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E. Larson +1 206 223 1313

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven R. Pounian +1 212 687 8181

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacqueline M James +1 212 596 9725 +1 646 728 2844 jacqueline.james@ropesgray.com
No Logo Pamela Sparks, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Sanchez, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul, Bernard, Plaintiff
No Logo Peter Gandesbery, Plaintiff
No Logo Peter Penna, Plaintiff
No Logo Pierrette M.F. Ing, Plaintiff
No Logo Ralph Pearson, Plaintiff
No Logo Ramon Gomez Quintero, Plaintiff
No Logo Randolph H. Laigo, Plaintiff
No Logo Raymund H. Laigo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ammirato & Palumbo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent A. Ammirato +1 626 432 5181

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson Calcagnie & Robinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Frank Calcagnie +1 949 720 1288 +1 949 720 1292 kcalcagnie@rcrlaw.net
No Logo Reginald H. Laigo, Plaintiff
No Logo Reina Isabel Marquez Morales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Speiser Krause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juanita Marie Madole +1 949 553 1421 +1 949 553 1346
No Logo Richard J. Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Y. Thorgrimson, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Hovey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sara M Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Hobson Wecht +1 415 981 7210 rwecht@walkuplawoffice.com
No Logo Romana Garcia Cisneros, Plaintiff
No Logo Rose Bermudez, Plaintiff
No Logo Sasha Poll, Plaintiff
No Logo Shaina Poll, Plaintiff
No Logo Stockley Dina Moreno, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Da Silva, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan S. Wilkie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin P. Durkin +1 312 899 9090
No Logo Thelma Stasinos, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Gandesbery, Plaintiff
No Logo Timothy A. Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Timothy P. Janosik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krutch Lindell Housh Bingham Keller & Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C. Jones +1 206 682 1505

Toggle Switch Represented by Speiser Krause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Joseph Veth +1 949 553 1421 +1 949 553 1346
No Logo Tracy J. Knizek, Plaintiff
No Logo Velda Pearson, Plaintiff
No Logo Velma Fay Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Vera Plumb, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Rubin & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael N. White +1 253 284 2780
No Logo William Margiotta, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore, O'Brien, Jacques & Yelenak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett M. Moore +1 203 272 5881 +1 203 272 9273 gmoore@mojylaw.com
No Logo William Wilkie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sara M Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Henry Schoenberger +1 415 981 7210 rschoenberger@walkuplawoffice.com
No Logo Winston W.S. Ing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Penthouse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lionel Toms Aiken +1 415 357 1200 +1 415 512 9277 laiken@kmlaw100.com
v.
Alaska Air Group, Inc. Alaska Air Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Kahn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur Irwin Willner +3108 219 000 x720 +1 310 775 8775 awillner@bergerkahn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
Space Dane B Jaques +1 703 336 8709 +1 703 336 8750 djaques@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCullough, Campbell & Lane

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann P. Goodman +1 312 923 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Webb Huston +1 858 720 5154 +1 858 720 5125 jhuston@mofo.com
Space Don Gale Rushing +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 drushing@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richmond & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L. Richmond +1 907 276 5727 +1 907 276 2953 brichmond@richmondquinn.com
No Logo Chairman of the NTSB James Hall, Defendant
No Logo Derlan Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Derlan Industries, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Derlan Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey & Partners

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allan M. Bower +1 310 392 5000
No Logo Equilon Enterprises LLC, Defendant
Officer/Director, Codexis, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shalem Asher Massey +1 949 223 7000 +1 949 223 7100 shalem.massey@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick & Hunt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James William Hunt +1 213 873 2100 +1 213 873 2125 james.hunt@fitzhunt.com
No Logo McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mobil Oil Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert E Peacock, III +1 562 436 2000 +1 562 436 7416 al.peacock@kyl.com
Space Cameron Gardner Stout +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 cameron.stout@kyl.com
No Logo MPDC, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Transportation Safety Board ("NTSB"), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Sullivan +1 704 344 6222 +1 704 344 6629 james.sullivan2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Nortek, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Linear LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Winstead PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred John Meier, Jr. +1 214 745 5400 +1 214 745 5390
No Logo Peacock Aerospace, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peacock Engineering, Defendant
Royal Dutch Shell PLC Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Shell Oil Company"
Officer/Director, Codexis, Inc.
Officer/Director, Equilon Enterprises LLC
Officer/Director, Cosan Ltd.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory C. Read +4157 817 900 1401 +1 415 781 2635 gregory.read@sedgwicklaw.com
No Logo Struthers Industries, Inc., Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Howard Frankel +1 415 882 5000 +1 415 882 0300 steven.frankel@snrdenton.com
Space Mark T. Hansen +1 213 623 9300
Space Sonia Renee Martin +1 415 882 5000 +1 415 882 0300 sonia.martin@snrdenton.com
Space Stephen H. Rovak +1 314 241 1800 +1 314 259 5959 srovak@sonnenschein.com
Space Robert F Scoular +1 213 623 9300 +1 213 623 9924 robert.scoular@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H Stern +1 213 613 2800 +1 213 613 2950 sternd@hugheshubbard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Alan McIntire +1 310 788 9900 +1 310 788 3399 rmcintire@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Trig Aerospace, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Edward Rose +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 mrose@rosewalker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bailey Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn J. Shields +1 718 463 1868 +1 718 463 2883 cshields@baileypartners.com
No Logo Trig Holdings, Inc., Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
No Logo Air Crash Off Point Mugu, California, on January 30, 2000, In Re
No Logo American Manufacturers Mutual Insurance Company, Intervenor Pla

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert R. Poindexter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Crowe +1 415 882 7840

Toggle Switch Represented by Rudloff Wood & Barrows

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman La Force +1 510 740 1500
No Logo daniel weinstein, Special Master
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (984) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 983 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. That Plaintiffs be reimbursed the pro-rata amount of the refund $35,716.34 after the repayment to Greene, Broillet for the amount spent on the JAMS bill ($5,500.00) (see document for specifics) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
    MOTION for Order for Disbursement of Remaining Settlement Funds; Affidavit of Timothy J. Wheeler in Support thereof filed by Candelario Estrada-Pena. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion petition for reimbursement of expenses, in the sum of $999,299. to Issue a check payable to Frank M. Pitre drawn on the PSC Expense Assessment Fund to be distributed by the PSC Liaison Counsel to PSC members in the amounts of their respective reported expenses. See order for continuation [981-1] ( Date Entered: 3/16/04) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/11/2004 Court Filing
        MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's (PSC'S) combined petition for reimbursement of expenses and authority to disperse the remaining balance in the PSC expense fund to individual plaintiffs. [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
          LETTER to the court dated 2/23/04 from Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 enclosed the petition and order prepared for filing regarding the disbursement of the balance of monies in the PSC Expense Fund. [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
            LETTER to the court dated 3/8/04 from Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 regarding enclosed petition and order prepared for approval regarding the disbursement of the balance of monies in the PSC Expense Fund. [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer Court suggests that the MDL panel remand this action to the USDC for the Central District of CA. ( Date Entered: 12/23/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer Court holds that in this general maritime survival action future lost earnings may be reduced by federal and state taxes as well as a personal consumption percentage. ( Date Entered: 12/23/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                  REPLY by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 re motion for judgment on any claim for recovery of lost gross income [967-1], re motion to preclude testimony or evidence of future economic loss that does not make appropriate deduction for taxes and personal consumption [967-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION by Joseph W. Carcione, Jr. in support of opposition to Motion for Judgment on any claim for recovery of lost gross income and to preclude testimony or evidence of future economic loss that does not make appropriate deduction for taxes and personal consumption. [M:00-cv-01343] (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in opposition by plaintiff Estate of Joan Smith to motion for judgment on any claim for recovery of lost gross income [967-1], motion to preclude testimony or evidence of future economic loss that does not make appropriate deduction for taxes and personal consumption [967-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                        LETTER from Gary W. Dolinski dated 11/26/03 response to Order of 11/18/03., [M:00-cv-01343] (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                          LETTER dated 11/24/03 from Dane B. Jaques in M:00-cv-0134 3 re Motion for Judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer setting hearing on motion for judgment on any claim for recovery of lost gross income [967-1] 10:00 12/19/03, setting hearing on motion to preclude testimony or evidence of future economic loss that does not make appropriate deduction for taxes and personal consumption [967-2] 10:00 12/19/03 ( Date Entered: 12/3/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None
