DACOSTA et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:10-cv-00115
District Judge George W. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo JOHN DACOSTA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN DACOSTA
No Logo N.B. SALTY MILLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space N.B. SALTY MILLER
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Brian Syverson +1 202 307 6508 +1 202 514 9440 joseph.b.syverson@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER. Service: 5/13/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER re: "Therefore, plaintiffs' Petition for Confidentiality for Informants is DENIED." Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
      RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' statement regarding plaintiffs' Petition for Confidentiality (together with separate one volume appendix), filed by USA. Service: 5/5/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply due by 5/24/2010.), and REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 5/5/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by N.B. SALTY MILLER. Service: 5/3/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            RESPONSE filed by JOHN DACOSTA and N.B. SALTY MILLER to Judge Miller's 17 Order. Service: 4/23/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
              MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER. Service: 4/14/2010. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due by 5/24/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER. Reply due by 5/10/2010. Service: 4/14/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a statement due by 4/28/2010. Defendant shall file response due by 5/5/2010. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, ) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying 15 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, ) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Recusal, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER. Service: 4/5/2010. Response due by 4/26/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss (together with separate appendix) pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 4/8/2010. Response due by 5/10/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                          ***SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT *** [NUNC PRO TUNC 3/5/2010] against USA, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER. Answer due by 4/8/2010.(hw1, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 4 Motion to Amend Pleadings (Amended Complaint) - Rule 15(b). Plaintiff's Amended Complaint deemed filed as of March 5, 2010. Copy of order sent to plaintiffs via U.S. mail this day. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Plaintiffs Motion requesting that their case be referred to an ADR settlement judge. Copy of order sent to plaintiffs via U.S. mail this day. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge George W. Miller for all further proceedings. Judge Francis M. Allegra no longer assigned to the case. (jt1) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [] Motion to Transfer case to the Honorable George W. Miller. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jt1) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    RESPONSE to MOTION to Transfer, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER. Filed by leave of the Judge.Reply due by 3/29/2010. Service: 3/15/10.(jt1) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [9-558], filed by USA. Service: 3/17/10.(jt1) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by Joseph Brian Syverson for USA. Service: 3/10/10.(dls) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dls) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                            MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER.Response due by 3/22/2010. (Copy to DOJ)(jt1) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION re: alternative dispute resolution, filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER.Response due by 3/22/2010.(jt1) (Copy to DOJ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jt1) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                  **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (IRS) (Filing fee $350, Receipt number 070620) (Five copies served on Department of Justice), filed by JOHN DACOSTA, N.B. SALTY MILLER.Answer due by 4/20/2010.(jt1) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?