Implicit Networks, Inc. v. Sybase, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-01478

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:33 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Implicit Networks, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ClearmanPrebeg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Prebeg +1 713 223 7070 +1 713 223 7071 mprebeg@clearmanprebeg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Suder & Cooke PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corby R Vowell +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 vowell@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Wecker +1 415 633 1908 +1 415 358 4980 bwecker@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie McArthur LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer Hosie +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 shosie@hosielaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie Rice LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Bishop +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 gbishop@hosielaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prebeg, Faucett & Abbott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen W Abbott +1 832 742 9260 +1 832 742 9261 sabbott@pfalawfirm.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Bettinger +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 mbettinger@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Anne Hogan +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 hhogan@sidley.com
v.
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Bettinger +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 mbettinger@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Anne Hogan +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 hhogan@sidley.com
No Logo Sybase, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D Fowler +1 650 833 2048 +1 650 833 2001 mark.fowler@dlapiper.com
No Logo Implicit Networks, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ClearmanPrebeg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Prebeg +1 713 223 7070 +1 713 223 7071 mprebeg@clearmanprebeg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Suder & Cooke PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corby R Vowell +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 vowell@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Wecker +1 415 633 1908 +1 415 358 4980 bwecker@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie McArthur LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer Hosie +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 shosie@hosielaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie Rice LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Bishop +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 gbishop@hosielaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prebeg, Faucett & Abbott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen W Abbott +1 832 742 9260 +1 832 742 9261 sabbott@pfalawfirm.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., 3rd party defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara Darlene Fraizer +1 650 839 5097 +1 650 839 5071 fraizer@fr.com
VMware, Inc. VMware, Inc., 3rd party defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara Darlene Fraizer +1 650 839 5097 +1 650 839 5071 fraizer@fr.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejduice.(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION "STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS BY IMPLICIT NETWORKS, INC. AND MICROSOFT CORPORATION, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER" by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
      ORDER granting 55 Motion to Relate Case re 10-720. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
        Response re 55 MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12) MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12) byVMWare, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 3/16/2010) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Implicit Networks, Inc. re 55 MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12) MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/10/2010) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION to Relate Case to 10-720 JCS (Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12) filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/09/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on Emin G. Sirer on March 1, 2010, filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                PROTECTIVE ORDER (as modified) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order re: Disclosure of Confidential Materials by Microsoft Corporation. (Hogan, Holly) (Filed on 2/10/2010) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 51 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULING ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                      Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/15/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 1/20/2010). Case continued to 5/14/10 @ 3:00 p.m.. for Further Case Management ConferenceCase continued to 7/7/10 @ 3:30 p.m. for TutorialCase continued to 7/8/10 @ 3:30 p.m. Markman () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                        Proposed Order FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Microsoft Corporation. (Hogan, Holly) (Filed on 1/19/2010) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER RELATING CASE (Case 09-5628 VRW and Case 09-5633 SBA to Case 09-1478 SI).. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/13/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2010) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT "JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT" filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 1/11/2010) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                ORDER granting 43 Motion to Relate Case; granting 44 Motion to Relate Case re 09-5628, 09-5633. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Relate Case to 09-5628-VRW, 09-5633-SBA and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Hogan, Holly) (Filed on 1/8/2010) Modified on 1/8/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Relate Case "STIPULATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED" to 09-5633-SBA filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                      ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                        Letter from Michel J. Bettinger Objecting to Implicit's Reply Letter Brief. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2009) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                          Letter Brief re 38 Reply Memorandum CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 39 filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/20/2009) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                            *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 40 . *** Letter Brief re 38 Reply Memorandum filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/20/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                              Reply Memorandum To Motion To Compel Filed by Implicit Networks, Inc. filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2009) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                Letter Brief re 35 Letter Brief with Exhibits A-D filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/12/2009) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009
                                                  ORDER granting extension of patent local rule deadlines re 31 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Letter Brief re 34 Letter Brief filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/10/2009) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Letter Brief re 32 Letter filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/10/2009) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of Holly Hogan in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2009) Modified on 11/9/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Letter from Michael J. Bettinger in Response to Motion to Compel. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2009) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] to Extend Time for Patent Local Rule 4-2 Deadline by Microsoft Corporation. (Hogan, Holly) (Filed on 11/4/2009) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Declaration in Support of 29 Letter Brief filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/2/2009) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Letter Brief filed byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/2/2009) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER granting 27 motion to withdrawal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009) Modified on 9/30/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney "NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR IMPLICIT NETWORKS, INC. AND [PROPOSED] ORDER" filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/25/2009) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Statement "PLAINTIFF IMPLICIT NETWORKS, INC.'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES" by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/10/2009) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/31/9 before Illston (Date Filed: 8/3/2009). 1/15/10 @ 3:00 pm for further case management (see attached for further scheduling) () (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/4/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 7/24/2009) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER TO 21 COUNTERCLAIM "IMPLICIT NETWORKS, INC.'S ANSWER TO MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S COUNTERCOMPLAINT" byImplicit Networks, Inc.. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 7/20/2009) Modified on 7/21/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation. (Hogan, Holly) (Filed on 7/14/2009) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Implicit Networks, Inc. byMicrosoft Corporation. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2009) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2009) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Implicit Networks, Inc. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 6/23/2009) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Implicit Networks, Inc. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 6/23/2009) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2009 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER dismissing Sybase, Inc., only (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION "STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF SYBASE, INC. WITH PREJUDICE AND PROPOSED ORDER" by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/18/2009) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting second request for extension of time. re 12 Signed by Judge ILLSTON on 5/7/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/6/2009
                                                                                                  STIPULATION (SECOND) TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR SYBASE, INC. by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 5/4/2009) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT SYBASE, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Sybase, Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 4/24/2009) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR MICROSOFT by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/21/2009) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ORDER RELATING CASE to 09-1342, 09-1478. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009) Modified on 4/20/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. Sybase, Inc. served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 4/13/2009) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. Microsoft Corporation served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 4/13/2009) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 7/7/2009
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Sybase, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?