Ethylene Propylene v.
Federal Court Proceeding Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:03-md-01542
District Judge Stefan R. Underhill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2019 at 1:11 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alco Indust Inc, Plaintiff

Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Carlisle Co Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

No Logo Carlisle Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Carlisle Engineered Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Carlisle Syntec Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlisle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Ford +1 315 477 9108 +1 315 474 2008 sford@carlisle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin A. Suga +1 781 466 0700 +1 781 466 0701 ksuga@zelle.com
No Logo Diamond Holding Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by IZARD NOBEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Nobel +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290 firm@snlaw.net

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Duraplas Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline E. Bryks +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
TERMINATED: 09/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weltman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stewart M. Weltman +1 312 606 8755 +1 312 444 1028 sweltman@weltmanlawfirm.com
No Logo Freudenberg-nok, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

No Logo Industrial Rubber Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo Parker-hannifin Coropration, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Parker Hannifin Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com
No Logo Polymerics, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julio Ramos +1 415 948 3015 +1 415 469 9787 ramosfortrustee@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Lehmann +1 415 229 2080 +1 415 986 3643 mlehmann@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Greenfogel +1 215 564 5182 +1 215 569 0958 sgreenfogel@mcgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Kanner +1 312 346 3100 +1 312 521 2100 skanner@muchshelist.com
TERMINATED: 02/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis A. Kessler +1 312 521 2000 +1 312 521 2100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Millen +1 312 346 3100

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Edwards Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Edwards, III +1 361 698 7600 +1 361 698 7614 bedwards@edwardsfirm.com

Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Represented by Trump, Alioto, Trump & Prescott, LLP

No Logo PolyOne Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com
No Logo Precision Assoc Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Kornreich +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rkornreich@wolfpopper.com
No Logo RBX Indus Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodanast, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dianne M. Nast +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 dnast@rodanast.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL G. NAST +1 717 892 3000 +1 717 892 1200 mnast@rodanast.com
No Logo Reeves Brothers, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Hartley +1 619 235 4040 jhartley@rdblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merril Hirsh +1 202 662 2000 +1 202 662 2190 mhirsh@rdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Daniels +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 bpdaniels@bswlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Richard Immerman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Westrup Klick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Kitchenoff kitchenoff@wkalaw.com
No Logo Robbins LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guido Saveri +1 415 217 6810 +1 415 217 6813 guido@saveri.com
No Logo Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

No Logo Schlegel Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
No Logo Synaflex Rubber Prod, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Pizzirusso +1 202 408 4600

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by MEHRI & SKALET, PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Schaefer +1 203 772 2600 +1 203 562 2098 dschaefer@bswlaw.com
v.
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bayer Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Vincent O'Reilly +1 202 879 3939 woreilly@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Read +1 202 879 5465 +1 202 626 1700 jaread@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Langer +1 860 297 3700 rlanger@wiggin.com
TERMINATED: 11/28/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Bruce Malech +1 860 297 3700 smalech@wiggin.com
No Logo CROMPTON CORP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw , +1 202 383 5163 +1 202 383 5414 bbradshaw@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS J. MCGARRIGLE +1 215 851 8220 +1 215 851 1420 tmcgarrigle@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig A. Raabe +1 860 275 8200 craabe@rc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/21/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
The Dow Chemical Company The Dow Chemical Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dow Chemical Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Bliss +1 203 961 7400 +1 212 230 7845 jamesbliss@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Hamilton Loeb +1 202 508 9500 +1 202 508 9700 hamiltonloeb@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C. McCann +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 kevinmccann@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S. McGeeney +1 203 961 7400 stevemcgeeney@paulhastings.com
No Logo Dsm Copolymer, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S. Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +7017 701 701 7711

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Favretto +1 202 263 3250 +1 202 263 5250 rfavretto@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary A. Winters +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 gwinters@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
No Logo DSM Elastomers BV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S. Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +7017 701 701 7711

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Favretto +1 202 263 3250 +1 202 263 5250 rfavretto@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
No Logo DSM Elastomers Europe BV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S. Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +7017 701 701 7711

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary A. Winters +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 gwinters@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
No Logo Dupont Dow Elastomers, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T. Shearin +1 203 330 2000 +1 203 576 8888 jshearin@pullcom.com
TERMINATED: 03/23/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Wenzel +1 203 330 2207 +1 203 576 8888 wwenzel@pullcom.com
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "EI Dupont De Nemours & Co"

Represented by Murtha Cullina LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Wenzel +1 203 330 2207 +1 203 576 8888 wwenzel@pullcom.com
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Exxon Mobil Chemical Co"
Officer/Director, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Alan Reiss +1 212 310 8000 +1 212 310 8007

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy K. Fuyuno +1 415 393 2000 joy.fuyuno@bingham.com
TERMINATED: 07/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B. Hockett +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 393 2286 chris.hockett@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Rule +1 202 862 2420 +1 202 862 2400 rrule@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony V. Nanni +1 202 639 7000 +1 202 639 7003

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connell, Flaherty & Attmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane C. Mokriski +1 860 548 1300 +1 860 548 0023 dmokriski@oamlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. O'Connell +1 860 548 1300 +1 860 548 0023 moconnell@ofalaw.com
No Logo Polimeri Europa Amer Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Brannon +1 202 974 1500 +1 202 974 1999 lbrannon@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Shea +1 860 275 0146 +1 860 275 0343 mpshea@DayPitney.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Weathers +1 860 275 0356 +1 860 275 0343 jsweathers@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley R. Sadin +1 203 333 9441 +1 203 333 1489 ssadin@znclaw.com
No Logo Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw , +1 202 383 5163 +1 202 383 5414 bbradshaw@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS J. MCGARRIGLE +1 215 851 8220 +1 215 851 1420 tmcgarrigle@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford S. Babbitt +1 860 275 8209 +1 860 275 8299 bbabbitt@rc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig A. Raabe +1 860 275 8200 craabe@rc.com
No Logo MDL Panel, Notice

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MDL Panel +1 202 502 2800 +1 202 502 2888
No Logo Stone Paradise, Inc, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wallace Stanley +1 202 789 3960 +1 202 789 1813 davids@cuneolaw.com

Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

No Logo Waterville Tg Inc., Intervenor

Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

Citation Section In Re U.S.C. § EPDM Anti-trust Litigation
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (655) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 576 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/10/2011. (Yaster, B.) (Main Document 581 replaced on 3/10/2011) (Sbalbi, B.). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 575 Motion to Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Markham Sherwood. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/10/11. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 579 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Sealed Document: Declaration of Markham Sherwood in support of motion for order authorizing distribution of final settlement funds with Unredacted Exhibit A by Alco Indust Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Richard Immerman, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Parker Hannifin Corp, Polymerics Inc, Polyone Corporation, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Reeves Brothers Inc, Robbins LLC, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod re 578 Affidavit,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lewis, D) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AFFIDAVIT re 576 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Signed By Markham Sherwood filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Memorandum in Support re 576 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Markham Sherwood in Support of Motion for an Order Authorizing Final Distribution of Settlement Funds by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 559 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/1/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER granting 567 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/1/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Fairness hearing re: final approval of settlement agreement held on 10/1/2010. 30 minutes(Court Reporter S. Catucci.) (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Pizzirusso on behalf of Alco Indust Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Richard Immerman, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Parker Hannifin Corp, Polymerics Inc, Polyone Corporation, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Reeves Brothers Inc, Robbins LLC, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod (Pizzirusso, James) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Waterville TG, Inc. re 565 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Substitute Party of Submission to this Court's Jurisdiction and Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Klingman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in Support re 559 MOTION for Attorney Fees Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for (1) an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Costs with Respect to the Proposed Settlement with the DSM Defendants and (2) Court Approval of Incentive Awards for the Representative Class Plaintiffs filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in Support re 567 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement with Defendants DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. and DSM Copolymer, Inc. and Proposed Plan of Allocation of the Settlement Proceeds filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement with Defendants DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. and DSM Copolymer, Inc. by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Markham Sherwood Regarding the Publication of Notice and Mailing of Notice to the Class Members filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 564 Motion to Intervene; granting 564 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/20/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                    Consent MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Protective Order (Responses due by 10/8/2010, ), Consent MOTION to Substitute Party - Stone Paradise Inc. by Waterville TG, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E)(Klingman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT re 559 MOTION for Attorney Fees Signed By Howard Sedran,Anthony Bolognese,C.Andrew Dirksen,Megan E. Jones,Gregory K.Arenson,Kathleen Konopka,David R. Schaefer filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT re 559 MOTION for Attorney Fees Signed By Anthony J. Bolognese filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum in Support re 559 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                            PROPOSED ORDER re 559 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod.Responses due by 8/27/2010 (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER denying 557 Motion to Intervene; denying 557 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/28/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Intervene (Responses due by 8/16/2010, ), MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Patrick J. Simpson, Jonathan Lee Riches, Daniel Anthony Weymouth. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement fairness hearing set for 10/1/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 555 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 553 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/22/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 554 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum in Support re 553 MOTION for Settlement Between Class Plaintiffs and Defendants DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. and DSM Copolymer, Inc. and Proposed Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Settlement Between Class Plaintiffs and Defendants DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. and DSM Copolymer, Inc. and Proposed Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds by Alco Indust Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Polymerics Inc, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 548 Motion to waive right to remand. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/13/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2010 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/23/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/23/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Plaintiffs Parker Hannifin Corporation and Polonye Corporation Motion to Waive Their Right to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Order by Parker Hannifin Corp, Polyone Corporation. (Searby, Edmund) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying 534 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/15/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY to Response to 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 545 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Sealed Document: Class plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to DSM defendants' Motion for Partial Reconsideration by Alco Indust Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Richard Immerman, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Parker Hannifin Corp, Polymerics Inc, Polyone Corporation, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Reeves Brothers Inc, Robbins LLC, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod re 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 544 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Sealed Document with exhibits A-D MANUALLY FILED IN PAPER FORM: Class plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to DSM defendants' Motion for Partial Reconsideration by Alco Indust Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Richard Immerman, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Parker Hannifin Corp, Polymerics Inc, Polyone Corporation, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Reeves Brothers Inc, Robbins LLC, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod re 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 540 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/17/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co filed by Parker Hannifin Corp, Polyone Corporation. (Searby, Edmund) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to DSM Defendants' Motion for Partial Reconsideration by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM re: Date for trial and the right to remand. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/11/2010. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 533 Motion to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/29/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference set for 2/10/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Parties shall call chambers, (203) 579-5714, from a single line. Status Conference set for 3/19/2010 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 536 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Sealed Document: Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s & DSM Elastomer Europe B.V.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Motion to Strike & for Summary Judgment by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re 534 MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Co -- REDACTED filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Motions to Strike and for Summary Judgment by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV.Responses due by 2/16/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Defendant DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on Motions to Strike and for Summary Judgment (with exhibits) by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 531 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/26/10 to file Motion for Reconsideration re 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/13/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until January 26, 2010 -- Unopposed Motion to To File Their Motion for Reconsideration 530 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Sealed Motion, by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 530 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/13/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                        RULING denying 437 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 472 Motion to Strike; denying 476 Sealed Motion; and denying 480 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/29/2009. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 527 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Signed By Markham Sherwood filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER approving 506 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by RBX Indus Inc. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/3/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 524 Motion for Approval of Dissemination of Class Notices and to Set Deadlines. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B) (Penberthy, Katherine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 523 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph M. Barton terminated. Attorney Kristina Pollak was terminated from this case on May 27, 2005. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/27/2009. (Penberthy, Katherine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER re 524 MOTION Approval of Dissemination of Class Notices and to Set Deadlines by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION Approval of Dissemination of Class Notices and to Set Deadlines by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc.Responses due by 6/10/2009 (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Joseph Barton and Kristina Pollak to Withdraw as Attorney by Schlegel Corp. (Dirksen, Charles) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Stone Paradise, Inc re 510 Order of Submission to this Court's Jurisdiction and Protective Order (Klingman, Patrick) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 518 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William J. Wenzel terminated; granting 519 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James T. Shearin terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/23/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER approving 517 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/20/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                              MOTION for James T. Shearin to Withdraw as Attorney by Dupont Dow Elastomers LLC. (Shearin, James) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                MOTION for William J. Wenzel to Withdraw as Attorney by Dupont Dow Elastomers LLC. (Wenzel, William) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEFERRAL OF CLASS NOTICE PENDING THE DSM DEFENDANTS' PETITION REGARDING THE COURT'S CLASS CERTIFICATION RULING by Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Notice of Pendency of Class Action, # 2 Exhibit B -- Summary Notice of Class Certification)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER re 512 Order of Class Certification dated February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/4/2009. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 513 Motion to Amend/Correct 512 Order of Class Certification. A written order will follow. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/3/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 513 MOTION to Amend/Correct 512 Order of Class Certification filed by Duraplas Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 512 Order of Class Certification by Duraplas Corp.Responses due by 3/20/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER of Class Certification. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/13/2009. (Penberthy, K.) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Order on Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              RULING granting 184 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/13/2009. (Penberthy, K.) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER modifying Protective Order 37 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 02/13/2009. (Penberthy, K.) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Stone Paradise, Inc re 507 Order on Motion to Intervene of Submission of Proposed Order Modifying Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Klingman, Patrick) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 184 MOTION to Certify Class -- Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      RULING Granting 241 Stone Paradise's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/26/2009. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Exxon Mobil Chemical Corporation by RBX Indus Inc. (Nast, Dianne) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ethylene Propylene Diene Monomer (EPDM) Antitrust Litigation of Change of Firm Affiliation (Hausfeld, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 501 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, 500 Transcript,, DEFENDANTS DSM COPOLYMER, INC.S AND DSM ELASTOMERS EUROPE B.V.S REQUEST FOR REDACTION OF AUGUST 19, 2008 TRANSCRIPT (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 502 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Frederick P. Furth terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/10/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for The Furth Firm LLP to Withdraw as Attorney ; Proposed Order by Polymerics Inc. (Dove, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Britt M. Miller re 500 Transcript,, (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/19/08 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2008. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re 488 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Signed By Markham Sherwood filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 494 Motion to Seal memorandum. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/3/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 497 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document: Memorandum by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod 495 Response re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 480 Amended MOTION to Strike REDACTED -- Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Supplemental Brief Concerning Admissibility of the EC Statement of Objections filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D [Part 1 of 2], # 5 Exhibit D [Part 2 of 2], # 6 Exhibit E [Part 1 of 2], # 7 Exhibit E [Part 2 of 2], # 8 Exhibit F)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum Re: The Admissibility of Certain Factual Findings in the Statement of Objections by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 492 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/29/08 to submit briefing requested by the Court. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/25/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until August 29, 2008 -- UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time To Submit Supplemental Briefing Requested by the Court by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 443 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/21/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 483 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) named plaintiffs' claims against Exxon Mobil Corp. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/21/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2008 re 472 MOTION to Strike, 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 480 Amended MOTION to Strike, 476 SEALED MOTION to Strike. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill, taking under advisement 437 Motion for Summary Judgment; taking under advisement 472 Motion to Strike ; taking under advisement 476 Sealed Motion; taking under advisement 480 Motion to Strike. Total Time: 4 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 484 Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Disseminate Notice to Prospective Class Members RE: Contemplated Dismissal of Named Plaintiffs' Claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/19/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B) (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 482 Sealed Document, 480 Amended MOTION to Strike REDACTED -- Defendants DSM Copolymer Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Notice of Typographical Error (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 485 Affidavit, (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 484 MOTION for Leave to Disseminate Notice to Prospective Class Members Re: Contemplated Dissmisal of Named Plaintiffs' Claims Against Exxon Mobil Corporation Signed By Markham Sherwood filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Disseminate Notice to Prospective Class Members Re: Contemplated Dissmisal of Named Plaintiffs' Claims Against Exxon Mobil Corporation by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc.Responses due by 9/1/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - L, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Named Plaintiffs' Claims Against Exxon Mobil Corporation by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc.Responses due by 9/1/2008 (Schaefer, David) Text Modified on 8/12/2008 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 482 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document: Amended Motion to Strike by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 479 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/8/08. (Hollander, A.) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Strike REDACTED by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV.Responses due by 8/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) Text Modified on 8/8/2008 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Defendant DSM Copolymer, Inc's and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Amended Motion to Strike and Draft Order by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 478 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum in Support of re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DSM Copolymer Inc and DSM Elastomers Europe BV (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Exhibits, # 2 Table of Contents, # 3 Exhibit 180, # 4 Exhibit 181, # 5 Exhibit 182, # 6 Exhibit 183, # 7 Exhibit 184, # 8 Exhibit 185, # 9 Exhibit 186, # 10 Exhibit 187, # 11 Exhibit 188, # 12 Exhibit 189, # 13 Exhibit 190, # 14 Exhibit 191, # 15 Exhibit 192, # 16 Exhibit 193, # 17 Exhibit 194, # 18 Exhibit 195, # 19 Exhibit 196)(D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 436 Motion to Seal; granting 444 Motion to Seal; granting 457 Motion to Seal; granting 463 Motion to Seal; granting 470 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/31/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 476 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION to Strike by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Memorandum of ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Phone Conference held on 7/30/2008. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/31/2008. (Penberthy, K.) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental EXHIBIT re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment S Cited in DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment -- REDACTED by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 473 Reply to Response to Motion. (Marovitz, Andrew) Motion link Modified on 7/31/2008 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- REDACTED filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike -- REDACTED by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV.Responses due by 8/20/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 469 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/30/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, Supplemental Joint Exhibits, and Motion to Strike by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of the Page Limit for Their Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 467 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony V. Nanni and Charles F. Rule terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/11/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Charles F. Rule and Anthony V. Nanni to Withdraw as Attorney by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 465 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher B. Hockett terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/02/2008. (Penberthy, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Diane Mokriski to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher B. Hockett by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Mokriski, Diane) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 464 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document: Unredacted Memorandum of Law In Opposition by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 443 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Unredacted Consolidated Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement, manually filed under seal. Appendix of Documentary Exhibits Volumes I-V, filed manually under seal and Appendix of Sworn Testimony Volumes I-II, filed manually under seal)(Sanders, C.) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment, Consolidated Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement, Appendix of Documents and Appendix of Sworn Testimony by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 453 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/24/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 456 Statement of Material Facts, (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 455 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, of Manual Filing of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RBX Indus Inc of Adoption and Joinder (Nast, Dianne) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 456 Statement of Material Facts, of Manual Filing of Consolidated Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement and Appendicies thereto Vol. 1-V & Vol. 1 & II (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment, Consolidated Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement and Appendicies thereto (Vol I-V & Vol. I & II) by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Material Facts re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 443 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition REDACTED re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 443 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, Carlisle Syntec Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER re 453 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/19/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, (not Chambers) 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/19/2008 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reset Deadlines as to 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 443 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 6/20/2008 and Reply/Responses due by 7/30/2008 (Sanders, C.) Modified on 6/10/2008 (Sanders, C.). (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and ORDER re: Pre-Trial Schedule, Responses to Dispositive motions due by 6/20/2008 and Response/Reply due by 7/30/2008. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/4/2008. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 447 Motion to Amend 424 Memorandum of Conference deadlines. The Court will issue a written order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/2/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 424 Memorandum of Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc.Responses due by 6/19/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 445 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document: Memorandum in Support of 443 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Statement of Material Facts, Affidavit of Christopher V. Roberts with exhibits 1 - 135 submitted paper form by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Part 2, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Affidavit of Christopher V. Roberts with exhibits 1 - 135 sumbitted in paper form, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Proposed Order)(Candee, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal - Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Material Facts, Declaration of Christopher V. Roberts and exhibits to the declaration by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. Responses due by 5/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Part 1 - Redacted, # 2 Memorandum in Support Part 2 - redacted, # 3 Statement of Material Facts - Redacted)(Candee, D.) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 433 Motion for Leave to File supplemental authority in support of opposition to Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/17/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 441 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document: Memorandum in Support by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support part 2, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibits submitted in paper form)(Cody, C.) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re: 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Joint Exhibits Cited in DSM Copolymer, Inc.'s and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Local Rule 56(a)(1) Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment -- REDACTED by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 439 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 438 Statement of Material Facts. (Marovitz, Andrew) Motion link Modified on 4/17/2008 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment --REDACTED filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED Statement of Material Facts re 437 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Marovitz, Andrew) Modified on 4/16/2008 (Simpson, T.). (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV.Responses due by 5/7/2008 (Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Local Rule 56(a)(1) Statement, Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, and Joint Exhibits by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 433 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 432 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/14/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- McLaughlin v. American Tobacco Co., 2008 WL 878627 (2d Cir. Apr. 3, 2008), # 2 Exhibit B -- In re New Motor Vehicles Canadian Export Antitrust Litig., 2008 WL 820922 (1st Cir. Mar. 28, 2008))(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Mokriski, Diane) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 430 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/9/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages -- Unopposed Motion of Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc. and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. for Extension of the Page Limit For Their Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 2/14/2008 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: S. Catucci. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley R. Sadin on behalf of DSM Elastomers Europe BV Notice of Appearance by Gary A. Winters on behalf of DSM Elastomers Europe BV (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley R. Sadin on behalf of DSM Copolymer Inc Notice of Appearance by Gary A. Winters on behalf of DSM Copolymer Inc. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Order on Motion to Certify ClassCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2008 re 184 MOTION to Certify Class. Oral ruling issued, taking under advisement 184 Motion to Certify Class. Total Time: 1 hour and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/25/2008. 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Memorandum of ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of Scheduling Conference, ( Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2008, Responses shall be filed by 6/11/2008 and Replies shall be filed by 7/9/2008). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/25/2008. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory K. Arenson on behalf of Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc (Arenson, Gregory) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing (doc. #184) set for 2/14/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 419 Motion to Seal expert report. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/7/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Expert Report of Dr. Kenneth G. Elzinga by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Order on Motion for Disbursement of FundsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 413 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/24/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re 413 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Signed By Markham Sherwood filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER re 413 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 413 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER re 406 MOTION for Extension of Time until dates set forth in Proposed Order Re: Pretrial Schedule 370 Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/1/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time 406 is granted. SO ORDERED by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10-1-07. (Schmitz, C.) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 405 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stewart M. Weltman terminated. SO ORDERED by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10-1-07. (Schmitz, C.) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 402 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/27/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 184 MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Beverley, T.) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 407 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 184 MOTION to Certify Class. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until dates set forth in Proposed Order Re: Pretrial Schedule 370 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Stewart M. Weltman to Withdraw as Attorney by Duraplas Corp. (Weltman, Stewart) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 402 Motion to Seal reply/response; granting 403 Motion for Leave to File redacted version of reply/response. Counsel should electronically file the redacted reply/response forthwith. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/28/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Thier Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED -- Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification# 2 Exhibit -- REDACTED -- Exhibit A to Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : taking under advisement 241 Motion to Intervene; Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2007 re 241 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stone Paradise, Inc. 55 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 184 MOTION to Certify Class (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Klingman on behalf of Stone Paradise, Inc (Klingman, Patrick) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 184 MOTION to Certify Class. (Exhibit A submitted in paper form) (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 395 Motion to Seal supplemental memorandum. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/10/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV Notice of Name Change (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing (re #241 Motion to Intervene) set for 9/20/2007 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 391 Motion for Hearing re 241 Motion to Intervene. A hearing is scheduled for 9/20/07 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/20/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Hearing re 241 MOTION to Intervene by Stone Paradise, Inc. (Leser, Karen) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 388 Sealed Document filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 386 Motion to Seal; granting 387 Motion for Leave to File supplemental memorandum in opposition to 184 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/8/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 388 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 184 MOTION to Certify Class (Exhibits 1-3 submitted in paper form). (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document)(Beverley, T.) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification -- Redacted by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification -- Redacted# 2 Exhibits to Supplemental Memorandum -- Redacted)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 380 letter motion, but the relief requested is modified. Plaintiffs may ask DEE up to three written depostion questions to probe DEE's knowledge about why the name "Weissman" was used by defendants in connection with hotel reservations and meetings. The written deposition questions must be served within 10 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/31/07. (Schmitz, C.) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 379 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 21, 2007 Letter Motion Requested a Second Deposition of Nicolaas Viets filed by DSM Elastomers Europe BV. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/11/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER re sealing 380 Letter. Letter document 380 is hereby sealed. Counsel is instructed to re-file redacted version of letter document, together with all exhibits. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/7/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document by DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 380 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2 # 2 Exhibit 3 # 3 Exhibit 4-5 # 4 Exhibit 6-7)(Cody, C.) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 380 Letter -- Defendant DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 21, 2007 Letter Motion Requesting a Second Deposition of Nicolaas Viets filed by DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -- Exhibits 1-7)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Edmund W. Searby Dated 5/21/07 Re: Disputed Issue - DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.'s failure to provide certain testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C ) (Beverley, T.) . Modified on 6/1/2007 (Beverley, T.). (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 21, 2007 Letter Motion Requested a Second Deposition of Nicolaas Viets by DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT purusant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the Court finds there is no just reason for delay and hereby directs the entry of judgment as to defendants Chemtura Corporation (f/k/a Crompton Corporation) and Chemtura USA Corporation (f/k/a Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc) in the amount of $21,000,000. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/9/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 373 MOTION for Interim Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/9/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting final approval of plan of allocation of Crompton settlement proceeds re 371 MOTION for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/9/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : granting 371 Motion for Settlement; granting 373 Motion for Attorney Fees; Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2007 re 373 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Polymerics Inc, 371 MOTION for Settlement filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Polymerics Inc. and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 373 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc.Responses due by 5/18/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Interim Award of Attornys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 2 Affidavit Anthony J. Bolognese, Esquire# 3 Exhibit A (Part 1) to Bolonese Declaration# 4 Exhibit A (Part 2) to Bolognese Declaration# 5 Affidavit Markham Sherwood (Part 1)# 6 Affidavit Markham Sherwood (Part 2))(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 371 MOTION for Settlement filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 5/10/2007 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order and Rule 54(b) Final Judgment# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Final Approval of Plan of Allocation of Crompton Settlement Proceeds# 3 Affidavit Declaration of Markham Sherwood [Part 1]# 4 Affidavit Markham Sherwood Declaration [Part 2])(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULE re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2007 re 336 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2007. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/24/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 361 MOTION to Seal Sur-Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Polymerics Inc. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/20/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 367 Motion to amend scheduling order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/24/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2007 336 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Re Pretrial Schedule)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 361 Motion to Seal Sur-Rebuttal Memorandum. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/19/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 359 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/18/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 364 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 184 MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit 1, Volume I# 3 Exhibit 2, Volume I# 4 Exhibit 3, Volume I# 5 Exhibit 4, Volume I# 6 Exhibit 5, Volume I# 7 Exhibit 6, Volume I# 8 Exhibit 7, Volume, I# 9 Exhibit 8, Volume I# 10 Exhibit 9, Volume I# 11 Exhibit 10, Volume I# 12 Exhibit 11, Volume I# 13 Exhibit 1.part 1, Volume II# 14 Exhibit 1.part2, Volume II# 15 Exhibit 2.part1, Volume II# 16 Exhibit 2.part2, Volume II# 17 Exhibit 3, Volume II# 18 Exhibit 4, Volume II# 19 Exhibit 5, Volume II# 20 Exhibit 6, Volume II)(Beverley, T.) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 361 MOTION to Seal Sur-Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Sur-Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 359 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : Telephone Status Conference held on 3/2/2007. Total Time: 1 hour and 55 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motion to Compel held on 3/2/07 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 356 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3# 2 Exhibit 4-16)(Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 352 Motion to Seal sur-reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/20/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 184 MOTION to Certify Class notice of sealed sur-reply filed by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 184 MOTION to Certify Class redacted sur-reply filed by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal sur-reply memorandum by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Steven Alan Reiss Dated 2/27/07 Re: Status Conference held on 2/15/07 & Order of 2/16/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 328 MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/8/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 2/15/07 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSOLIDATED CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM re Telephone Conference held on 3/2/07 granting in part and denying in part 328 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/6/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION. Signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chairman MDL Panel on 2/16/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 338 MOTION to Seal Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Produce Outstanding Dicsocvery and Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to filed by DSM Elastomers Europe BV, DSM Copolymer Inc. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/27/07. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 344 Sealed Document...ORIGINALLY EFILED IN ERROR AS DOCUMENT # 339 , REDOCKETED TO PROPERLY IDENTIFY. (Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Unredacted version of document # 340 filed on 2/26/07) by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV re 328 MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document.part2)(Beverley, T.) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 338 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/28/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 337 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/16/07 to file supplemental brief and affidavit on class certification. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/27/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Motion Hearing re Motion to Compel #328 set for 3/2/2007 at 4:30 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate phone call to chambers (203) 579-5714. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Produce Outstanding Discovery and Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories -- REDACTED VERSION (also filed in MDL 1642) re 328 MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit REDACTED EXHIBITS)(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR... Memorandum in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Produce Outstanding Discovery and Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories -- Notice of Manual Filing (also filed in MDL 1642) re 328 MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Miller, Britt) Modified on 3/1/2007 (Beverley, T.). (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Individual Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Produce Outstanding Dicsocvery and Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories (also filed in MDL 1642) by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until March 16, 2007 To file supplemental brief and affidavit on class certification by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV, Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Sadin, Shelley) Modified on 3/5/2007 (Beverley, T.). (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSOLIDATED CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM re Conference held on 2/15/07. Discovery due by 10/10/2007, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2007. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/16/07. (Beverley, T.) Modified on 2/21/2007 (Beverley, T.). (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot without prejudice 261 Motion to Compel; denying as moot without prejudice 311 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2007 re 187 MOTION for Leave to File, 311 MOTION to Compel filed by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc, 261 MOTION to Compel filed by Carlisle Corp, Duraplas Corp, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Richard Immerman, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc, Alco Indust Inc, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Freudenberg-Nok, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Precision Assoc Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Reeves Brothers Inc. Total Time: 1 hour and 30 minutes(Court Reporter Catucci.) (Montz, A.) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 334 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Crompton Corporation and Unroyal Chemical Company, Inc. re 333 Proposed Order, filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Precision Assoc Inc, Schlegel Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Polymerics Inc. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/15/07. (Cody, C.) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007, Terminated: 2/15/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER re 324 MOTION for Settlement With Crompton Corporation and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc. by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE NOTICE re judicial recusal. Responses to be filed within thirty days from the docketing of this notice. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/14/07. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc re 328 MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C - part 1# 4 Exhibit C - part 2)(Candee, D.) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Crompton Corporation (n/k/a Chemtura Corporation) and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc., (n/k/a Chemtura USA Corporation) by Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Products, Inc, Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bell, Joseph) Modified on 2/15/2007 (Beverley, T.). (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc re 328 MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel the DSM Defendants to Provide Complete Answers to Interrogatories by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc.Responses due by 3/5/2007 (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Order of TransferCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/7/07. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 324 MOTION for Settlement With Crompton Corporation and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc. filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER re 324 MOTION for Settlement With Crompton Corporation and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc. by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement With Crompton Corporation and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc. by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Konopka on behalf of Duraplast, Diamond Holdings, Alco, Polimeri, Schlagel, Synaflex, Precision , plaintiffs (Konopka, Kathleen) Modified on 1/29/2007 (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 311 MOTION to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Produce 30(b)(6) Witnesses filed by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc. (Raabe, Craig) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 320 Motion for Extension of Time until January 18, 2007 to file brief in further support of 311 MOTION to Compel class plaintiffs to produce 30(b)(6) witnesses. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1/11/07. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2007 for filing its reply brief in further support of its 311 Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Produce 30(b)(6) Witnesses by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc. (Raabe, Craig) Modified on 1/11/2007 to create link (Brown, S.). (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion for Order. Pretrial Order #1 was entered on 9/11/03 [Doc. #11]. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1/5/07. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting NUNC PRO TUNC 185 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1/3/07. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 302 Motion to Seal Unredacted Memorandum and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1/3/07. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 314 Response to 311 Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Produce 30(b)(6) Witnesses Signed By Joshua H. Grabar filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) Modified on 12/29/2006 to create link (Brown, S.). (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER re 314 Response to 311 Motion to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Produce 30(b)(6) Witnesses by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) Modified on 12/29/2006 to create link (Brown, S.). (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 311 MOTION to Compel Class Plaintiffs to Produce 30(b)(6) Witnesses filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2# 2 Exhibit 3 - 4# 3 Exhibit 5 - 7# 4 Exhibit 8# 5 Exhibit 9# 6 Exhibit 10# 7 Exhibit 11# 8 Exhibit 12# 9 Exhibit 13# 10 Exhibit 14)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 2/28/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2007.. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/8/06. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 311 MOTION to Compel filed by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 3 Part A# 9 Exhibit 3 Part B# 10 Exhibit 3 Part C# 11 Exhibit 3 Part D# 12 Exhibit 3 Part E)(Torday, B.) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel class plaintiffs to produce 30(b)(6) witnesses by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc.Responses due by 12/28/2006 (Torday, B.) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection 303 Motion to Withdraw Certain Responses to Requests for Admission. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/30/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter C. Dorsey : Final Approval Hearing held on 11/28/2006. Total Time: 0 hours and 12 minutes(Court Reporter Falcone, ECRO.) (Villano, P.) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT against Defendants Bayer AG, Bayer Corp, and Bayer MaterialScience LLC for $32,474,810 as settlement amount plus accrued interest as depostited into escrow accounts... and is approved as a Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/28/06. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Final Approval of Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/28/06. (2 pgs)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 296 Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/28/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support re 302 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum and Exhibits, 303 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Responses to Requests for Admission NOTICE ONLY filed electronically filed by DSM Copolymer Inc. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 303 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Responses to Requests for Admission Redacted Public Version filed by DSM Copolymer Inc. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw Certain Responses to Requests for Admission by DSM Copolymer Inc. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memorandum and Exhibits by DSM Copolymer Inc. (Sadin, Shelley) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel, This Document Relates to All Actions in MDL 1542 and MDL 1642 (and is being filed in both actions) re 261 MOTION to Compel filed by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 296 MOTION for Settlement By Class with Defendants Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation and Bayer MaterialScience LLC Signed By Lisa A. Poncia filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 296 MOTION for Settlement By Class with Defendants Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation and Bayer MaterialScience LLC filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER re 296 MOTION for Settlement By Class with Defendants Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation and Bayer MaterialScience LLC [and Rule 54(b) Final Judgment] by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re 296 MOTION for Settlement By Class with Defendants Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation and Bayer MaterialScience LLC [Granting Final Approval of Plan of Allocation and Settlement Proceeds] by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Settlement By Class with Defendants Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation and Bayer MaterialScience LLC by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of 241 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stone Paradise, Inc. (replaces entry #294) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE by Stone Paradise, Inc re 241 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in support of Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Leser, Karen) Modified on 11/6/2006 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Suga on behalf of Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc (Suga, Kristin) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for Tuesday, 11/7/2006, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Peter C. Dorsey. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 289 Motion for Status Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, 11/7/06, at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Dorsey. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/20/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 288 Motion for Protective Order Unopposed Motion for Application of Protective Order to Carlisle Action. Plaintiffs in Carlisles Co., Inc. Vs. Crompton Corp., Case No. 3:05cv1278 (PCD) are hereby added as a party to the Protective Order filed by the Court on December 23, 2003 (Doc. No. 50) and are henceforth bound by the terms of said order as if they were original signatories. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/18/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Status Conference by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order Unopposed Motion for Application of Protective Order to Carlisle Action by Carlisle Co Inc.Responses due by 10/16/2006 (Attachments: # 1)(Bell, Joseph) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 282 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joy K. Fuyuno terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/14/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 276 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Chemtura Corporation (formerly Crompton Corp.) and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/12/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 183 Motion to File Documents Under Seal . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/12/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 154 Motion to File CD Under Seal . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/12/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 153 Motion to Seal CD . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/11/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Joy K. Fuyuno to Withdraw as Attorney by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Hockett, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, as there is no appearance on the docket for Attorney Schulman. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/1/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 274 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Linda Nussbaum terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/1/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 279 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 267 Motion for Leave to File nstanter A Surreply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents and Answer Interrogatories Without Any Geographic Limitation by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Surreply of Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc. and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents and Answer Interrogatories Without Any Geographic Limitation. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/15/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER and Stipulation Relating to Carlisle Companies Incorporated, et al. by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc. (Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Chemtura Corporation and Uniroyal Chemical Company, Inc. by RBX Indus Inc.Responses due by 8/25/2006 (Nast, Dianne) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Steven H. Schulman to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Linda Nussbaum as Attorney by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to DSM Defendants' 267 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel DSM Defendants to Produce Documents and Answer Interrogatories Without Geographic Limitation filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Daniels, Brian) Modified on 7/27/2006 to create link (Brown, S.). (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER Approving re 101 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice and Stipulation for Tolling of Statute of Limitations and Tolling Agreement as to DSM Elastomers B.V filed by Ethylene Propylene Diene Monomer (EPDM) Antitrust Litigation, . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7/25/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 268 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Bayer . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7/19/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Bayer Defendants by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 268 MOTION for Settlement With Bayer Defendants filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement With Bayer Defendants by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Instanter A Surreply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents and Answer Interrogatories Without Any Geographic Limitation by DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe BV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Surreply of Defendants DSM Copolymer, Inc. and DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents and Answer Interrogatories Without Any Geographic Limitation# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 266 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc re 261 SEALED DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITA# 2 EXHIBITB)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 265 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document by DSM Elastomers Europe BV, DSM Copolymer Inc re 261 SEALED DOCUMENT, 264 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT1# 2 EXHIBIT2# 3 EXHIBIT3# 4 EXHIBIT4# 5 EXHIBIT5# 6 EXHIBIT6# 7 EXHIBIT7# 8 EXHIBIT8# 9 EXHIBIT9# 10 EXHIBIT10# 11 EXHIBIT12# 12 EXHIBIT13# 13 EXHBIT14# 14 EXHIBIT15# 15 EXHIBIT16)(Brown, S.) Modified filers on 7/14/2006 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 264 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document by DSM Elastomers Europe BV, DSM Copolymer Inc re 261 SEALED DOCUMENT. (Brown, S.) Modified filers on 7/14/2006 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 263 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc re 262 Sealed Document,, 261 SEALED DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 eXHIBITB# 2 EXHIBITC# 3 EXHIBITD# 4 EXHIBITE# 5 EXHIBITF# 6 EXHIBITG# 7 EXHIBITH# 8 EXHIBITI# 9 EXHIBITJ# 10 EXHIBITK# 11 EXHIBITL# 12 EXHIBITM# 13 EXHIBITN# 14 EXHIBITO# 15 EXHIBITP# 16 EXHIBITQ# 17 EXHIBITR)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 262 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document by Reeves Brothers Inc, Crompton Corp, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc re 261 SEALED DOCUMENT. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 261 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc.Responses due by 8/2/2006 (Brown, S.) MOTION to Compel Discovery Requests Without Geographic Limitation by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc.Responses due by 8/2/2006 (Brown, S.) Modified on 7/14/2006 (Brown, S.). Modified on 7/14/2006 (Minor, V.) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 241 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stone Paradise, Inc. (Leser, Karen) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. A check of the docket shows no appearance having been filed in this case for Peter B. Ackerman. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/9/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 201 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Louis A. Kessler terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/9/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot 207 Motion for Settlement . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/9/06. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 241 MOTION to Intervene filed by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Notice of Manual Filing Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Notice of Manual Filing Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Notice of Manual Filing Exhibit C)(Mokriski, Diane) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 254 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William V. O'Reilly terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1/9/06. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for William V. O'Reilly to Withdraw as Attorney by Bayer Corp. (Malech, Steven) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Stanley on behalf of Stone Paradise, Inc. (Stanley, David) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 251 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 241 MOTION to Intervene Responses due by 1/27/2006. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/20/05. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Stipulated) as to 241 MOTION to Intervene until January 27, 2006 by Bayer Corp. (Malech, Steven) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Order on Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Endorsement ORDER; Ordered Accordingly 249 Motion to for David W. Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Clerk on 12/14/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for David W. Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stone Paradise, Inc. Filing Fee $$25.00. Receipt Number N017188. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER grantiing 243 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval filed by Duraplas Corp,, Diamond Holding Corp,, Alco Indust Inc,, Polymerics Inc,, Schlegel Corp,, Synaflex Rubber Prod,, Precision Assoc Inc, . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/13/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Brannon on behalf of Polimeri Europa Amer Inc (Villano, P.) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 243 Motion for Settlement for Final Approval by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/13/05. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter C. Dorsey : Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2005 re 243 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval filed by Duraplas Corp,, Diamond Holding Corp,, Alco Indust Inc,, Polymerics Inc,, Schlegel Corp,, Synaflex Rubber Prod,, Precision Assoc Inc,. 4 minutes(Court Reporter Sherman, ECRO.) (Villano, P.) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 243 MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gilardi# 2 Exhibit Ex. A# 3 Exhibit Ex. B# 4 Exhibit Ex. C)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT Declaration of Michael Robb by Stone Paradise, Inc. re 241 MOTION to Intervene. (Leser, Karen) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene by Stone Paradise, Inc..Responses due by 12/28/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7)(Leser, Karen) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Leser on behalf of Stone Paradise, Inc. to intervene (Leser, Karen) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 238 Motion for Extension of Time until January 19, 2006 to Respond to Defendant ExxonMobil Corporation's Discovery Requests . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/6/05. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until January 19, 2006 to Respond to Defendant ExxonMobil Corporation's Discovery Requests by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Dianne M. Nast on behalf of RBX Indus Inc (Nast, Dianne) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Extending Dates to Implement Settlemnt with Syndial SpA. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/4/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 231 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Dates to Implement the Settlement with Syndial S.p.A. . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/4/05. (S-Villano, P.) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Extending Dates to Implement Settlement with Yndial S.p.A . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/25/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 229 Motion for Court Approval of Fourth Amended Joint Proposed Schedule Order . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/26/05. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2005.. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1`0/5/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Dates to Implement the Settlement with Syndial S.p.A. Dates to Implement the Settlement With Syndial S.p.A. by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Polimeri Europa Amer Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Extending Dates to Implement Settlement with Syndial S.p.A.)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Syndial SpA and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds re 219 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/30/05. (Brown, S.) Modified on 10/27/2005 to create link to document #219 (Inferrera, L.). (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Court Approval of Fourth Amended Joint Proposed Schedule Order by Reeves Brothers Inc, Crompton Corp, Diamond Holding Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc, Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Bayer AG, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Bayer Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, DSM Elastomers BV, DSM Copolymer Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Fourth Amended Joint Proposed Schedule)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick J. Sweeney terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/21/05. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Craig C. Corbitt on behalf of Carlisle Co Inc Appearance (Corbitt, Craig) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Patrick Sweeney to Withdraw as Attorney by Crompton Corp, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Uniroyal Chemical Company Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Antitrust Laws by Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc.(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant Chemtura Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Antitrust Laws by Crompton Corp.(Babbitt, Bradford) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 222 Motion for Hearing re 207 MOTION for Settlement, 213 Calendar Entry, Request to Cancel Crompton Settlement Hearing. The Settlement conference that was scheduled for 9/7/05 is hereby cancelled.. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/6/05. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing re 207 MOTION for Settlement, 213 Calendar Entry, Request to Cancel Crompton Settlement Hearing by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 207 MOTION for Settlement with Crompton and Uniroyal filed by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc, Carlisle Co Inc, Carlisle Corp, Carlisle Syntec Inc, Carlisle Engineered Products Inc, Carlisle Power Transmission Prod Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christl Hansman# 2 Exhibit 1 to Hansman Declaration# 3 Exhibit 2 to Hansman Declaration# 4 Exhibit 3 to Hansman Declaration)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Mason on behalf of Carlisle Co Inc (Mason, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005, Terminated: 9/30/2005 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER re 217 MOTION for Settlement with Syndial S.p.A., 218 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 217 MOTION for Settlement with Syndial S.p.A. filed by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement with Syndial S.p.A. by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER . Signed by MDL Panel Clerk on 8/4/05. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart M. Weltman on behalf of Duraplas Corp Plaintiff (Weltman, Stewart) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER and Final Judgment granting 197 Motion for Settlement against DuPont Dow Elastomers LLC . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 6/29/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED MISCELLANEOUS CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/7/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Peter C. Dorsey. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 211 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacqueline Bryks terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 6/20/05. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Jacqueline E. Bryks to Withdraw as Attorney by Duraplas Corp. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/28/2005, Entered: 5/28/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by DSM Copolymer Inc Notice of Change of Address (Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw LLP) (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 05/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kristina E. Pollak terminated. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 5/27/05. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 207 MOTION for Settlement filed by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Settlement by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Wenzel on behalf of EI Dupont De Nemours & Co, Dupont Dow Elastomers LLC (Wenzel, William) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in further Support re 197 MOTION for Settlement with Defendant DuPont Dow Elastomers LLC filed by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 attachments# 2 affidavit)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR: MOTION for Settlement Brief in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment# 2 Declaration)(Schaefer, David) Modified on 5/16/2005 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Kristina E. Pollak to Withdraw as Attorney by Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Schlegel Corp, Freudenberg-Nok. (Dirksen, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Dirksen on behalf of Schlegel Corp (Dirksen, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Louis A. Kessler to Withdraw as Attorney by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re 197 MOTION for Settlement with Defendant DuPont Dow Elastomers LLC Signed By Robert Mellin filed by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re 197 MOTION for Settlement with Defendant DuPont Dow Elastomers LLC Signed By Chrystl Hansman filed by Reeves Brothers Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Richard Immerman, Rubber Eng & Dev Co, Alco Indust Inc, Robbins LLC, Polymerics Inc, Industrial Rubber Products, Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Freudenberg-Nok, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc, RBX Indus Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 197 MOTION for Settlement with Defendant DuPont Dow Elastomers LLC filed by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Settlement with Defendant DuPont Dow Elastomers LLC by Diamond Holding Corp, Alco Indust Inc, Polymerics Inc, Schlegel Corp, Duraplas Corp, Synaflex Rubber Prod, Precision Assoc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, David) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/28/05. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum in Further Support re 187 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply and Report in Opposition to 184 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Exxon Mobil Chemical Co, Bayer AG, Bayer Corp, DSM Elastomers BV, DSM Copolymer Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re: Electronic Filing of Case. Responses due by 4/26/2005.. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/20/05. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Electronic Filing Order)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 190 Motion Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Crompton . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/12/05. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Brown, S.) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS: (1) Global Settlement Agreement with Crompton and (2) Implementing Settlement Agreement with Crompton Related document: 191 Memorandum in Support of Motion and 190 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Crompton & Uniroyal Chemical filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re 190 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Crompton & Uniroyal Chemical filed by Plaintiffs (Brown, S.) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Crompton & Uniroyal Chemical by PalintiffsResponses due by 4/28/2005 (Brown, S.) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' REPLY to Response to 187 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply Memorandu and Report in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs (Brown, S.) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 187 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum and report in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Exxon Mobil Corp, DSM Copolymer, Inc., DSM Elastomers Europe, B.V., Bayer Corp, Bayer AG and Bayer MaterialScience, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum and report in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Exxon Mobil Corp, DSM Copolymer, Inc., DSM Elastomers Europe, B.V., Bayer Corp, Bayer AG and Bayer MaterialScience, LLC. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document re 184 MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess Page Limit. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by plaintiffs. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Shea on behalf of Europa Americas, Inc. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Weathers on behalf of Polimeri Europa Americas, Inc. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by Exxon Mobil Corp.