Optimumpath LLC v. Belkin International Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-01398
District Judge Claudia Wilken, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 11:11 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Belkin International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Gunnar Anderson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 carlanderson@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Cisco-linksys LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Gunnar Anderson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 carlanderson@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo D-link Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Gunnar Anderson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 carlanderson@quinnemanuel.com
NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Arlo Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, First Solar Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Gunnar Anderson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 carlanderson@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Smc Networks, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan Miller Blair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Joshua D. Cohen +1 925 937 3600 +1 925 943 1106 jcohen@wendel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Eric W Benisek +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 ebenisek@vbllaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/11/2011 Craig E Davis +1 925 791 2923 +1 925 403 0905 cdavis@vbllaw.com
Space Craig E Davis +1 925 791 2923 +1 925 403 0905 cdavis@vbllaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/11/2011 Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/11/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Avin Pravind Sharma +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0904 asharma@vbllaw.com
No Logo Buffalo Technology (usa), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Avin P. Sharma +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 aps@classcounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oblon, Spivak, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Cabral , +1 703 412 3527 rcabral@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Richard D. Kelly +1 703 412 6241 +1 703 413 2220 rkelly@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Robert Carter Mattson +1 703 413 3000 rmattson@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Takahiro Miura +8 133 507 5830 +8 133 507 5907 tmiura@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank Jonah West +1 703 413 3000 +1 703 413 2220 fwest@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Frank Jonah West +1 703 413 3000 +1 703 413 2220 fwest@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth David Wilcox +1 703 413 3000 +1 703 413 2220 kwilcox@oblon.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Kenneth David Wilcox +1 703 413 3000 +1 703 413 2220 kwilcox@oblon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Eric W Benisek +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 ebenisek@vbllaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Craig E Davis +1 925 791 2923 +1 925 403 0905 cdavis@vbllaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo Compex, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stetina Brunda Garred & Brucker, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce B. Brunda +1 949 855 1246 +8556 855 855 6371 GDELGADILLO@STETINALAW.COM
No Logo Optimumpath LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (301) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
Acknowledgment Receipt of returned exhibits. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Belkin International Inc re 312 Clerks Notice of Removal of Exhibits (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 12/4/2012) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
      MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 278 Notice of Appeal filed by Optimumpath LLC (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
        CLERKS NOTICE re withdrawal of exhibits in accordance with LR 79-4(b). (documents #s 245 - 249) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
          MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 278 Notice of Appeal filed by Optimumpath LLC (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
            USCA for the Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to 278 Notice of Appeal filed by Optimumpath LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Entry of Judgment)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
              Brief re 234 Claim Construction Statement, [REDACTED] Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 234 ) (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/27/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 307 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 2 Exhibit BB to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 3 Exhibit JJ to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 4 Exhibit MM to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 5 Exhibit OO to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 6 Exhibit PP to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 7 Exhibit QQ to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 8 Exhibit BBBB to Declaration of Todd M. Briggs In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 238), # 9 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Dr. Nicholas Bambos In Support of Defendants (1) Responsive Claim Construction Brief; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 240))(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/27/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 307 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                    Proposed Order re 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                      Declaration of Erica Tierney in support of re 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNon-Party Apple Inc.(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                        EXHIBITS re 257 Declaration in Support, Exhibit E to Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of Defendants (1) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief; (2) Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 257) filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 257 ) (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                          [REDACTED] Defendants (1) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief re 234 Claim Construction; (2) Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 234 ) (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 293 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants (1) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief; (2) Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of Defendants (1) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief; (2) Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 257), # 2 Exhibit C to Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of Defendants (1) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief; (2) Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; (3) Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Preclude Reliance on the Doctrine of Equivalents; and (4) Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. No. 257))(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 301 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                              [REDACTED] Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents (Dkt. No. 225) filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 290 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 288 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Motion and Motion to Preclude Plaintiff from Asserting