In re Harmonic Inc. Securities Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:00-cv-02287-PJH
District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 8, 2020 at 4:50 PM EDT (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bruce Burns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan K. Alexander +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 SuziA@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/26/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Paul Montgomery +1 619 231 1058 mattm@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gergosian & Gralewski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward M Gergosian +1 619 237 9500 +1 619 237 9555 ed@gergosian.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward M Gergosian +1 619 237 9500 +1 619 237 9555 ed@gergosian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 + 770 392 0029

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Kessler , +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 dkessler@btkmc.com
Space David Kessler +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 dkessler@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jay Saltzman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay P Saltzman +1 212 943 2300 +1 212 943 2300 jay@saltzmanlawny.com
Space Jay P Saltzman +1 212 943 2300 +1 212 943 2300 jay@saltzmanlawny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan K. Alexander +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 SuziA@rgrdlaw.com
Space Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
Space William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel P Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold Sporn Laitman & Lometti, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Hunciker , +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137 kurt.hunciker@spornlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Hunciker , +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137 kurt.hunciker@spornlaw.com
No Logo David S. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barroway Topaz Kessler Meltzer and Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Danek +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 mdanek@btkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Zivitz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 azivitz@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sylvia Wahba Keller +1 415 703 5386 +1 415 703 5480 sylvia.keller@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 + 770 392 0029

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Cassidy Davis +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 jdavis@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel P Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137
No Logo Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com
Space Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 + 770 392 0029

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
Space William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel P Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137
No Logo Jerry Krim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 + 770 392 0029

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Laura M. Perrone, P.L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura M. Perrone +1 212 949 5500
No Logo Joseph S. Ivanich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Cassidy Davis +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 jdavis@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com
Space Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Primegest SPA-Prime Special, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2001, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel P Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137
No Logo Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706
Space Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com
Space William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com
Space Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermandevalerio.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. +1 415 433 6382 +1 415 433 6382 jtabacco@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman Tabacco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher T. Heffelfinger +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 cheffelfinger@bermantabacco.com
Space Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 jtabacco@bermantabacco.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com
Space Christopher E Lometti +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 clometti@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Coughlin +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 685 6920 patc@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 + 770 392 0029

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jay Saltzman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay P Saltzman +1 212 943 2300 +1 212 943 2300 jay@saltzmanlawny.com
Space Jay P Saltzman +1 212 943 2300 +1 212 943 2300 jay@saltzmanlawny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Cassidy Davis +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 jdavis@rgrdlaw.com
Space Jason Cassidy Davis +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 jdavis@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
Space Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel P Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137
No Logo Robert Sproule, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer & Cannon LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 + 770 392 0029

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090 +1 770 392 0029 cholzer@holzerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Alexandre Balkanski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Anthony J. Ley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda S. Blackman +1 415 268 7000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
Space Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
Space Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Regents of the University of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret L. Wu +1 510 987 9747 +1 510 987 9757 margaret.wu@ucop.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Barry D. Lemieux, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Baryn S. Futa, Defendant
No Logo C-cube Microsystems Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo David Lane, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Donald McKinney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Donald T. Valentine, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Floyd Kvamme, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Frederick Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Gregorio Reyes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Harmonic, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda S. Blackman +1 415 268 7000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
Space Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
Space Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Regents of the University of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret L. Wu +1 510 987 9747 +1 510 987 9757 margaret.wu@ucop.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Kirk Flatow, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Vaillaud, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Michael Yost, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda S. Blackman +1 415 268 7000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
Space Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Regents of the University of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret L. Wu +1 510 987 9747 +1 510 987 9757 margaret.wu@ucop.edu
No Logo Moshe Nazerathy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Richard Foreman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Robin N. Dickson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammy Albarran +1 415 591 7066 +1 415 955 6566 talbarran@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Fitzgerald Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue Gallagher Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana Anthony Rodriguez +1 510 451 3300 +1 510 451 1827 trodriguez@donahue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda S. Blackman +1 415 268 7000
Space Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terri Garland +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 tgarland@mofo.com
Space Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R. Goldman +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 MGoldman@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia Mazza +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mmazza@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Huntley Rice +1 415 268 7000 mrice@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Regents of the University of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret L. Wu +1 510 987 9747 +1 510 987 9757 margaret.wu@ucop.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew H. Rice +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 mrice@sperling-law.com
No Logo Tom Lookabaugh, Defendant
No Logo Umesh Padval, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
