Hill et al v. Apartment Investment and Management Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01492

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 10:07 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Ananias Nunez, Plaintiff
No Logo Antonio Young, Plaintiff

Represented by Antonio Young

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antonio Young
No Logo Charles Holman, Plaintiff
No Logo Dominic Rinaldi, Plaintiff

Represented by Dominic Rinaldi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dominic Rinaldi
No Logo Donald Cooperrider, Plaintiff
No Logo Dustin Jernberg, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Cordova, Jr, Plaintiff

Represented by Edward Cordova, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Cordova, Jr
No Logo Eric Larsen, Plaintiff
No Logo James Fazzone, Plaintiff
No Logo James Perry, Plaintiff
No Logo Jamey Block, Plaintiff

Represented by Jamey Block

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamey Block
No Logo Jessie Sanchez, Plaintiff
No Logo John Estrada, Plaintiff
No Logo Johnny Sizemore, Plaintiff
No Logo Jose Baca, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Myles, Plaintiff
No Logo Laute Bachicha, Jr, Plaintiff

Represented by Laute Bachicha, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laute Bachicha, Jr
No Logo Leonard Sanchez, Plaintiff
No Logo Leonardo Diaz, Plaintiff

Represented by Leonardo Diaz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonardo Diaz
No Logo Lonnie Blake, Plaintiff

Represented by Lonnie Blake

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lonnie Blake
No Logo Mark Hill, Plaintiff

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
Space Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
No Logo Mathew Corbett, Plaintiff

Represented by Mathew Corbett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mathew Corbett
No Logo Patrick Haggerty, Plaintiff
No Logo Polo Aguirre, Plaintiff
No Logo Raymondo Martinez, Plaintiff

Represented by Raymondo Martinez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymondo Martinez
No Logo Ronald Pollock, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Birchfield, Plaintiff

Represented by Steven Birchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Birchfield
No Logo Trevor Hamilton, Plaintiff
No Logo William Raymond, Plaintiff

Represented by William Raymond

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Raymond
No Logo William Wakefield, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo AIMCO Properties, LP, Defendant
Officer/Director, Century Properties Fund Xvi
Officer/Director, Angeles Partners Xi
Officer/Director, CENTURY PROPERTIES FUND XIX
Officer/Director, Aimco OP L.P.
Officer/Director, Century Properties Fund Xiv
Officer/Director, Century Properties Fund Xv
Officer/Director, Angeles Partners Xii
No Logo AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Apartment Investment & Management Company, Defendant

Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christina Finzel Gomez +1 303 295 8366 +1 303 713 6304 cgomez@hollandhart.com
Space John M. Husband +1 303 295 8228 +1 303 975 5381 jhusband@hollandhart.com

Represented by Law Offices of Raouf M. Abdullah

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E.J. Hazard +1 303 295 8280 +1 303 742 1694 tobie.hazard@gmail.com

