Johnson v. Thoratec Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:04-cv-03168

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 2:08 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Craig Toby, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Connie M. Cheung +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 ConnieC@milberg.com
No Logo Jerrell Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
Space Courtland Wayne Creekmore +1 619 798 2006 +1 480 247 4553 ccreekmore@csgrr.com
Space Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 pgeller@rgrdlaw.com
Space William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN MATTHEW STEIN +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 jstein@saxenawhite.com
No Logo John Bowden, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesley Elizabeth Weaver +1 310 556 5637 +1 310 496 1454 LWeaver@InitiativeLegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Maniskas +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
Space Tamara Skvirsky +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
Space Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
No Logo Mark Stromberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo Michael Brauth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack W. Fruchter +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 jfruchter@aftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bing Zhang Ryan +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 bingzhangryan@magstonelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lawrence Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey W. Lawrence +1 415 725 7973 +1 415 454 2348 jeffreyl@jlawrencelaw.com
No Logo The Cornelia I. Crowell Gst Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
Space Michael Marc Goldberg +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mmgoldberg@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo D. Keith Grossman, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Nelson, Defendant
No Logo M. Wayne Boylston, Defendant
No Logo Thoratec Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Collins +1 650 849 5309 +1 650 849 5333 pcollins@gibsondunn.com
Space Michael B. Smith +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 986 5309 mbsmith@gibsondunn.com
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Motion Hearing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2006 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 11/17/2006) re [61] MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Craig Toby,, [60] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Craig Toby,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER AWARDING LEAD COUNSEL'S ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
        FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Declaration in Support
          Declaration of Jeffrey D. Light in Support of [61] MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byCraig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Part 1# (2) Exhibit A, Part 2)(Related document(s)[61]) (Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Declaration in Support
            Declaration of William B. Federman in Support of [61] MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byCraig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[61]) (Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Declaration in Support
              Declaration of Craig D. Toby in Support of [61] MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, [60] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed byCraig Toby. (Related document(s)[61], [60]) (Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Declaration in Support
                Declaration of Jeffrey W. Lawrence in Support of [61] MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, [60] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed byCraig Toby. (Related document(s)[61], [60]) (Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT re [61] MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, [60] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds Affidavit of RSM McGladrey, Inc. in Connection with Notice by Mailing and Publication by Craig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Motion for Attorney Fees
                    MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Craig Toby. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A# (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Awarding Lead Counsel's Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 ~Motion for Settlement
                      MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Craig Toby. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds# (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Light, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER Preliminary Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice:Final Approval of Settlement/Fairness Hearing set for 11/17/2006 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Proposed Order
                          Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice by Craig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1# (2) Exhibit A-2# (3) Exhibit A-3)(O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION of Settlement by Craig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit A-1# (3) Exhibit A-2# (4) Exhibit A-3# (5) Exhibit B)(O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/3/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Stipulation
                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint by M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/12/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Stipulation
                                    STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Thoratec Corporation. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Amended Complaint
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against all defendants. Filed byCraig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q)(Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/15/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Stipulation
                                          STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Craig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Granting [31] Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/10/06. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Motion Hearing
                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte re [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed by Thoratec Corporation,, D. Keith Grossman,, M. Wayne Boylston,, Jeffrey Nelson,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, Court Staff)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 ERRATA
                                                ERRATA re [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS MEMO OF LAW AND REPLY by Jeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman, Jeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Smith, Michael) (Filed on 6/15/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Craig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/3/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Reply Memorandum
                                                    Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byJeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 5/23/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Reply to Opposition
                                                      Reply to Opposition re [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed byJeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 5/23/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting [42] Application of William B. Federman for Admission Pro Hac Vice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005, Terminated: 5/12/2005 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                          APPLICATION of William B. Federman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Craig Toby, Jerrell Johnson, Mark Stromberg, John Bowden, Jr, The Cornelia I. Crowell Gst Trust, Michael Brauth. (fee paid) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                            Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's (Corrected) Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws filed byCraig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/21/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                              Memorandum in Opposition PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byCraig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/18/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Oppostion re [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed byCraig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[31]) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/18/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2005 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/05. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/31/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Stipulation
