ConnectU LLC v. Zuckerberg et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:07-mc-80055
District Judge Ronald M. Whyte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Connectu LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com
Space Meredith H. Schoenfeld +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 meredith.schoenfeld@finnegan.com
v.
No Logo Andrew McCollum, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Hughes, Defendant
Moskovitz, Dustin A. Moskovitz, Dustin A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Dustin Moskovitz"
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Asana, Inc.
No Logo Saverin, Eduardo, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eduardo Saverin"
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"
No Logo Thefacebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com
Accel Partners & Co., Inc. Accel Partners & Co., Inc., Movant
Officially listed as "Accel Partners"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas James Martin +1 415 493 3900 +1 650 565 5100 tmartin@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Thomas Stefano +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 kstefano@wsgr.com
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Thomas James Martin (Martin, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
    EXHIBITS (FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #16 POSTED ON 8/6/2007) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #16 POSTED ON 8/6/2007). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 2 6 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          INTERIM ORDER re 1 MOTION to Compel filed by ConnectU LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/19/07. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2007) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
            Request for Judicial Notice of Refiling and Carrying Over of Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 201 and [PROPOSED ORDER] filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Schoenfeld, Meredith) (Filed on 4/2/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
              Request for Judicial Notice re 9 Request for Judicial Notice, re Order of Dismissal of Underlying Matter filed byTheFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/2/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
                CLERK'S NOTICE REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLOYD. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/15/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER of Recusal. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/6/07. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/6/2007) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Request for Judicial Notice re 1 MOTION to Compel Magistrate Judge Collings Report and Recommendation Allowing Dismissal of Complaint and Electronic ORDER Terminating ConnectU's Motion for Contempt filed byTheFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Report and Recommendation)# 2 Exhibit B (Electronic ORDER))(Related document(s) 1 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 3/6/2007) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Accel Partners re 7 Declaration in Support,, 6 MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Accel Partners, Portions of Exhibit 15 and Exhibits 18 (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                          Declaration of Richard H. Zamboldi in Support of 6 MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Accel Partners, Portions of Exhibit 15 and Exhibits 18 filed byAccel Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                            MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Accel Partners, Portions of Exhibit 15 and Exhibits 18, 19, 23 and 24 Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Accel Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re 2 Declaration in Support, Received Document, 1 MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Seal, Received Document, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2007) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Referring Cases to District Judge Ronald M. Whyte for Related Case Consideration. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/22/07. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/23/2007) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re 2 Declaration in Support, Received Motion to Compel submitted under seal, 1 MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Seal, Received Confidential Exhibits submitted under seal, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                    Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel Financial Documents from Accel Partners filed by ConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) 1 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and MOTION to Compel Financial Documents from Accel Partners filed by ConnectU LLC. Redacted Version (fee paid, receipt #54611000492) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?