Represented by Messner & Reeves LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya E Milligan +1 303 623 1800 +1 303 623 0552 tmilligan@messner.com
No Logo NHP Management Company, Defendant
No Logo NHP Management, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
Docket Annotation re: 111 MOTION to Dismiss. Modified on 4/7/2011 to edit text to clarify title of document. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (wjc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 112 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendants AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc., Apartment Investment and Management Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Husband, John) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
      Stipulation of Dismissal by Defendants AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc., Apartment Investment and Management Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Husband, John) Modified on 4/7/2011 to edit text to clarify title of document (wjc, ). (Entered: 04/06/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 101 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (wjc, ) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 101 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (wjc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 101 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Addressed to Mathew Corbett. (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 101 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr. (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 101 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Addressed to William Raymond. (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 101 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss. Addressed to Antonio Young. (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 104 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Approve Settlement. Denied in part, insofar as the Court declines to approve that portion of the Settlement Agreement that reserves continuing jurisdiction in this Court over this matter, and granting in part, on the grounds set forth above. There being no further issues requiring judicial resolution, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/11/08.(jmp, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                      BRIEF in Support re 102 MOTION for Order to Motion To Approve Settlement Memorandum In Support of Motion To Approve Settlement filed by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Llezlie Green)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 102 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Order to Motion To Approve Settlement by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/10/2008: adopting Report and Recommendations re 67 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Bachicha, Birchfield, Blake, Block, Cordova, Diaz, Martinez, Raymond, Rinaldi and Young are DISMISSED. Denying as moot 81 Motion to Dismiss; granting 95 Motion to Dismiss pro se plaintiff Matthew Corbett. The parties advise the court that the stipulation for dismissal will be filed on December 11, 2008. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock.) (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 93 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 94 Certificate of Mailing. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 94 Certificate of Mailing Addressed to William Raymond. (gms, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 93 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 94 Certificate of Mailing Addressed to Antonio Young. (wjc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 93 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, addressed to Matthew Corbett. (wjc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 93 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr. (wjc, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Pro Se Plaintiff Matthew Corbett for Failure to Prosecute by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk of Court re 93 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Llezlie Lloren Green terminated. Plaintiff Corbett will now proceed pro se, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/1/08.(jmp, ) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Plaintiffs Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 87 Memorandum. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (jmp, ) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 87 Memorandum. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 87 Memorandum. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr.. (jmp, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 87 Memorandum. Addressed to Antonio Young. (jmp, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mathew Corbett. Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/10/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(msksec, ) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Mathew Corbett. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Llezlie L. Green, # 3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 77 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 78 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (jmp, ) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 74 Memorandum. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr.. (jmp, ) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 78 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 78 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr.. (jmp, ) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Pro Se Plaintiffs For Failure To Prosecute by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 77 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 78 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings. Addressed to William Raymond. (jmp, ) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 74 Memorandum. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (jmp, ) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/29/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2008, pursuant to Minute Order of 7/30/08. Text only entry - no document attached. (jmp, ) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 73 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery cut-off deadline is extended to 8/29/08, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to 9/30/08, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/30/08.(jmp, ) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 74 Memorandum. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 74 Memorandum. Addressed to William Raymond. (jmp, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 73 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc., Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P. Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/16/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(msksec, ) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to Joint Motion To Amend Scheduling Order To Extend The Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines)(Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint,, filed by Eric Larsen, James Fazzone, Larry Myles, Jose Baca, Edward Cordova, Jr, Laute Bachicha, Jr, Ananias Nunez, John Estrada, Steven Birchfield, William Wakefield, Mathew Corbett, James Perry, W. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint,, filed by Eric Larsen, James Fazzone, Larry Myles, Jose Baca, Edward Cordova, Jr, Laute Bachicha, Jr, Ananias Nunez, John Estrada, Steven Birchfield, William Wakefield, Mathew Corbett, James Perry, W. Addressed to Antonio Young. (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint, filed by Eric Larsen, James Fazzone, Larry Myles, Jose Baca, Edward Cordova, Jr, Laute Bachicha, Jr, Ananias Nunez, John Estrada, Steven Birchfield, William Wakefield, Mathew Corbett, James Perry, W. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint, filed by Eric Larsen, James Fazzone, Larry Myles, Jose Baca, Edward Cordova, Jr, Laute Bachicha, Jr, Ananias Nunez, John Estrada, Steven Birchfield, William Wakefield, Mathew Corbett, James Perry, W. Addressed to William Raymond. (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint, filed by Eric Larsen, James Fazzone, Larry Myles, Jose Baca, Edward Cordova, Jr, Laute Bachicha, Jr, Ananias Nunez, John Estrada, Steven Birchfield, William Wakefield, Mathew Corbett, James Perry, W. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint, that this case be dismissed as to plaintiffs Laute Bachicha, Jr., Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Edward Cordova, Jr., Leonard Diaz, Raymondo Martinez, William Raymond, Dominic Rinaldi and Antonio Young for failure to prosecute and that the case caption be amended accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/23/08. (gms, ) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 59 Minute Entry. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 59 Minute Entry. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 59 Minute Entry. Addressed to William Raymond. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk of Court re 53 Minute Order 59 Minute Entry. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr. (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 59 Minute Entry. Addressed to Antonio Young. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 59 Minute Entry. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr. (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Status Conference held on 4/25/2008. Joint Status Report due by 5/5/2008. Show Cause Response due by 5/15/2008 by pro se plaintiffs: Laute Bachicha, Jr., Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Edward Cordova, Jr., Leonard Diaz, Raymondo Martinez, William Raymond, Dominic Rinaldi and Antonio Young. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 53 Minute Order. Addressed to Lonnie Blake. (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 53 Minute Order. Addressed to Antonio Young. (jmp, ) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 53 Minute Order. Addressed to William Raymond. (jmp, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 53 Order. Addressed to Raymondo Martinez. (jmp, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 53 Minute Order. Addressed to Edward Cordova, Jr. (jmp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/25/2008 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/03/08. (jmp, ) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Due to a calendar conflict, the status conference set for Monday, March 3, 2008 is VACATED. Instead, the parties shall initiate a conference call to Magistrate Judge Tafoya's chambers (303-335-2780) at 9:30 AM on March 3, 2008, to set a settlement conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/29/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(kmtlc1, ) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Llezlie Lloren Green terminated. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/28/08.(jmp, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A - Green Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Denying Transfer of this case into MDL 1915 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 2/14/2008. (llk, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery Reply In Support Of Motion For Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Discovery filed by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 EXHIBIT C, # 4 EXHIBIT D)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to Respond to Discovery. Granted to the extent the responses pertain to theColorado plaintiffs named in this case. Plaintiffs will provide responsive discovery as to each named plaintiff no later than 2/11/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/28/08.(pap, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Docket Annotation re: 39 Brief in Support of Motion, Entry modified to correct Exhibit E's identification. Text only entry - no document attached (pap2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Docket Annotation re: 43 Reply to Response to Motion, is actually a Response and has been refiled correctly as 44 Response to Motion, Text only entry - no document attached (pap2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery filed by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., NHP Management, Inc., NHP Management Company, AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery filed by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., NHP Management, Inc., NHP Management Company, AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Docket Annotation re: 41 Response to Motion, Entry contains only Exhibits, Counsel shall refile Response with the Exhibits. Text only entry - no document attached (pap, ) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery filed by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., NHP Management, Inc., NHP Management Company, AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery filed by Mark Hill. Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/18/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(msksec, ) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF in Support re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery Plaintiffs' memorandum In Support Of Motion For An Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Discovery filed by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Green, Llezlie) (Modified on 1/22/2008 to correct exhibit label) (pap2, ). (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plainatiffs' Motion for An Enlargement Of Time In Which To Respond To Discovery by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. The Plaintiffs have until January 17, 2008 to file a more comprehensive motion for extension of time to respond to oustanding discovery requests. The defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion on or before January 24, 2008. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/15/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(ewnsec, ) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 35 MOTION For Extension of Time for an Enlargement of Time to File a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery filed by Eric Larsen, James Fazzone, Larry Myles, Jose Baca, Edward Cordova, Jr, Laute Bachicha, Jr, Ananias Nunez, John Estrada, Steven Birchfield, William Wakefield, Mathew Corbett, James Perry, William Raymond, Antonio Young, Raymondo Martinez, Donald Cooperrider, Leonardo Diaz, Polo Aguirre, Jamey Block, Leonard Sanchez, Ronald Pollock, Charles Holman, Dominic Rinaldi, Mark Hill, Lonnie Blake, Johnny Sizemore, Dustin Jernberg, Patrick Haggerty, Jessie Sanchez, Trevor Hamilton. Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/14/08. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(msksec, ) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION For Extension of Time to an Enlargement of Time to File a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery by Plaintiffs Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to General Order 2008-2 upon the appointment of Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, this case has been reassigned and is now referred to Kathleen M. Tafoya effective January 9, 2008. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (such as 05-cv-00500-LTB-KMT). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Tafoya in Courtroom A601. Her chambers are located in Room A641. Her telephone number is 303-335-2780. (Text only entry - no document attached) (gms, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER Denying 26 Plaintiffs' Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/07.(pap, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, 28 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 28 Motion to Expedite Treatment of their Concurrently Filed Motion to Stay Proceedings. Plaintiff to file reply to defendant's response to the motion to stay on or before 12/14/07, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/10/07.(gms, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, 28 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 26 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed by Mark Hill, and 28 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed by Mark Hill. Because these motions appear to primarily seek the stay of matters related to discovery, the motions are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/7/07. (Text Only Entry - No Document Attached)(msksec, ) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Support re 26 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C., # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation by Plaintiff Mark Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Conventionally Submitted Material: Letter from Llezlie L. Green to the Clerk re: attached copy of documents filed with the MDL Panel: Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer for Coordinated Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407; Brief in Support; Index of Exhibits to Brief in Support; Schedule of Actions; and Plaintiffs' Reasons Why Oral Argument Should be Heard Text Only Entry - Available in paper format in the Clerk's Office. (lam, ) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER VACATING Jury Trial set for 03/09/2009. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/07. (dln, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      PRE-TRIAL PREPARATION AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER - CIVIL: Ten (10) Day Jury Trial set for 3/9/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. This setting is on a trailing docket in a third position. Rule 702 motions by 08/16/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2008 04:00 PM before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Trial is scheduled for 03/09/2009. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/13/07. (dln, ) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/13/2007. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/3/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Discovery due by 7/16/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2008. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/3/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Discovery due by 7/16/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/13/07. (dln, ) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Annotation re: 19 Proposed Scheduling Order. [Entry modified to add filers]. Text only entry - no document attached (dln, ) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs and Defendants . (Hazard, Thomas) (Modified on 11/7/2007 to add filers) (dln, ). (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr. Apartment Investment and Management Company waiver sent on 10/4/2007, answer due 12/3/2007; AIMCO Properties, L.P. waiver sent on 10/4/2007, answer due 12/3/2007; NHP Management Company waiver sent on 10/4/2007, answer due 12/3/2007; AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2007, answer due 12/3/2007. (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc... (Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, by Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc..(Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanya Eileen Milligan on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Milligan, Tanya) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christina Finzel Gomez on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Gomez, Christina) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Husband on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Husband, John) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas E.J. Hazard on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Tanya E. Milligan by Thomas E.J. Hazard on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Christina F. Gomez by Thomas E.J. Hazard on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for John M. Husband by Thomas E.J. Hazard on behalf of Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc. (Hazard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., NHP Management Company, AIMCO/BETHESDA Holdings, Inc., filed by Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr.(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Annotation re: 6 Amended Complaint (First). [Document to be refiled by Counsel]. Text only entry - no document attached. (dln, ) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., NHP Management, Inc., filed by Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr.(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : RESETTING Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/13/07. (dln, ) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom C203 on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers U.S. District Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/16/2007. (mehcd) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND LETTER TO COUNSEL. CASE referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Krieger. (dln, ) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. Any exhibits and depositions to be used during this case, counsel for the parties shall obtain such exhibits and depositions from the Court within 30 days after any judgment is entered or closure o f the case. Counsel shall retain same for 60 days beyondthe later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. Failure to retrieve exhibits and depositions in conformance with this Order may result in their destruction. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/18/07. (dln, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT - Jury Trial Demanded against Apartment Investment and Management Company, AIMCO Properties, L.P., NHP Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number COX002770) Summons issued, filed by Steven Birchfield, Lonnie Blake, Jamey Block, Donald Cooperrider, Mathew Corbett, Edward Cordova, Jr, Leonardo Diaz, John Estrada, James Fazzone, Patrick Haggerty, Mark Hill, Trevor Hamilton, Charles Holman, Dustin Jernberg, Eric Larsen, Raymondo Martinez, Larry Myles, Ananias Nunez, James Perry, Ronald Pollock, William Raymond, Polo Aguirre, Dominic Rinaldi, Jessie Sanchez, Leonard Sanchez, Johnny Sizemore, William Wakefield, Antonio Young, Jose Baca, Laute Bachicha, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Receipt)(llr, ) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?