                              REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 8/29/03 ( C/R: Joan Marie Columbini) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re defendant Alaska Airlines' motion for judgment [967-1]. Alaska Airlines is directed to advise the Court in writing, on or before 11/24/03, as to whether in its opinion the first issue is resolved and why this Court, as opposed to the transferror court, should decide whether certain evidence is precluded. ( Date Entered: 11/18/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 in support of motion for judgment on any claim for recovery of lost gross income [967-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 for judgment on any claim for recovery of lost gross income , and to preclude testimony or evidence of future economic loss that does not make appropriate deduction for taxes and personal consumption with Notice set for 12/19/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                      LETTER dated 10/22/03 from Brian J. Panish in M:00-cv-01343 re enclsoed application for approval of compromise of minor's claim (C-00-3308). [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/29/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER dated 9/25/03 from Kevin P. Durkin in M:00-cv-01343, C-00-2815 CRB, to Judge Breyer re enclosed application for approval of settlement under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
                                          REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 8/8/03 ( C/R: Katherine Pope Wyatt) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                            LETTER dated 8/28/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2592, re enclosed application for approval of settlement under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                              MINUTES: ( C/R Joan Columbini) ( Hearing Date: 8/29/03) Discovery cutoff set for 9/30/03 ; [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                LETTER dated 8/28/03 from Gary W. Dolinski to Judge Breyer re plaintiffs' proposal for completion of the discovery process for the Smith litigation. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                  PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR COMPLETION OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS by Plaintiff Jesse J. Smith in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3622, Plaintiff Holly A. Smith in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3622, Plaintiff Richard J. Smith in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3622. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for order [958-1] FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 8/28/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3333] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/28/2003 Court Filing
                                                      EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Mary Hall in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3333 for order FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                        PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR REMAINING PRETRIAL ACTIVITIES by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer approving the establishment of the Estrada Qualified Settlement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL. ( Date Entered: 8/20/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                            PETITION by Plaintiff Candelario Estrada-Pena in M:00-cv-01343, to approve the establishment of the Estrada Qualified Settlement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                              LETTER dated 8/19/03 from Brian J. Panish in M:00-cv-01343 to Ms. Barbara re enclosed petition to approve the establishment of the Estrada Qualified Settlement Fund. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order [952-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : The Court has reviewed in camera the tax returns of the decedent, Joan Smith, and concludes that the tax returns should be produced to the defendants in their entirety. The returns shall be subject to an appropriate protective order. ( Date Entered: 8/14/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiff Jesse J. Smith in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Holly A. Smith in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Richard J. Smith in M:00-cv-01343 of notice of second lodging of documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER dated 8/13/03 from Gary W. Dolinski in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed Joan Smith's tax returns for in camera inspection. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of lodgment of cockpit voice recorder tape and application to file under seal by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          MINUTES: ( C/R Kathy Wyatt) ( Hearing Date: 8/8/03) granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion to compel decedent Joan Smith's tax returns and personal consumption records [930-1]. File documents in camera by noon on Tuesday 8/13/03. Hearing will be held 8:30 9/5/03 for discovery matters [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            MAIL [932-2] addressed to Michael N. White, Esq. returned from Post Office [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting petition [945-1], approving the establishment of the Estrada Qualified Settlement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 7/31/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2003
                                                                                PETITION by Plaintiff Candelario Estrada-Pena in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Estate of Gabriela in M:00-cv-01343 to approve the establishment of the Estrada Qualified Settlement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  LETTER dated 7/29/03 from Brian J. Panish in M:00-cv-01343 re enclosed Petition to approve the establishment of the Estrada Qualified Settlement Fund (C-00-3308 CRB) and proposed Order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    DECLARATION by Dr. Victor Tabbush on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to compel decedent Joan Smith's tax returns and personal consumption records [930-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION by Dr. Victor Tabbush on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 re motion reply [941-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition to motion to compel decedent Joan Smith's tax returns and personal consumption records re 930 . [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [939-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [932-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              LETTER dated 7/24/03 from Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 re enclosed notice of order of dismissal and certificate of service. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer amending complaint in case no. C-01-0494 CRB ( Date Entered: 7/23/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  LETTER dated 7/21/03 from Brian J. Panish in M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-1924, re enclosed Order changing the name of the Thompson Qualified Settlement Fund. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Gary W. Dolinski on behalf of Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition [934-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to compel decedent Joan Smith's tax returns and personal consumption records [930-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by plaintiffs Bonnie Fuller, Richard Donaldson for agreed order pursuant to stipulation to amend complaint (in case no. C-01-0494) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer dismissing case without prejudice ; 90-day conditional dismissal (see attached list of cases dismissed) ( Date Entered: 7/21/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            LETTER dated 7/16/03 from Marcus S. Topel re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343], [3:00-cv-1183] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to compel decedent Joan Smith's tax returns and personal consumption records [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER dated 7/7/03 from Joseph W. Carcione Jr. in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer in response to Alaska's letter dated 7/3/03. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 7/7/03 from Joseph W. Carcione Jr. in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re teleconference. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 7/3/03 from Dane B. Jaques, Esq. to Judge Breyer re discovery dispute. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3622] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 7/1/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-00-1183 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        TITLE Sheet [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 7/2/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-1530, 3:01-cv-1531, to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER dated 7/2/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3002, 3:00-cv-3003, to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 6/30/03 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 6/30/03) granting motion in limine No. 2 to exclude evidence of litigation conduct [805-1], granting motion in limine No. 1 to exclude all evidence relating to liability [804-1], denying motion in limine No. 3 to exclude evidence of the death of Alaska flight crew and employees aboard Flight 261 [801-1], granting motion in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of settlement offers, demands and communications related thereto [799-1] that the motion in limine No. 2 re the financial condition of defendants Alaska Airlines, Boeing, McDonnell-Douglas or Douglas [800-1] is submitted, that the motion in limine No. 3 to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Richard Levy [789-1] is submitted re [796-1], that the motion in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of pre-death emotional distress, pain and suffering [784-1] is submitted, Alaska's motion in limine no. 2 (expert testimony) is submitted, Alaska's motion in limine no. 3 (expert testimony) is submitted, Alaska's motion in limine no. 4's thru 9 (DVD related matters) is submitted, denying plaintiff's motion in limine relimiting argument to one counsel, plaintiff Poll's motion in limine re exclude evidence of criminal history is submitted, granting Alaska's motion in limine re exclude evidence on claims as to mental pain & suffering as to Poll's beneficiaries [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 7/1/03 from Brian J. Panish in M:00-cv-01343 to Barbara re enclosed Petition to approve the establishment of the Thompson Qualified Settlement Fund and proposed Order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 6/26/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-00-2815 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 6/20/03 from Kevin P. Durkin to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order [892-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order [890-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order [897-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order [899-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MINUTES: ( C/R Sahar McVickar) ( Hearing Date: 6/3/03) Status conference held Agreement on proposed form of judgment signed in open court. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 6/24/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-00-3333 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer sealing documents FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/30/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 of lodgment FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, to file documents under seal. FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer sealing documents FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/30/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Frederick Miller in M:00-cv-01343 to (proposed) brief statement of the case. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of response [904-1], brief [903-1], response [902-1], response [901-1], response [900-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to plaintiffs' objection No. 3 to jury instruction re pre-death pain, suffering and emotional distress. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    BENCH BRIEF FILED by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re : admissibility of testimony and evidence relating to grief and emotional distress of Frederick and Susan Miller and objection to related jury instruction offered by plaintiff. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to plaintiffs' objections Nos. 4,5,and 6 to jury instruction re pre-death pain, suffering and emotional distress. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to plaintiffs' objection No. 2 to jury instruction re pre-death pain, suffering and emotional distress. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to plaintiff's objection No. 1 to jury instruction re : pre-impact fear, pain, and suffering and related statements in joint proposed final pretrial order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion allowing equipment into courthouse for use during trial [888-1] ( Date Entered: 6/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 6/23/03 from Don G. Rushing in M:00-cv-01343 re enclosed documents - request of defendant Alaska Air Group's entry of order granting summary judgment and proposed Order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for summary judgment [750-1] ( Date Entered: 6/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 6/20/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case nos. C-00-3331 CRB, C-01-0494 CRB, C-00-3335 CRB, C-00-3337 CRB, C-01-0495 CRB and C-00-3338 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX A filed by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183 FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, to plaintiffs' motion in limine no. 1 FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer sealing notice of lodgment FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion to file documents under seal [891-1] FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to filed documents under seal FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion to exceed page limitation to file over length brief [889-1] FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to exceed page limitation to file over length brief FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 allowing equipment into courthouse for use during trial [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 of lodgment of the DVD animation and application to file under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by Plaintiff Frederick Miller, Plaintiff the Estate of Stanford R. Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3330, 3:00-cv-1183. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 of opposition [883-1], opposition [882-1], opposition [881-1], Appendix A to Alaska Airlines' opposition, motion for leave to file over length brief and motion for leave to file documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 6/23/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer requesting a brief extension to file instructions and verdict forms. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 2 to exclude documentary evidence and witness testimony relating to (1) newspaper article, (2) civil case pleadings, and (3) civil dispute document [844-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 1 [867-1] to exclude evidence regarding David Knowles, Ph.D. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 2 [868-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of motion reply [879-1], opposition [878-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition to motion in limine No. 1 to exclude all evidence relating to liability [804-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183, to motion in limine No. 3 limiting opening statement, witness examination, objections, and closing argument to one counsel for both defendants [845-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Frederick Miller in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3330 to defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc.'s response to plaintiff's motion in limine re cumulative witness testimony regarding non-economic damages. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS submitted by Plaintiff Frederick Miller, the Estate of Stanford R. Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3330, 3:00-cv-1183 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343 to Alaska Airline's exhibit list of 6/10/03. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order ; NOTICE of joinder and supplemental jury instruction by the Estate of Stanford R. Poll and Abigail Busche (case nos. C-00-1183 and C-00-3330). [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343 to Alaska Airline's revised witness list. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of motion in limine to exclude duplicative witness testimony regarding noneconomic damages [843-1], opposition [841-1], motion response [840-1], motion response [839-1], motion in limine to exclude testimony of Dr. Peter Formuzis regarding lost future earnings from music and film industry ; Declaration of Arthur I. Willner ; Exhibits A - B [842-1], motion in limine to exclude duplicative witness testimony regarding noneconomic damages [838-1], motion in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [837-1], motion in limine to exclude duplicative witness regarding noneconomic damages [836-1], motion in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [835-1], motion in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [834-1], motion in limine to exclude duplicative witness testimony regarding noneconomic damages [833-1], motion in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [832-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 of request [865-1], proposed Order and Letter to Clerk from Don G. Rushing dated 6/23/03. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT PROPOSED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order by plaintiffs, defendants. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 2 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 1 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 for entry of order granting unopposed motion for summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : dismissing with prejudice case no. C-01-1532 CRB (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : dismissing with prejudice case no. C-01-3446 CRB , dismissing party Richard Y. Thorgrimson in M:00-cv-01343, party Margery Ann Thorgrimson in M:00-cv-01343, party Lorna Tamara Donaghy in M:00-cv-01343, party Michael Donaghy in M:00-cv-01343, party John Digel in M:00-cv-01343 (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 6/19/03 from Thomas William Bingham in M:00-cv-01343 re enclosed stipulation and proposed order of dismissal and certificate of service. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 6/19/03 from Thomas William Bingham in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed stipulation and proposed order of dismissal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff John Digel in M:00-cv-01343 of Stipulation and proposed Order of dismissal (C-01-0332 CRB). [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE of Stipulation and Proposed Order of dismissal (C-01-1532 CRB) by plainitffs [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 6/12/03 from Don G. Rushing in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re proposed juror questionnaire. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting application [856-1]. FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/20/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343 to file oversize brief. FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343 in limine FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting application [853-1] FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/20/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Jason Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Sasha Poll in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343 to file under seal. FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 5 to exclude evidence of or reference to plaintiffs' animation [794-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 4 to exclude admission of cockpit voice recorder tape from evidence and to exclude related expert witness testimony [792-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of pre-death emotional distress, pain and suffering [784-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 2 to preclude the testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Augenstein [786-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 3 to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Richard Levy [789-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 10 to preclude lump sum and per diem arguments regarding non-economic damages [796-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion in limine No. 1 to exclude all evidence relating to liability [804-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1183 in limine No. 3 limiting opening statement, witness examination, objections, and closing argument to one counsel for both defendants [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll, Plaintiff Jason Poll , Plaintiff Sasha Poll, Plaintiff Shaina Poll in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-1183 in limine No. 2 to exclude documentary evidence and witness testimony relating to (1) newspaper article, (2) civil case pleadings, and (3) civil dispute document [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3335 in limine to exclude duplicative witness testimony regarding noneconomic damages [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 06/20/2003 (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine to exclude testimony of Dr. Peter Formuzis regarding lost future earnings from music and film industry ; Declaration of Arthur I. Willner ; Exhibits A - B [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to plaintiff's motion in limine no. 3 to exclude evidence of the death of Alaska flight crew and employees aboard Flight 261 re 801 . [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 to plaintiff's motion in limine no. 2 re the financial condition of defendants Alaska Airlines, Boeing, McDonnell-Douglas or Douglas re 800 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00--cv-3330 to plaintiff's motion in limine re cumulative witness testimony regarding non-economic damages. