Netbula, LLC v. Bindview Development Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00711
District Judge Martin J. Jenkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 6:15 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Netbula, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD L. ANTOGNINI +1 916 564 5400 +1 916 290 0539 rlalawyer@yahoo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vonnah M Brillet +1 510 351 5345 +1 510 351 5348 brilletlaw@yahoo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antonio Luis Cortes +1 415 256 1911 +1 415 256 1919 corteslaw@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fergus, a law firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Scott Fergus +1 415 537 9032 +1 415 537 9038 gfergus@ferguslegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/18/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Bruno +1 415 434 9100 +1 415 434 3947 nbruno@sheppardmullin.com
TERMINATED: 07/18/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle J. Hirth +1 415 434 9100 mhirth@smrh.com
v.
No Logo Bindview Development Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Eric J. Pulaski, Defendant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Chordiant Software, Inc., Intervenor

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Darden Restaurants, Inc. Darden Restaurants, Inc., Intervenor
Officer/Director, Verde Investments, Inc.
Caterpillar, Inc. Officer/Director, Caterpillar, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Liwen Arius Mah +41587 523 00x2336 +1 415 281 1350 lmah@fenwick.com
No Logo Derek P. Witte, Intervenor

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo DONGXIAO YUE, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dongxiao Yue +1 510 396 0012 +1 510 291 2237 dxyue@yahoo.com
No Logo EMC Corporation, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Liwen Arius Mah +41587 523 00x2336 +1 415 281 1350 lmah@fenwick.com
No Logo Steven R. Springsteel, Intervenor

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Sun Microsystems, Inc. Sun Microsystems, Inc., Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Liwen Arius Mah +41587 523 00x2336 +1 415 281 1350 lmah@fenwick.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (355) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING 344 MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Declaration in Support
    Declaration of LAURENCE F. PULGRAM in Support of 353 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion by Third Parties Chordiant Software, Inc., Derek P. Witte, and Steven R. Springsteel to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed byChordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 353 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Reply Memorandum
      Reply Memorandum re 344 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed byChordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Declaration in Opposition
        DECLARATION of Dr. Dongxiao Yue in Opposition to 351 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 351 ) (Cortes, Antonio) (Filed on 10/8/2009) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in Opposition re 344 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed byNetbula, LLC. (Cortes, Antonio) (Filed on 10/8/2009) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 342 Motion to Shorten Time. Plaintiff's response due 10/8/2009. Third parties' reply due 10/13/2009. The hearing scheduled on October 26, 2009 is VACATED. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Declaration in Opposition
              DECLARATION of Antonio L. Cortes in Opposition to 342 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Intervene and Motion to Modify the Protective Order filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 342 ) (Cortes, Antonio) (Filed on 9/25/2009) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in Opposition re 342 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Intervene and Motion to Modify the Protective Order filed byNetbula, LLC. (Cortes, Antonio) (Filed on 9/25/2009) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS 342 MOTION to Shorten Time, 344 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order to the Hon. James Ware; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/24/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte re 343 Declaration in Support, 342 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Intervene and Motion to Modify the Protective Order, 344 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order, 345 Declaration in Support, (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/22/2009) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Declaration in Support
                      Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 344 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed byChordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 344 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/21/2009) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Motion to Intervene
                        MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed by Chordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/21/2009) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Declaration in Support
                          Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 342 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Intervene and Motion to Modify the Protective Order filed byChordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 342 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/21/2009) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Motion to Shorten Time
                            MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Intervene and Motion to Modify the Protective Order filed by Chordiant Software, Inc., Steven R. Springsteel, Derek P. Witte. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/21/2009) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                              ORDER by Judge James Ware in case 3:06-cv-00711-MJJ; granting (57) Motion for Leave to File; denying (61) Motion in case 5:08-cv-00019-JW; granting (105) Motion for Leave to File; denying (109) Motion in case 5:07-cv-05850-JW (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jedediah Wakefield Re Removal of Albert L. Sieber From E-Mail Notification (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
                                  CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 USCA Mandate
                                    MANDATE of USCA as to 327 Notice of Appeal. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 USCA Order
                                      ORDER of USCA dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction as to 327 Notice of Appeal filed by Dongxiao Yue. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting (84) Motion to Seal. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Receipt
                                          Receipt from USCA re Certificate of Record. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Certificate of Record
                                            Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re 327 Notice of Appeal. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2008) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/14/07 before Mag. Judge Brazil. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/8/07 before Mag. Judge Brazil. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2008) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/07 before Judge Martin J. Jenkins. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Columbini.. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Transcript Designation
                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 11/20/07 (C/R Joan Columbinie); 2/14/07 (C/R Raynee Mercado); 6/8/07 C/R Diane Skillman) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 USCA Scheduling Order