a Theory of Infringement under the Doctrine of Equivalents and to Strike Portions of Dr. Dahlberg's Expert Report Discussing the Doctrine of Equivalents by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents (Dkt. No. 226), # 2 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents (Dkt. No. 226))(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 297 Motion to Stay re 295 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Extension of Time to Comply With Order Granting In Part and Deferring In Part Defendants Administrative Motion to Seal [Dkt. No. 291] (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                      Emergency MOTION to Stay re 295 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Extension of Time to Comply With Order Granting In Part and Deferring In Part Defendants Administrative Motion to Seal [Dkt. No. 291] filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. Responses due by 9/26/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl G. Anderson in support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting remainder of Plaintiff's 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying remaining requests to seal in Defendants' administrative motion to seal 235 (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                            Proposed Order re 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by non-party Apple Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 293 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting in part 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 292 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE 253 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART DEFENDANTS 235 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 290 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 227 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Docketing and USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 2011-1458 for 278 Notice of Appeal filed by Optimumpath LLC. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA for the Federal Circuit re appeal 278 Notice of Appeal. (kc, ) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Transcript Designation and Ordering Form: No transcript needed re 278 Notice of Appeal. (kc, ) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re 278 Notice of Appeal(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter from Victoria F. Maroulis re: Motion to Stay Costs. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 5/23/2011) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to non-email address in ECF in this case re 281 Costs Taxed (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Costs Taxed in amount of $ 102,554.04 against Plaintiff Optimumpath LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Opposition to Defendants Bill of Costs and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Optimumpath LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 5/20/2011) Modified on 5/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 307 Filed: 9/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 9/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting in part 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 9/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE 253 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 9/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART DEFENDANTS 235 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 290 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 289 Filed: 9/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 227 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 288 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Optimumpath LLC re 278 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 270 Order, 271 Clerk's Judgment by Optimumpath LLC. Filing fee $ 455.00, Receipt #44611006993. Appeal Record due by 6/17/2011. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 276 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Bill of Costs. Responses due by 5/20/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Bill of Costs filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                BILL OF COSTS by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Carl G. Anderson in support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 4/29/2011) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen Frederick Schlather terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 263 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen W. Abbott terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc against Optimumpath LLC (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 270 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS (Docket No. 234) and GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Docket No. 236) by Judge Wilken. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 267 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant SMC Networks, Inc. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/11/11. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC of Compliance with Order for Pretrial Preparation (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/8/2011) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant SMC Networks, Inc., by Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 4/6/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 265 Stipulation Regarding Exchange of Demonstrative Exhibits. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding Exchange of Demonstrative Exhibits by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc., Optimumpath LLC (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on February 17, 2011, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/15/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2011. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/25/2011) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephen W. Abbott filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 2/17/2011), Further Case Management Conference held on 2/17/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 2/17/2011). Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2011 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/17/2011) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING 259 Stipulation Regarding Use of Visual Aids at February 17, 2011 Hearing. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 259 Stipulation Regarding Use of Visual Aids at February 17, 2011 Hearing. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (ndr, COURT STAFF). *** DISREGARD, SEE ORDER (DOCKET NO. 261). STIP IS DENIED *** (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Use of Visual Aids at February 17, 2011 Hearing by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Regarding Use of Visual Aids at February 17, 2011 Hearing)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/11/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of David C. Currie CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 256 filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 257 . *** Declaration of David C. Currie IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' (1) SUR-REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF; (2) REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT; (3) REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS; AND (4) REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Corby R. Vowell in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Brief Regarding Claim Construction and Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment filed byOptimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Errata C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/20/2011) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/20/2011) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit AAAA to re 238 Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of Claim Construction, Summary Judgment and Preclusion Brief filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/29/2010) Modified on 12/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT QQQ re 238 Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 238 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT AA filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT AAAA (CD) re 238 Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 238 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT ZZZ (CD) re 238 Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 238 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT YYY (CD) re 238 Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 238 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT ZZ (Apple AirPort Wireless Router) re 238 Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 238 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT R (CD - Linda Frager Deposition) re 238 Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 238 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 240 Declaration in Support, EXHIBIT 1 TO BAMBOS DECLARATION filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Related document(s) 240 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/24/2010) (Entered: 12/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re MOTION for Summary Judgment, Motion to preclude reliance on the doctrine of equivalents by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/24/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS ADDITIONAL TO TODD M. BRIGGS DECLARATION re 238 filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OOO, # 2 Exhibit PPP, # 3 Exhibit QQQ, # 4 Exhibit RRR, # 5 Exhibit SSS, # 6 Exhibit TTT, # 7 Exhibit UUU, # 8 Exhibit VVV, # 9 Exhibit WWW, # 10 Exhibit XXX, # 11 Exhibit YYY, # 12 Exhibit ZZZ, # 13 Exhibit AAAA, # 14 Exhibit BBBB)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/24/2010) (Entered: 12/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS ADDITIONAL TO TODD M. BRIGGS DECLARATION re 238 filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CCC, # 2 Exhibit DDD, # 3 Exhibit EEE, # 4 Exhibit FFF, # 5 Exhibit GGG, # 6 Exhibit HHH, # 7 Exhibit III, # 8 Exhibit JJJ, # 9 Exhibit KKK, # 10 Exhibit LLL, # 11 Exhibit MMM, # 12 Exhibit NNN)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/24/2010) (Entered: 12/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Nicholas J. Bambos in support of motion for summary judgment and claim construction brief filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 238 Declaration in Support,, EXHIBITS AA-BBB TO THE DECLARATION OF TODD M. BRIGGS filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit CC, # 4 Exhibit DD, # 5 Exhibit EE, # 6 Exhibit FF, # 7 Exhibit GG, # 8 Exhibit HH, # 9 Exhibit II, # 10 Exhibit JJ, # 11 Exhibit KK, # 12 Exhibit LL, # 13 Exhibit MM, # 14 Exhibit NN, # 15 Exhibit OO, # 16 Exhibit PP, # 17 Exhibit QQ, # 18 Exhibit RR, # 19 Exhibit SS, # 20 Exhibit TT, # 21 Exhibit UU, # 22 Exhibit VV, # 23 Exhibit WW, # 24 Exhibit XX, # 25 Exhibit YY, # 26 Exhibit ZZ, # 27 Exhibit AAA, # 28 Exhibit BBB)(Related document(s) 238 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of TODD M. BRIGGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND PRECLUSION BRIEF filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. Claudia Wilken. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Summary Judgment (NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF) filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Duchemin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Corby R. Vowell, # 2 Exhibit 1 - '281 patent, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Dahlberg Depo excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 3 - SMC User Guide excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 4 - D-Link User Guide excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 5 - IEEE Dictionary Definition)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/2/2010) Modified on 12/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WIHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS 225 MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM ASSERTING A THEORY OF INFRINGEMENT UNDER THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS AND TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. DAHLBERGS EXPERT REPORT (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting re 231 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Deposition of Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/29/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/29/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Extending Deadline for Deposition of Apple, Inc. by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/23/2010) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Preclude Plaintiff From Asserting a Theory of Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents and To Strike Portions of Dr. Dahlbergs Expert Report Discussing the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/23/2010) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Edward W. Goldstein in Opposition to 225 MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents [REDACTED] MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents [REDACTED] filed byOptimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 225 ) (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 11/18/2010) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 225 MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents [REDACTED] MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents [REDACTED] filed byOptimumpath LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 11/18/2010) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Preclude and Strike and Exhibits D,E, F, and G to the Declaration of Edward W. Goldstein in Support. filed by Optimumpath LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 11/18/2010) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of 225 MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions to NETGEAR, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions to Cisco-Linksys, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions to D-Link, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions to SMC, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions to SMC, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Preliminary Claim Constructions, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Spearman Deposition Excerpts, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Email Correspondence)(Related document(s) 225 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/4/2010) Modified on 11/5/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents [REDACTED] filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report and Preclude Assertion of Doctrine of Equivalents)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/4/2010) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Motion To Preclude Plaintiff from Asserting a Theory of Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents and to Strike the Portions of Dr. Dahlbergs Expert Report Discussing the Doctrine of Equivalents and Exhibits 7 and 8 thereto filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 11/4/2010) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion for Protective Order; granting 211 Motion (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James for handling of Motion 210 for Protective Order and Motion 211 for Leave to Take Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/18/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 215 Motion to Amend/Correct (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of 219 Reply Memorandum filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Related