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3331 in limine to exclude duplicative witness testimony regarding noneconomic damages [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3331 in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-0494 in limine to exclude duplicative witness regarding noneconomic damages [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-0494 in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3335 in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3338 in limine to exclude duplicative witness testimony regarding noneconomic damages [M:00-cv-01343] [3:00-cv-3338] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-3338 defendant in limine to exclude all testimony of witnesses not previously identified and exclude all evidence that goes beyond the scope of answers provided in discovery [M:00-cv-01343] [3:00-cv-3338] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of entry order re plainitffs' motion to compel production of sharing agreement and The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's motion for protective order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 6/17/03 from Carl Wolf in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL Sheet [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 6/13/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-01-0452 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated 6/13/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-00-3308 CRB and C-01-1689 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 6/11/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-01-0389 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 6/16/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer regarding voir dire. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Anita Cuthbertson in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Mary Hall in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Earlene Shaw in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Pamela Sparks in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Patricia Sanchez in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Frederick Miller in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (PROPOSED) BRIEF STATEMENT of the case by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 for oral voir dire by Court. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for attorney Mary F. Schiavo to appear pro hac vice . Fee status pd. [818-1] ( Date Entered: 6/16/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 6/13/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re Alaska Airlines Inc's motion for individual damages trials. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition to motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/16/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Anita Cuthbertson in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Mary Hall in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Earlene Shaw in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Pamela Sparks in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Patricia Sanchez in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Frederick Miller in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Richard Thorgrimson in M:00-cv-01343 for attorney Mary F. Schiavo to appear pro hac vice . Fee status pd. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 in support of motion for inidividual damages trial [816-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343 for inidividual damages trial [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Keith Loveless regarding liability stipulation of Alaska Airlines, Inc. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [781-1] case management order The parties are directed to return to the Special Master, the Hon. Daniel Weinstein, for mediation of all cases, prior to trial, that have not been mediated since the Court's 5/16/03 Order granting Boeing's motion for summary judgment on punitive damages. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:00-cv-2985. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:00-cv-2985 ( Date Entered: 6/11/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION by Plaintiff Paul Bernard, Plaintiff Irene Bernard in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2985 for approval of settlement FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 6/9/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2985 to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Gabriel Poll in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of motion in limine No. 2 to exclude evidence of litigation conduct [805-1], motion in limine No. 1 to exclude all evidence relating to liability [804-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 2 to exclude evidence of litigation conduct [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 1 to exclude all evidence relating to liability [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [802-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 to Court concerning trial. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 3 to exclude evidence of the death of Alaska flight crew and employees aboard Flight 261 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 2 re the financial condition of defendants Alaska Airlines, Boeing, McDonnell-Douglas or Douglas [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of settlement offers, demands and communications related thereto [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of declaration [797-1], motion in limine No. 10 to preclude lump sum and per diem arguments regarding non-economic damages [796-1], declaration [795-1], motion in limine No. 5 to exclude evidence of or reference to plaintiffs' animation [794-1], declaration [793-1], motion in limine No. 4 to exclude admission of cockpit voice recorder tape from evidence and to exclude related expert witness testimony [792-1], declaration [791-1], declaration [790-1], motion in limine No. 3 to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Richard Levy [789-1], declaration [788-1], declaration [787-1], motion in limine No. 2 to preclude the testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Augenstein [786-1], declaration [785-1], motion in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of pre-death emotional distress, pain and suffering [784-1], motions in limine no. 6 - 9 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 10 to preclude lump sum and per diem arguments regarding non-economic damages [796-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 10 to preclude lump sum and per diem arguments regarding non-economic damages [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 5 to exclude evidence of or reference to plaintiffs' animation [794-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 5 to exclude evidence of or reference to plaintiffs' animation [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 4 to exclude admission of cockpit voice recorder tape from evidence and to exclude related expert witness testimony [792-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 4 to exclude admission of cockpit voice recorder tape from evidence and to exclude related expert witness testimony [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 3 to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Richard Levy [789-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Robert D. Banks, Beng, M.D. on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 3 to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Richard Levy [789-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 3 to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' expert Dr. Richard Levy [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Robert D. Banks, Beng, M.D. on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 2 to preclude the testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Augenstein [786-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 2 to preclude the testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Augenstein [786-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 2 to preclude the testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Augenstein [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of pre-death emotional distress, pain and suffering [784-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in limine No. 1 to exclude evidence of pre-death emotional distress, pain and suffering [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED DECLARATION by Paul J. Ehlenbach on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 regarding election to not contest liability of the Boeing Company and McDonnell lDouglas Corporation. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5 by Judge Charles R. Breyer The parties are directed to return to the Special Master, the Hon. Daniel Weinstein, for mediation of all cases, prior to trial, that have not been mediated since the Court's 5/16/03 Order granting Boeing's motion for summary judgment on punitive damages. . (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:01-cv-0449. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:01-cv-0449 ( Date Entered: 6/9/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-0449, for approval of settlement FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 6/3/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-0449, to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:00-cv-2741. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2741 for approval of settlement FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:00-cv-2741 ( Date Entered: 6/9/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 6/3/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2388] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL in M:00-cv-1343, 3:00-cv-2388 ( Date Entered: 6/9/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for approval of settlement FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2388] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 6/6/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2388, to Judge Breyer re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Jeff Hatlberg FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Julie Fisher FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Joanne Jamieson FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for approval of settlement UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of attorney FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 6/6/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 6/4/03 from Jamie R. Lebovitz to Judge Breyer in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-1512, 3:00-cv-1513 re enclosed documents under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, [757-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 5/15/03 ( C/R: Debra Pas) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion to change time for hearing of defendant Alaska Air Group Inc's motion for summary judgment [752-1] ; opposition due 6/18/03 ; reply due 6/23/03 ( Date Entered: 6/3/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER and direction to enter consent judgments on liability pursuant to FRCP 54(b) by Judge Charles R. Breyer : judgment upon Alaska's consent is hereby directed to be entered against Alaska and in favor of plaintiffs on liability under the Warsaw Convention and the IATA Agreement on Passenger Liability ; judgment upon Boeing's consent is hereby directed to be entered against Boeing and in favor of plaintiffs on liability for all compensatory damages ... (see document for specifics) ( Date Entered: 6/3/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER and direction to enter consent judgments on liability pursuant to FRCP 54(b) by Judge Charles R. Breyer : judgment upon Alaska's consent is hereby directed to be entered against Alaska and in favor of plaintiffs on liability under the Warsaw Convention and the IATA Agreement on Passenger Liability ; judgment upon Boeing's consent is hereby directed to be entered against Boeing and in favor of plaintiffs on liability for all compensatory damages that may be recoverable by plaintiffs under maritime law, or whatever damages law may ultimately be determined to apply to these cases, pursuant to final jury awards in compensatory damages-only trials in these cases. (see document for specifics) ( Date Entered: 6/3/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 6/2/03 from Robert F Scoular in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed copy of proposed Order and direction to enter consent judgments on liability. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 regarding structure of compensatory damages trials. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of declaration [753-1], order received [0-0], motion to change time for hearing of defendant Alaska Air Group Inc's motion for summary judgment [752-1], declaration [751-1], motion for summary judgment [750-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to change time for hearing of defendant Alaska Air Group Inc's motion for summary judgment [752-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to change time for hearing of defendant Alaska Air Group Inc's motion for summary judgment [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Don G. Rushing on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion for summary judgment [750-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 for summary judgment [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order received [0-0], declaration [748-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Paul J. Ehlenbach on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 regarding election to not contest liability of the Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Keith Loveless on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 regarding liability stipulation of Alaska Airlines, Inc. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [698-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES: ( C/R Jim Yeomans) ( Hearing Date: 5/27/03) pretrial conf held 5/28/03 , Status conference set for 9:00 6/3/03 ; Jury selection set for 6/17/03 at 8:30 am. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 5/27/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer in response to Boeing and Alaska's request for "reverse bifurcation". [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 5/21/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-00-0709 CRB, C-00-4540 CRB subsequent to 8/31/01. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BRIEF regarding trial structure by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 of list [740-1], brief [739-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT list by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343, C-01-2215 CRB [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT TO PSC'S PRETRIAL BRIEF FILED by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BRIEF regarding structure of trial and scope of evidence by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 on scope of evidence and structure of trial. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs in M:00-cv-01343 on scope of trial evidence and issues. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 5/20/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-00-1177 CRB, C-00-1758 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [704-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 5/19/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in C-01-0929 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 5/12/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re list of cases agreed to a settlement amount subsequent to 8/31/01 : C-00-2592 CRB, C-00-2985 CRB, C-01-0448 CRB, C-00-4483 CRB, C-00-1512 CRB, C-00-1513 CRB, C-00-1530 CRB, C-00-1531 CRB, C-00-2388 CRB, C-01-0449 CRB, C-00-2741 CRB, C-00-3002 CRB and C-00-3003 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [717-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [710-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT PROPOSED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by plaintiffs, defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc., Alaska Air Group, Inc., The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE submitted by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL briefs submitted by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Shell Oil Company in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [724-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendant Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Shell Oil Company in M:00-cv-01343 [705-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of errata [707-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL briefs submitted by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [720-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [717-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 5/19/03 from Karen A. Gotelli, Secretary to Frank M. Pitre re enclosed notice of order and certificate of service. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 5/14/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343, Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re Alaska Airlines' request for additional time. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : A pretrial hearing in this matter is scheduled for 5/27/03 at 2:30 pm. In advance of the hearing, the parties are directed to file briefs addressing the scope of the evidence that should be submitted to the jury if liability is conceded and the only issue that the jury is asked to consider is the amount of any compensatory damage award. The parties shall file their briefs concurrently on or before noon on 5/23/03 ( Date Entered: 5/19/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for Rule 54(b) certification [639-1], granting motion entry of judgment [639-2] ( Date Entered: 5/19/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in support of motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [714-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) with Notice set for 6/30/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 of list [712-1], list [711-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DAMAGES-ONLY EXHIBIT list by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION OF WITNESS(ES) submitted by Plaintiff Malcolm Branson in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part motion for summary judgment [624-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] ( Date Entered: 5/19/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : dismissing defendant Mobil Oil Corporation in C-01-2215 CRB (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 5/15/03) re [624-1], re [624-2]. Court denies the motion for summary judgment as to negligence claim ; Court takes under submission as to punitive damages claim ; Court denies motion to file more than 5 motion in limine. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to Exhibits Q and R to the Supplemental Declaration of Mark Hansen [685-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to strike [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : dismissing with prejudice defendants Shell Oil Company, Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343 (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re corrected redacted opposition. The clerk shall substitute the corrected redacted opposition filed 5/13/03 for the redacted opposition filed 5/7/03 and return the substituted copies to plaintiffs' counsel ( Date Entered: 5/16/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for summary judgment [636-1] ( Date Entered: 5/16/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 5/14/03 from Gregory C. Read in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed stipulation and dismissal of Shell Oil Company and Equilon Enterprises LLC. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER UNDER SEAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer ( Date Entered: 5/16/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 for approval of settlement under seal. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying motion to seal document - Declaration of Douglas C. Hipe in support of the Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's objections to plaintiffs' evidence and motion to strike, Declaration of Jay R. Simmons and Declaration of Gene McDonald [678-1] ( Date Entered: 5/16/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 5/12/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re correct redacted page 2. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to motion for modification of the Court's guidelines for trial and final pretrial conference in civil jury cases regarding motions in limine [692-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED REDACTED MEMO of Plaintiffs' opposition in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition memorandum [674-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 of order received [0-0], declaration [693-1], motion for modification of the Court's guidelines for trial and final pretrial conference in civil jury cases regarding motions in limine [692-1], Stipulation and proposed Order regarding number and length of motions in limine. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Robert F. Scoular on behalf of defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 re motion for modification of the Court's guidelines for trial and final pretrial conference in civil jury cases regarding motions in limine [692-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 for modification of the Court's guidelines for trial and final pretrial conference in civil jury cases regarding motions in limine [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST by defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant MPDC, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Peacock Engineering in M:00-cv-01343 for entry of order granting summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of objection [689-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to reply [673-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of filing of redacted declarations of Douglas C. Hipe and Jay R. Simmons in support of defendants The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's objections to evidence and motion to strike. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of filing of redacted declaration of Gene McDonald in support of defendants The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of order received [0-0], declaration [685-1], declaration [684-1], declaration [683-1], motion to strike [682-1], notice [681-1], request [680-1], motion reply [679-1], order received [0-0], motion to seal document - Declaration of Douglas C. Hipe in support of the Boeing COmpany and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's objections to plaintiffs' evidence and motion to strike, Declaration of Jay R. Simmons and Declaration of Gene McDonald [678-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Mark T. Hansen on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re motion for summary judgment [624-1], re motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] and objections to evidence and motion to strike 682 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Peter T. Kovacik on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re motion for summary judgment [624-1], re motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Michael V. Mineart on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re objections to evidence and motion to strike [682-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to plaintiffs' evidence and MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to strike [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Illustrations of plaintiffs' material misstatement and omissions from the record by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADDITIONAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 motion for summary judgment [624-1], motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition to motion for summary judgment [624-1], motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/14/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to seal document - Declaration of Douglas C. Hipe in support of the Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's objections to plaintiffs' evidence and motion to strike, Declaration of Jay R. Simmons and Declaration of Gene McDonald [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX III : declarations and reports filed by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition memorandum [674-1] REDACTED. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX II : deposition evidence filed by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition memorandum [674-1] REDACTED VERSION. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX I : documentary evidence filed by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition memorandum [674-1] REDACTED VERSION. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document returned to counsel pursuant to Court's Order #704. See document no. 695 for the corrected redacted opposition to motion for summary judgment. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re motion response [649-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of filing of redacted memorandum and redacted appendix I, redacted appendix II, and redacted appendix III in support of plaintiffs steering committee opposition to the Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's motion for summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [670-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [666-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 5/5/03 from Karen A. Gotelli, secretary to Frank M. Pitre re enclosed notice of entry of order and certificate of service. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [664-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Faxed copy of LETTER dated 5/5/03 from Frank M. Pitre and Marcus S. Topel to Messrs. Frankel and Jaques re Judge Breyer's Order regarding unsealing of documents. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : plaintiffs shall file the redacted version of the sealed documents by 5/7/03 ( Date Entered: 5/5/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 5/2/03 from Steve Miletich re sealing of plaintiff's responses to motion for summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re reply memorandum of The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation in support of motion for summary judgment, or, in the alternative, for partial summary judgment not to exceed 20 pages of text. (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [662-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [657-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX III : Declarations and reports filed by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition memorandum [658-1] FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX II : deposition evidence filed by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition memorandum [658-1] FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX I : documentary evidence filed by Plaintiffs Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition memorandum [658-1] FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 in opposition to motion for summary judgment [624-1], motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer sealing documents - Plaintiff Steering Committee's memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to defendants Boeing and McDonnell Douglas' motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, partial summary judgment, Appendix I, Appendix II and Appendix III ( Date Entered: 4/30/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs' steering committee of opposition statement [655-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement in NON-Opposition by plaintiffs' steering committee to motion to shorten time for briefing and hearing on motion for summary judgment [640-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs' steering committee of opposition statement [653-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement in NON-Opposition by plaintiffs' steering committee to motion for summary judgment [636-1], motion for partial summary judgment [636-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs' steering committee of notice [651-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by plaintiffs' steering committee re [647-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Index of supplemental authorities by Reina Isabel Marquez Morales in M:00-cv-01343 in opposition to motion for summary judgment [624-1], motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to motion for summary judgment [624-1], motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 to seal document - Memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment or alternatively partial summary judgment, Appendix I : Documentary evidence in support of opposition, Appendix II : Deposition evidence in support of opposition, Appendix III : Declarations and reports in support of opposition. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : Deadline for motions in limine filings is 6/2/03 ; (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in NON-Opposition to motion for summary judgment [636-1], motion for partial summary judgment [636-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 4/23/03 from Marcus S. Topel in M:00-cv-01343, Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed stipulation and proposed Order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : extending time for filing plaintiff's opposition and defendant's reply re defendant's motion for summary judgment ; opposition due 4/28/03, reply due 5/7/03 (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : hearing for Peacock's motion for summary judgment will be held 5/15/03, opposition due 4/21/03, reply due 5/2/03 (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION by Fred J. Meier on behalf of defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 in support of motion to shorten time for setting defendants' summary judgment motion. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 of filing declaration of Fred J. Meier and notice of filing stipulation in suppport of its motion to shorten time for setting defendants' motion for summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant MPDC, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Peacock Engineering in M:00-cv-01343 to shorten time for briefing and hearing on motion for summary judgment [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/19/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343 for Rule 54(b) certification , and entry of judgment with Notice set for 5/23/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Index of exhibits by Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 re: motion for summary judgment [636-1], re: motion for partial summary judgment [636-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 in support of motion for summary judgment [636-1], of motion for partial summary judgment [636-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Nortek, Inc., defendant MPDC, Inc., defendant Peacock Engineering in M:00-cv-01343 for summary judgment , or, in the alternative for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 5/15/03 at 2:00 pm [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [623-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of entry of 4/6/03 Order re expert discovery1 by Special Master. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE of hearing by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 setting motion for summary judgment [624-1] ; hearing set for 2:00 5/15/03, motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] ; hearing set for 2:00 5/15/03 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: ( C/R none) ( Hearing Date: 4/4/03) Initial Pre-Trial/Status Conference held setting hearing on motion for summary judgment [624-1] 2:00 5/15/03 setting hearing on motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] 2:00 5/15/03 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Special Master Charles B. Renfrew re discovery ( Date Entered: 4/4/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 4/2/03 from Peter C. Lenart re enclosed 4/1/03 Discovery Order signed by the Special Master Charles Renfrew. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 04/04/2003 (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Index of evidence by The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re: motion for summary judgment [624-1], re: motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Index of supplemental authorities by The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re: motion for summary judgment [624-1], re: motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 motion for summary judgment [624-1], motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 in support of motion for summary judgment [624-1], of motion for partial summary judgment [624-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/16/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 for summary judgment , or in the alternative for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 5/19/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Special Master Charles Renfrew and Judge Charles R. Breyer continuing Alaska Airlines' damages expert disclosures to 4/14/03 ( Date Entered: 4/4/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of LETTER dated 3/26/03 from William V. O'Connor, Jr. to Judge Renfrew re enclosed Order modifying the expert disclosure dates. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 3/28/03 from William V. O'Connor, Jr. to Judge Breyer re enclosed Order modifying the expert disclosure dates on the issues of economic damages in seven individual cases. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 of statement [618-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant The Boeing Company M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 3/20/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case nos. C-00-2839 CRB and C-00-3175 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 3/20/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-00-2750 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 3/17/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-00-3470 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 3/17/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case nos. C-00-3144 CRB and C-00-3471 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 3/17/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-01-0408 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Susan Illston : dismissing case no. C-02-569 CRB Charles Clemetson v. Kelly et. al. (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Cory Karlsson in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Lisa Champion in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Julie Serrano in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [609-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiff Cory Karlsson in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Lisa Champion in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Julie Serrano in M:00-cv-01343 [605-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 3/6/03 from Karen A. Gotelli, secretary to Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 re enclosed notice of entry of order and certificate of service. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiff Jeff Whitworth in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Brad Whitworth in M:00-cv-01343, Plaintiff Keith Whitworth in M:00-cv-01343 of change of address of counsel [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of entry of order re various discovery disputes between the plaintiffs and the Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer regarding claims for economic and/or pecuniary loss or damages (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 [601-1] judgment [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of entry of order re defendants The Boeing Company's and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's 1/3/03 in camera submission. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 2/7/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed subsequent to 8/31/01 in case nos. C-01-0423 CRB, C-01-0425 CRB and C-01-0426 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT: The Court having granted the motion for summary judgment of defendant Integrated Aerospace Systems Corp. as well as defendant's motion for a separate judgment, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendant Integrated Aerospace Systems Corp. and against plaintiffs. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge Charles R. Breyer ( Date Entered: 2/14/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (aaa, COURT StafF) (Entered: 02/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 in NON-Opposition to motion for summary judgment [590-1], motion for partial summary judgment [590-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 1/24/03 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re parties agreed to a settlement amount in case no. C-00-1178 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for summary judgment [590-1], granting motion for partial summary judgment [590-2], granting motion for summary judgment [580-1], granting motion for partial summary judgment [580-2] ( Date Entered: 2/4/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re Case Management Order No. 4 by Judge Charles R. Breyer Status conference set for 4/4/03 ; Discovery cutoff set for 2/27/03 ; Deadline for all motion filings is 5/19/03 ; All motions will be heard by 6/30/03 ; Pretrial conference set for 5/27/03 ; Jury trial will be held 8:30 7/7/03 ; cutoff date for expert discovery is 5/9/03 ; pre-trial filings due by 5/21/03 ; ( Date Entered: 2/4/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 [593-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff's Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 of opposition statement [594-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement by Plaintiff's Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 in NON-Opposition to motion for summary judgment [590-1], motion for partial summary judgment [590-2], motion for summary judgment [580-1], motion for partial summary judgment [580-2] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for certification and entry of judgment [572-1]. The Court hereby orders and directs that judgment be entered in favor of Integrated Aerospace Systems Corp., formerly known as Trig Holding, Inc and sued variously as Trig, Trig Aerospace, Trig Aerospace Company, and Trig Aerospace, Inc. and against plaintiffs in each of the actions consolidated in this Court pursuant to the Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation dated 7/12/00 ( Date Entered: 1/22/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 of opposition statement [591-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 02/05/2003 (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of non-opposition by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 to motion for certification and entry of judgment [572-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/3/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Derlan, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343 for summary judgment , and alternative for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 2/14/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re Guidelines for Trial and Final Pretrial Conference in civil jury cases ( Date Entered: 1/13/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES: ( C/R Joan Columbini) ( Hearing Date: 1/10/03) Status Conference held. Pretrial conference set for 2:30 5/27/03 ; Jury trial will be held 8:30 7/7/03 ; Jury selection 6/3/03 at 8:30 am. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated 1/9/03 from Shalem A. Massey to Judge Breyer in response to Mr. Pitre's letter dated 1/9/03. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 1/9/03 from Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed Joint Status Conference Statement and Proposed Order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 1/8/03 from Fred J. Meier in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer requesting trial date be set for 7/14/03 or later. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice of motion and motion for summary judgment and alternative motion for partial summary judgment, declaration of Randal L. Levine, declaration of Kristina M. Kennedy, request for judicial notice and proposed Order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant MPDC, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Peacock Engineering in M:00-cv-01343 in opposition to proposed Order re case management order no. 4 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re proposed stipulation concerning trial calendar by defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant MPDC, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Peacock Engineering in M:00-cv-01343 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Derlan, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries Ltd. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343 for summary judgment , and alternative motion for partial summary judgment with Notice set for 2/14/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [578-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of status conference set for 1/10/03 at 8:30 am. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Special Master The Hon. Charles Renfrew (Ret.) re self-critical analysis privilege : plaintiffs' motion is hereby granted and defendant Boeing/McDonnell Douglas is ordered to produce all information and documentation and permit all deposition testimony regarding defendant's post-accident reviews, analyses, assignments, etc., pertaining to design, maintenance, redundancy, and certification issues, including but not limited to specific issues addressed in Exhibit 777 to the deposition of Michael Minaert. ( Date Entered: 1/3/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Special Master The Hon. Charles B. Renfrew (Ret.) denying Boeing Corp's and McDonnell-Douglas Corp's motion to compel ( Date Entered: 1/3/03) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of motion for disclosure of grand jury materials, memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion and declaration of Sonia R. Martin. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of withdrawal of motion pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P.6(e)(3)(C)(i) for disclosure of grand jury materials. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : dismissing case C-00-3309 with prejudice (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/17/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 for certification and entry of judgment with Notice set for 1/24/03 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : defendants The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation are directed to serve their motion and this order on the United States Attorney's Office. The United States Attorney may file a response to defendants' motion on or before 1/10/02. ( Date Entered: 12/23/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 12/13/02 from Steven H. Frankel in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed defendants The Boeing Company and McDonnell Douglas Corporation's motion for disclosure. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE of Notice of Change of address, by the firm of Cotchett, Pitre, Simon and McCarthy [M:00-cv-01343] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Firm Change of Address by Plaintiffs Jeff Hatlebert, Executor of the Estate of Barbara Hatleberg and Executor of the Estate of Glenn Hatleberg. [M:00-cv-01343, 3:01-cv-00389, 3:01-cv-00398, 3:01-cv-00408] (db, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MAIL [566-1] addressed to Kenneth K. Tse, Esq. returned from Post Office [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 11/8/02 from R. Christopher Julius to Judge Breyer re meeting set for 12/10/02. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343 [564-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for summary judgment [459-1] ( Date Entered: 10/17/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of hearing by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343 setting motion for summary judgment [459-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 10/18/02, motion for partial summary judgment [459-2] ; hearing set for 10:00 10/18/02 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 [561-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : for protective order re confidential information (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 9/16/02 from William V. O'Connor, Jr. to Judge Breyer re enclosed stipulation and agreed protective order. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 8/22/02 from Stephen Jacques re settlement funds in case no. 01-472 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 of petition [557-1], order [556-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION FOR PARTIAL REIMBUSEMENT OF EXPENSES by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 FILED UNDER SEAL. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 8/23/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated 8/20/02 from Frank M. Pitre in M:00-cv-01343 to Judge Breyer re enclosed request for reimbursement. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 8/9/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no C-00-3332. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer dismissing C-00-3332 CRB without prejudice ( Date Entered: 8/20/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer dismissing without prejudice C-00-2698 CRB ( Date Entered: 8/14/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer dismissing without prejudice C-00-3127 CRB ( Date Entered: 8/14/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 8/5/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. 00-2698 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER dated 8/5/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-00-3127 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant Trig Aerospace in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Derlan Industries in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Trig Holdings, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Nortek, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant MPDC, Inc. in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Peacock Engineering in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Shell Oil Company in M:00-cv-01343 for entry of dismissal of action C-01-0472 [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion to dismiss with prejudice [544-1] dismissing party David Mills in M:00-cv-01343 ( Date Entered: 8/7/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion to dismiss with prejudice [543-1] dismissing party George Voronoff in M:00-cv-01343, party Katharine Voronoff in M:00-cv-01343 ( Date Entered: 8/7/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion to dismiss with prejudice [542-1] dismissing party Alice Lillian Baldridge in M:00-cv-01343, party Elizabeth Baldridge in M:00-cv-01343, party Lawrence Baldridge in M:00-cv-01343 ( Date Entered: 8/7/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff David Mills in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-4826 to dismiss with prejudice [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Katharine Voronoff in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2941, Plaintiff George Voronoff in M:00-cv-01343 to dismiss with prejudice [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Lawrence Baldridge Jr. in M:00-cv-01343, 3:00-cv-2940, to dismiss with prejudice [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of notice [540-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [538-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [538-2] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : Discovery cutoff set for 1/13/03 ; Deadline for all motion filings is 4/7/03 ; All motions will be heard by 3/28/03 ; Pretrial conference set for 4/14/03 ; Jury trial will be held 4/28/03 ; In court hearing on pre-trial motions in limine will be held 4/21/03 ; Case Management Conference set for 2/21/03 ; cutoff date for expert discovery is 3/28/03 It is futher stipulated and agreed that the parties shall be permitted to conduct depositions of NTSB representatives involved in the investigation of the crash of Flight 261 up to 30 days prior to trial (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer : vacating hearing re motion for summary judgment [459-1], vacating hearing re motion for partial summary judgment [459-2]. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion will be due 30 days after the completion of the Bill Stout deposition (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 7/26/02 from Steven H. Frankel to Judge Breyer in M:00-cv-01343 re enclosed copy of stipulation and order re case management. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by defendant Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343 re proposed stipulation concerning trial calendar. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of Stipulation and Proposed Order granting plaintiffs a continuance to permit depositions to be taken or further discovery to be had to oppose the motion for summary judgment. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPROMISE ORDER ( C-00-1878 ) by Judge Charles R. Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL ( Date Entered: 7/25/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 7/9/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-00-2737 CRB. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated 6/19/02 from R. Christopher Julius to Judge Breyer re December Board meeting. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer (Letter from Kristina M. Kennedy to Judge Breyer) re telephonic appearance for status conference scheduled for 8/2/02 at 8:30 am ( Date Entered: 7/9/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 6/7/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case no. C-00-3309 CRB subsequent to 8/31/01. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 6/21/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case nos. C-01-0063 CRB, C-01-0062 CRB subsequent to 8/31/01. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 6/21/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case nos. 00-3334 CRB, 01-0285 CRb subsequent to 8/31/01. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of LETTER dated 6/25/02 from Frank M. Pitre to Judge Renfrew in M:00-cv-01343 re the Sonnenschein firm. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 [517-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES: ( C/R Diane Skillman) ( Hearing Date: 6/7/02) denying defendant's motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] Further Case Management Conference set for 8:30 8/2/02 ; [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of order [521-2], order received [0-0], declaration [505-1], declaration [504-1], motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1], stipulation and proposed order shortening time for briefing and hearing on defendants' motion to modify case management order no. 3. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 of declaration [519-1], motion reply [518-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer withdrawing attorney Bruce D. Campbell for McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, attorney Charles S. Kim for McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, attorney Ronald A. McIntire for McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343, attorney Bruce D. Campbell for The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, attorney Charles S. Kim for The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, attorney Ronald A. McIntire for The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343 and substituting attorney Robert F Scoular, Mark T. Hansen, David H. Stern, Steven H. Frankel, Sonia Renee Martin, Stephen H. Rovak ( Date Entered: 6/11/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of declaration [519-1], motion reply [518-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Robert F. Scoular on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition to motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER shortening time for briefing and hearing by Judge Charles R. Breyer : re [503-1]. Plaintiffs' opposition due 5/31/02, reply due 6/5/02. (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343 of join/joinder [515-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER by defendant Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting motion for substitution [507-1] to case(s) M:00-cv-01343, C-00-3002 dismissing party Velma Fay Williams in M:00-cv-01343, C-00-3002 ; Carlene Oliver substituted in as Plaintiff for Velma Fay Williams ( Date Entered: 6/3/02) (cc: all counsel) [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 of declaration [511-1], opposition [510-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Frank M. Pitre on behalf of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 re opposition [510-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in M:00-cv-01343 to motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER by defendant Shell Oil Company in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Equilon Enterprises in M:00-cv-01343 in plaintiffs' contention interrogatories, requests for production, and request for admissions to Alaska Airlines, Inc. and Alaska Air Group. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/31/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Plaintiff Gregory B. Williams in M:00-cv-01343, C-00-3002 CRB for substitution [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 of order received [0-0], declaration [505-1], declaration [504-1], motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by RObert F. Scoular on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Bruce D. Campbell on behalf of defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 re motion to modify Case Management Order No. 3 [503-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Charles R. Breyer by defendant The Boeing Company in M:00-cv-01343, defendant McDonnell Douglas in M:00-cv-01343 to modify Case Management Order No. 3 with Notice set for 6/7/02 at 10:00 am [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MAIL [489-1] addressed to Peter J. Rubin, Esq. returned from Post Office [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [496-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiff in M:00-cv-01343 [494-1] order [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc in M:00-cv-01343, defendant Alaska Air Group in M:00-cv-01343 to opposition to motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim [468-1] [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 5/15/02 from Charles W. Ryan, III to Judge Breyer and Mr. Pitre re settlement amount agreed in case numbers C-01-0959, C-01-1849, C-01-1850 and C-02-0569. [M:00-cv-01343] (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request