UniRAM Technology, Inc. v. Monolithic System Technology
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:04-cv-01268
District Judge Vaughn R. Walker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 12:52 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniram Technology, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Conley, Rose & Tayon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Heim +1 713 238 8000 +1 713 238 8008 mheim@conleyrose.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell A. Chorush rchorush@hpcllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Morris Tuttle +1 713 221 2000 +1 713 221 2021 rtuttle@hpcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria C. Capitaine +1 713 653 7870 +1 713 654 3343 vcapitaine@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian B. Crosby +1 206 516 3880 icrosby@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Samuel Grinstein +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 jgrinstein@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin A. Nelson +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 jnelson@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo Monolithic System Technology, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/09/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Thomas Burse +1 408 777 2905 +1 408 877 1662 dtb@viplawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adrienne L. Taclas +1 650 849 4400 +1 650 849 4800 adrienne.taclas@bingham.com

Represented by Krieg Keller Sloan Reilley & Roman LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Maxim Integrated Products

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/09/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary A. Fuller +1 408 737 7600

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Anne Schmitt +1 415 439 1400 +1 415 439 1500 kschmitt@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C. Conard brandon.conard@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich +1 650 802 3227 +1 650 802 3100 Paul.Ehrlich@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo TSMC, North America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Anne Schmitt +1 415 439 1400 +1 415 439 1500 kschmitt@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C. Conard brandon.conard@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich +1 650 802 3227 +1 650 802 3100 Paul.Ehrlich@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
v.
No Logo Monolithic System Technology, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Calkins +1 415 393 2000 jcalkins@mdbe.com

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Anne Schmitt +1 415 439 1400 +1 415 439 1500 kschmitt@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C. Conard brandon.conard@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich +1 650 802 3227 +1 650 802 3100 Paul.Ehrlich@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Douglas Powers +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 matthew.powers@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo TSMC, North America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/13/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Anne Schmitt +1 415 439 1400 +1 415 439 1500 kschmitt@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C. Conard brandon.conard@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich +1 650 802 3227 +1 650 802 3100 Paul.Ehrlich@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason D. Kipnis +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Douglas Powers +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 matthew.powers@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo Uniram Technology, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Morris Tuttle +1 713 221 2000 +1 713 221 2021 rtuttle@hpcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc David Peters +1 650 813 5600 +1 650 494 0792 mdpeters@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin A. Nelson +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 jnelson@susmangodfrey.com
Intel Corporation Intel Corporation, Third Party Defendant
VMware, Inc. Unknown Role, VMware, Inc.
Unknown Role, Clearwire Corp
Unknown Role, New Clearwire CORP
Unknown Role, Synacor, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cloudera, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vuzix Corp
Unknown Role, Intel Pacific Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Broaddus +1 206 583 8694 +1 206 583 8500 mbroaddus@perkinscoie.com
Marvell Semiconductor Israel, Ltd. Marvell Semiconductor Israel, Ltd., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Molano +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 mmolano@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Pixim, Inc., Miscellaneous Party
No Logo VIA Technologies, Inc. USA, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer A. Ochs +1 408 222 2186 jochs@marvell.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (673) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
Receipt for Plaintiff's Exhibits. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
    Receipt for Trial Exhibits (Defendant TSMC). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE re withdrawal of exhibits by TSMC, North America, UniRAM Technology, Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
        CLERKS LETTER re withdrawal of exhibits. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING [Doc #668] Motion to Vacate Judgment. Pursuant to FRCP 60(b)(6), UniRAM and TSMC jointly move for and stipulate to vacatur of judgment as follows: 1. All judgments contained in paragraphs 1-4 of the Court's 5/1/2008 Judgment (D.I.638) are vacated. 2. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Vacate Judgment and [Proposed] Order filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 11/12/2008) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
              MANDATE of USCA as to 652 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by TSMC, North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., 654 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                ORDER of USCA as to 652 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by TSMC, North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., 654 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/11/2007; 9/12/2007; 9/14/2007, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. FILED UNDER SEAL per Judge Vaughn R. Walker's order #656. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Redaction of 553 Transcript, 551 Transcript, 550 Transcript per Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker's order #656. (2 copies). (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Transcript of Proceedings held on August 19, 2008, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail address belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2008. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                        USCA Case Number 2008-1520 Federal Circuit (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment of Inequitable Conduct filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                            Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of 482 Memorandum in Opposition filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 482 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                              Memorandum in Opposition to 487 Motions in Limine filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) Modified on 8/14/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. for proceedings held on 6/19/08 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                  USCA Case Number 2008-1494 Federal Circuit for 652 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by TSMC, North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 650 Motion to Seal portions of the trial transcript and trial exhibits. The following trial exhibits in this case are sealed from public inspection: 1039, 1118, 2000 and 2001. The following trial transcript in this case are sealed from public inspection: 178:10 thru 183:02, 649:24 thru 651:16, 939:21 thru 940:11, 985:17 thru 985:23. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                      Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 654 Notice of Cross Appeal (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2008: # 1 New Cross Appeal) (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL re 627 April 14, 2008 Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455 (34611021942). Appeal Record due by 9/2/2008. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 652 Notice of Appeal,,, (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2008: # 1 New Appeal Form) (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 649 Civil Minute Order, 545 Judgment, 628 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, 638 Judgment, 508 ORDER by Judge Walker granting in part and denying in part 375 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation; denying 376 Motion for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations, 349 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike, 627 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Filing fee $ 455 (34611021477). (Filed on 7/21/2008) Modified on 7/23/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/11/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 650 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPT - ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO SEAL filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/11/2008) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPT - ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO SEAL filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/9/2008) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 642 TMSC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial filed by TSMC, North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. - the motions are DENIED. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2008) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Reply Memorandum re 642 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [TMSC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [TMSC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial] filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/5/2008) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Based on the Parties Stipulation re Amount of Costs, the amount of taxable costs awarded, pursuant to the 5/1/2008 Judgment, shall be $ 244,561. against TSMC. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION RE AMOUNT OF COSTS by UniRAM Technology, Inc., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 5/30/2008) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 642 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [TMSC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [TMSC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial] OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/29/2008) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR TSMC'S OBJECTIONS TO BILL OF COSTS up to and including 5/30/2008 re 643 filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc., TSMC, North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/27/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR TSMC'S OBJECTIONS TO BILL OF COSTS by UniRAM Technology, Inc., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 5/23/2008) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [TMSC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial] filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 5/15/2008) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America of Withdrawal of Counsel (Schmitt, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/13/2008) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 639 Bill of Costs Affidavit of Russell A. Chorush In Support of UniRAM's Bill of Costs by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      BILL OF COSTS by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment in this action shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff UniRAM Technology Inc and against Defendants Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co. Ltd and TSMC North America the total amount of $30,500,000 and prejudgment interest through April 30, 2008, the amount of $5,484,116. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2008) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Walker denying 630 motion to seal without prejudice (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2008). (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Reply to Opposition re 630 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Portions of the Trial Transcript and A Subset of the Exhibits filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/30/2008) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Reply to Opposition re 629 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Motion for Entry of Revised Order of Judgment UNIRAM REPLY TO TSMC'S OBJECTIONS TO ORDER OF JUDGMENT filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Proposed Order re 629 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Motion for Entry of Revised Order of Judgment PREJUDGMENT INTEREST CALCULATION (FILED SEPARATELY AT COURT REQUEST) by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Proposed Order re 629 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Motion for Entry of Revised Order of Judgment TEXT OF PROPOSED ORDER OF JUDGMENT by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 630 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Portions of the Trial Transcript and A Subset of the Exhibits filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 4/28/2008) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re 629 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Motion for Entry of Revised Order of Judgment by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 4/28/2008) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Portions of the Trial Transcript and A Subset of the Exhibits filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Russell A. Chorush, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Motion for Entry of Revised Order of Judgment filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER granting 569 583 motion for entry of judgment; denying 585 motion to seal transcript with leave to amend. UniRAM to submit proposed form of judgment and calculation of prejudgment interest by April 23, 2008 (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2008). (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW on TSMC's counterclaim of unenforceability due to inequitable conduct. Signed by Judge Walker on 4/14/08 (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008). (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/07 before Judge Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by UniRAM Technology, Inc. UniRAM's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Inequitable Conduct. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/29/2008) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America [TSMC's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Inequitable Conduct]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/29/2008) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/15/2008 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas, Belle Ball.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/14/2008 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas, Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Bench Trial completed on 1/15/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 1/15/2008). (Court Reporter Debra Pas, Belle Ball.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2008) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/14/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial 1/15/2008 at 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debbie Pas, Belle Ball.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2008) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION UniRam's Page and Line Counter to TSMC's Counter-Designations From the Deposition of Richard A. Killworth by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Reply to Opposition re 602 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Inequitable Conduct Theories filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Reply to Opposition re 601 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Obviousness and Enablement Evidence filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION Counter-designations by UniRAM Technology, Inc. for proceedings held on 1/14/08 before Judge Chief Judge Walker.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to TSMC's Exhibit List by UniRAM Technology, Inc... (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/11/2008) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        TSMC's Objections and Counter-Designations to UniRAM's Deposition Designations by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to UniRAM's Trial Exhibit List by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/10/2008) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 602 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Inequitable Conduct Theories filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2008) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 601 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Obviousness and Enablement Evidence filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2008) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT E re 603 Declaration in Support,, filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 603 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Pretrial Conference Statement by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America (Jointly Filed). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A TSMC's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Exhibit B UniRAM's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Exhibit C TSMC's Witness List, # 4 Exhibit D UniRAM's Witness List, # 5 Exhibit E TSMC's 4th Amended Trial Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit F UniRAM's Trial Exhibit List, # 7 Exhibit G TSMC's Discovery Designations, # 8 Exhibit H UniRAM's Discovery Designations)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/8/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 605 UniRAM's Motion to seal document. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 605 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit E to Confidential Declaration of Russell A. Chorush re 603 Declaration in Support,,, 606 Declaration in Support, by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Counsel in Support of 605 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit E to Confidential Declaration of Russell A. Chorush re 603 Declaration in Support,, filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 605 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Exhibit E to Confidential Declaration of Russell A. Chorush re 603 Declaration in Support,, filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 601 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Obviousness and Enablement Evidence, 602 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Inequitable Conduct Theories by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 601 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Obviousness and Enablement Evidence, 602 MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Inequitable Conduct Theories filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 601 , 602 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Inequitable Conduct Theories filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Obviousness and Enablement Evidence filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER re 599 re Pretrial submission for inequitable conduct trial filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc., TSMC, North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. The parties shall file a joint pretrial conference statement containing the applicable materials listed in the pretrial order no later than 1/8/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/3/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Re: Pretrial Submissions for Inequitable Conduct Trial by UniRAM Technology, Inc., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/2/2008) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/26/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2007) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Telephone Conference to set a trial date held. TRIAL DATE: January 14, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. (Court - 3 days) (Date Filed: 12/21/2007). () (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2007) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker: re 571 MOTION Administrative Request to Seal re 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b),, 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc., 585 MOTION Seal Trial Transcript and Trial Exhibits filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc., 583 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc. The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court took the matter(s) under-submission.Court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2007) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re 594 Reply to Opposition -- McFarlane Decl. -- by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Opposition (Docket No. 589) filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Russell A. Chorush re Docket Entry # 585. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 11/5/2007) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 585 MOTION Seal Trial Transcript and Trial Exhibits filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/1/2007) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jim Lai in Support of 588 Memorandum in Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Entry of Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 588 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Christopher Adams in Support of 588 Memorandum in Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Entry of Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 588 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Brandon D. Conard in Support of 588 Memorandum in Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Entry of Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 588 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 585 MOTION Seal Trial Transcript and Trial Exhibits by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 585 MOTION Seal Trial Transcript and Trial Exhibits filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 585 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Seal Trial Transcript and Trial Exhibits filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Confidential Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 583 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 583 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 571 Motion to file documents under seal. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2007) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 580 . UniRAM's notice of a hearing for 11/15/2007 is hereby vacated. The hearing on the motion for entry of judgment is reset for 11/20/2007 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/23/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2007) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Re: November 20, 2007 Hearing Date by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/19/2007) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 575 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TSMC'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME RE: HEARING DATE FOR UNIRAM'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Max Tribble)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/18/2007) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 579 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re 575 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TSMC'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME RE: HEARING DATE FOR UNIRAM'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Max Tribble)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/18/2007) Modified on 10/19/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/17/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of EDWARD R. REINES in Support of 575 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TSMC'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME RE: HEARING DATE FOR UNIRAM'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 575 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TSMC'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME RE: HEARING DATE FOR UNIRAM'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 569 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 572 Affidavit, by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re 571 MOTION Administrative Request to Seal re 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ADMININSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL MOTION Administrative Request to Seal re 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ADMININSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Administrative Request to Seal re 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ADMININSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 569 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit)(Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting aside and vacating judgment 545 . Signed by Judge Walker on October 2, 2007 (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007). (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Edward R. Reines in Response to UniRAM's October 2, 2007 letter re D.I. 545. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/2/2007) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Max L. Tribble, Jr. in response to TSMC's October 1, 2007 letter [Dkt. 565]. (Tribble, Max) (Filed on 10/2/2007) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Edward R. Reines re D.I. 545. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/4/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Joan Columbini. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/24/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/25/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/21/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/20/2007, 4:15 p.m. before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/20/2007 - 8:30 a.m. before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/19/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/18/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/17/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/10/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/5/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/14/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Joan Marie Columbini. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/13/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/12/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/11/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas and Belle Ball. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 491 Declaration in Support, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 491 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiff Uniram's 469 Statement of In Limine Requests by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) Modified on 9/26/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JURY Trial Log. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Note. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the jury having found for the plaintiff, judgment is entered in favor of UniRAM in the amount of $30.5 million and against the defendants. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JURY VERDICT. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 9/25/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. The jury returned a unanimous verdict for UniRam and award damages in the amount of $30.5 million ($30,500,000).Exhibits admitted in evidence:All exhibits are filed with the CSA. (Court Reporter Debra Pas, Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Jury continue to deliberate from 8:30 am to 3:30 pm on 9/24/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 9/24/2007). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Final Jury Instructions signed by Chief Judge Walker on Friday, September 21, 2007 (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/21/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. FURTHER JURY TRIAL : September 21, 2007. Courts final jury instructions.Closing Statements.Rebuttal argument by Plaintiff. Jury begin deliberation. Jury note #1. The court will talk to the lawyers on Monday re the note. Jury will resume their deliberations on Monday at 8:30 AM. Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 1340. Def - 5422.All exhibits admitted into evidence has been provided to the jury for the deliberation. (Court Reporter Debra Pas, Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/20/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Defendant Rest.Hearing regarding the final jury instructions and final form of verdict. MOTION:Defendant filed their motion for judgment as a matter of law. WITNESSES : Def:1. Edward CK Chen - Testimony via video taped deposition. 2. Terry Musika - expert on damages.Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 279, 554, 380, 580, 157, 158, 159, 160,161, 163, 164, 166, 170, 110, 1331, 1332, 1333, 1334, 1335, 1336, 1337, 1338, 1339.438 (adm 9/12/07), 235 (adm 9/13/07), 249 (adm 9/13/07), 250 (adm 9/13/07), 240 (adm 9/13/07), 304 (adm 9/14/07), 305 (adm 9/14/07), 270 (adm 9/14/07), 537 (adm 9/11/07)Def - 5306, 5200, 5161, 5408, 5409, 5410, 5411, 5412, 5413, 5414, 5415, 5416, 5417, 5418, 5419, 5420, 5421.5032 (adm 9/13/07), 5324 (adm 9/14/07).5324 (adm 9/14/07). (Court Reporter Belle Ball, Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to UniRAM's Objection to the Final Jury Instructions by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Opposition re 535 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UniRAM's Opposition to TSMC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to Final Jury Instructions and Final Verdict Form by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2007 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Form of Verdict by UniRAM Technology, Inc. UniRam's Revised Proposed Jury Verdict Form. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/19/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES : Def:1. Fu-Chieh Hsu - continued testimony on direct and cross. 2. Chue-San Yoo - testimony on direct and cross. 3. David Taylor - expert on DRAM and embedded DRAM. Direct and Cross.4. Jack Mandelman - expert on DRAM and embedded Dram, direct and cross.5. Pin Nan Tseng - direct and cross.Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 401, 227, 933.Def - 5107, 5108, 5377, 5291, 5234, 5285, 5018. (Court Reporter Belle Ball, Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Form of Verdict by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by UniRAM Technology, Inc. Uniram's Revised Proposed Jury Instructions. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/18/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES : Def:Fu-Chieh Hsu - continued testimony on direct and cross. Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 139, 1330, 1327, 1328, 1014, 276.Def - 5382, 5315, 5316. (Court Reporter Belle Ball, Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 509 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Bench Memorandum Requesting Clarification of Order Partially Granting UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Gillingham Testimony by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/17/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES : Pla: Bruce McFarlane - expert on damages.Jennifer Yen - CFO, UniRam.Def:Fu-Chieh Hsu - founder of MoSys business and technology.Plaintiff Rest. Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 272, 1202, 8, 9, 353, 1170, 1174, 1179, 1184, 164, 343, 290.Def - 5060, 5145, 5144, 5233. (Court Reporter Belle Ball, Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 521 MOTION to Strike Jury Trial Mention of MoSys Settlement Terms [CORRECTED] filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/14/2007) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/14/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES : 1. Prof Carl Sechen - expert witness. 2. Video deposition testimony of Dr. Leung on direct and cross.3. Video deposition testimony of Jennifer Tseng.Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 268, 273, 132, 278, 280, 281, 282, 269, 284, 285.Def - 5305, 5308, 5310, 5311, 5312, 5313, 5314, 5315, 5317, 5318, 5320, 5325, 5325. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2007) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to Opposition UniRam's Reply to TSMC's 524 Opposition to UniRam's Motion to Strike and Renewed Motion to Exclude filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/18/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 521 MOTION to Strike Jury Trial Mention of MoSys Settlement Terms filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/14/2007) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/13/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES :Pla: Robert J. Murphy - continued testimony on direct and cross. Dennis Sinitsky - adverse witness. Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 235, 249, 250, 240.Def - 5032.(Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2007) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/12/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES :Pla: Robert J. Murphy - continued testimony on direct and cross. Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 1039, 114, 308, 1190, 1189, 436, 435, 479, 941, 438, 276, 1013, 1010. Def - 5278, 5271, 5406, 5407. (Court Reporter Belle Ball, Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2007) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Jury Trial Mention of MoSys Settlement Terms filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/12/2007) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/11/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. WITNESSES :Pla: Dr Jeng-Jye Shau - continued testimony on cross and re-direct.Robert J. Murphy - expert on the field of integrated circuits, embedded memory, DRAM. Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 1091, 7, 1180, 9, 353, 1094, 291, 263Def - 5116, 5275, 5271, 5253, 5029, 5084, 5089, 5316, 5317, 5091, 5094. (Court Reporter Debra Pas, Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2007) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List Plaintiff's Third Amended Exhibit List by UniRAM Technology, Inc... (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/11/2007) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 9/10/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS: Jury trial begun. Courts preliminary jury instructions.Opening Statements. WITNESSES :Pla: Dr Jeng-Jye Shau.Exhibits admitted in evidence: Pla - 184, 194, 320, 321, 702, 442, 443, 1118, 181, 243, 244, 246, 3, 1071, 1062.Def - 5228, 5110, 5109, 5132, 5096, 2000, 2001. (Court Reporter Belle Ball, Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 9/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List TSMC's Third Amended Trial Exhibit List and Parties' Joint Exhibits by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America.. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2007) (Entered: 09/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 9/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Matthew Powers. (Powers, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2007) (Entered: 09/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 9/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Plaintiff's Second Amended Exhibit List by UniRAM Technology, Inc... (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/9/2007) (Entered: 09/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION RE Edward Chen by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION RE: EDWARD CHEN by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Jury Selection/Voir Dire held on 9/5/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 9/5/2007). (Court Reporter Debra Pas, Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Walker denying 457 , 473 TSMC's motion in limine #1; finding as moot 367 Motion to Bifurcate; finding as moot 369 UniRAM's motion for Summary Judgment of no inequitable conduct; deferring ruling on motions in limine 458 459 460 461 462 463 464 474 475 476 , (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2007). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum to UniRAM's 506 Supplemental Brief Re TSMC Motion In Limine No. 1, Re Damages filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Modified on 9/11/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Walker granting in part and denying in part 366 motion to exclude independent development theory, (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007). (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Walker granting in part and denying in part 375 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation; denying 376 Motion for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations, (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007). (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re 498 Transcript Designation UniRAM's Objections and Counter-Counter Deposition Designations in Response to TSMC's Counter Deposition Designations by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief re 457 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 457 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Final Pretrial Conference. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America Revised. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Form of Verdict by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT granting joint motion to bring into the federal courthouse certain equipment and materials for purposes of trial by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker 478 . (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2007) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re 497 Exhibit List Defendant TSMC's Objections to UniRAM's Amended Exhibit List by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 9/3/2007) (Entered: 09/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Second Amended by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America.. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 9/3/2007) (Entered: 09/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 9/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re 479 Exhibit List Plaintiff UniRAM's Objections to TSMC's Amended Exhibit List by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/3/2007) (Entered: 09/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION TSMC's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff UniRAM's Deposition Designations by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Amended Exhibit List and Counter Designations of Wingyu Leung, Ph.D. by UniRAM Technology, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of 495 MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiff UniRAM's Opposition to TSMC's Motions In Limine filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 495 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiff UniRAM's Opposition to TSMC's Motions In Limine filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America re 491 Declaration in Support, 490 Memorandum in Opposition (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Brandon Conard in Support of 492 MOTION to Seal Documents Related to TSMC's In Limine Response filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 492 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Documents Related to TSMC's In Limine Response filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Brandon Conard in Support of 490 Memorandum in Opposition to UniRAM's Statement of In Limine Requests filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 490 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition to UniRAM's Statement of In Limine Requests filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 468 Proposed Pretrial Order,, Defendant TSMC's Statement of Objections and Motions in Limine (Exhibit J) by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of 482 Memorandum in Opposition, 487 Memorandum in Opposition, 481 Memorandum in Opposition, 480 Memorandum in Opposition, 483 Memorandum in Opposition, 486 Memorandum in Opposition, 484 Memorandum in Opposition, 485 Memorandum in Opposition filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 482 , 487 , 481 , 480 , 483 , 486 , 484 , 485 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 457 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 462 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Re: No Modification Of NDAs filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 461 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Re: New Breach Of Contract Theories filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 460 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Re: Misappropriation After September 16, 1999 For Information Disclosed Under Expired NDA filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 463 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Re: Complaints By MoSYS About Disclosure Of Information filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 464 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Re: Jeng-Jye Shau's Family's Health Issues filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 459 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Re: Improper Expert Testimony By Jeng-Jye Shau filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 458 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Re: Exclusion Of Untimely And UnSupported Opinion Testimony Of Robert J. Murphy filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List Amended by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America.. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/29/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION To Bring Equipment Into The Courtroom For Purposes Of Trial filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/29/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS 1,2,3,6,8,9,10,11 and 12 re 465 Declaration in Support, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 465 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine No. 6 re: No Modification of NDAs filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine No. 3 re: Improper Expert Tstimony by Jeng-Jye Shau filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine No. 2 re: Exclusion of Untimely and Unsupported Opinion Testimony of Robert J. Murphy filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 1 re: Exclusion of Unsupported Uniram Damages Evidence and Testimony filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 466 Motion to Seal Documents related to TSMC's motions in limine. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER re 456 Evidentiary Exclusions filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/28/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 8/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 468 Proposed Pretrial Order,, Amended Exhibit C filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 468 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 8/25/2007) (Entered: 08/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 468 Proposed Pretrial Order,, Exhibit J TSMC Objections And Motions In Limine List filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 468 ) (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/25/2007) (Entered: 08/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order [Joint Pretrial Conference Statement] by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A UniRAM's Proposed Jury Instructions# 2 Exhibit B TSMC's Proposed Jury Instructions# 3 Exhibit C UniRAM's Identification of Witnesses# 4 Exhibit D TSMC's Witness List# 5 Exhibit E UniRAM's Exhibit List# 6 Exhibit F TSMC's Exhibit List# 7 Exhibit G UniRAM's Depo Designations# 8 Exhibit H TSMC's Discovery Excerpts# 9 Exhibit I UniRAM# 10 Exhibit K TSMC's Proposed Findings of Fact# 11 Exhibit L UniRAM's Proposed Findings of Fact)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Brandon Conard in Support of 466 MOTION to Seal Document 459 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Re: Improper Expert Testimony By Jeng-Jye Shau, 457 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony, 462 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Re: No MOTION to Seal Document 459 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Re: Improper Expert Testimony By Jeng-Jye Shau, 457 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony, 462 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Re: No MOTION to Seal Document 459 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Re: Improper Expert Testimony By Jeng-Jye Shau, 457 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony, 462 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Re: No filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 466 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document 459 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Re: Improper Expert Testimony By Jeng-Jye Shau, 457 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony, 462 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Re: No Modification Of NDAs, 458 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Re: Exclusion Of Untimely And UnSupported Opinion Testimony Of Robert J. Murphy, 465 Declaration in Support, [Misc Administrative Request to Seal Documents Related to TSMC's Motions in Limine] filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Paul T. Ehrlich In Support of 457 458 459 460 461 462 463 464 TSMC's Motions In Limine filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) Modified on 9/5/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine No. 8 Re: Jeng-Jye Shau's Family's Health Issues filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motions In Limine)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine No. 7 Re: Complaints By MoSYS About Disclosure Of Information filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine No. 6 Re: No Modification Of NDAs filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine No. 5 Re: New Breach Of Contract Theories filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine No. 4 Re: Misappropriation After September 16, 1999 For Information Disclosed Under Expired NDA filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine No. 3 Re: Improper Expert Testimony By Jeng-Jye Shau filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine No. 2 Re: Exclusion Of Untimely And UnSupported Opinion Testimony Of Robert J. Murphy filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 1 Re: Exclusion of Unsupported UniRAM Damages Evidence and Testimony filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: EVIDENTIARY EXCLUSIONS by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 8/17/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 376 , 369 , 367 , 417 , 375 , 366 , 418 . 1. UniRams Motion to Exclude Testimony2. Cross motion for summary judgment3. Motion on the Statute of Limitations4. Plas Motion to Bifurcate - UnopposedThe Court heard argument from counsel. The Court took the matter(s) under-submission.Court to issue written ruling.The matter continues to be set for pretrial conference on September 4, 2007 at 9:00 AM.Jury selection set for September 5, 2007 at 8:30 AM.Jury trial to begin on September 10, 2007 at 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2007) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker DENYING 452 Motion to bring equipment and materials for the purpose of a hearing on summary judgment and other motions. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker DENYING 449 Motion to Continue jury selection. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2007) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION UniRAM's Unopposed Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equipment and Materials for Purposes of a Hearing on Summary Judgment and Other Motions filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/14/2007) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of 450 Response to TSMC's Objections to the Shau and Murphy Declarations filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 450 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/10/2007) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response re 410 Objection, Plaintiff UniRAM's Response to TSMC's Objections to the Shau and Murphy Declarations byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/10/2007) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Jury Selection to September 10, 2007 (Unopposed) filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/10/2007) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 410 Objection, 411 Declaration in Support,, 409 Response in Support, 408 Response in Support filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 410 , 411 , 409 , 408 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 8/1/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : Motions Hearing reset for 8/17/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeng-Jye Shau in Opposition to 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations, 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 418 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 376 , 417 , 418 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Robert J. Murphy in Support of 440 Memorandum in Opposition, 395 Memorandum in Opposition filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 440 , 395 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration II of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 395 Memorandum in Opposition filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 395 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration I of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 441 Memorandum in Opposition, 440 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 441 , 440 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unredacted version of MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 376 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 376 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Modified on 8/1/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 391 397 MOTION to Seal Documents. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue 8/16/07 Motions Hearing filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Conard Dec ISO Motion# 2 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS 4,5,8,10,11,13,20,21,22,23,24, re 389 Declaration in Support,,, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 389 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS 1,2,3,5,and 10 re 385 Declaration in Support,, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 385 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 366 MOTION Motion to Exclude TSMCs New Independent Development Theory filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 366 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 369 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT A re 370 Declaration in Support, filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 370 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition re 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to re 402 Declaration in Support, by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS 1,2,3,4,and 5 re 385 Declaration in Support,, 416 Declaration in Support filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 385 , 416 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Brief re 418 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Brief re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : Hearing on All Motions Continued from 8/2/2007 to 8/16/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 412 Administrative Motion to Seal. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 405 Administrative Motion to Seal Document 405 MOTION to Seal Document 401 Reply to Opposition, 404 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Seal Document 401 Reply to Opposition, 404 Declaration in Support. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 390 Administrative Motion to Seal. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of UniRAM's Counsel in Support of 421 UniRAM's Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiff UniRAM's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of T. Musika in Support of 421 MOTION to Seal filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 421 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/24/2007) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of Plaintiff UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s 368 Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika in Support of 368 MOTION Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Related document(s) 368 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS 1, 3-9, 11-14, 21, 22, 24, 25, 28, 31-33, 36 and 41 re 377 Declaration in Support,,,,, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 377 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 7/23/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment that Uniram's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FILED UNDER SEAL(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgmentof No Misappropriation of Uniram Trade Secrets filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FILED UNDER SEAL(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of 407 Reply to Opposition to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 407 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition re 366 MOTION Motion to Exclude TSMCs New Independent Development Theory filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Paul Ehrlich in Support of 412 MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets and TSMC's Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims Are Barred By The Statut filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 412 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets and TSMC's Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims Are Barred By The Statute of Limitations and Supporting Documents filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 409 Response in Support, 408 Response in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets and Motion for Summary Judgment that UniRAM's Claims Are Barred By The Statute of Limitations filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 409 , 408 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to re 395 Memorandum in Opposition to TSMC's Motions For Summary Judgment [Jeng-Hye Shau Declaration]; And To The Declaration of Robert J. Murphy In Support of UniRAM's Response to TSMC's Motion For Summary Judgment of no Misappropriation by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 375 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition re 368 MOTION Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UniRAM Technology, Inc. re 401 Reply to Opposition, 402 Declaration in Support, 404 Declaration in Support, 403 Declaration in Support, 405 MOTION to Seal Document 401 Reply to Opposition, 404 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Seal Document 401 Reply to Opposition, 404 Declaration in Support, (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 401 Reply to Opposition, 404 Declaration in Support, filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration in Support of Admin Motion# 2 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 401 Reply to Opposition UniRAM's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 401 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 401 Reply to Opposition UniRAM's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 401 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Dr. Jeng-Jye Shau in Support of 401 Reply to Opposition UniRAM's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 401 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/19/2007) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Opposition UniRAM's Reply to Defendants' 390 Opposition to UniRAM's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/24/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 378 Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to Seal documents. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 373 Miscellaneous Administration Motion to seal documents. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of UNIRAM'S COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 in Support of 378 MOTION to Seal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims Are Barred by the Statute of Limitations; Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets; and Other Supporting Documents filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 378 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 391 Memorandum in Opposition filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Seal# 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration in Support of Admin Mtn)(Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 395 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 395 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 375 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 391 Memorandum in Opposition to TSMC's Motion for Summary Judgment that UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 391 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Brandon D. Conard in Support of 390 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika, Defendants' Opposition to Pla filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 390 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 376 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude TSMC's New Independent Development Theory and Support Documents filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Brandon D. Conard in Support of 386 Memorandum in Opposition, 387 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' New Independent Development Theory and Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2# 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Errata 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) 386 , 387 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration in Support of 387 Memorandum in Opposition, Declartion of Peter Gillingham in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude TSMC's New Independent Development Theory filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 387 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 366 MOTION Motion to Exclude TSMCs New Independent Development Theory filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 368 MOTION Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Paul T. Ehrlich in Support of 383 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff UniRAM Technology Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7 Part 1 of 2# 8 Exhibit 7 Part 2 of 2# 9 Exhibit 8 Part 1 of 3# 10 Exhibit 8 Part 2 of 3# 11 Exhibit 8 Part 3 of 3# 12 Exhibit 9 Part 1 of 2# 13 Exhibit 9 Part 2 of 2# 14 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 383 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : Motions Hearing Continued to 8/9/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF UniRAM TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF UniRAM TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE TSMC'S INEQUITABLE CONDUCT COUNTERCLAIMS FOR BENCH TRIAL filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/11/07 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America [Re Summary Judgment Documents] (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 378 MOTION to Seal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims Are Barred by the Statute of Limitations; Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets; and Other Supporting Documents filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 378 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims Are Barred by the Statute of Limitations; Motion for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets; and Other Supporting Documents filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Brandon Conard in Support of 375 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets, 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2)# 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2)# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 24# 24 Exhibit 25# 25 Exhibit 26# 26 Exhibit 27# 27 Exhibit 28# 28 Exhibit 29# 29 Exhibit 30# 30 Exhibit 31# 31 Exhibit 32# 32 Exhibit 33# 33 Exhibit 34 (Part 1 of 4)# 34 Exhibit 34 (Part 2 of 4)# 35 Exhibit 34 (Part 3 of 4)# 36 Exhibit 34 (Part 4 of 4)# 37 Exhibit 36# 38 Exhibit 37# 39 Exhibit 38# 40 Exhibit 39# 41 Exhibit 40# 42 Exhibit 41# 43 Exhibit 43# 44 Exhibit 44# 45 Exhibit 45# 46 Exhibit 47# 47 Exhibit 48# 48 Exhibit 49# 49 Exhibit 50# 50 Errata Exhibit 51# 51 Exhibit 52)(Related document(s) 375 , 376 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment That UniRAM's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Misappropriation of UniRAM Trade Secrets filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of of UniRAM Technology Inc.'s Counsel in Support of UniRAM's Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Seal Documents filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Documents filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by UniRAM Technology, Inc. re 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct Notice of Manual Filing of Confidential Chorush Declaration (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by UniRAM Technology, Inc. re 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct Notice of Manual Filing (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 369 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** Declaration of John Neukom Exhibit A . FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** MOTION Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Terry Musika filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Exclude Portions of The Expert Report of T. Musika# 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Neukom in Support to Motion to Exclude Portions of The Expert Report of T. Musika)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 7/12/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Bifurcate filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Bifurcate TSMC's Inequitabel Conduct Counterclaims for Bench Trial# 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Neukom in Support of Motion to Bifurcate)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Motion to Exclude TSMCs New Independent Development Theory filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Exclude TSMC's New Independant Development Theory# 2 Affidavit Declaration of J Neukom# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of J Neukom# 4 Exhibit Exhibit A part 2 to Declaration of J Neukom# 5 Exhibit Exhibit A part 3# 6 Exhibit Exhibit A part 4# 7 Exhibit Exhibit A part 5# 8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of J Neukom)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/28/2007) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/21/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/1/2007 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by John McMakin Neukom Plaintiff UniRAM's Notice of Substitution of Local Counsel (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. RESULT OF THE PROCEEDING: 1) TSMC to produce tapeouts re Dr Sinitsky's testimony within 10 days from this date. 2) Deposition of Wing Leung set for May 22, 2007 and May 23, 2007.3) Deposition of TSMC's remaining 30(b)(6) witness(es) set for May 23, 2007.4) Cutoff date for all discovery is May 23, 2007. 