No Logo Walt Walczykowski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hchew@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanley Chew +1 408 535 5060 +1 408 535 5066 hanley.chew@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
Space Jerome F. Birn +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 jbirn@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Turner Johnson +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tjohnson@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Hays Pace +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 brandonpace@paulhastings.com
Office Oakland
Filed 6/28/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 1/6/2003
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags AO279,CLOSED,CONSOL,E-Filing,PROTO,REFSET-JCS
  Entries (370) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/29/2008, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [331] Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2017. (Related documents(s) [331]) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Transcript Order
    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/29/2008 before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Pintar, Theodore) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Transcript Order
      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/30/2008 before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, for Court Reporter Sahar McVickar. (Pintar, Theodore) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Notice of change of address
        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND OFFICE ADDRESS by Christopher T. Heffelfinger (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/12/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 judgmentCourt Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/29/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
            ORDER AWARDING CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [308] Motion for Attorney Fees (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS re [323] Reply Memorandum,, filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/29/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008 Motion Hearing
                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2008 before Phyllis J. Hamilton re [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich, [316] Memorandum In Support of Approval of Settlement filed by Michael L. Vaillaud, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Harmonic Inc., Moshe Nazerathy, Robin N. Dickson, Anthony J. Ley, Floyd Kvamme. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn (415) 531-6587) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2008) Modified on 10/29/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Declaration in Support
                  Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses Declaration of Michael Joaquin of Gilardi & Co. LLC filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Related document(s)[308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Reply Memorandum
                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re [308] Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, # (3) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Awarding Class Counsel Attorney Fees and Expenses)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/15/2008) Modified on 10/15/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 order on motion for settlementCourt Filing
                      ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [307] Motion for Settlement (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Proposed Order
                        Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A1, # (2) Exhibit A2, # (3) Exhibit A3)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Motion Hearing
                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2008 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 7/30/2008) re [307] MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich, [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                            Set/Reset Hearings: Final Hearing for Approval of Class Action Settlement set for 10/29/2008 09:00 AM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Notice of change of address
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen R. Basser (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Clerks Notice
                                CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                  Declaration of Melvin R. Goldman in Support of [316] MOTION for Settlement Defendants' Memorandum In Support of Approval of Settlement filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Related document(s)[316]) (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/2/2008 motion for settlement
                                    MEMORANDUM In Support of Approval of Settlement filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 6/2/2008) Modified on 6/3/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                      Declaration of David Kessler, Filed on Behalf of Schiffrin Barroway Topaz & Kessler, LLP in Support of [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                        Declaration of Jay P. Saltzman in Support of [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                          Declaration of Stephen R. Basser, Filed on Behalf of Barrack, Rodos & Bacine in Support of [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                            Declaration of Bjorn I. Steinholt in Support of [307] MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[307], [308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                              Declaration of Robert G. Knollenberg in Support of [307] MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Related document(s)[307], [308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                Declaration of Joseph S. Ivanich in Support of [307] MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Related document(s)[307], [308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                  Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of [307] MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds, [308] MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27)(Related document(s)[307], [308]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 10/29/2008 Motion for attorney fees
                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of an Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 motion for settlement
                                                      MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Proposed Order
                                                        Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1, # (2) Exhibit A-2, # (3) Exhibit A-3)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION and Agreement of Settlement by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit A-1, # (3) Exhibit A-2, # (4) Exhibit A-3, # (5) Exhibit B)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT PAPERS re [303] Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/16/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008) Modified on 5/19/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 stipulation
                                                              STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT PAPERS. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/22/07 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt.. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Letter
                                                                  Letter from Terri Garland to Honorable Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Notice - other
                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF [285] MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND INTERROGATORIES by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Modified on 2/7/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER re [298] Stipulation, filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND INTERROGATORIES by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER Granting re [296] Stipulation filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich (Expert disclosures by 2/13/08).. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 stipulation
                                                                              STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REVISING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/15/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER re [294] Stipulation, filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND INTERROGATORIES by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 2/13/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER re [290], [291] Second Deposition of Charles Conner. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/2007. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 discovery hearing
                                                                                        Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/13/2007 before Edward M. Chen. Defendants are allowed to take second deposition of Charles Conner. Travel costs to be paid by defendants. Court will issue order. (Date Filed: 12/13/2007). (Tape #305p-3:29p.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                          Letter from Matthew H. Rice to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                            Letter from SHAWN A. WILLIAMS to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Declaration of D. ANTHONY RODRIGUEZ in Support of [285] MOTION to Compel Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories Corrected Declaration of D. Anthony Rodriguez in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Related document(s)[285]) (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 1/30/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [285] MOTION to Compel Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                    Declaration of D. Anthony Rodriguez in Support of [285] MOTION to Compel Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Related document(s)[285]) (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 2/6/2008 Motion to compel
                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Letter
                                                                                                        Letter from SHAWN W. WILLIAMS and D. ANTHONY RODRIGUEZ TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE EDWARD M. CHEN. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 11/5/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 discovery hearing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 10/2/2007 before Edward M. Chen (Docket #281-82) Court ordered parties to further meet and confer. (Date Filed: 10/2/2007). (Tape #07-11-LD.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Letter from Matthew H. Rice to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Letter from Shawn A. Willliams to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting [237] Defendants' Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Regarding "Confidential Witnesses." (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by David S. Smith NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER re [258] MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich, [277] Proposed Order filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                      Proposed Order [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [258] Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Protective Order (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2007 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 8/23/2007) re [258] MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; and [237] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Re "Confidential Witnesses" filed by Michael L. Vaillaud, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Harmonic Inc., Moshe Nazerathy, Robin N. Dickson, Anthony J. Ley, Floyd Kvamme. For #237, Court took Defendants Motion under submission and will issue order. For #258, Parties are ordered to meet and confer and to submit joint letter by the end of today. Court will then take matter under submission and will issue order.Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Letter from Jason C. Davis to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Letter from Matthew H. Rice to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                Declaration of JASON C. DAVIS in Support of [271] Reply Memorandum, REPLY TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Related document(s)[271]) (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum re [258] MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                    Letter from D. Anthony Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Regarding "Confidential Witnesses" filed byHarmonic Inc.. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [267] Memorandum in Opposition, PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING "CONFIDENTIAL WITNESSES" filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Related document(s)[267]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING "CONFIDENTIAL WITNESSES" filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Matthew H. Rice in Opposition to [265] Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Matthew H. Rice in Support of Harmonic Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry of [Proposed] Protective Order Governing Confidentiality filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[265]) (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry of [Proposed] Protective Order Governing Confidentiality filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rice, Matthew) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/11/07 before Magistrate Judge Chen. Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzalez. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Shawn A. Williams [Corrected]. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2007 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 7/11/2007) re [225] MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich, [214] MOTION to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Joseph S. Ivanich. Court directed parties to meet and confer in court. Plaintiffs motions are granted in part and denied in part. Defendants have until 7/18/07 to decide whether to provide a 30(b)(6) deponent to testify further about the preservation and collection of documents. Defendants have until 8/15/07 to produce documents. Court will issue order. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans/Juanita Gonzales.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in part [214] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; Granting in Part and Denying in Part [225] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [258] MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/5/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of JASON C. DAVIS in Support of [258] MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9)(Related document(s)[258]) (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/5/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007, Terminated: 8/24/2007 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/5/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                              Mail sent to Robert I. Harwood returned as undeliverable; Docs [234] [235] (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [255] Reply Memorandum, PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(Related document(s)[255]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum re [225] MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [241] Reply Memorandum, AMENDED DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8)(Related document(s)[241]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg OF WITHDRAWAL OF [244] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/29/2007) Modified on 7/2/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT in Response to [244] Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Shawn Williams filed byHarmonic Inc.. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 7/2/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson re [247] Memorandum in Opposition, (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Matthew H. Rice in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of [247] filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A-1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit A-2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit Exhibit I# (11) Exhibit Exhibit J# (12) Exhibit Exhibit K# (13) Exhibit Exhibit L# (14) Exhibit Exhibit M)(Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 7/2/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [237] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 7/2/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [244] MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLED GEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [244] MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLED GEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Related document(s)[244]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/29/2007 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF EXHIBIT 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [241] Reply Memorandum, REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8)(Related document(s)[241]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum re [214] MOTION to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/27/2007 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS 2-5 to [238] Declaration of D. Anthony Rodriguez In Support of Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Regarding "Confidential Witnesses" [Court Doc. No. 238] filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Rodriguez Declaration# (2) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 3# (3) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 4# (4) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 5# (5) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 6)(Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/27/2007) Modified on 6/28/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/27/2007 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING [237] DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORIES RE "CONFIDENTIAL WITNESSES" filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/27/2007) Modified on 6/28/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/27/2007 