USA Sunset Media 3, LLC et al v. U.S. Advisor, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00654
District Judge Richard Seeborg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 5, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
No Logo USA Sunset Media 9, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Joseph Sugerman +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 sugerman@gkhs.com
v.
CB Richard Ellis Investors, LLC CB Richard Ellis Investors, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Herrington +1 310 586 7700 +1 310 586 7800 herringtonr@gtlaw.com
CB Richard Ellis Group CB Richard Ellis Group, Defendant
Officially listed as "CB Richard Ellis Investors, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Herrington +1 303 473 2700 +4732 473 473 2720
No Logo CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Herrington +1 310 586 7700 +1 310 586 7800 herringtonr@gtlaw.com
No Logo Gavin Hinze, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Herrington +1 303 473 2700 +4732 473 473 2720
No Logo Glen McCrae, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Fitzgerald, Defendant
No Logo Michael Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Paula Mathews, Defendant
No Logo Strategic Capital Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Advisor, LLC, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Select Securities LLC, Defendant
No Logo USA Sunset Media Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Herrington +1 303 473 2700 +4732 473 473 2720
No Logo USA Sunset Media, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Herrington +1 303 473 2700 +4732 473 473 2720
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California filed by CB Richard Ellis Investors, L.L.C., CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC, Kevin Fitzgerald, Gavin Hinze, Paula Mathews, Glen McCrae, Michael Schwartz, Strategic Capital Holdings, LLC, U.S. Advisor, LLC, U.S. Select Securities LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC, USA Sunset Media Management, LLC, USA Sunset Media, LLC. Responses due by 7/25/2011. Replies due by 8/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2011) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of PLAINTIFF USA SUNSET MEDIA 10, LLC ONLY by USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC (Sugerman, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/18/2011) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
        CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a) by CB Richard Ellis Investors, L.L.C., CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC, Gavin Hinze, USA Sunset Media Management, LLC, USA Sunset Media, LLC. (Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 6/28/2011) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC re 15 Stipulation (Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 6/23/2011) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER RE: 15 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                STIPULATION To Continue Case Management Conference by CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) by CB Richard Ellis Investors, L.L.C., CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC, Gavin Hinze, USA Sunset Media, LLC, USA Sunset Media Management, LLC. (Herrington, Robert) (Filed on 5/19/2011) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                    CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal AS TO USA SUNSET MEDIA 6, LLC, ONLY by USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC (Sugerman, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/15/2011) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC. Glen McCrae served on 3/6/2011, answer due 3/28/2011. (Sugerman, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/10/2011) Modified on 3/11/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC. U.S. Advisor, LLC served on 3/2/2011, answer due 3/23/2011. (Sugerman, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/10/2011) Modified on 3/11/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                            CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/3/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC re 3 Summons Issued, Case Referred to ECF, 4 Clerks Notice, 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 1 Complaint,,,,, 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,,, (Sugerman, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC. (Sugerman, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/1/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiffs re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due 3/2/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Summons Issued as to CB Richard Ellis Investors, L.L.C., CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC, Kevin Fitzgerald, Gavin Hinze, Paula Mathews, Glen McCrae, Michael Schwartz, Strategic Capital Holdings, LLC, U.S. Advisor, LLC, U.S. Select Securities LLC, USA Sunset Media, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT for Damages for Federal Securities Act Violations; Demand for Jury Trial against CB Richard Ellis Investors, L.L.C., CB Richard Ellis Investors/U.S. Advisor, LLC, Kevin Fitzgerald, Gavin Hinze, Paula Mathews, Glen McCrae, Michael Schwartz, Strategic Capital Holdings, LLC, U.S. Advisor, LLC, U.S. Select Securities LLC, USA Sunset Media, LLC (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611056228). Filed by USA Sunset Media 21, LLC, USA Sunset Media 13, LLC, USA Sunset Media 6, LLC, USA Sunset Media 11, LLC, USA Sunset Media 3, LLC, USA Sunset Media 32, LLC, USA Sunset Media 17, LLC, USA Sunset Media 18, LLC, USA Sunset Media 33, LLC, USA Sunset Media 29, LLC, USA Sunset Media 20, LLC, USA Sunset Media 22, LLC, USA Sunset Media 8, LLC, USA Sunset Media 31, LLC, USA Sunset Media 15, LLC, USA Sunset Media 9, LLC, USA Sunset Media 19, LLC, USA Sunset Media 24, LLC, USA Sunset Media 4, LLC, USA Sunset Media 30, LLC, USA Sunset Media 7, LLC, USA Sunset Media 25, LLC, USA Sunset Media 10, LLC, USA Sunset Media 28, LLC, USA Sunset Media 23, LLC, USA Sunset Media 27, LLC, USA Sunset Media 26, LLC, USA Sunset Media 12, LLC, USA Sunset Media 5, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to the Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?