METZGER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:09-cv-00740
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEFFREY A. METZGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenstein, Wilson & Dean, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bridget Jeanne Wilson +1 619 232 8377 +1 619 238 8376 bwilson@rwdlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William James Grimaldi +1 202 616 0471 +1 202 514 8624 william.j.grimaldi@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by JEFFREY A. METZGER, USA.. (Wilson, Bridget) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by JEFFREY A. METZGER, USA.. (Wilson, Bridget) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint, until February 26, 2010. Response due by 2/26/2010. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (cr) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 1 Complaint, until February 26, 2010, filed by USA.Response due by 12/28/2009.(Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by William James Grimaldi for USA. (Grimaldi, William) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jt1) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jt1) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 070202) (Five copies served on Department of Justice), filed by JEFFREY A. METZGER.Answer due by 12/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jt1) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 133 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?