(Brown, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by DSM Copolymer,(Brown, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to RBX Industries' Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Polimeri Europa Americas(Brown, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Polimeri Europa Americas. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Crompton Corp.(Brown, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Uniroyal Chemical Co.(Brown, S.) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 2/24/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer ORDER, RBX Industries -v- Bayer Corp, et al., from E.D. PA. Signed by Michael Beck, Clerk on 10/8/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of Robert S. Kitchenoff by Plaintiff, Richard Immerman (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. So Ordered 169 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Joint Proposed Schedule. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/17/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Dupont Dow Elastomers LLC re 167 Motion for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/4/05. (Brown, S.) Modified on 10/27/2005 to create link to document #167 (Inferrera, L.). (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Vacating Conditional Transfer Order; re case # 5:04-853 from Northern District of Ohio . Signed by Judge William T. Hodges, Chairman, MDL Panel on 2/4/05. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Third Amended Joint Schedule by Plaintiffs, DSM Copolymer, DSM Elastomers Europe B.V, Mobil Corp. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 167 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement with Dupont Elastomers by Class Plaintiffs: filed by Alco Inc, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Functional Products, Polymetrics Inc, Precision Assoc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Products Co,. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement with Dupont Elastomers by Class Plaintiffs: Alco Industries, Diamond Holding Corp, Duraplas Corp, Functional products, Polymetrics Inc, Precision Assoc, Schlegel Corp, Synaflex Rubber Products Co.Responses due by 2/22/2005 (Brown, S.) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER, Defenses and Affirmative Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Polimeri Europa S.P.A.(Brown, S.) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time for 45 day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 1/17/05. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/14/04. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for 45 day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Polimeri Europa S.p.A (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Polimeri Europa S.P.A (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Weathers (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Shea (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing by Bayer Corp, Bayer AG, Bayer MaterialScience, Crompton Corp, Uniroyal, Dow, DuPont Dow Elastomers, DSM Coppolymer, DSM Elastomers Europe, Exxon Mobil, re 156 Sealed Document, 157 Sealed Document, 158 Sealed Document, 159 Sealed Document (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document by Bayer Corp, Bayer AG, Bayer MaterialScience, Crompton Corp, Uniroyal, Dow, Dupont Dow Elastomers, DSM Elastomers, Exxon Mobil. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 158 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document by Bayer Corp, Bayer AG, Bayer MaterialScience, Crompton Corp, Uniroyal, Dow, Dupont Dow Elastomers, DSM Elastomers Europe, Exxon Mobil. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document by Bayer Corp, Bayer AG, Bayer MaterialScience, Crompton Corp, Uniroyal, Dow Chemical, DuPont Dow Elastomers, DSM Elastomers Europ, Exxon Mobil. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 156 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document by Bayer Corp, Bayer AG, Bayer MaterialScience, Crompton Corp, Uniroyal, Dow Chemical Co, Dupont Dow Elastomers, DSM Elastomers Europe, Exxon Mobil. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/19/04.THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File CD Under Seal by DSM Copolymer, Inc and DSM Elastomers Europe, BV. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File CD Under Seal by DSM Copolymer, Inc and DSM Elastomers Europe, B.V. (Brown, S.) Modified on 11/18/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Class Certificiaton, Exhibits to Opposition for Class Certification, Expert Report, Exhibits to Expert Report, by DSM Copolymer, Inc and DSM Elastomers Europe, BV. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot 148 Consented Motion for Extension of Time (See corrected motion), granting 149 CORRECTED Motion on Consent for Extension of Time to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/25/04. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Sweeney on behalf of Crompton Corp and Uniroyal Chemical Co(Brown, S.) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED MOTION on Consent to Modify Second Amended Joint Scheduling Order by Crompton Corp,, Uniroyal Chemical Co., Bayer Corp, Bayer AG, Bayer Polymers, LLC, Dupont Dow Elastomers LLC, Dow Chemical Co., DSM Copolymer Inc, DSM Elastomers Europe B.V., Exxon Mobil Corp & E.I. duPont de Nemours & Co. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for one week Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Defendants. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 147 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Answer by Uniroyal re 102 Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Endorsement ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File Answer Underseal . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/27/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Answer by Crompton Corp. re 102 Sealed Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Endorsement ORDER granting Crompton Corp.'s 131 Motion for Leave to File Answer Under Seal. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/27/04. (Brown, S.) Modified on 8/30/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 116 Motion for Mathew Rechner to Withdraw as Attorney. . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/27/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Favretto on behalf of DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 139 Motion for Extension of Time for 1 day to Respond to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Crompton Corp. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/24/04.THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE (Villano, P.) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 138 Motion for Extension of Time for 1 day to Respond to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by defendant Uniroyal Chemical Co., Inc. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/24/04. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE. (Villano, P.) Modified on 8/24/2004 (Villano, P.). (Entered: 08/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for 1 day Extension of Time to Respond to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Crompton Corp. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for 1 day Extension of Time to Respond to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Uniroyal. (Brown, S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Richard A. Lockridge by Precision Assoc. Inc (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance W. Joseph Bruckner by Precision Assoc. Inc (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Yvonne M. Flaherty by Precision Associates, Inc (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Rule and Anthony V. Nanni for Exxon Mobil Corp (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Answer under seal by Uniroyal. (Depino, F.) Modified on 8/30/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Dow Chemical Co.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Answer under seal by Crompton Corp. (Depino, F.) Modified on 8/19/2004 (Depino, F.). Modified on 8/30/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing re 128 Answer to Second Consoldiated Amended Complaint, 129 Answer to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER and Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.(Inferrera, L.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER and Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by DSM Copolymer Inc.(Inferrera, L.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2004 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Dupont Dow Elastomers LLC (Attachments: # 1 Continued Answer)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Bayer MaterialScience, LLC.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Bayer Corp.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Bayer AG.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Adding DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. to Stipulation and Order Concerning Confidentiality of Documents and Materials (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by DSM Elastomers Europe B.V. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Britt M. Miller on behalf DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley R. Sadin on behalf of DSM Elastomer Europe B.V.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Marovitz on behalf of DSM Elastomers Europe B.V.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: # 1 document continuation# 2 document continuation)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Amended Joint Proposed Schedule (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Mathew Rechner to Withdraw as Attorney by Polymeric, Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bayer Corp (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bayer MaterialScience LLC (Falcone, K.) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2004 (Falcone, K.). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2004 (Falcone, K.). (Entered: 07/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time until 8/16/04 to respond to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7/29/04. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 72 Motion to Dismiss, denying as moot 74 Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7/28/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/28/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/16/04 for Bayer Corp; Bayer Polymers, LLC; Bayer AG; Crompton Corp; Uniroyal Chemical Co, Inc.; Dow Chemical Co; DSM Elastomer Europe B.V., DSM Copolymer Inc. and Exxon Mobil Corp to respond to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 07/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION RE; Filing Second Consolidated Amended Complaint and Tolling Agreement re; James McKinley by ExxonMobil. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re; Filing Second Consolidated Amended Complaint and Tolling Agreement re Stephen Nathanson and Lincoln Widmer by DSM Copolymer Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Order on Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Endorsement ORDER Ordered Accordingly 105 Motion for Richard Lockridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Clerk on 7/19/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Order on Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Endorsement ORDER Ordered Accordingly 104 Motion for Yvonne Flaherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Clerk on 7/19/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Order on Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Endorsement ORDER Ordered Accordingly 103 Motion for H. Joseph Bruckner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Clerk on 7/19/04. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard Lockridge. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N012959 by Precision Associates Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yvonne Flaherty. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N012959 by Precision Associates Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear 7/16/04 Attorney W. Joseph Bruckner. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N012959. by Precision Associates Inc. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Second Consolidated AMENDED COMPLAINT (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice and Stipulation for Tolling of Statute of Limitations and Tolling Agreement as to DSM Elastomers B.V by Plaintiffs (Brown, S.) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re: Filing of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed