GILBRETH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:09-cv-00704
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DALE A GILBRETH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Jason Perry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Ellis Perry +1 203 887 6967 +1 800 576 5648 jason.perry@jeperrylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William James Grimaldi +1 202 616 0471 +1 202 514 8624 william.j.grimaldi@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. No costs. (jt1) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION granting 7 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and denying 8 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ce) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
      RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record, 8 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USAFirst MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative RecordCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA Reply to Def. Resp to Cross Motion, filed by DALE A GILBRETH.Reply due by 5/10/2010. (Perry, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/23/2010 to File Reply to Def. Repl., filed by DALE A GILBRETH.Response due by 5/10/2010.(Perry, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
          RESPONSE and reply to 8 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USAFirst MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative RecordCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA (Reply due by 4/5/2010.), REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. (Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
            CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, First MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Response due by 3/19/2010.), filed by DALE A GILBRETH.(Perry, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) (Response due by 2/16/2010.), MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA.(Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Record Part 1, # 2 Administrative Record Part 2, # 3 Administrative Record Part 3)(Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint, until January 14, 2010, filed by USA.Response due by 12/28/2009.(Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by William James Grimaldi for USA. (Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink (vro) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 070143) (Five copies served on Department of Justice), filed by DALE A GILBRETH.Answer due by 12/15/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vro) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 260 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?