ConnectU LLC v. Zuckerberg et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:07-mc-80056
District Judge Ronald M. Whyte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 11:58 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Connectu LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com
v.
No Logo Andrew McCollum, Defendant
No Logo Morgan & Finnegan, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Christopher Hughes"
Moskovitz, Dustin A. Moskovitz, Dustin A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Dustin Moskovitz"
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Asana, Inc.
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"
No Logo Thefacebook, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Greylock Partners, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Mark Schatz +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 sschatz@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Thomas Stefano +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 kstefano@wsgr.com
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Thomas James Martin (Martin, Thomas) (Filed on 8/29/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
    (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBITS re 26 MOTION to Compel filed byConnectU LLC. (Related document(s) 26 ) (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
      (UNDER SEAL) MOTION to Compel filed by ConnectU LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        INTERIM ORDER re 1 MOTION to Compel filed by ConnectU LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/19/07. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2007) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
          Request for Judicial Notice of Refiling and Carrying Over of Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 201 and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Schoenfeld, Meredith) (Filed on 4/2/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
            Request for Judicial Notice re 12 Memorandum in Opposition re Order of Dismissal of Underlying Matter filed byTheFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 4/2/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
              CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 3/28/07 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS FROM GREYLOCK PARTNERS (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
                CLERK'S NOTICE REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLOYD. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/15/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                    Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of 18 Reply to Opposition Plaintiff ConnectU's Reply to Greylock Partners' Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Compel filed byConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26# 2 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Schoenfeld, Meredith) (Filed on 3/14/2007) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                      Reply to Opposition Plaintiff ConnectU's Reply to Greylock Partners' 12 Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Compel filed byConnectU LLC. (Schoenfeld, Meredith) (Filed on 3/14/2007) Modified on 3/17/2007 (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER re 5 MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Greylock Partners and Exhibits 14, 15 and 19 Pursuant filed by Greylock Partners,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greylock Partners re 13 Declaration in Support,, 12 Memorandum in Opposition, 14 Exhibits,, 15 Exhibits, (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 3/7/2007) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                            EXHIBITS re 13 Declaration in Support, of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and Request for Limited Protective Order filed byGreylock Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F (Part 2 of 2)# 2 Exhibit G# 3 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 3/7/2007) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                              EXHIBITS re 13 Declaration in Support, of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and Request for Limited Protective Order filed byGreylock Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 3/7/2007) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                Declaration of Karen T. Stefano in Support of 12 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and Request for Limited Protective Order filed byGreylock Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 3/7/2007) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents and Request for Limited Protective Order filed byGreylock Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 3/7/2007) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Request for Judicial Notice re 1 MOTION to Compel Magistrate Judge Collings Report and Recommendation Allowing Dismissal of Complaint and Electronic ORDER Terminating ConnectU's Motion for Contempt filed byTheFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Report and Recommendation)# 2 Exhibit B (Electronic ORDER))(Related document(s) 1 ) (Sutton, Theresa) (Filed on 3/6/2007) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 03/01/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greylock Partners re 5 MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Greylock Partners and Exhibits 14, 15 and 19 Pursuant, 6 Declaration in Support, (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                              Declaration of Donald Sullivan in Support of 5 MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Greylock Partners and Exhibits 14, 15 and 19 Pursuant filed byGreylock Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 5 ) (Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                MOTION Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff ConnectU's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Financial Documents From Greylock Partners and Exhibits 14, 15 and 19 Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Greylock Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stefano, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re Received Document, 2 Declaration in Support, 1 MOTION to Compel, Received Document , Via Hand Delivery addressed to Karen Stefano (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2007) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC re Received Document, 2 Declaration in Support, Proposed Order, 1 MOTION to Compel, Received Document (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel filed byConnectU LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                        (Redacted Version) MOTION to Compel Financial Documents from Greylock Partners filed by ConnectU LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 197 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?