5) All Experts Reports due May 31, 2007.6) Rebuttal Expert Reports due June 14, 2007.7) Expert depositions to be completed by June 28, 2007.8) Last day to file dispositive motions is June 28, 2007.9) Hearing for dispositive motions is set for August 2, 2007 at 2:00 p.m.10) Pretrial Conference has been set for September 4, 2007 at 9:00 a.m.11) Jury selection is scheduled on September 5, 2007 at 8:30 a.m.12) Jury trial is set to begin September 10, 2007 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 356 Motion to Seal (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2007) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/19/2007 before HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES (Date Filed: 4/19/2007). () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2007) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America re 356 MOTION to Seal Joint Letter of April 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Ed Reines (TSMC) and Joseph Grinstein (UniRAM) of April 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 [Redacted]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Joint Letter of April 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul T. Ehrlich# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Notice of Manual Filing)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re 354 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/17/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from TSMC to Magistrate Judge James Requesting Teleconference. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/13/2007) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 30(b)(6) deposition 348 Letter, filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/23/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 345 Letter filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,, 346 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2007) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: TSMC'S INTERROGATORIES NOS 22 AND 23. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/26/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge Walker denying 271 , 284 motion for summary judgment that '229 patent is unenforceable due to inequitable conduct, denying 319 motion to strike. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007). (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Edward Reines and Russ Chorush Regarding TSMC's Request for a Protective Order Quashing UniRAM's Amended Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6). (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/21/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: James Yeomans.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Edward Reines and Russell Chorush regarding UniRAM's Response to Interrogatory no. 19. (Attachments: # 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Russell Chorush and Edward Reines regarding TSMC's Response to Interrogatory nos. 13 and 14. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief re 342 Letter, 341 Order Requesting Further Briefing Regarding TSMC's Interrogatories Nos. 22 and 23 filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 342 , 341 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 2/6/2007) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE TSMC'S INTERROGATORY NO. 12 re 338 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/6/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2007) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Edward Reines for TSMC re Court's Order Requesting Further Briefing regarding TSMC's Interrogatories Nos. 22 and 23 [D.I. 341]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/30/2007) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING re 334 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/23/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2007) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 335 Motion to Seal Document (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2007) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 335 MOTION to Seal Document Related to Joint Letter of January 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 335 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 1/19/2007) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Letter of January 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 from Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. and TSMC North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2007) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America re 335 MOTION to Seal Document Related to Joint Letter of January 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/17/2007) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Ed Reines (TSMC) and Rob Tuttle (UniRAM) of January 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 [Redacted]. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/17/2007) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document Related to Joint Letter of January 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 12 filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul T. Ehrlich# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Notice of Manual Filing)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/17/2007) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Edward Reines (TSMC) and Robert Tuttle (UniRAM) of January 17, 2007 re Interrogatory No. 22 and 23. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/17/2007) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 284 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America, the court submitted the matter, court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2007) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Confidential Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 331 Memorandum in Opposition filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 331 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007) Modified on 1/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sur-Reply in Opposition re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007) Modified on 1/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 328 Response in Support filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 328 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006) Modified on 1/12/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 317 Motion to Seal Document. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 308 Motion to Seal TSMC's Reply brief in support of motion for summary judgment of unenforceability due to inequitable conduct. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 300 Motion to Seal: UniRam's brief in response to motion for summary judgment of inequitable conduct, Declaration of Robert M Tuttle in support of. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 323 Motion to bring computer equipment and materials for powerpoint presentation. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equipment and Materials for Purposes of a Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Request to Bring into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equipment and Materials for Purposes of a Summary Judgment Hearing)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/9/2007) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul T. Ehrlich in Support of 321 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 321 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 319 MOTION to Strike 305 Reply to Opposition, UniRAM's Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, to Submit a Sur-Reply Brief filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by UniRAM Technology, Inc. re 316 Declaration in Support,, 319 MOTION to Strike 305 Reply to Opposition, UniRAM's Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, to Submit a Sur-Reply Brief, 314 Reply Memorandum,, 315 Declaration in Support,, 317 MOTION to Seal Document 316 Declaration in Support,, 314 Reply Memorandum,, 318 Declaration in Support, Declaration of Service (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 305 Reply to Opposition, UniRAM's Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, to Submit a Sur-Reply Brief filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Counsel in Support of 317 MOTION to Seal Document 316 Declaration in Support,, 314 Reply Memorandum, filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 317 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 316 Declaration in Support,, 314 Reply Memorandum, filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 314 Reply Memorandum, Sur-Reply [Redacted] in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 314 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 314 Reply Memorandum, Sur-Reply [Redacted] in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Related document(s) 314 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] Sur-Reply [Redacted] in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2007) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Counsel in Support of 308 MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, 312 Declaration in Support, including attestation line filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 308 , 312 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2007) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of UniRAM Technologies, Inc.'s Counsel in Support of 308 MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 308 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 1/2/2007) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America re Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 308 MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Paul Ehrlich in Support of 308 MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 308 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal TSMC's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America re 305 Reply to Opposition, Confidential Reply To Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment (Manual Filing) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul Ehrlich in Support of 305 Reply to Opposition, filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1# 2 Exhibit A2)(Related document(s) 305 ) (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Opposition re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Russell Chorush [UniRAM] and Edward Reines [TSMC] reporting to the Court for a status conference in re Court's Order dated December 21, 2006. (Ehrlich, Paul) (Filed on 12/28/2006) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for parties to serve and file a letter describing the present status of trial preparation on or before December 28, 2006. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 12/22/06. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Service by UniRAM Technology, Inc. re 295 Reply Memorandum,, 296 Declaration in Support,, 299 Declaration in Support,, 301 Declaration in Support,, 297 Declaration in Support,, 300 MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiff's Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, 298 Declaration in Support, Declaration of Service (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) Modified on 12/22/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Counsel in Support of 300 MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiff's Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 300 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiff's Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert M. Tuttle in Support of 295 Reply Memorandum, Confidential Declaration re Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 295 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Russell A. Chorush in Support of 295 Reply Memorandum, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I Part 1# 10 Exhibit I Part 2)(Related document(s) 295 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Dr. Jeng-Jye Shau in Support of 295 Reply Memorandum, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 295 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dr. Carl Sechen in Support of 295 Reply Memorandum, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 295 ) (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 12/21/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #230Letter from Edward R. Reines, Attorney for TSMC, dated 8/29/2006 to Judge Walker requesting clarification from the Court regarding whether TSMC's customer's 0.13um tapeouts must be made available for UniRAM's inspection. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006) Modified on 11/27/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. All claims and counterclaims between UniRAM and MoSys are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement Agreement between the parties, dated October 24, 2006, of which this Stipulation forms a part. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/21/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2007 09:00 AM.Jury Selection: 9/5/2007 at 8:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2007 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/22/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Status Conference set for 8/17/2007 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2007 at 9:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 9/5/2007 at 8:30 AM. Opening Statements and Testimony begins 9/10/2007 at 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 288 Motion to Seal Document (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of UniRAM's Counsel in Support of 288 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 288 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 11/16/2006) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rul 7-11)(Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 11/16/2006) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., UniRAM Technology, Inc.(a California corporation), TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 11/15/2006) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Motion for and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 11/15/2006) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Confidential Declaration of Brandon D. Conard in Support of 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 284 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability due to Inequitable Conduct filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 276 Motion to seal Motion and Declaration (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2006) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER : Further Case Management Conference Continued from 11/7/2006 to 11/21/2006 09:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/6/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2006) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Motion and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 11/1/2006) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 11/1/2006) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] [Revised] (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/1/2006) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 276 MOTION Request To Seal Documents Supporting TSMC's Motion For Summary Judgment For Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Brandon D. Conard in Support of 276 MOTION Request To Seal Documents Supporting TSMC's Motion For Summary Judgment For Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Request To Seal Documents Supporting TSMC's Motion For Summary Judgment For Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] , Confidential Conard Declaration In Support Of Motion (Manual Filing) (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] OF MANUAL FILING (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Edward R. Reines in Support of 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B1# 3 Exhibit B2# 4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 271 ) (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Unenforceability Due To Inequitable Conduct [Redacted] filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 10/31/2006) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Edward R. Reines re Stip for Dismissal (Docket #269). (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/26/2006) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Monolithic System Technology. (Whitley, Guang Ming) (Filed on 10/24/2006) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED Minute Entry of further case management conference held on 8/1/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. TSMC shall allow UniRam to depose Fu-Chieh Hsu, Ed Chen, CC Cstai, Somnuct Ratanphangart and Chu-San Yoo by the end of September 2006. The court will hold a hearing on August 11, 2006 at 10:30 am, at which time TSMC's customers may challenge the proposed production of TSMC's customers' tapeout files. Any written submissions from TSMC's customers shall be filed with the court not later than August 8, 2006. UniRam shall pare down its number of alleged trade secrets from 212 to 12 by October 20, 2006. Further Case Management Conference set for November 7, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2006) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER. UniRAM shall pare down its number of alleged trade secrets from 212 to 12: 10/27/2006. Fact Discovery Cutoff for depositions of already requested party witnesses and subpoenaed third parties: 10/27/2006. Expert Reports by party with burden of proof: 11/8/2006. Rebuttal Expert reports: 12/8/2006. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 12/22/2006. Last day to file dispositive motions: 1/26/2007. Dispositive motion hearing: 3/1/2007 at 2:00 PM. Joint proposed final pretrial order: 4/9/2007. Pretrial Conference: 5/8/2007 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/11/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Amend Case Management Deadlines by Monolithic System Technology. (Whitley, Guang Ming) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 210 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Monolithic System Technology. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/2/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2006) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FURTHER ORDER RE TSMC'S INTERROGATORY NO. 12 re 261 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/2/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2006) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE UNIRAM'S TRADE SECRET LIST re 244 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE TSMC'S INTERROGATORY NO. 19 re 242 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/28/2006. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Letter of September 25, 2006 re UniRam's Response to INterrogatory No. 12.FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT A to Joint Letter (Uniram's Seventh Supplemental Trade Secret) filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE TSMC'S INTERROGATORY NO. 14 re 241 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 245 Motion to Seal Document (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 250 Motion to Seal (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE TSMC'S '050, '186, AND '226 PATENTS re 239 Letter filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,, 243 Letter filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.,, TSMC, North America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of UniRAM's Counsel in Support of 250 MOTION to Seal [Administrative Request Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Joint Letter Regarding Interrogatory No. 12 Under Seal] filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 250 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of UniRAM's Counsel in Support of 245 MOTION to Seal Document [Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Exhibit A to Joint Letter Under Seal filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 245 ) (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 250 MOTION to Seal [Administrative Request Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Joint Letter Regarding Interrogatory No. 12 Under Seal] by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Edward R. Reines in Support of 250 MOTION to Seal [Administrative Request Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Joint Letter Regarding Interrogatory No. 12 Under Seal] filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 250 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal [Administrative Request Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Joint Letter Regarding Interrogatory No. 12 Under Seal] filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from [Joint Letter] Edward R. Reines and Russ Chorush Regarding Interrogatory No. 12. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America Re Exhibit A to Joint Letter (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 245 MOTION to Seal Document [Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Exhibit A to Joint Letter Under Seal by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Edward R. Reines in Support of 245 MOTION to Seal Document [Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Exhibit A to Joint Letter Under Seal filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 245 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document [Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 & 79-5 To File Exhibit A to Joint Letter Under Seal filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from [Joint Letter] Edward Reines and Ian Crosby Regarding Trade Secret List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from TSMC Regarding Inventor Notebooks. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/19/2006) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from [Joint Letter] Edward Reines and Russ Chorush Regarding TSMC's Interrogatory No. 19. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/19/2006) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from [Joint Letter] Edward Reines and Russ Chorush Regarding TSMC's Interrogatory No. 14. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/19/2006) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER: MoSys' and TSMC's Third, Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims against UniRAM in their respective Answers to UniRAM's Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/14/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2006) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from UniRAM Technology, Inc. regarding inventor notebooks. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2006) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Confidential EXHIBITS 4-5 re 221 Letter Brief filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.(a California corporation), UniRAM Technology, Inc.(a California corporation), UniRAM Technology, Inc., UniRAM Technology, Inc.(a California corporation), UniRAM Technology, Inc.(a California corporation), UniRAM Technology, Inc.(a California corporation). FILED UNDER SEAL. (Related document(s) 221 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2006) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 219 Motion to Seal exhibits 4 and 5 to UniRam's 8/17/2006 letter. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE TSMC'S U.S. PATENT NUMBERS '638, '186, '050, AND '226 re 231 Letter filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/11/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Dismissal of Certain Counterclaims Related to the '148 Patent Without Prejudice by Monolithic System Technology(a Delaware corporation), Monolithic System Technology, Monolithic System Technology(a Delaware corporation). (Yagura, Ryan) (Filed on 8/31/2006) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Mark E. McKane to Hon. Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker re: Production of 0.13 Tapeout Files. (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 8/31/2006) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Michael D. Broaddus to Hon. Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker Re: Production of 0.13um Tapeout Files. (Broaddus, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2006) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Russell Chorush in Response to TSMC's 8/29/06 Letter Regarding 0.13um Tapeouts. (Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 8/30/2006) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Plaintiff UniRAM and Defendant TSMC regarding inventor notebooks. (Tuttle, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2006) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from TSMC Requesting Clarification Re 0.13um Customer Tapeouts. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/29/2006) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Modified STIPULATION for PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2006) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Regarding #221 filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 8/23/2006) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from UniRAM Technology, Inc. Correction of Docket # 221. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 8/23/2006) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/11/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2006) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Modified Protective Order by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/18/2006) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. The parties have agreed to engage in settlement discussions before Judge Charles B. Renfrew and propose to do so on 9/6/2006 at 10:00 a.m. in lieu of a settlement conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Larson. The parties have furthermore agreed, for purposes of settlement discussions before Judge Renfrew, to adhere to the terms of the Settlement Conference Order including mandatory attendance of Party representatives, and all required written submissions by the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/18/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2006) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 212 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2006) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TSMC's Customer Submissions and Supporting Documents re Productions of Tapeouts by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(Schwab, George) (Filed on 8/17/2006) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of George M. Schwab in Support of 219 MOTION to Seal Document UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 Declaration of UniRAM's Counsel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 219 ) (Schwab, George) (Filed on 8/17/2006) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting UniRAM Technology, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11)(Schwab, George) (Filed on 8/17/2006) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Hearing re proposed production of TSMC's customer tape out files held on 8/11/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. The court heard argument from counsel regarding: (1) the relevance of the tape out files to the underlying litigation, (2) the burden that producing the tape out files would impose on TSMC's customers and (3) what procedures or restrictions the court should impose to accommodate these competing interests. UniRAM stated that it was willing to view the files on a secure, non-networked workstation at a site determined by TSMC. The court directed the parties on or before August 14, 2006, to propose an amended protective order that expands coverage to TSMC's customers and provides additional restrictions on patent prosecution. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2006) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/1/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Belle Ball.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2006) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Agere Systems Inc. Notice of "Highly Confidential -- Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation to TSMC's Production of Tapeout Files (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2006) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from TSMC including Modified Protective Order. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/16/2006) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Amend Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 8/15/2006) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 196 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Tuttle. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2006) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Michael D. Broaddus filed by Intel Corporation. Fee paid. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third Party Pixim, Inc.'s Written Submission Re Its Trade Secrets and Confidential Information by Pixim, Inc. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ryan K. Yagura (Yagura, Ryan) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 207 MOTION to Seal Document TSMC's Customer Submissions and Supporting Documents re Production of Tapeouts by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Brandon Conard in Support of 207 MOTION to Seal Document TSMC's Customer Submissions and Supporting Documents re Production of Tapeouts filed byTaiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Related document(s) 207 ) (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document TSMC's Customer Submissions and Supporting Documents re Production of Tapeouts filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to PROPOSED PRODUCTION OF "TAPE OUT" DATABASES by Marvell Semiconductor Israel, Ltd.. (Molano, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to TSMC's Production of Tapeout Files by Agere Systems Inc.. (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation re 202 Objection of Intel's Objections to Production of Tapeout File (Broaddus, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to Intel's Objections to Production of Tapeout File, Including Exhibits 1 and 2 by Intel Corporation. (Broaddus, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to UniRAM's Demand For Customers' Complete Tapeouts - (Submission Re Production of Tapeouts in The 0.13 um Generation) by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America. (Conard, Brandon) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to Production of Azul Confidential Material by Azul Systems, Inc.. (Gratzinger, Peter) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to OBJECTIONS OF NON-PARTY VIA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. TO TSMC'S PRODUCTION OF TAPEOUT FILES by VIA Technologies, Inc. USA. (Ochs, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/1/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. TSMC shall allow UniRam to depose Fu-Chieh Hsu, Ed Chen, CC Cstai, Somnuct Ratanphangart and Chu-San Yoo by the end of September. The court will hold a hearing August 11, 2006, at 10:30 am, at which time TSMC's customers may challenge the proposed production of TSMC's customers' tapeout files. Any written submissions from TSMC's customers shall be filed with the court not later than August 8, 2006. UniRam shall pare down its number of alleged trade secrets from 212 to 12 by October 20, 2006. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2006) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER re 194 Order on Report and Recommendations,,,,, 193 Notice (Other) filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/31/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Robert Tuttle filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/26/2006) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker adopting Report and Recommendations as to 187 . On June 1, 2006, the parties filed a joint meet and confer letter before Magistrate Judge James regarding plaintiff's request to compel defendant Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co, Ltd (TSMC) to produce its tapeout files. Doc #177-1. The parties agreed the files were at least somewhat relevant but TSMC argued the files contained proprietary information about its customers that could not be disclosed. Id. On June 16, 2006, Magistrate Judge James recommended that the undersigned grant Judge James authority to appoint a special master to supervise discovery of the tapeout files. Doc #187. The parties have since met and conferred and agreed on a special master, Lou Brucculeri of Wong, Cabello, Lutsch, Rutherford & Brucculeri, LLP. The court agrees with the magistrate judge's recommendation and pursuant to 28 USC 636(b)(1), GRANTS Magistrate Judge James authority to appoint a special master to supervise discovery related to TSMC's customers' tapeout files, with any expenses to be borne by the parties and TSMC's customers.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006). (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by UniRAM Technology, Inc. of Selection of Special Master (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 7/13/2006) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 191 , Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/13/2006. Expert Witness Reports due 10/27/06. Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports due 11/10/06. Expert Witness Discovery Cut-Off 12/8/06. Disp. Mtns. hearing remains set for 2/15/07, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 7/13/06. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2006) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 170 Case Management Scheduling Order,, Stipulated Motion and [Proposed] Order To Amend Pretrial Discovery Deadlines CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 190 . by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Schwab, George) (Filed on 7/12/2006) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 191 . *** STIPULATION re 170 Case Management Scheduling Order,, Stipulated Motion and [Proposed] Order To Amend Pretrial Discovery Deadlines by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Schwab, George) (Filed on 7/5/2006) Modified on 7/17/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FINAL CONTENTIONS AND REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS. (1). The date for UniRAM to submit final infringement contentions under Patent Local Rule 3-6(a) is extended to 15 days after completion of UniRAM's deposition of TSMC and MoSys pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) on the subject of the accused products. (2). The dates for TSMC and MoSys to submit final invalidity contentions under Paten Local Rules 3-6(b)(1) and (2) are consolidated and extended to 20 days. (3). The date for the parties to serve rebuttal expert reports is extended to and includes 10/27/2006. (4). The date by which discovery from experts must be concluded is extended to and includes 11/17/2006.. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/22/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2006) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES re 186 Letter filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,, 181 Letter Brief filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2006) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER Objections to R&R due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/16/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Letter dated June 6, 2006. Document Submitted Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order filed 2/6/2005. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 182 Motion to Seal (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 180 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of George M. Schwab in Support of 182 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 Declaration of UniRAM's Counsel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 182 ) (Schwab, George) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwab, George) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief (REDACTED) Joint Letter by R. Chorush and E. Reines regarding 90 nm Embedded DRAM Products -- CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 178 filed byUniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Schwab, George) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document # 178 from Court Docket filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwab, George) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 173 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of John M. Neukom, representing UniRAM Technology Inc. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2006) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY REMOVED BY ORDER OF THE COURT 184 (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Ian Crosby and Edward Reines Regarding Tapeout Files. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to 5-31-06 Joint Letter# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to 5-31-06 Joint Letter# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to 5-31-06 Joint Letter)(Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/1/2006) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT re 175 Stipulation filed by UniRAM Technology, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/1/2006. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2006) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 163 Order Motion and [Proposed] Order to Allow Attachments to Joint Letter by UniRAM Technology, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 5/31/2006) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: FINAL CONTENTIONS AND REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS by Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., TSMC, North America, TSMC, North America. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/30/2006) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 364 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?