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION OF D. ANTHONY RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF [237] DEFENDANTS' MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES REGARDING "CONFIDENTIAL WITNESSES" filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 1st Part 01# (2) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 1st Part 02# (3) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 1st Part 03# (4) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 1st Part 04# (5) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 1st Part 05# (6) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 1st Part 06# (7) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 2nd Part 1# (8) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 2nd Part 02# (9) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 2nd Part 3# (10) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 2nd Part 4# (11) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 2nd Part 05# (12) Exhibit DAR Decl. Exhibit 1 2nd Part 6)(Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/27/2007) Modified on 6/28/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 9/13/2007 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Re "Confidential Witnesses" filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Matthew Paul Montgomery (Montgomery, Matthew) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 7/11/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of JASON C. DAVIS in Support of [225] MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF AMENDED DECLARATION OF JASON C. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20# (21) Exhibit 21# (22) Exhibit 22# (23) Exhibit 23# (24) Exhibit 24# (25) Exhibit 25# (26) Exhibit 26# (27) Exhibit 27# (28) Exhibit 28# (29) Exhibit 29# (30) Exhibit 30# (31) Exhibit 31# (32) Exhibit 32)(Related document(s)[225]) (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [214] MOTION to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) AMENDED DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11)(Related document(s)[214]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White for Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/21/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Jeffrey S. White for Phyllis J. Hamilton denying [218] Motion to Seal Document ; denying [222] Motion to Seal (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Mark D. Gursky in Support of [228] Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Mark D. Gursky in Support of Harmonic Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byHarmonic Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit I (continued)# (11) Exhibit J# (12) Exhibit K)(Related document(s)[228]) (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to [225] Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byHarmonic Inc.. (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 6/20/2007) Modified on 6/21/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [225] MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of JASON C. DAVIS in Support of [225] MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20# (21) Exhibit 21# (22) Exhibit 22# (23) Exhibit 23# (24) Exhibit 24# (25) Exhibit 25# (26) Exhibit 26# (27) Exhibit 27# (28) Exhibit 28# (29) Exhibit 29# (30) Exhibit 30# (31) Exhibit 31# (32) Exhibit 32)(Related document(s)[225]) (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007, Terminated: 7/11/2007 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [222] MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE EXHIBITS 14, 15, 19, 21-24 AND 28 TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON C. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUES T FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of JASON C. DAVIS in Support of [222] MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE EXHIBITS 14, 15, 19, 21-24 AND 28 TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON C. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUES T FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Related document(s)[222]) (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007, Terminated: 6/21/2007 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE EXHIBITS 14, 15, 19, 21-24 AND 28 TO THE DECLARATION OF JASON C. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT in Response to [218] Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Deposition Transcript of Diane Georgi filed byHarmonic Inc.. (Garland, Terri) (Filed on 6/6/2007) Modified on 6/7/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [218] MOTION to Seal Document ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS? EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30 by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [218] MOTION to Seal Document ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS? EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30 filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Related document(s)[218]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/21/2007 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS? EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re [214] MOTION to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg re [215] Declaration in Support,, NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF EXHIBIT 1 TO THE DECLARATION OF SHAWN A. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of SHAWN A. WILLIAMS in Support of [214] MOTION to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Redacted)# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11)(Related document(s)[214]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 7/11/2007 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL HARMONIC INC. TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION re [212] Stipulation filed by Robert G. Knollenberg,, Joseph S. Ivanich. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/31/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF GLYNN EMERGING OPPORTUNITY FUND, L.P. AS NAMED PLAINTIFF AND AS LEAD PLAINTIFF re [203] Stipulation filed by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/20/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. With the permission of the district judge, the parties have chosen to attend a mediation in lieu of a settlement conference. Therefore, the settlement conference previously scheduled for 5/2/2007, at 9:30 a.m., is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/19/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re [204] MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, [207] Proposed Order AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. re [204] MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PLAINTIFFS? AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [204] MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of [204] MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[204]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Mark S. Danek in Support of [204] MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byJoseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Related document(s)[204]) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 motion to certify class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Joseph S. Ivanich, Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2007 09:00 AM. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re [43] Stipulation and Order, by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Joseph S. Ivanich# (2) Proposed Order Pursuant to Stipulation)(Danek, Mark) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: substitution of counsel. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 03/20/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [199] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jason C. Davis. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Tammy Albarran (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/19/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jason C. Davis, Fee Paid ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611004163) filed by Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Received Order re [199] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100416.) by Robert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [197] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Samuel P. Sporn. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Samuel P. Sporn, Fee Paid, Receipt Number 34611003663 filed by Lead Plaintiffs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Received Order re [197] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [194] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kurt Hunciker. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [193] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jay P. Saltzman. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kurt Hunciker, Fee Paid, Receipt Number 34611002690 filed by Lead Plaintiffs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jay P. Saltzman, Fee Paid, Receipt Number 34611002689 filed by Lead Plaintiffs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 5/2/2007, at 9:30 AM. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 4/18/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/7/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received Order re [194] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Burns. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Order re [193] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Lead Plaintiffs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [185] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark S. Danek. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting [184] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Andrew L. Zivitz. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re [186] Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/29/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/29/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Clerks Notice re Inclusion of Case Into E-Filing Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE re Inclusion of Case Into E-Filing Program (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 1/25/2007 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 1/26/2007). Plaintiff to file Motion for Class Certification by 4/18/2007; Opposition to be filed by 5/30/2007; Reply to be filed by 6/27/2007 with a hearing to be held on 7/25/2007 at 9:00 AM. Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/13/2008. Disclosure of Experts due by 1/16/2008. Expert Discovery due by 3/12/2008. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 4/16/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2008 02:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 8/11/2008 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Danek, Fee Paid, Receipt Number 34611002105 filed by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew L. Zivitz, Fee Paid, Receipt Number 34611002105 filed by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to Amended Complaint THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT byHarmonic Inc.. (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Received Order re [185] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Received Order re [184] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [180] Case Management Statement (Joint) PLAINTIFFS? [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Wahba, Sylvia) (Filed on 1/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [180] Case Management Statement (Joint) (Defendants' Proposed Order) by Harmonic Inc.. (Wu, Margaret) (Filed on 1/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Wahba, Sylvia) (Filed on 1/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ANSWER TO THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT re [178] Stipulation filed by Harmonic Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/06. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION & [PROPOSED]ORDER REGARDING ANSWER TO THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Harmonic Inc.. (Wu, Margaret) (Filed on 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2007 02:30 PM. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part [167] Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harmonic Inc. re [174] Reply Memorandum DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION TO STRIKE SPECIFIED ALLEGATIONS IN THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION TO STRIKE SPECIFIED ALLEGATIONS IN THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byHarmonic Inc.. (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by D. Anthony Rodriguez (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 8/2/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of [171] Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byRobert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[171]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re [167] MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byRobert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson re [168] Declaration in Support,, [167] MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint, [169] Proposed Order, (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [167] MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of D. Anthony Rodriguez in Support of [167] MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byMoshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[167]) (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006, Terminated: 12/11/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006, Terminated: 6/23/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *****E-FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD AND REFER TO DOCUMENT [167] ***** MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Specified Allegations in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by C-Cube Microsystems, Inc., Alexandre Balkanski, Frederick Brown, Richard Foreman, Donald McKinney, Umesh Padval, Donald T. Valentine, Walt Walczykowski, Gregorio Reyes, Kirk Flatow, Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Tom Lookabaugh, Baryn S. Futa, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson, Michael Yost. (Rodriguez, D.) (Filed on 6/23/2006) Modified on 6/23/2006 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding briefing schedule for motion to dismiss. Motion to dismiss 6/23/06; Opposition 7/24/06; Reply 8/11/06; Hearing 8/11/06. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/14/06. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. (Fitton, Will) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 appeal record returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appeal Record Returned (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against Moshe Nazerathy, Floyd Kvamme, David Lane, Barry D. Lemieux, Michael L. Vaillaud, Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson. Filed byRobert G. Knollenberg, Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER designating case to ECF. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/20/06. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/19/06. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Received Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Received Stipulation and Order regarding designation of case for electronic filing by Plaintiffs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENTS IN RESPONSE to Court's March 17, 2006 Order filed All Parties. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. This matter having been remanded and the mandate having been filed, the parties are ordered to meet and confer and to file within 30 days, a status statement addressing among other things, whether plaintiffs will file an amended complaint against defendant Harmonic, and if so providing a schedule the filing of the remaining pleadings in this case, as well as a suggested schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/17/06. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2006 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA. The judgment of the said District Court is AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part and REMANDED. Case reopened. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiffs of change of firm address (Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP). [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECEIVED REQUEST for Record on Appeal from the USCA. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of firm affiliation filed by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COPY of USCA Order re request for judicial notice. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of related cases by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COPY of USCA Order re opening brief. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Appeal Notification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 03-16238 [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg for dates 5/30/01 ; C/R: Sahar Demos (already prepared); appeal [149-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIVED re appeal [149-1] fee in amount of $ 105.00 ( Receipt # 3349237) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket fee notification form and case information sheet to USCA [149-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of notice of appeal and docket sheet to all counsel [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg from Dist. Court decision order [148-1], judgment [138-1], Scheduling order dismissing case ; appeal filing ddl 12/16/02 [134-1], order [134-2] Fee status NOT PAID [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying motion to amend the judgment [139-1], denying motion for leave to file an amended complaint only as to the C-Cube defendants [139-2] ( Date Entered: 6/12/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg of change of address [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of recent decision pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(d) by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of recent decision pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(d) by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton The date for the hearing on plaintiffs' motion to amend the judgment and for leave to file an amended complaint, previously set for, 2/5/03 is VACATED ( Date Entered: 1/30/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSOLIDATED REPLY by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg re motion to amend the judgment [139-1], re motion for leave to file an amended complaint only as to the C-Cube defendants [139-2] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost to motion to amend the judgment [139-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION by defendant C-Cube Microsystems, defendant Alexandre Balkanski, defendant Frederick Brown, defendant Richard Foreman, defendant Donald McKinney, defendant Umesh Padval, defendant Donald T. Valentine, defendant Walt Walczykowski, defendant Gregorio Reyes to motion to amend the judgment [139-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost ) re: motion to amend the judgment [139-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant C-Cube Microsystems, defendant Alexandre Balkanski, defendant Frederick Brown, defendant Richard Foreman, defendant Donald McKinney, defendant Umesh Padval, defendant Donald T. Valentine, defendant Walt Walczykowski, defendant Gregorio Reyes ) re: motion to amend the judgment [139-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  terminated case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Modification (Administrative) to judgment [138-1] terminating case [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Shawn A. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging re motion to amend the judgment [139-1], re motion for leave to file an amended complaint only as to the C-Cube defendants [139-2] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 15(a) and 59(e) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging to amend the judgment and for leave to file an amended complaint only as to the C-Cube defendants with Notice set for 2/5/03 at 9:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT: It is ordered and adjudged that the complaint s dismissed with prejudice by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton ( Date Entered: 12/2/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MAIL [134-2] addressed to Bull & Lifshitz returned from Post Office [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MAIL [134-2] addressed to Marc Henzel returned from Post Office [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MAIL [134-2] addressed to John Emerson, Jr. returned from Post Office [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re motions to dismiss by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1], granting motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1], granting motion to dismiss second amended complaint [98-1], granting motion to dismiss second amended complaint [97-1] dismissing case ; appeal filing ddl 12/16/02 ( Date Entered: 11/14/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton withdrawing The Law Firm of Harvey Greenfield and substituting attorney Laura M. Perrone representing plaintiff Jerry Krim ( Date Entered: 10/30/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIVED Subtitution of attorney and Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Jerry Krim ) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT of recent decision in support of defendants' motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint by defendant Harmonic Inc. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of firm name by Plaintiff Robert Sproule [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT of recent decision in support of defendants' motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint by defendant Harmonic Inc. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of recent decision in support of defendants' motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint by defendant Harmonic Inc. and the individual Harmonic defendants'. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of recent decision in support of defendants' motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint by defendant C-Cube Microsystems, defendant Alexandre Balkanski, defendant Frederick Brown, defendant Richard Foreman, defendant Donald McKinney, defendant Umesh Padval, defendant Donald T. Valentine, defendant Walt Walczykowski, defendant Gregorio Reyes [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of recent decision in support of defendants' motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint by defendant Harmonic Inc. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of recent decision by defendant Harmonic Inc. in support of motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Statement of facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of recent decision in support of defendants' motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint by defendant Harmonic Inc. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg of change of address [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging to request [113-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA by defendant Harmonic Inc. to [118-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Harmonic Inc. of declaration [120-1], documents [119-1], reply [118-1], reply [117-1], reply [116-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Mark C. Krause on behalf of defendant Harmonic Inc. re motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX of authorities not published in West Reporters and Cited in Harmonic defendants' reply briefs in support of motion to dismiss second consolidated amended complaint filed by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY Memorandum by defendant Harmonic Inc. re motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost re objection [103-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY Memorandum by defendant Harmonic Inc. re motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant C-Cube Microsystems, defendant Alexandre Balkanski, defendant Frederick Brown, defendant Richard Foreman, defendant Donald McKinney, defendant Umesh Padval, defendant Donald T. Valentine, defendant Walt Walczykowski, defendant Gregorio Reyes of declaration [114-1], request [113-1], reply [112-1], reply [111-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Brandon H. Pace on behalf of defendant C-Cube Microsystems, defendant Alexandre Balkanski, defendant Frederick Brown, defendant Richard Foreman, defendant Donald McKinney, defendant Umesh Padval, defendant Donald T. Valentine, defendant Walt Walczykowski, defendant Gregorio Reyes re motion to dismiss second amended complaint [98-1], re motion to dismiss second amended complaint [97-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by defendant C-Cube Microsystems, defendant Alexandre Balkanski, defendant Frederick Brown, defendant Richard Foreman, defendant Donald McKinney, defendant Umesh Padval, defendant Donald T. Valentine, defendant Walt Walczykowski, defendant Gregorio Reyes motion to dismiss second amended complaint [98-1], motion to dismiss second amended complaint [97-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY memorandum of points and authorities by defendant C-Cube Microsystems re motion to dismiss second amended complaint [98-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY Memorandum of C-Cube Officer and Director defendants' by defendant Alexandre Balkanski re motion to dismiss second amended complaint [97-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg in opposition to motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 10/22/01 to Clerk from Shawn A. Williams. [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Shawn A. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg in opposition to the C-Cube officer and director defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second consolidated amended complaint. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg in opposition to motion to dismiss second amended complaint [98-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg to the individual Harmonic defendants' memorandum of points and authorities in support of their motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg to to judicial notice of defendants' exhibits. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of entry by defendant Harmonic Inc. [89-2] order [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Harmonic Inc. of documents [95-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SECOND ERRATA by Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging to [87-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of motion to dismiss second amended complaint [98-1] [97-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (hdj, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendant C-Cube Microsystems to dismiss second amended complaint [3:00-cv-02287] (hdj, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendant to dismiss second amended complaint [3:00-cv-02287] (hdj, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of order received [0-0], documents [95-1], declaration [94-1], motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1], declaration [92-1], motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX of unpublished authorities cited in Harmonic by defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost re motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Xavier Carlos Vasquez on behalf of defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost in support of motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Memorandum In SupportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Mark C. Krause on behalf of defendant Harmonic Inc. in support of motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Memorandum In SupportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendant Harmonic Inc. to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECEIVED Proposed Order (defendant) re: motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1], re: motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint [91-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (scu, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion to dismiss the second amended consolidated amended complaint [93-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (hdj, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of entry of order by defendant's Harmonic Inc., Anthony J. Ley, Robin N. Dickson and defendant Michael Yost [89-1] Scheduling order extending due dates for the briefing schedule. [3:00-cv-02287] (hdj, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton extending due dates for the briefing schedule ( Date Entered: 9/18/01) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging to [87-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT [51-1] by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging of change of address [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Modification (Administrative) to complaint [87-1] adding new parties , terminating party Primegest SPA-Prime, party David S. Smith [3:00-cv-02287] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith of change of address [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; ( C/R: Sahar Demos) minutes [80-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 7/12/01 to Clerk re service list from Leila Ahlstrom-Guerrero. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging [81-1] order [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1], granting motion to dismiss [58-1], granting motion to dismiss [57-1]; The Second Consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 8/13/01. ( Date Entered: 7/10/01) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES: ( C/R Sahar Demos) ( Hearing Date: 5/30/01) that the motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] is submitted; Order to be prepared by Court. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton the stipulation re hearing schedule for motions to dismiss is DENIED ( Date Entered: 5/21/01) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECEIVED Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding hearing schedule for motions to dismiss ( Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging ) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE by Federal Express of declaration [74-1], reply [73-1], reply [72-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Margaret L. Wu on behalf of defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost re motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX of authorities not included in West Reporters that are cited in the "new" harmonic defendants' reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss filed by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY memorandum of points and authorities by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost re motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Hanley Chew re motion to dismiss case [58-1], re motion to dismiss case [57-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion to dismiss case [58-1] submitted by C-Cube Microsystems, Inc. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion to dismiss case [58-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging of opposition memorandum [70-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging in opposition to motion to dismiss case [58-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging re opposition memorandum [68-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging in opposition to motion to dismiss case [58-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging to motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE by electronic mail by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost of declaration [63-1], motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons submitted by defendant C-Cube Microsystems, Inc., Balkanski, Brown, Foreman, McKinney, Padval, Valentine, Walczykowski and Reyes [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Modification (Administrative) to In court hearing will be held 9:00 5/23/01 ; [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION or Interested Entities or Persons by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Margaret L. Wu on behalf of defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost re motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX of Unpublished authorities and other authorities cited filed by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost re motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint with Notice set for 5/23/01 at 9:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Brandon H. Pace re motion to dismiss case [58-1], re motion to dismiss case [57-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE motion to dismiss case [58-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendant C-Cube Microsystems, Inc. to dismiss case with Notice set for 5/23/01 at 10:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by defendants Balkanski, Brown, Foreman, McKinney, Padval, Valentine, Walczykowski and Reyes to dismiss case with Notice set for 5/23/01 at 10:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECEIVED Proposed Order (from defendants C-Cube Microsystems, Inc., Balkanski, Brown, Foreman, McKinney, Padval, Valentine, Walczkowski and Reyes ) re: motion to dismiss case [58-1], re: motion to dismiss case [57-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost ) re: motion to dismiss the "corrected" consolidated amended complaint [61-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging of complaint [51-1], complaint [49-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE served on 1/18/01 in response to the Request for Waiver sent on 12/8/00 submitted by defendants Kirk Flatow, Moshe Nazerathy, Floyed Kvamme, David Lane, Barry Lemieux, Michael Vaillaud; WAIVER OF SERVICE served on 1/11/01 in response to the Request for Waiver sent on 12/8/00 submitted by defendants C-Cube Microsystems Inc, Alex Balkanski, Fred Brown, Richard Foreman, Donald McKinney, Umesh Padval, Donald T. Valentine, Walt Walczykowski and Gregorio Reyes [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of entry by defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson [53-2] order [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton : Defendants will have until 2/16/01 to move to dismiss the "Corrected" Consolidated Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs' opposition papers will be due 3/30/01; defendants' reply papers due 4/27/01; and oral argument will be heard 5/23/01 or as soon thereafter as is convenient for the Court (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIVED Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding briefing schedule for motions to dismiss ( Plaintiff David S. Smith, defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson ) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging; Spector, Roseman & Kodroff, PC withdraw as one of counsel of record for plaintiffs in this action. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF) Modified on 12/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT [49-1] by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging; jury demand [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 10/4/00 ( C/R: Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR 5297) minutes [42-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SUMMONS issued as to defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT for violation of the Federal Securites Laws [1-1] by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging; jury demand [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton : Plaintiffs shall have until 11/27/00 to file and serve a consolidated complaint and defendants shall have 45 days after service of the consolidated complaint to respond (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RECEIVED Stipulation and Proposed Order extending time for filing and responding to consolidated complaint ( Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging ) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging, [45-2] order [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith, Plaintiff Robert G. Knollenberg, Plaintiff Primegest SPA-Prime, Plaintiff Hans-Peter Wild, Plaintiff Glynn Emerging [43-1] Scheduling order to case(s) 3:00-cv-02287, [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton consolidating cases ( Date Entered: 10/11/00) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting motion to consolidate related actions for violations of the federal securities laws [7-1] (3:00-cv-02965 3:00-cv-02964 3:00-cv-02963 3:00-cv-02486 3:00-cv-02404 3:00-cv-02509 3:00-cv-02333 3:00-cv-02323 3:00-cv-02306 3:00-cv-02390 3:00-cv-02289) 3:00-cv-2287 with member cases 3:00-cv-2289, 3:00-cv-2306, 3:00-cv-2323, 3:00-cv-2333, 3:00-cv-2390, 3:00-cv-2404, 3:00-cv-2486, 3:00-cv-2509, 3:00-cv-2963, 3:00-cv-2964, 3:00-cv-2965, 3:00-cv-3262 ( Date Entered: 10/11/00) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER appointing lead plaintiff and approving lead plaintiff's choice of counsel by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton : to case(s) 3:00-cv-02287, (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES: ( C/R Leo Mankiewicz) ( Hearing Date: 10/4/00) Plaintiff's motions to consolidate submitted; granting motion for appointment of Primegest Spa - Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of counsel [8-1] Order to be prepared by Court; Parties stipulate to the appointment of lead plaintiff's counsel. Court to issue stipulation and proposed order submitted as to the lead counsel issue. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting motion for Christopher Lometti,attorney, to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [37-1] ( Date Entered: 10/4/00) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE of declaration [39-1], declaration [38-1], order received [0-0], motion for Christopher Lometti,attorney, to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [37-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Christopher T. Heffelfinger re motion for Christopher Lometti,attorney, to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [37-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Christopher Lometti re motion for Christopher Lometti,attorney, to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [37-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX-PARTE APPLICATION by attorneys for Robert G. Knollenberg before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Christopher Lometti,attorney, to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECEIVED Proposed Order (from attorneys for Robert G. Knollenberg ) re: motion for Christopher Lometti,attorney, to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [37-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of entry by defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287, [34-2] order [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 of opposition [27-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting motion for attorney Shawn A. Williams to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [22-1] ( Date Entered: 9/19/00) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton plaintiff Robert J. Knollenberg denying motion to extend time to file opposition brief [30-1] ( Date Entered: 9/15/00) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Christopher Lometti on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 re motion to extend time to file opposition brief [30-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX-PARTE MOTION before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 to extend time to file opposition brief [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 re motion for appointment of lead plaintiff, approval of lead counsel, consolidation and entry of proposed pretrial order No. 1 [16-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by Spa-Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn, Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P.'s, for Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 to motion for appointment of lead plaintiff, approval of lead counsel, consolidation and entry of proposed pretrial order No. 1 [16-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 to motion for appointment of Primegest Spa - Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of counsel [8-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287 of response [25-1], order received [0-0], response [24-1], response [23-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287 re motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel [15-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287 re motion for appointment of Primegest Spa - Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of counsel [8-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287 re motion to consolidate related actions for violations of the federal securities laws [7-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECEIVED Proposed Order to consolidate realted actions for violations of the Federal Securities Laws ( defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton : Defendants are not required to respond to the complaint in any of these related actions and shall be required to respond only to a consolidated complaint. After the Court has apointed the lead plaintiff and approved counsel for the lead plaintiff, counsel for the defendants will meet and confer with ocunsel for the lead plaintiff regarding the time for defendants to respond to the consolidated complaint. (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000, Terminated: 9/15/2000 Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION of before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 for attorney Shawn A. Williams to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287) re: motion for attorney Shawn A. Williams to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [22-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of withdrawal of [15-1] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIVED Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding response to plaintiffs' complaint ( defendant Harmonic Inc. in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Anthony J. Ley in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Robin N. Dickson in 3:00-cv-02287, defendant Michael Yost in 3:00-cv-02287) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. re motion for appointment of lead plaintiff, approval of lead counsel, consolidation and entry of proposed pretrial order No. 1 [16-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Jonathan M. Plasse re motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel [15-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of motion for appointment of lead plaintiff, approval of lead counsel, consolidation and entry of proposed pretrial order No. 1 [16-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Movant Peter G. Farrel in support of motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel [15-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by Robert G. Knollenberg before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for appointment of lead plaintiff, approval of lead counsel, consolidation and entry of proposed pretrial order No. 1 with Notice set for 10/4/00 at 9:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by Peter G. Farrell before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel with Notice set for 10/4/00 at 9:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIVED Proposed Pretrial Order No. 1 (by Robert G. Knollenberg ) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 re motion for appointment of Primegest Spa - Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of counsel [8-1], re motion to consolidate related actions for violations of the federal securities laws [7-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE by William S. Lerach on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE by Stephen R. Basser on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE by Andrew L. Barroway on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE by Patrick J. Coughlin on behalf of Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 for appointment of Primegest Spa - Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of counsel with Notice set for 10/4/00 at 9:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287 to consolidate related actions for violations of the federal securities laws with Notice set for 10/4/00 at 9:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287) re: motion to consolidate related actions for violations of the federal securities laws [7-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff David S. Smith in 3:00-cv-02287) re: motion for appointment of Primegest Spa - Prime Special, Hans-Peter Wild and Glynn Emerging Opportunity Fund, L.P. as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of counsel [8-1] [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton relating case c-00-2287 with member cases c-00-2289, c-00-2306, c-00-2323, c-00-2333, c-00-2390, c-00-2404, c-00-2486, c-00-2509, c-00-2963, c-00-2964, and c-00-2965; ( Date Entered: 8/18/00) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02287] (far, COURT StafF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Harmonic Inc., defendant Anthony J. Ley, defendant Robin N. Dickson, defendant Michael Yost on 7/5/00 of summons and complaint by serving Laura Donovan, Executive Assistant [3:00-cv-02287] (gba, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiff of publication [3:00-cv-02287] (gba, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiff to preserve documents pursuant to local rule 16-1(g)(4) [3:00-cv-02287] (gba, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE PROCEDURE and SCHEDULE by Mag. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton : Plaintiff to file requisite certificate on 6/28/00 ; Last day for pltf to file copy of class action notice 7/18/00 ; Proof of service to be filed by 8/14/00 ; (cc: all counsel) Plaintiff to file motion to serve as lead plaintiff 60 days after publication of notice. (gba, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT Summons(es) issued; Fee status pd entered on 6/28/00 in the amount of $ 150.00 (Receipt No. 3312054); jury demand [3:00-cv-02287] (gba, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?