document(s) 219 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/14/2010) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum re 211 MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Discovery from Apple, Inc. filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/14/2010) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of 217 Memorandum in Opposition, To Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Under Federal R. Civ. P. 26(c) filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15 - Email Correspondence 9/23/10 - 9/24/10, # 2 Exhibit 16 - 9/24/10 Letter, # 3 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Cisco-Linksys LLC, # 4 Exhibit 18 - 9/8/10 Letter re: NETGEAR, # 5 Exhibit 19 - 9/8/10 Letter re: Belkin, # 6 Exhibit 20 - 9/8/10 Letter re: Cisco-Linksys, # 7 Exhibit 21 - 9/8/10 Letter re: D-Link, # 8 Exhibit 22 - Notice of Deposition of Doug Karl)(Related document(s) 217 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/7/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 210 MOTION for Protective Order Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/8/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 211 MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Discovery from Apple, Inc. filed byOptimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Corby R. Vowell in Support of Plaintiff OptimumPath, LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to take Limited Discovery from Apple, Inc., # 2 Exhibit A_Vowell Declaration - Belkin's Objections_Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit B_Vowell Declaration - Excerpts of Doug Karl's Deposition Testimony, # 4 Exhibit C_Vowell Declaration - Doug Karl Depo. Exhibit #27 (KARLNET000688-689))(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 10/7/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Case Management Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 213 Granting Joint Stipulation RE THE NON-DISCOVERABILITY OF EXPERT COMMUNICATIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/28/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE THE NON-DISCOVERABILITY OF EXPERT COMMUNICATIONS by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc., SMC Networks Inc., Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of David C. Currie in Support of 211 MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Discovery from Apple, Inc. filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Doug Karl Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 2- Document Subpoena to Apple, Inc., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Subpoena to Apple, Inc., # 4 Exhibit 4 - Email Correspondence (4/21/10 - 4/23/10), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Email Correspondence (3/24/10 - 5/18/10), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Email Correspondence (6/22/10 - 6/29/10), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Email Correspondence (7/19/10), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Email Correspondence (3/15/10 - 3/16/10), # 9 Exhibit 9 - Email Correspondence (6/22/10 - 8/2/10), # 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Deposition of Belkin International, Inc., # 11 Exhibit 11 - Email Correspondence (9/7/10), # 12 Exhibit 12- Letter (9/15/10), # 13 Exhibit 13 - Email Correspondence (9/22/10), # 14 Exhibit 14 - Email Correspondence (9/3/10 - 9/16/10))(Related document(s) 211 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 9/23/2010) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Discovery from Apple, Inc. filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery from Apple, Inc.)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 9/23/2010) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) filed by Optimumpath LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Corby R. Vowell in Support of Motion for Protective Order Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c), # 2 Exhibit A - Subpoenas to Apple, # 3 Exhibit B - Subpoenas to Michaels, # 4 Exhibit C - Defendant Emails, # 5 Exhibit D - Belkin Initial Disclosures, # 6 Exhibit E - OptimumPath Initial Disclosures, # 7 Exhibit F - Defendant's Invalidity Contentions, # 8 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Email, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c))(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 9/17/2010) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 208 Granting Stipulation RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 205 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Ingrid Yang. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 204 Stipulation of Dismissal of Compex Inc. Only. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Ingrid Yang ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005648.) filed by D-Link Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Compex Inc. Only by Optimumpath LLC, Compex Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2010) Modified on 9/2/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 201 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen W. Abbott (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen W. Abbott ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005597.) filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE DEEMING OBJECTION DENIED (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of 198 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 195 Order filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - March 19, 2010 Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - April 1, 2010 E-mail, # 3 Exhibit C - April 21, 2010 Letter, # 4 Exhibit D - April 23, 26, and 27, 2010 E-mail chain, # 5 Exhibit E - Standing Order on Discovery and Dispute Procedures, # 6 Exhibit October 19, 2009 Declaration of Anthony C. Spearman)(Related document(s) 198 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 195 Order filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/25/2010) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 196 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER re 194 Letter, filed by Cisco Linksys LLC, Belkin International Inc, Optimumpath LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, SMC Networks Inc, Netgear Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/8/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Plaintiff OptimumPath, LLC and Defendants Belkin International, Inc., Cisco-Linksys, LLC, D-Link Systems, Inc., NETGEAR, Inc. and SMC Networks, Inc. Regarding Dispute as to Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Word Product Protection. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 5/21/2010) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 192 Granting Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/30/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. by Optimumpath LLC, Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2010) Modified on 4/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY by Judge Maria-Elena James (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/09/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS RELATING TO PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS KNOWINGLY DISCLOSED TO THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE by Cisco Linksys LLC. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 4/7/2010) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Todd M. Briggs in Support of 187 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Privileged Documents Knowingly Disclosed to the United States Patent and Trademark Office filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 187 ) (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 4/7/2010) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Relating to Privileged Documents Knowingly Disclosed to the United States Patent and Trademark Office filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 4/7/2010) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 185 Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steinberg, Stephen) (Filed on 3/15/2010) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc of Change of Firm Name (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 3/11/2010) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 170 Motion to Stay (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 181 granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulated Protective Order; (Proposed) Order by SMC Networks Inc., Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC (Steinberg, Stephen) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement filed by Optimumpath LLC, Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc,SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Opposition re 170 MOTION to Stay filed byOptimumpath LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/7/2010) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 170 MOTION to Stay by Compex Inc. (Brunda, Bruce) (Filed on 12/31/2009) Modified on 1/4/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 170 MOTION to Stay by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (Cabral, Robert) (Filed on 12/31/2009) Modified on 1/4/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 170 MOTION to Stay filed byBelkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/31/2009) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jack Weaver in Support of 173 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySMC Networks Inc. (Related document(s) 173 ) (Steinberg, Stephen) (Filed on 12/31/2009) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Eric W. Benisek in Support of 173 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric W. Benisek)(Related document(s) 173 ) (Steinberg, Stephen) (Filed on 12/31/2009) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 170 MOTION to Stay filed bySMC Networks Inc. (Related document(s) 170 ) (Steinberg, Stephen) (Filed on 12/31/2009) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Victoria F. Maroulis (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 12/23/2009) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 1/21/10 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay filed; (Proposed) Order by Optimumpath LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/15/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Optimumpath LLC : Correction of Attorney's Name (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 10/21/2009) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Briggs (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/20/2009) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to Withdraw 162 Motion to Amend/Correct Court's Management Order. by Optimumpath LLC (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 10/20/2009) Modified on 10/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 11/19/09 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 164 JOINT MOTION TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order filed by Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 10/15/2009) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 161 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Comply with PLR 4-2 (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct : Amend Court's Managaement Order filed by Optimumpath LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Comply with PLR 4-2 filed by Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 159 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stephen L. Schlather (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Stephen L. Schlather ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004186.) filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Optimumpath LLC of Withdrawal of Billy C. Killough and John W. Fletcher (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 9/23/2009) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Optimumpath LLC Regarding service of its Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3.1 (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/27/2009) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Compex Inc identifying Corporate Parent Compex Systems PTE LTD for Compex Inc. (Brunda, Bruce) (Filed on 7/20/2009) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 140 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Edward W. Goldstein (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 139 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Corby R. Vowell (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options from Compex, Inc. (Brunda, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2009) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT # 155 *** Certificate of Interested Entities by Compex Inc (Brunda, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2009) Modified on 7/21/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Netgear Inc (none) (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 7/7/2009) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by D-Link Systems Inc identifying Corporate Parent D-Link Corporation for D-Link Systems Inc. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 7/7/2009) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Cisco Linksys LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cisco Systems, Inc. for Cisco Linksys LLC. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 7/7/2009) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Belkin International Inc (none) (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 7/7/2009) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Shiou-Jin Christine Hwang Yang (Yang, Shiou-Jin Christine) (Filed on 7/6/2009) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by SMC Networks Inc (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 7/2/2009) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Optimumpath LLC, SMC Networks Inc. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2009) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Buffalo Technology USA Inc of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 7/2/2009) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Buffalo Technology USA Inc (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 7/2/2009) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Defendant SMC Networks, Inc. (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 7/2/2009) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Edward W. Goldstein filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/1/2009) Modified on 7/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***FEE PAID, SEE DOCUMENT # 137 *** (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Corby R. Vowell filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/1/2009) Modified on 7/1/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***FEE PAID, SEE DOCUMENT # 138 *** (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Corby R. Vowell ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003815.) filed by Optimumpath LLC. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Edward W. Goldstein ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003815.) filed by Optimumpath LLC. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/7/09 at 11:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Milde, Breck) (Filed on 6/24/2009) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Optimumpath LLC. (Milde, Breck) (Filed on 6/24/2009) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 6/24/2009) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 6/24/2009) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 6/23/2009) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 129 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Robert S. Cabral. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Robert S. Cabral ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003742.) filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 127 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Takahiro Miura (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Takahiro Miura ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611003645.) filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on May 13, 2009. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) Modified on 5/13/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Richard D. Kelly by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009) Modified on 5/13/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Richard D. Kelly (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611003601) filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 109 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert C. Mattson. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Frank J. West. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 113 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Kenneth D. Wilcox. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting 115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Manton McCutchen Grier and Sarah Spruill terminated. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Re: Manton Grier and Sarah Spruill [Proposed] Order filed by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Compex Inc. (Anderson, Carl) (Filed on 5/8/2009) Modified on 5/11/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/11/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 113 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Kenneth D. Wilcox by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Kenneth D. Wilcox (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611003571) filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Frank J. West by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Frank J. West (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611003573) filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert C. Mattson by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert C. Mattson (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611003572) filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce B. Brunda on behalf of Compex, Inc. (Brunda, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2009) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR BUFFALO TECHNOLOGY (USA), INC. and SMC Networks, Inc. by Avin P. Sharma. (Sharma, Avin) (Filed on 4/30/2009) Modified on 5/1/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2009. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2009 04:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer from U.S.D.C. South Carolina (Florence), Case No. 4:08-cv-317-TLW. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009) Modified on 3/31/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 4:08-cv-00317. Electronically transferred file with documents numbered 1 - 103. Modified on 4/1/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 69 Motion to Transfer Case. This case is transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 3/30/09.(swel, ) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion to Remand held on January 14, 2009, before Judge Thomas E. Rogers, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond D. Simmons, Telephone number 843-610-1896. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 4/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2009. (rsimmons, ) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2009 re 69 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Belkin International Inc, Optimumpath LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, SMC Networks Inc, Netgear Inc. Counsel present Craig Evan Davis, Manton Grier, Sarah Spruill, Billy Craig Kilough, Victoria Maroulis and Corlby Vowell. Arguments heard. Court will make ruling. Court Reporter Ray Simmons. (tsin, ) Modified to add attorney Sarah Spruill on 1/14/2009 (tsin, ). (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 69 MOTION to Transfer Case : Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2009 11:00 AM in Florence #3, McMillan Federal Bldg., 401 W. Evans St., Florence before Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers III. (swel, ) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 9/23/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 6/16/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joshua D. Cohen by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/7/2008 ; No proposed order Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Spruill, Sarah) Modified on 6/16/2008 to remove order (swel, ). (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 6/10/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 69 MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. Modified to correct event type(swel, ) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Stay re 69 MOTION to Transfer Case by Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc and Optimumpath LLC Response to Motion due by 6/16/2008 ; Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel; Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Spruill, Sarah) Modified on 5/28/2008 to add all filers listed on document and to remove order (swel, ). (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Optimumpath LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/6/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Spearman Affidavit)(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Compex, Inc.'s Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Compex Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compex Inc. (Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Compex, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Compex Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 63 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of SMC Networks by Optimumpath LLC.(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 60 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Netgear by Optimumpath LLC.(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of D-Link Systems by Optimumpath LLC.(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Cisco-Linksys by Optimumpath LLC.(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Belkin International by Optimumpath LLC.(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 69 MOTION to Transfer Case. Response to Motion due by 5/26/2008 Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 5/9/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to # 69 Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Optimumpath LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/20/2008 )No proposed order Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Killough, Billy) Modified on 5/5/2008 to remove proposed order, to correct motion relief and to link correct event to associated event (swel) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/21/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/21/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/21/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/21/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 4/21/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Transfer Case by Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Anderson part 1, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Anderson part 2, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Anderson part 3, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Anderson part 4, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Bettino, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Gorjanc, # 9 Affidavit Declaration of Hassel, # 10 Affidavit Declaration of Inaba, # 11 Affidavit Declaration of Kennedy, # 12 Affidavit Declaration of Wang)No proposed orderMotions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Buffalo Technology USA Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Buffalo Technology USA Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Buffalo Technology USA Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by SMC Networks Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SMC Networks Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimumpath LLC by SMC Networks Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Netgear Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Netgear Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimumpath LLC by Netgear Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by D-Link Systems Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by D-Link Systems Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimumpath LLC by D-Link Systems Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cisco Linksys LLC.