                                                      USCA Scheduling Order as to 327 Notice of Appeal filed by Dongxiao Yue. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2007) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                        USCA Case Number 07-17355 US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for 327 Notice of Appeal filed by Dongxiao Yue. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2007) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 326 Order by Dongxiao Yue. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 34611013525. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2007) (USCA Case No. 07-17355) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER re 325 Proposed Order filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., EMC Corporation, Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 12/1/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Proposed Order
                                                              Proposed Order re 306 Renotice motion hearing, on Motion to Intervene and Modify Protective Order, by Sun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 11/29/2007) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order
                                                                filed in error (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2007 before Judge Martin J. Jenkins. The motion to intervene is granted for reasons stated on the record. The Court will issue an order.(Court Reporter: Joan Columbini) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2007) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dongxiao Yue re 321 Declaration in Support, 319 Reply Memorandum, 320 Declaration in Support (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                      Declaration in Support of 316 MOTION to Seal Documents filed by Dongxiao Yue. (Related document(s) 316 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                        Declaration in Support of 307 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Unseal Document filed by Dongxiao Yue. (Related document(s) 307 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                          Reply in Support re 307 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Unseal Document filed by Dongxiao Yue. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                            Proposed Order re 316 MOTION to Seal Materials Designated as Confidential by Sun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                              Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in Support of 316 MOTION to Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed bySun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Related document(s) 316 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                MOTION to Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                  Proposed Order re 313 Memorandum in Opposition, to Non-Party Dongxiao Yue's Motion to Intervene and Enforce Protective Order by Sun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 313 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff Netbula, LLC's Motions to Substitute Parties and for Withdrawal of Counsel, and to Non-Party Dongxiao Yue's Motion to Intervene and Enforce Protective Order filed bySun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Defendants' Notice of Manual Filing)(Related document(s) 313 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 307 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Unseal Document and Plaintiff Netbula, LLC's Motions to Substitute Parties and for Withdrawal of Counsel filed bySun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Related document(s) 307 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dongxiao Yue re 308 Declaration in Support, 309 Exhibits, 307 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Unseal Document, 310 Exhibits (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dongxiao Yue re 308 Declaration in Support, 309 Exhibits, 307 Memorandum in Opposition, 307 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Unseal Document, 310 Exhibits (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                            EXHIBITS G-J re 308 Declaration in Support filed by Dongxiao Yue. (Related document(s) 308 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                              EXHIBITS A-F re 308 Declaration in Support filed by Dongxiao Yue. (Related document(s) 308 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                Declaration in Support of 307 MOTION to Intervene, to Enforce Protective Order, and to Unseal Document; in Opposition to 303 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed by Dongxiao Yue. (Related document(s) 307 , 303 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                  Opposition re Sun Microsystems Inc, EMC Corporation, and Darden Restaurants Inc's 303 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed by Dongxiao Yue. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Renotice motion hearing
                                                                                                    Renotice motion hearing on Motion to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed bySun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 303 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order by Sun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                        Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 303 MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed bySun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C# 2 Exhibit D-F)(Related document(s) 303 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene and Modify Protective Order filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc., EMC Corporation, Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 9/24/2007. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2007) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 9/24/2007. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2007) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice by Netbula, LLC. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Netbula, LLC Joint Notice of Settlement (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information Designated as Confidential by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information Designated as Confidential by Defendants filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Information Designated as Confidential filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration or Permission to Appeal and to Stay Entry of Judgment Pending Appeal filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 9/20/2007. (mjjlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Netbula, LLC re 289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney First Amended Notice Revised Hearing Date (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order filed by Netbula, LLC. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/17/2007) Modified on 9/18/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                    Consent to Withdrawal filed by Netbula, LLC. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/17/2007) Modified on 9/18/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 215 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 224 Motion for Summary Judgment AND DENYING PLAINTIFF NEBULA'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Netbula, LLC Separate SUPPLEMENTAL. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netbula, LLC re 276 Proposed Jury Instructions Separate CORRECTED (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Exhibits B, D, L and N (filed UNDER SEAL) filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 283 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Eric J. Pulaski in Support of 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 1 and 21 (filed UNDER SEAL) filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 283 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities is Support (filed UNDER SEAL) filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski --Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Netbula, LLC, Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski --Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration in Support of 279 MOTION to Seal Document 278 Pretrial Conference Statement MOTION to Seal Document 278 Pretrial Conference Statement filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 279 ) (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 278 Pretrial Conference Statement filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Seal)(Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                            Pretrial Conference Statement by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski [JOINT STATEMENT] [REDACTED]. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski of Manual Filing Re: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and Exhibits Thereto (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Netbula, LLC Separate CORRECTED. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Gary S. Fergus in Support of 274 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gregory T. Kovecses filed byNetbula, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(Related document(s) 274 ) (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 260 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Gregory T. Kovecses filed byNetbula, LLC. (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Gary S. Fergus in Support of 272 MOTION to Seal filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 272 ) (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal filed by Netbula, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held; the case did not settle. The parties were invited to contact the Court (JCS) if they wish to have a Further Settlement Conference. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 269 Letter filed by Eric J. Pulaski, et al. requesting telephone appearance at Settlement Conference. Granted by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/24/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Jedediah Wakefield re Settlement Conference. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action, and Motion for Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement, held on 8/23/2007 before Judge Martin J. Jenkins. Matter submitted. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski re 260 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Gregory T. Kovecses, 262 Declaration in Support, (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 241 Motion to Seal Document Designated as Confidential: Exhibit A attached to the Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; and Exhibits B-G and Exhibit J attached to the Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 219 Motion to Seal Documents: Portions of BindView's Motion for Summary Judgment found at 7:22, 7:23, 8:9-13 and 8:17-18; Exhibits B, D, L and N of Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment; and, Exhibits 1 and 21 to the Declaration of Eric J. Pulaski in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Liwen Mah in Support of 263 MOTION to Seal filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 263 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Bill Stephenson in Support of 260 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Gregory T. Kovecses [Redacted] filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 260 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 260 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Gregory T. Kovecses filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) 260 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Gregory T. Kovecses filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing# 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude Kovecses Testimony)(Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) Re Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action Filed Under Seal; Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield Exhibits A, B, D, L and N Filed Under Seal; Declaration of Eric J. Pulaski Exhibits 1 and 21 Filed Under Seal. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 8/10/2007) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski of Defendants' Privileged Documents Log (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 8/10/2007) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Non-Opposition re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED), 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts for Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byNetbula, LLC, Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 215 , 224 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/8/2007) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition to Defendant Eric J. Pulaski's Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Evidence submitted in Opposition to Summary Judgment Motions by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 252 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 4 of Wakefield Reply Declaration filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 252 ) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply to Opposition re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 4 of Wakefield Reply Declaration filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to file Exhibit 4 of Wakefield Reply Declaration under seal)(Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Paul Hickman in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of JEDEDIAH WAKEFIELD in Support of 248 Reply to Opposition, RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 248 ) (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Bill Stephenson in Support of 248 Reply to Opposition, filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 248 ) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's "Cross Motions" [233, 234, 235] filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Fergus on behalf of Plaintiff Netbula, LLC (Fergus, Gary) (Filed on 8/7/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S JUNE 11, 2007 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 204 Objection filed by Netbula, LLC. Court ADOPTS the Order and DENIES plaintiff's objection. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 8/4/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins denying 207 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed 8/1/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated as Confidential by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated as Confidential filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Seal Document Designated as Confidential filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 239 Declaration in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication and in Support of Palintiff's Cross Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 239 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Don Yue in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Copyright Claim by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Fraud and Breach of Contract Claims by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' 215 Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Contract and Fraud Claims filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Modified on 8/2/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' 224 Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication as to the Copyright Claim filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Modified on 8/2/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant Eric J. Pulaski's 215 Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Modified on 8/2/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOLLOWING JULY 13, 2007, TELEPHONIC HEARING REGARDING DISPUTES ARISING DURING THE DEPOSITION OF NEIL SMITH, ESQ.. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 7/19/2007. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 225 filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Eric J. Pulaski's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/20/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield Regarding Login Errors To The Electronic Case Filing System On July 17, 2007 filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 7/13/2007 before Wayne D. Brazil (Date Filed: 7/18/2007). (Tape #FTR 7/13/2007, 1:30 p.m..) (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT A re 221 Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 221 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 221 Declaration in Support,,,, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[221 EXHIBIT C ONLY] filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C Part 2# 2 Exhibit C Part 3# 3 Exhibit C Part 4# 4 Exhibit C Part 5# 5 Exhibit C Part 6# 6 Exhibit C Part 7)(Related document(s) 221 ) (Kusters, David) (Filed on 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 223 by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Kusters, David) (Filed on 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 231 . *** MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AND AUTHORITIES in Support re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 222 filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER granting defendant Eric J. Pulaski's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kusters, David) (Filed on 7/18/2007) Modified on 7/19/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/20/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT)(Kusters, David) (Filed on 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 226 . *** Proposed Order re 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING BINDVIEWS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND, THIRD, FOURTH AND FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION by Netbula, LLC. (Kusters, David) (Filed on 7/18/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 225 . *** MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Eric J. Pulaski's Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Eric J. Pulaski's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kusters, David) (Filed on 7/18/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED), 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B *** # 3 Exhibit C (Part 1) # 4 Exhibit C (Part 2) FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 227 . *** # 5 Exhibit C (Part 3)# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H (Part 1)# 11 Exhibit H (Part 2)# 12 Exhibit I# 13 Exhibit J# 14 Exhibit K# 15 Exhibit L# 16 Exhibit M (Part 1)# 17 Exhibit M (Part 2)# 18 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 215 , 216 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 219 MOTION to Seal Document s and Information Designated as Confidential filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 219 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document s and Information Designated as Confidential filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration in Support of 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED), 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13 (Part 1)# 14 Exhibit 13 (Part 2)# 15 Exhibit 13 (Part 3)# 16 Exhibit 14# 17 Exhibit 15# 18 Exhibit 16# 19 Exhibit 17# 20 Exhibit 18# 21 Exhibit 19# 22 Exhibit 20# 23 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) 215 , 216 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Donald Closser in Support of 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED), 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 215 , 216 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING re: MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (Under Seal) filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment re Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Fraud Causes of Action (REDACTED) filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply to Opposition Plaintiff's Reply in Support of 207 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Modified on 7/16/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 212 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File 2d Amended Complaint filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibits 2-6# 3 Exhibit Exhibits 7-11# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 7/10/2007) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 207 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 7/10/2007) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** Witness List by Netbula, LLC Plaintiff's Designation of Experts. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 7/9/2007) Modified on 7/10/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN PART. Signed by Judge Jenkins on July 6, 2007. (mjjlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 6/28/07. (Attachments: # 1)(wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 207 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/26/2007) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit Certification of Interested Parties)(Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/26/2007) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/22/2007 before Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil (Date Filed: 6/22/2007). (Tape #FTR 6-22-07.) (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Vonnah M. Brillet Regarding Plaintiff's Objections to Deposition. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/20/2007) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 ObjectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to Magistrate Judge's June 11, 2007 Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/20/2007) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief re Netbula, Yue and Smith Depositions filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/19/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 201 Memorandum in Opposition to 199 "Objections" to Defendants' Notice of Depositions filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 17 to Wakefield Declaration)(Related document(s) 201 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/15/2007) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to 199 "Objections" to Defendants' Notice of Depositions filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/15/2007) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 ObjectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to Magistrate Judge's Discovery Orders Issued on June 11, 2007 by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/14/2007) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Notice of Depositions of Plaintiff Netbula, LLC and Its Former Counsel Neil A. Smith by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/14/2007) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief re Netbula and Yue Depositions filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/13/2007) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE from 7/30/2007 until 8/28/2007, at 11:00 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 8/14/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/12/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2007) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil denying 167 Plaintiff's First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007, Court Order and Motion to Compel (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief re 188 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 188 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 182 Motion to Seal (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 103 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; and Granting 128 Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE PRIOR COURT ORDERS AND MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Wayne D. Brazil (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 190 Declaration in Support of First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 190 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support of 167 First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/11/2007) Modified on 6/12/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/9/2007, Entered: 6/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 167 Second MOTION to Compel and First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 186 . filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/9/2007) (Entered: 06/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/9/2007, Entered: 6/9/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jedediah Wakefield in Opposition to 186 Memorandum in Opposition in Support of 186 Memorandum in Opposition to Netbula motion to compel filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A, Netbula requests for documents# 2 Exhibit Exh B, screenshot of software version information# 3 Exhibit Exh C, Wakefield letter with software version list# 4 Exhibit Exh D, Wakefield letter re format of production# 5 Exhibit Exh E, Wakefield letter re Netbula review problems# 6 Exhibit Exh F, Defendants' supplemental responses to interrogatories# 7 Exhibit Exh G, email serving Defendants' supplemental responses to interrogatories# 8 Exhibit Exh H, Netbula responses to Defendants' interrogatories# 9 Exhibit Exh I, BindView internal email# 10 Exhibit Exh J, BindView development status# 11 Exhibit Exh K, BindView financial information# 12 Exhibit Exh L, SEC Release No. 51283# 13 Exhibit Exh. M, BindView proxy statement excerpts)(Related document(s) 186 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/9/2007) (Entered: 06/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/9/2007, Entered: 6/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 188 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re 167 Second MOTION to Compel and First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/9/2007) Modified on 6/11/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/9/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Christine Tocalino in support of opposition to Netbula motion to compel filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information and Documents Designated As Confidential by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 182 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information and Documents Designated As Confidential filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 182 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information and Documents Designated As Confidential filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/8/2007 before Wayne D. Brazil (Date Filed: 6/8/2007). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Jedediah Wakefield re Netbula and Yue depositions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Netbula 30(b)(6) deposition notice# 2 Exhibit Amended Yue depo notice)(Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2007 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 6/6/2007) re 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by Eric J. Pulaski, Symantec Corporation, Bindview Development Corporation, 103 First MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 filed by Netbula, LLC. Court took matter under submission and will issue order (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzalez.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2007) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 164 Motion to Seal (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 171 Motion to Shorten Time (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 175 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 175 ) (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 171 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 135 Stipulation filed by Eric J. Pulaski, Netbula, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Bindview Development Corporation. Case Management Schedule following 5/18/06 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 5/29/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 141 Stipulation filed by Eric J. Pulaski, Symantec Corporation, Bindview Development Corporation. Granted and Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 5/29/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 171 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 167 Second MOTION to Compel and First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 168 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 168 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of 167 Second MOTION to Compel and First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 167 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Compel and First Amended Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of David M. Lacy Kusters In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information and Documents Designated by Plaintiff as Confidential filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal (Administrative) to File Under Seal Information and Documents Designated by Plaintiff as Confidential filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Dr. Philip Faillace Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Prior Orders Re Source Code and Damages Documents and to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Manual Filing Notification Re Reply Declaration of Dr. Philip Faillace in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Prior ORders Re Source Code and Damages Documents and to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski re Manual Filing Notification re Exhibits 1 and 2 to Reply Declaration of Jedediah Wakefiled In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Prior Orders Re Source Code and Damages Documents, and to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Prior Orders Regarding Source Code and Damages Documents and to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enforce Prior Orders Regarding Source Code and Damages Documents and to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. FILED UNDER SEAL. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil denying 154 Motion to Shorten Time (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2007) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lacy Kusters for Defendants Symantec Corporation, Bindview Development Corporation, and Eric J. Pulaski (Kusters, David) (Filed on 6/1/2007) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Jedediah Wakefield re Neil A. Smith subpoena. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Neil A. Smith Subpoena)(Mah, Liwen) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 154 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce May, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce May, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 151 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 151 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce May 7, 2007 Court Order and Motion to Compel filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION to Compel Enforcement of May 7, 2007 Court Order filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 122 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated By Plaintiff As Confidential filed by Symantec Corporation,, Bindview Development Corporation,, Eric J. Pulaski, . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2007) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to 142 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Prior Orders Regarding Source Code and Damages Documents and to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/31/2007) Modified on 6/4/2007 (far, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 144 Motion to Shorten Time (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/28/2007, Entered: 5/28/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 142 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and to Enforce Prior Court Orders Regarding Source Code and Damages Documents by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/28/2007) (Entered: 05/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/28/2007, Entered: 5/28/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Mary E. Milionis in Support of 144 MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and to Enforce Prior Court Orders filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 144 ) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/28/2007) (Entered: 05/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/28/2007, Entered: 5/28/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and to Enforce Prior Court Orders filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/28/2007) (Entered: 05/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/28/2007, Entered: 5/28/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of 142 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and to Enforce Prior Court Orders Regarding Source Code and Damages Documents filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 142 ) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/28/2007) (Entered: 05/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/28/2007, Entered: 5/28/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and to Enforce Prior Court Orders Regarding Source Code and Damages Documents filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/28/2007) (Entered: 05/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING HANDLING OF SOURCE CODE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/25/2007) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Status Conference held before Hon. Martin J. Jenkins 5/18/07. No further discovery that to be propounded without Court approval. Discovery due by 6/26/2007. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2007 09:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2007 03:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2007 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero Aug./Sept. 2007(Court Reporter : Not Reported.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2007) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/23/2007) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Don Yue in Support of 137 Response in Support of Rule 11 filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 137 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/23/2007) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support of Rule 11 filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 5/23/2007) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 125 Defendants' Motion to Shorten Time. Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees shall be heard on June 6, 2007. Any opposition to the motion for fees shall be filed and served by May 23, 2007. There shall be no reply brief for the motion for fees. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2007) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Netbula, LLC, Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 5/18/2007) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by Bindview Development Corporation. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/17/2007) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S 103 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of JEDEDIAH WAKEFIELD [PART 2 OF 2] EXHIBITS M-P IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of JEDEDIAH WAKEFIELD [Part 1 of 2] IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND EXHIBITS A-K [Exh. L Manually Filed Under Seal 5/16/07) filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION SHORTENING TIME RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 11(c)(1)(A) [Civil L.R. 6-3] [Related to 127] by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 11(c)(1)(A) [Related to 125 and 126] by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of MARY E. MILIONIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION SHORTENING TIME RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 11(c)(1)(A) [Related to 125] filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Shorten Time DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION SHORTENING TIME RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 11(c)(1)(A) and Exhibit A filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AS CONFIDENTIAL [Related to 122 and 123] by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of MARY E. MILIONIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AS CONFIDENTIAL [Related to 122] filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated By Plaintiff As Confidential filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE - setting Status Conference, regarding discovery deadlines and the trial date, for Friday, May 18, 2007 at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 11, 19th floor, before Hon. Martin J. Jenkins. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Order on Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion for Sanctions, granting 87 Motion to Seal Document, granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Compel (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Milionis For Defendants Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, and Eric J. Pulaski (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/2/2007 before Wayne D. Brazil (Date Filed: 5/2/2007). (Tape #FTR 5/2/07, 1:30 p.m..) (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 6/6/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Confidential EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in support of defendants' Motion to Enforece Order and Sanctions (filed UNDER SEAL) filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING NON-DISCOVERY MOTION: 103 First MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion referred to a magistrate judge, appointed at random. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 4/18/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in Support of 112 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Enforce Prior Court Order and for Sanctions filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/18/2007) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition re 84 MOTION for Sanctions and to Enforce Prior Court Order filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/18/2007) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance with Document Requests filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 107 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Netbula's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance with Document Requests filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/11/2007) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Albert L. Sieber In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Netbula's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance with Document Requests filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/11/2007) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Donald Closser in Support of 107 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Netbula's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Document Requests filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/11/2007) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's 88 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance with Document Requests filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/11/2007) Modified on 4/13/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of 105 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enforce Prior Order and for Sanctions filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 105 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 4/11/2007) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' 84 Motion to Enforce Prior Order and for Sanctions filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 4/11/2007) Modified on 4/13/2007 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 