Bahramipour v. Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:04-cv-04440

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 26, 2018 at 11:06 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Austin Heberger, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Demchak, Baller, Borgen & Dardarian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Borgen +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 dborgen@gdblegal.com
No Logo Guita Bahramipour, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Kelson +1 510 465 1326 +1 510 465 0871 kelsonlaw@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin T Berger +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 692 3606 jberger@cpmlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dostart Clapp & Coveney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Clapp +1 858 623 4200 +1 858 623 4299 jclapp@sdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffman Libenson Saunders & Barba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Tim Hoffman +1 510 763 5700 +1 510 835 1311 hth@hoffmanandlazear.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of James Andre Boles

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Micheline Fairbank +1 775 284 1500 +1 775 703 5027 thier2@callatg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Thierman +1 775 284 1500 +1 775 703 5029 laborlawyer@pacbell.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazear Mack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur William Lazear +1 510 735 6316 arthur@lazearmack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shustak and Partners

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arian A. Baryalai +1 619 696 9500 +1 619 615 5290 abaryalai@shufirm.com
Space Thomas C Frost +1 619 696 9500 +1 619 615 5290 tfrost@shufirm.com
Space Erwin Jay Shustak +1 619 696 9500 +1 619 615 5290 shustak@shufirm.com
No Logo Janella Hairston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry K. Cimmet +1 650 866 4700 +1 650 866 4770 cimlaw@me.com
v.
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher T. Scanlan +1 415 677 6427 +1 415 677 6262 christopher.scanlan@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris A. Hollinger +1 415 984 8906 +1 415 984 8701 chollinger@omm.com
Space Adam P. KohSweeney +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 akohsweeney@omm.com
Space Framroze Murzban Virjee +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 fvirjee@omm.com
No Logo Judge (Ret.) Charles A. Legge, Special Master
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Labor: Fair Standards
  Entries (171) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RELATING CASE with member case C-09-238-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/6/09. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
    MOTION to Relate Case Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/26/2009) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
      Letter from Jeffrey R. Sweers. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER re 162 granting STIPULATION Allowing Payment of Late Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/1/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying as moot 158 MOTION to Remove or Seal Letter ; denying as moot 161 MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Supplemental Declaration of James F. Clapp Under Seal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Allowing Payment of Late Claims by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Clapp, James) (Filed on 6/18/2008) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
              MOTION for Administrative Relief to File Supplemental Declaration of James F. Clapp Under Seal filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Clapp, James) (Filed on 6/16/2008) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                Proposed Order re 158 MOTION to Remove or Seal Letter Filed by Guita Bahramipour by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 6/13/2008) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                  Declaration of James F. Clapp in Support of 158 MOTION to Remove or Seal Letter Filed by Guita Bahramipour filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 6/13/2008) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Remove or Seal Letter Filed by Guita Bahramipour filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 6/13/2008) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Letter to Judge Claudia Wilken, dated 6/9/08, from Guita Bahramipour. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008) (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying without prejudice 131 MOTION To Appoint Special Master for Purpose of Allocating Attorney's Fees Among Certain of the Plaintiffs' Attorneys (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 126 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 137 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 142 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 154 Motion to Compel (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                            MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by John Kelson. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/13/2008) Modified on 5/14/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                              Proposed Order Granting Petition to Compel Arbitrationby John Kelson. (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/13/2008) Modified on 5/14/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                Declaration of Justin T. Berger in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by John Kelson. (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/13/2008) Modified on 5/14/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                  Declaration of John M. Kelson in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by John Kelson. (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/13/2008) Modified on 5/14/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston re 149 Declaration in Support, 148 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                      Declaration of James F. Clapp in Response to Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Thierman Law Firm and Hoffman & Lazear filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/12/2008) Modified on 5/13/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to re 137 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Thierman Law Firm and Hoffman & Lazear by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/12/2008) Modified on 5/13/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                          Proposed Order Denying Motion for Order Shortening Time by John Kelson. (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/12/2008) Modified on 5/13/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 137 motion for order shortening time filed by John Kelson. (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/12/2008) Modified on 5/13/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Theodore Berger (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry K. Cimmet (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Proposed Order re 142 Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Directing Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class by Mark R. Thierman, H. Tim Hoffman (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Directing Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class filed by Mark R. Thierman, H. Tim Hoffman. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Directing Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class by Mark R. Thierman, H. Tim Hoffman (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Proposed Order re 137 Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Order Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Declaration of David Borgen in Support of 137 Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Order Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class filed by Mark R. Thierman, H. Tim Hoffman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s 1 thru 7, # 2 Exhibit s 8 thru 14)(Related document(s) 137 ) (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/2/05 before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Starr Wilson. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Order Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Mark R. Thierman, H. Tim Hoffman Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Order Class Counsel to Disburse Court-Approved Attorneys' Fees for the California Class; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Mark R. Thierman, H. Tim Hoffman (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 6/12/08 hearing vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston re 132 Declaration in Support, 133 Proposed Order, 131 MOTION To Appoint Special Master for Purpose of Allocating Attorney's Fees Among Certain of the Plaintiffs' Attorneys (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/8/2008) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Proposed Order re 131 MOTION To Appoint Special Master for Purpose of Allocating Attorney's Fees Among Certain of the Plaintiffs' Attorneys by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/8/2008) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Declaration of James F. Clapp in Support of 131 MOTION To Appoint Special Master for Purpose of Allocating Attorney's Fees Among Certain of the Plaintiffs' Attorneys filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Related document(s) 131 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/8/2008) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION To Appoint Special Master for Purpose of Allocating Attorney's Fees Among Certain of the Plaintiffs' Attorneys filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/8/2008) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on March 13, 2008 before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter: Raynee H. Mercado (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2008) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Borgen (Borgen, David) (Filed on 5/5/2008) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2008) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 6/12/08 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2008) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by Guita Bahramipour. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Shustak Declaration, # 3 Baryalai Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proof of Service)(Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Modified on 4/7/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston re 124 Judgment (Clapp, James) (Filed on 3/24/2008) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/21/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston re 122 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT (Clapp, James) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston, Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER re (114 in 4:04-cv-04440-CW) granting MOTION TO LIMIT SUBSEQUENT COLLECTIVE ACTIONS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc., (51 in 4:07-cv-00801-CW) granting MOTION TO LIMIT SUBSEQUENT COLLECTIVE ACTIONS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, filed by Smith Barney. Signed by Judge Clauida Wilken on 3/21/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (51) Motion for Settlement; granting (52) Motion for Settlement; granting in part (54) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:07-cv-00801-CW; granting (101) Motion for Settlement; granting in part (102) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (114) Motion for Settlement in case 4:04-cv-04440-CW (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2008 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/13/2008) re (54 in 4:07-cv-00801-CW) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements (52 in 4:07-cv-00801-CW) MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (114 in 4:04-cv-04440-CW) MOTION TO LIMIT SUBSEQUENT COLLECTIVE ACTIONS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, (101 in 4:04-cv-04440-CW) MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, (51 in 4:07-cv-00801-CW) MOTION TO LIMIT SUBSEQUENT COLLECTIVE ACTIONS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, (102 in 4:04-cv-04440-CW) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2008) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 101 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements REVISED [Proposed] Order (1) Granting the Class Representatives' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; (2) Granting Class Counsel's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Litigation Expenses; and (3) Granting in Part Class Counsel's Motion for Plaintiff Enhancements by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 3/14/2008) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum In Support of Objection to Settlement filed byGuita Bahramipour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Baryalai, Arian) (Filed on 3/12/2008) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 101 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 3/5/2008) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 114 MOTION TO LIMIT SUBSEQUENT COLLECTIVE ACTIONS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION TO LIMIT SUBSEQUENT COLLECTIVE ACTIONS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration of Caryn Donly re claims administration filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Declaration of Mark R. Thierman in Support of 101 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston, et al. (Related document(s) 101 , 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Declaration of Jeffrey G. Smith in Support of 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Larry LaVoice. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Declaration of Bruce H. Nagel in Support of 101 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Mark Brahney, et al. (Related document(s) 101 , 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan by Joseph Blood. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Arthur W. Lazear in Support of 101 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Related document(s) 101 , 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Declaration of John M. Kelson in Support of [ 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston, et al. (Related document(s)( 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Declaration of Max Folkenflik in Support of 101 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Francis Poliandro Heath. (Related document(s) 101 , 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Edward P. D'Alessio in Support of Enhancements for Donita Williams, Kenneth Glick, Lewis Shapiero filed by Donita Williams, et al. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jerry K. Cimmet in Support of 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Donita Williams, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Declaration of James F. Clapp in Support of 101 MOTION Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, 102 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 101 , 102 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Expenses, and Plaintiff Enhancements filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston, et al. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston, et al. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Leslie A. Klein in Support of 97 RESPONSE TO CERTAIN OBJECTIONS FILED BY PUTATIVE MEMBERS OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, filed byCitigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Douglas Campbell, Jr. in Support of 97 RESPONSE TO CERTAIN OBJECTIONS FILED BY PUTATIVE MEMBERS OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, filed byCitigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Adam P. KohSweeney in Support of 97 RESPONSE TO CERTAIN OBJECTIONS FILED BY PUTATIVE MEMBERS OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, filed byCitigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 97 ) (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE CERTAIN OBJECTIONS FILED BY PUTATIVE MEMBERS OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS re 92 Objection, 90 by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston OF FILING OF SPECIAL MASTER'S POST HEARING REPORT, FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Post Hearing Report)(Clapp, James) (Filed on 1/9/2008) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston OF CONTINUANCE OF: (1) HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL MASTER, AND (2) FINAL APPROVAL HEARING (Clapp, James) (Filed on 11/16/2007) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting stipulation re (93 in 4:04-cv-04440-CW), (43 in 4:07-cv-00801-CW) continuing hearing date to 12/19/07 at 1:00pm for Special Master to consider objections to allocation of settlement proceeds, and final approval hearing to 3/13/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/14/07. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order: (1) Continuing Hearing Date for Special Master to Consider Objections to Allocation of Settlement Proceeds; and (2) Continuing Final Approval Hearing by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston, Guita Bahramipour, Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 11/9/2007) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS to Final Approval of Settlement by Guita Bahramipour. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration# 2 Proof of Service)(Baryalai, Arian) (Filed on 11/6/2007) Modified on 11/7/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to approval of settlement agreement and MOTION for continuance filed by Objector Robert S. Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING - LETTERS REGARDING CLASS SETTLEMENT (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 88 granting STIPULATION Approving Form of Summary Notice for Publication in Wall Street Journal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/17/07. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Approving Form of Summary Notice for Publication in Wall Street Journal by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Clapp, James) (Filed on 9/14/2007) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 86 granting STIPULATION (REVISED) : (1) ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; (2) APPROVING CLASS NOTICE; AND (3) SETTING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/5/07. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION (REVISED) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER: (1) ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; (2) APPROVING CLASS NOTICE; AND (3) SETTING DEADLINES by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; (1) ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; (2) APPROVING CLASS NOTICE; AND (3) SETTING DEADLINES by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston of Filing Supplemental Special Master's Report (Clapp, James) (Filed on 8/17/2007) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 82 granting JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE AUGUST 16, 2007 STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/15/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE AUGUST 16, 2007 STATUS CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Scanlan, Christopher) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken in case 4:07-cv-00801-CW; granting (79) Ex Parte Application to Vacate Dates in May 11, 2007 Order and Ex Parte Application to Vacate Dates in May 11, 2007 Order in case 4:04-cv-04440-CW (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2007) Modified on 7/3/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION ADDENDUM TO JOINT STIPULATION OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Application to Vacate Dates in May 11, 2007 Order filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 72 MOTION to Adopt Report of Special Master and to Authorize Mailing of Class Notice. 5/15/07 hearing and FCMC vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA by Guita Bahramipour re 76 Notice of Appearance (Baryalai, Arian) (Filed on 5/10/2007) Modified on 5/11/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Arian Abdullah Baryalai (Baryalai, Arian) (Filed on 5/10/2007) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 72 MOTION to Adopt Report of Special Master and to Authorize Mailing of Class Notice by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/9/2007) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston re 72 MOTION to Adopt Report of Special Master and to Authorize Mailing of Class Notice, 73 Declaration in Support, (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of James F. Clapp in Support of 72 MOTION to Adopt Report of Special Master and to Authorize Mailing of Class Notice filed byAustin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 72 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Adopt Report of Special Master and to Authorize Mailing of Class Notice filed by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR*** Answer to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT SMITH BARNEY, A DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT byCitigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 5/4/2007) Modified on 5/7/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Austin Heberger, Jr, Janella Hairston of Filing of Special Master's Report (Clapp, James) (Filed on 4/30/2007) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 67 granting STIPULATION Continuing April 27, 2007 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/26/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 66 granting Substitution of Counsel by Guita Bahramipour. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/24/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2007) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing April 27, 2007 Case Management Conference by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 4/24/2007) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Guita Bahramipour (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Shustak, Erwin) (Filed on 4/23/2007) Modified on 4/24/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of David C. Holland Regarding Distribution of Initial Notice Pursuant to Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 re 52 Stipulation, by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 3/19/2007) Modified on 3/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2007 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/2/2007) re 53 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2007) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 53 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Guita Bahramipour. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Lodging of Exhibit by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. re 52 Stipulation (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 3/1/2007) Modified on 3/2/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 58 granting STIPULATION Appointing the Hon. Charles A. Legge as Special Master. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/21/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Hon. Charles A. Legge in Support of 58 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Appointing the Hon. Charles A. Legge as Special Master filed byAustin Heberger, Jr. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Appointing the Hon. Charles A. Legge as Special Master by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jeffrey G. Smith in Support of 52 Joint Stipulation of Class Action Settlement and Release filed byAustin Heberger, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 52 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of W. William Brab in Support of 53 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAustin Heberger, Jr. (Related document(s) 53 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of James F. Clapp in Support of 53 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAustin Heberger, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 53 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 53 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Austin Heberger, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Stipulation of Class Action Settlement and Release by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RELATING CASE; hearing on joint motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement will be held in both cases on 3/2/07 at 10:00am. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/13/07. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2007) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 47 48 granting Stipulation re 47 Joint MOTION to Relate Case No. 07-801, Motions terminated: 47 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/13/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2007) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 46 granting STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (1) CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND (2) SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/9/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Proposed Order re 47 Joint MOTION to Relate Case No. 07-801 by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/8/2007) Modified on 2/9/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Relate Case No. 07-801 filed by Austin Heberger, Jr. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 2/8/2007) Modified on 2/9/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (1) CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND (2) SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/7/2007) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 44 granting STIPULATION Permitting the Parties to File Their Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval on February 7, 2007. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Permitting the Parties to File Their Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval on February 7, 2007 by Guita Bahramipour. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 1/31/2007) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 42 granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference and Set Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2007) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Continue Case Management Conference and Set Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Guita Bahramipour. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 1/24/2007) Modified on 1/25/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Further Case Management Conference) filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 1/18/2007) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 39 granting STIPULATION CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JANUARY 26, 2007. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/4/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2006) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JANUARY 26, 2007 by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 11/30/2006) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 37 Granting STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Discovery and Other Case Management Deadlines to Allow Time to Mediate. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2006 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2006 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/16/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2006) Modified on 3/21/2006 (kk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Discovery and Other Case Management Deadlines to Allow Time to Mediate by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 3/14/2006) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 34 granting Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/22/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/16/2006) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer to Amended Complaint byCitigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/10/2006) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against all defendants. Filed byGuita Bahramipour. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 1/20/2006) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 30 Granting as Modified STIPULATION Allowing Filing of First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/18;/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order Allowing Filing of First Amended Complaint by Guita Bahramipour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint)(Clapp, James) (Filed on 1/11/2006) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Guita Bahramipour of Change of Firm Name (Clapp, James) (Filed on 12/23/2005) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2005 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/2/2005) re 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Federal Preemption of Plaintiff's First Claim for Restitution of Alleged Unpaid Overtime Under Fair Labor Standards Act, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Issues. (Court Reporter Starr Wilson, pro tem.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2005) Modified on 12/8/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, Re: FLSA Preemption by Guita Bahramipour. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 11/30/2005) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix re 25 Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Appendix of Authorities Cited in its Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Federal Preemption of Plaintiff's First Claim for Restitution of Alledged Unpaid Overtime Under Fair Labor Standards Act, Or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Issues filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 11/18/2005) Modified on 11/21/2005 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Reply Breif in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Federal Preemption of Plaintiff's First Claim for Restitution of Alleged Unpaid Overtime Under Fair Labor Standards Act, Or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Issues filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 11/18/2005) Modified on 11/21/2005 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix re 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGuita Bahramipour. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Clapp, James) (Filed on 11/10/2005) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGuita Bahramipour. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 11/10/2005) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Federal Preemption of Plaintiff's First Claim for Restitution of Alleged Unpaid Overtime Under Fair Labor Standards Act, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Issues by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Electronic Authorities Cited in Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCitigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Federal Preemption of Plaintiff's First Claim for Restitution of Alleged Unpaid Overtime Under Fair Labor Standards Act, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Issues; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File (docket #18) and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2005) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address of attorney John M. Kelson by Guita Bahramipour (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 16 Granting STIPULATION Order to Continue Discovery and Other Case Management Deadlines to Allow Time to Mediate. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/7/05. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2005) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Discovery and Other Case Management Deadlines to Allow Time to Mediate by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 7/1/2005) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND OTHER CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES TO ALLOW TIME TO MEDIATE by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Scanlan, Christopher) (Filed on 6/29/2005) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2006 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 3/24/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/06/05. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2005) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2005 01:30 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2005) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/25/2005) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 10 Granting STIPULATION selecting Private ADR; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/9/05. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2005) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 2/8/2005) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Re Case Management Scheduling Order For Reassigned Civil Case (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 11/12/2004) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2005 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/3/04. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2004) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Guita Bahramipour. (Clapp, James) (Filed on 11/2/2004) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 11/2/04. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2004) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2004) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. And Request For Reassignment To A United States District Judge. (Hollinger, Chris) (Filed on 10/26/2004) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal,, 2 ADR Scheduling Order & Other Misc. Court Procedures. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2004) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2005 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 4:00 p.m. on 2/28/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2004) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL & Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons - [No Process] from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-04434705. [Filing Fee: $150.00, Receipt Number 3365258]. Filed by Defendant Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2004 (tn, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2004 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?