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cisco Linksys LLC.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimupath LLC by Cisco Linksys LLC.(Spruill, Sarah) Modified on 4/24/2008 to correct to edit text (swel, ). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Belkin International Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Belkin International Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimumpath LLC by Belkin International Inc.(Spruill, Sarah) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND re 1 Complaint, filed by Optimumpath LLC. Compex is required to answer or otherwise plead or respond to the complaint up to and including May 23,2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 4/23/08. (swel, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles K. Verhoeven ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001480313) by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victoria F. Maroulis ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001480281) by Belkin International Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl Gunnar Anderson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001480243) by Belkin International Inc, Cisco-Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc and Netgear Inc.Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) Modified on 4/23/2008 to add all filers listed on document(swel, ). (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard C. Vasquez ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001479834) by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen C. Steinberg ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001479819) by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Avin Pravind Sharma ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001479802) by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig Evan Davis ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001479769) by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua D. Cohen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001479718) by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric W. Benisek ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001479668) by SMC Networks Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth D. Wilcox ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001458274) by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank J. West ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001458228) by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Takahiro Miura ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001458187) by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Mattson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001458070) by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Kelly ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001457695) by Buffalo Technology USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 1) Application for Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order(Grier, Manton) Modified on 4/9/2008 to remove filers at request of attorney and to correct name(swel, ). (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Manton McCutchen Grier on behalf of Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc (Grier, Manton) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY DELETED - Document # 29 - Reason for deletion: Document not signed by filing user - corrected document filed - Corrected Filing Document Number: #31 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 3/13/08 (swel, ) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optimumpath LLC. Defendant Cisco Linksys LLC served on 2/11/2008, answer due 3/3/2008. (Killough, Billy) Modified filing date on 3/18/2008 (swel, ). (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 3/10/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 3/10/08.(swel, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER extending time to answer 1 Complaint, filed by Optimumpath LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 3/3/2008. (swel, ) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III for FULL PRE TRIAL, NON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 3/3/08. (swel, ) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optimumpath LLC. D-Link Systems Inc served on 2/19/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (Killough, Billy) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued (Restricted Access) as to Cisco Linksys LLC. (swel, ) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optimumpath LLC. SMC Networks Inc served on 2/18/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (swel, ) M (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optimumpath LLC. Netgear Inc served on 2/18/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (swel, ) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optimumpath LLC. Compex Inc served on 2/18/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (swel, ) ). (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed; Belkin International Inc served on 2/10/2008, answer due 3/3/2008. (swel, ) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed ; Buffalo Technology USA Inc served on 2/13/2008, answer due 3/4/2008. (swel, ) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corby R. Vowell ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001366894) by Optimumpath LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/3/2008 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward W. Goldstein ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001366855) by Optimumpath LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/3/2008 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Killough, Billy) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT MAILED 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark placed in U.S. Mail to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 (prou, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (prou, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT MAILED: Two copies of each 4 Summons Issued placed in U.S. Mail to Billy Craig Killough (prou, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued (Restricted Access) as to Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc. (prou, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Optimumpath LLC.(prou, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology USA Inc, Cisco Linksys LLC, Compex Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, SMC Networks Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1349618.), filed by Optimumpath LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 281 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Assigned Interest to WP Media, # 3 Exhibit C - Assignment, # 4 Exhibit D - Amended Articles of Organization)(prou, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 234 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?