103 First MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil denying Plaintiff's Motion for Order Shortening Time and Vacating Earlier Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Order Shortening Time (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2007) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jedediah Wakefield in Opposition to 97 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Compel filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 97 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Compel filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 97 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Compel by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration in Support of 97 First MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Compel filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Compel filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 93 Motion to Shorten Time (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2007) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 93 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Enforce Prior Order and for Sanctions by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 93 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Enforce Prior Order and for Sanctions filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Enforce Prior Order and for Sanctions filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 90 Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel, Exhibits E - I filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 90 Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel - Exhibits A - D filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Vonnah M. Brillet in Support of 88 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Initial Disclosure filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 88 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Initial Disclosure by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Initial Disclosure filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 85 Declaration in Support, Exhibit C to Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in Support of Motion to Enforce Prior Order and for Sanctions filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski re 84 MOTION for Sanctions and to Enforce Prior Court Order (Confidential Exhibits to the Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in Support of Defendants' Motion to Enforce Order and for Sanctions) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in Support of 84 MOTION for Sanctions and to Enforce Prior Court Order filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 84 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Sanctions and to Enforce Prior Court Order filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASES C06-0711 MJJ, C06-7143 SBA and C06-7391 BZ. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 2/27/2007. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASES C06-0711 MJJ and C06-7391 BZ. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 2/27/2007. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence F. Pulgram on behalf of Defendants Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation and Eric J. Pulaski (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER clarifying the document request limit. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 02/22/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2007) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 60 Motion to Compel, denying 61 Motion for Sanctions (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/14/2007 before Wayne D. Brazil (Date Filed: 2/14/2007). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2007) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 76 Memorandum in Opposition, re Moption for More Definite Statement Clarifying the Document Request Limit filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 76 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 2/13/2007) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 75 First MOTION for More Definite Statement CLARIFYING THE DOCUMENT REQUEST LIMIT filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 75 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 2/13/2007) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for More Definite Statement CLARIFYING THE DOCUMENT REQUEST LIMIT filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 2/9/2007) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 73 Reply to Opposition, filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Related document(s) 73 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/31/2007) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition re 61 MOTION for Sanctions, 60 MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance With Discovery Requests filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/31/2007) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Richard Antognini in Opposition to 69 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 69 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 1/24/2007) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Darrell Salomon in Opposition to 69 Memorandum in Opposition Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 69 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 1/24/2007) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Don Yue in Opposition to 69 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed byNetbula, LLC. (Related document(s) 69 ) (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 1/24/2007) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition of Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed byNetbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 1/24/2007) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jedediah Wakefield (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 1/24/2007) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 66 First MOTION to Related Case and Defendants' Further Administrative Motion by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/23/2007) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Related Case filed by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 1/18/2007) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation filed by Netbula, LLC,, Attorney Richard L. Antognini terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 1/9/2007. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 61 MOTION for Sanctions by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 60 MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance With Discovery Requests by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 61 MOTION for Sanctions, 60 MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance With Discovery Requests and Exhibits Thereto filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 61 , 60 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Sanctions filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures and Compliance With Discovery Requests filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Substitution of Attorney by Netbula, LLC. (Brillet, Vonnah) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Protective ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 56 Motion Protective Order. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2006) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 56 MOTION Entry of Protective Order filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 12/8/2006) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Administrative Relief re Entry of Protective Order filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 12/8/2006) Modified on 12/11/2006 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to First 38 Amended Complaint byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 12/6/2006) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Strike. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Protective Order. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 11/8/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Don Yue in Support re 42 MOTION to Strike. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 11/7/2006) Modified on 11/8/2006 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF in Support re 42 MOTION to Strike filed by Netbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 11/7/2006) Modified on 11/8/2006 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Albert L. Sieber in Opposition to 42 MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 42 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Strike Portions of Defendants' Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/30/2007, at 9:30 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 7/16/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/25/2006. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/11/2007. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/16/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2006) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/13/2006) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/10/2006 before Martin J. Jenkins (Date Filed: 10/10/2006), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Spero for Settlement Conference. Discovery due by 5/25/2007. Jury Trial set for 9/24/2007 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (mat, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2006) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 42 MOTION to Strike. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 10/10/2006) Modified on 11/8/2006 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike filed by Netbula, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 10/10/2006) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to First 38 Amended Complaint byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 10/9/2006) (Entered: 10/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 9/21/2006) (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byNetbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2006) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss and denying 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2006) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 8/11/06 at 2:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2006) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Albert L. Sieber in Support of 17 MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint filed bySymantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit 01. Exhibit A - Form DEFM14A Title Pages and Pages 1-25# 3 Exhibit 02. Exhibit A (cont.) - Form DEFM14A Pages 26-48# 4 Exhibit 03. Exhibit A (cont.) - Form DEFM14A Annex A Pages 1-25# 5 Exhibit 04. Exhibit A (cont.) - Form DEFM14A Annex A Pages 26-53 and Exhibits Thereto# 6 Exhibit 05. Exhibit A (cont.) - Form DEFM14A Annex B-C and Proxy# 7 Exhibit 06. Exhibit B - Agreement and Plan of Merger Title Page and Pages 1-25# 8 Exhibit 07. Exhibit B (cont.) - Agreement and Plan of Merger Pages 26-53 and Exhibit Pages Thereto)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 8/1/2006) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint filed bySymantec Corporation. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 8/1/2006) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byEric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 8/1/2006) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 8/1/2006) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition Pulaski motion to dismiss; signature page for Yue declaration filed byNetbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition Pulaski motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed byNetbula, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition Pulaski motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed byNetbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint filed byNetbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition Brief in opposition to defendants' 12 b 6 motion filed byNetbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition defendants motion to dismiss under FRCP 12 b 6 filed byNetbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Conference reset for 10/10/2006 02:00 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel filed by Netbula, LLC,, Attorney Richard L. Antognini for Netbula, LLC added. Attorney Nathaniel Philip Bruno and Neil A. Smith terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 7/18/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2006) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Netbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/13/2006) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff Netbula, LLC by Netbula, LLC. (Antognini, Richard) (Filed on 7/13/2006) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint Granting Defendants BindView Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, and Eric J. Pulaski's Motions to Dismiss and to Strike by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Eric J. Pulaski in Support of 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byEric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Eric J. Pulaski's Motion to Dismiss [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)])(Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint [PROPOSED ORDER] filed byBindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Netbula, LLC's Complaint, MOTION to Strike Portions of Netbula, LLC's Complaint filed by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 6/6/2006) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 6/5/2006) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 13 Stipulation filed by Symantec Corporation, Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/15/2006 02:00 PM. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 08/07/2006. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 5/30/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2006) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION (Third) to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Related Dates by Symantec Corporation. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 5/26/2006) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options Defendants ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 5/26/2006) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 10 Stipulation filed by Netbula, LLC,, Symantec Corporation,, Bindview Development Corporation,, Eric J. Pulaski,. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 5/15/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2006) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (SECOND) by Netbula, LLC, Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 5/12/2006) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE [Reassigned Case]. Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2006 02:00 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2006) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Martin J. Jenkins for all further proceedings. Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on April 28, 2006. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2006) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2006) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation. (Sieber, Albert) (Filed on 4/12/2006) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netbula, LLC (Summons in a Civil Case) (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netbula, LLC re 1 Complaint,, 2 ADR Scheduling Order served to Bindview Development Corporation (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2006. Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2006 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) against Bindview Development Corporation, Symantec Corporation, Eric J. Pulaski ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 2281080.). Filed byNetbula, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 231 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?