                                                                    STIPULATION &ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Craig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/24/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2005 09:00 AM. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/16/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Craig Toby. Service waived by Jeffrey Nelson waiver sent on 1/25/2005, answer due 3/28/2005. (Cheung, Connie) (Filed on 3/8/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Proposed Order
                                                                          Proposed Order re [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS by Jeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 3/4/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice re [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed byJeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[31]) (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 3/4/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Declaration in Support
                                                                              Declaration of JONATHAN C. DICKEY in Support of [31] MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed byJeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (Related document(s)[31]) (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 3/4/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005, Terminated: 5/11/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed by Jeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2005 09:00 AM. (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 3/4/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting [28] Application of Michael B. Smith for admission Pro Hac Vice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge RONALD M. WHYTE granting [10] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005, Terminated: 2/1/2005 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      APPLICATION of Michael B. Smith for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Jeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman. (fee paid) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge RONALD M. WHYTE on 01/14/05. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against Jeffrey Nelson, M. Wayne Boylston, Thoratec Corporation, D. Keith Grossman (Filing fee $ 150.). Filed byCraig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q)(Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/18/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: THE FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Craig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/7/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                              ****** E-FILED IN ERROR, REFER TO DOCUMENT # 25 ****** STIPULATION STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: THE FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Craig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/7/2005) Modified on 1/19/2005 (bf, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2005 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2005. (mp, ) (Filed on 12/8/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge RONALD M. WHYTE on 11/22/04. (mp, ) (Filed on 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                    STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 42 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Craig Toby. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on Motion to Appoint Craig Toby as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Co-Lead Counsel; Craig Toby's Motion to Consolidate Realted Actions. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2004 09:00 AM. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 11/8/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re [8] MOTION to Consolidate Cases DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND TO PRESERVE DOCUMENTS BY PROPOSED LEAD PLAINTIFF CRAIG TOBY filed by M. Wayne Boylston, D. Keith Grossman, Thoratec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Collins, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Declaration of Brian O. O'Mara in Support of [17] Notice of Non-Opposition and Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Craig Toby as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Craig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[17]) (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/6/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Craig Toby re [10] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Non-Opposition and Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Craig Toby as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Co-Lead Counsel (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/6/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/4/04. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 10/5/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Certificate of Counsel
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel Bing Ryan Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Brian O. O'Mara on behalf of Craig Toby (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Certificate of Counsel
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Jeffrey W. Lawrence Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Brian O. O'Mara on behalf of Craig Toby (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Certificate of Counsel
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel William S. Lerach Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Brian O. O'Mara on behalf of Craig Toby (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [10] Granting Motion to Appoint Craig Toby as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Co-Lead Counsel by Craig Toby. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Brian O. O'Mara in Support of [10] Motion to Appoint Craig Toby as Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Craig Toby. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D part 1# (5) Exhibit D part 2# (6) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[10]) (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004, Terminated: 2/1/2005 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Craig Toby. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2004 09:00 AM. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [8] Granting Craig Toby's Motion to Consolidate Related Actions Pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and to Preserve Documents by Craig Toby. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Craig Toby. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2004 09:00 AM. (O'Mara, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/13/04. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/10/04. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/04. (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO MOVE TO DISMISS OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by M. Wayne Boylston, D. Keith Grossman, Thoratec Corporation. (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 8/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerrell Johnson. M. Wayne Boylston served on 8/4/2004, answer due 8/24/2004; D. Keith Grossman served on 8/4/2004, answer due 8/24/2004; Thoratec Corporation served on 8/4/2004, answer due 8/24/2004. (Coughlin, Patrick) (Filed on 8/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 SEC Class Action Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                          SEC CLASS ACTION SCHEDULING ORDER SEC Class Action Notice due by 8/23/2004. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2004 10:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT; Summons issued; Jury Demand; against M. Wayne Boylston, D. Keith Grossman, Thoratec Corporation ( Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 3362573). Filed by Jerrell Johnson. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2004 (gm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?