Appel v. Spiridon et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-01177-SRU

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 5:35 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rosalie Appel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AFSCME Council 37 Wisconsin Solidarity Form

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly Anne Rommel +1 203 250 2220 +1 203 250 2233 krommel@ctcop.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katrena K. Engstrom +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 kengstrom@johnrwilliams.com
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Abe Echevarria, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Carol Hawkes, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Charles P. Spiridon, Counter-Claimant
No Logo James Schmotter, Counter-Claimant
No Logo John Wallace, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Linda Rinker, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Linda Vaden-Goad, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Margaret Grimes, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Terry Wells, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Charles P. Spiridon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret Q. Chapple +1 860 808 5315 +1 860 808 5383 margaret.chapple@ct.gov
Space Joseph A. Jordano +1 860 808 5160 +1 860 808 5384 joseph.jordano@ct.gov
Space Beth Z. Margulies +1 860 808 5340 +1 860 808 5383 beth.margulies@ct.gov
No Logo James Schmotter, Defendant
No Logo Linda Rinker, Defendant
No Logo Linda Vaden-Goad, Defendant
No Logo Rosalie Appel, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Abe Echevarria, Consol Defendant
No Logo Carol Hawkes, Consol Defendant
No Logo James Schmotter, Consol Defendant
No Logo John Wallace, Consol Defendant
No Logo Linda Rinker, Consol Defendant
No Logo Margaret Grimes, Consol Defendant
No Logo Terry Wells, Consol Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (217) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 213 Motion for Release of Funds. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/16/14. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Continued Testimony of Terry Wells. Held on 12/16/13 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2014. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Testimony of Terry Wells. Held on 12/13/13 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2014. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Testimony of Hwa Young Caruso. Held on 12/13/13 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2014. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION for Release of Funds re: Doc. #s 211, 212 by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
            ORDER allowing 211 Bill of Costs filed by Linda Vaden-Goad, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker in the amount of $3,429.50. Signed by Clerk on 3/20/2014.(Thomas, D.) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
              BILL OF COSTS by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 210 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                JUDGMENT entered in favor of Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker, Linda Vaden-Goad against Rosalie Appel.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2014.(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                  Amended (corrected) Jury Instructions. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                    JURY VERDICT For defendants against plaintiff. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                      Marked Court Exhibit List. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                        Jury Instructions. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                          Marked Witness List. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                            Marked Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Rosalie Appel. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                              Marked Defendant's Exhibit List by Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Jury Trial held on 12/18/2013. Total Time: 2 hours and 25 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Jury Trial held on 12/17/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 12/18/13. Total Time: 3 hours and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Jury Trial held on 12/16/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 12/17/13. Total Time: 6 hours and 42 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Oral Ruling and ORDER denying 197 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/13/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Jury Trial held on 12/13/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 12/16/13. Total Time: 6 hours and 51 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                          ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Jury Trial held on 12/12/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 12/13/13. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill taking under advisement 193 Motion for limiting instruction. Total Time: 6 hours and 45 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                Marked Exhibit List (Stipulated to by the Parties) by Rosalie Appel, Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Limiting Instruction No. 1 by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.Responses due by 12/30/2013 (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION S OF FACT AND LAW by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE re 177 Trial Memo, by Rosalie AppelPlaintiff's Positions Regarding Proposed Defense Exhibits. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Jury Selection held on 12/6/2013. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill Total Time: 2 hours and 25 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS filed by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Defendants' Exhibit 579 by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 579 (Part 1 of 7), # 2 Exhibit 579 (Part 2 of 7), # 3 Exhibit 579 (Part 3 of 7), # 4 Exhibit 579 (Part 4 of 7), # 5 Exhibit 579 (Part 5 of 7), # 6 Exhibit 579 (Part 6 of 7), # 7 Exhibit 579 (Part 7 of 7))(Margulies, Beth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2013: # 8 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 1 of 7, # 9 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 2 of 7, # 10 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 3 of 7, # 11 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 4 of 7, # 12 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 5 of 7, # 13 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 6 of 7, # 14 REPLACEMENT PDF - Ex. 579 part 7 of 7) (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION in Limine by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.Responses due by 12/24/2013 (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Order of Facts Not in Dispute Under Rule 56(g) Order by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Amended Proposed Witness List by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File amended list of witnesses and exhibits. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/21/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      OBJECTION re 179 Trial Memo, to Plaintiff's Jury Instructions filed by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Amended List of Witnesses and Exhibits by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Amended List of Witnesses and Exhibits)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting nunc pro tunc, 176 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 178 Motion to Seal 177 Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/18/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Docket Entry Correction: Added Exhibits to 179 Redacted Joint Trial Memo, (Attachments: # 1 Addendum D, # 2 Addendum F1, # 3 Addendum F2, # 4 Addendum F3) (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              REDACTED TRIAL MEMO , Revised by Rosalie Appel, Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad Estimated trial time two weeks. (Margulies, Beth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2013: # 1 Exhibit Addendum B, # 2 Exhibit Addendum D, # 3 Exhibit Addendum F-1, # 4 Exhibit Addendum F-2, # 5 Exhibit Addendum F-3) (Pesta, J.). Modified on 11/15/2013 to add exhibits (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Seal Joint Trial Memorandum dated November 7, 2013 by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  JOINT TRIAL MEMO (JOINT) by Rosalie Appel, Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad Estimated trial time two weeks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Addendum B, # 2 Exhibit Addendum D, # 3 Exhibit Addendum F-1, # 4 Exhibit Addendum F-2, # 5 Exhibit Addendum F-3)(Margulies, Beth) Modified on 11/15/2013 to include exhibits(Pesta, J.). Modified on 11/15/2013 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 7, 2013,to file Joint Trial Memorandum 159 Calendar Entry, by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying 171 Motion to Continue for the reasons set forth on the record during the telephone conference held on 10/9/2013. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/9/2013. (Freuden, S.) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 171 MOTION to Continue Trial and Joint Trial Memorandum filed by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Defendant's counsel will contact Chambers at (203) 579-5714 with all parties on the line (Freuden, S.) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference set for 10/09/2013 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 411, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Defendant's counsel will contact Chambers at (203) 579-5714 with all parties on the line. (Freuden, S.) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Trial and Joint Trial Memorandum by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 9/20/2013. Case not settled. Counsel will contact Chambers when they are ready to schedule another settlement conference in this matter. Total Time: 3 hours (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Rosalie Appel (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA dated 5/21/2013 AFFIRMED IN PART and REVERSED IN PART 153 CORRECTED RULING AND ORDER re 154 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Linda Vaden-Goad, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying 162 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as moot.. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/14/13. (Munoz, A.) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Margaret Q. Chapple terminated. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/14/13. (Munoz, A.) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 5/6/2013, ( Settlement Conference set for 9/20/2013 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMO IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW.). 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2013 @ 1:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 160 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for Margaret Q. Chapple to Withdraw as Attorney by Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Margaret Q. Chapple to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Jordano on behalf of Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad in their individual capacities (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Judge William I. Garfinkel for settlement conference. (Munoz, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 12/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill Jury Trial set for 12/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Munoz, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Phone Status Conference set for 4/29/2013 10:30 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Plaintiff's counsel shall contact defendant's counsel and together they should contact chambers. (Munoz, A.) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA as to 154 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Linda Vaden-Goad, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker - For the foregoing reasons, the district court's denial of qualified immunity is hereby AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART. We remand for further proceedings consistent with this order. USCA Case Number 11-3799-cv (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. Held on 11/2/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2012. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Index to Record on Appeal by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad re 47 Notice of Appeal, 154 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, 69 USCA Mandate, 95 Amended Complaint, 152 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 41 Transcript, 88 Notice, 137 Reply to Response to Motion, 151 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 153 Order, 87 Transcript,, 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct, 138 Response, 90 Order, 108 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, 64 Order, 89 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 139 Reply to Response to Motion, 93 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 145 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion Hearing,, 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 141 Affidavit, 94 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 21 Amended Complaint, 148 Notice (Other), 142 Response, 100 Amended Complaint, 99 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 102 Status Conference, 86 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion Hearing,, 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint, 140 Transcript,, 1 Complaint. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 153 Order by Linda Rinker, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0205-2239373. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/11. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Anemone v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion for Extension of Time for 60 days after the court's ruling on 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The trial memo shall be due 60 days after the court's ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment. The calendar call (by phone) is scheduled for January 20, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. and shall go forward. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/10/11. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after the court's ruling on Defendants' Summary Judgment to file Joint Trial Memo and extension of Calendar Call to about two weeks thereafter by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            CALENDAR CALL ORDER. Calendar Call scheduled for January 21, 2011 at 4 pm. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/3/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/3/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2010 re 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill taking under advisement 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. A written ruling will issue. Total Time: 1 hour and 10 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Rescheduled Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2010 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Wolf, S.) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 10/8/2010 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 141 Affidavit, filed by Rosalie Appel. (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct Signed By Beth Z. Margulies filed by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/8/09 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct Sur reply filed by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff's Rule 56(a)(2) Statement filed by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct filed by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 27 - 28, # 3 Exhibit 29 - 32)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/06/2010. (Wolf, S.) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief to Motion for Summary Judgment by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time until August 10, 2010 to File Response/Reply re 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/27/2010. (Wolf, S.) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct until August 10, 2010 by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct filed by Rosalie Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Williams, John) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 7/15/2010. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/26/2010. (Yaster, B.) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (S-Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct until July 15, 2010 by Rosalie Appel. (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Katrena K. Engstrom on behalf of Rosalie Appel (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Substantive Due Process Claim and First Amendment Claim Re 2007 Conduct by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells.Responses due by 6/2/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Original summary judgment order, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Vaden Goad PI Testimony (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit Vaden Goad PI Testimony (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit Wiss PI Testimony (Part 1 of 3), # 8 Exhibit Wiss PI Testimony (Part 2 of 3), # 9 Exhibit Wiss PI Testimony (Part 3 of 3), # 10 Exhibit 4 - Wells Affidavit (Part 1 of 2), # 11 Exhibit Wells Affidavit (Part 2 of 2), # 12 Exhibit 5 - Schaab Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 6 - Echevarria Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 7 - Grimes Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 8 - Wallace Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 9 - Hawkes Affidavit, # 17 Exhibit 10 - Davis Affidavit, # 18 Exhibit 11 - Capobianco Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit 12 - Cardonsky Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit 13 - Bock Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit 14 - Alexander Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit 15 - Heslin Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit 16 - Fay Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit 17 - Yonkers Affidavit, # 25 Exhibit 18 - Rinker Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 19 - Rinker PI Testimony, # 27 Exhibit 20 - Spiridon Affidavit (Part 1 of 3), # 28 Exhibit 20 - Spiridon Affidavit (Part 2 of 3), # 29 Exhibit 20 - Spiridon Affidavit (Part 3 of 3), # 30 Exhibit 21 - Schmotter Affidavit, # 31 Exhibit 22 - Marcone Affidavit, # 32 Exhibit 23 - Appel's Depo Transcript, # 33 Exhibit 24 - Stacey Hongo Affidavit, # 34 Exhibit 25 - Stephanie Hongo Affidavit, # 35 Exhibit 26 - Unreported Cases)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 125 Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Pretrial Memorandum until 60 days after ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment. Calendar Call shall be re-scheduled. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/28/10. (S-Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after ruling on summary judgment (which motion is presently due 5/12/10) for joint pre-trial memo and date of trial calendar call to be determined thereafter by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/13/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            CALENDAR CALL ORDER. Calendar Call to be held on July 23, 2010 @ 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/13/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/11/10 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2010. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                First NOTICE by Rosalie Appel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Correspondence to Defendants' counsel, # 2 Exhibit Correspondence to Defendants' counsel)(Williams, John) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2010 re 114 MOTION for Protective Order, 109 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim, 105 MOTION to Compel. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhilldenying 105 Motion to Compel; granting 109 Motion to Dismiss; denying 114 Motion for Protective Order. 45 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/23/10 to file dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/1/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline Regarding New Allegation of Substantive Due Process in Civil Action No. 3:06CV1177(SRU) and Consolidated Case 3:07CV1237(SRU) to March 23, 2010 by Abe Echevarria, Margaret Grimes, Carol Hawkes, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, John Wallace, Terry Wells. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 109 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sean Loughran with attachments, # 2 Exhibit Summary Judgment Ruling (Docket No. 86))(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/2/10 to file dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/29/10. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline Regarding New Allegation of Substantive Due Process in Civil Action No. 3:06CV1177(SRU) and Consolidated Case 3:07CV1237(SRU) to March 2, 2010 by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order by Charles P. Spiridon.Responses due by 1/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant Spiridon, # 3 Exhibit Certification of Good Faith and Exhibit B - Email Correspondence)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Katrena K. Engstrom on behalf of Rosalie Appel (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/30/10 to File Response/Reply re 109 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/30/2010. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/15/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by defendants/counterclaimants as to 109 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim until January 30, 2010 by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Rosalie Appel.Responses due by 12/31/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Williams, John) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 100 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses., COUNTERCLAIM against Rosalie Appel by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 105 MOTION to Compel filed by Rosalie Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Discovery Responses)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 101 Motion to Strike. The additional language does not add a cause of action, but merely more specifically pleads damages. The October 19, 2006 amended complaint already alleged that plaintiff "is suffering...loss of pay and benefits," compl. paragraph 23, and that "plaintiff has suffered and will suffer...economic loss." Id. paragraph 27. The prior pending action does not bar the allegation of job loss because the allegations quoted above were made prior to the 2008 action filed by the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/16/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.Responses due by 11/17/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Faith)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 101 MOTION to Strike 100 Amended Complaint New Allegation in Third Amended Complaint Paragraph 29 MOTION to Strike 100 Amended Complaint New Allegation in Third Amended Complaint Paragraph 29 filed by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Two unreported cases)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Strike 100 Amended Complaint New Allegation in Third Amended Complaint Paragraph 29 MOTION to Strike 100 Amended Complaint New Allegation in Third Amended Complaint Paragraph 29 filed by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/8/2009. 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 100 Amended Complaint New Allegation in Third Amended Complaint Paragraph 29 by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.Responses due by 7/30/2009 (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by Rosalie Appel.(Williams, John) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM denying as moot 98 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/8/2009. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until December 1, 2009 to complete discovery and up to and including December 31, 2009 to file dispositive motions 89 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to 6/25/09 to respond to 95 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/27/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until June 25, 2009 to file responsive pleading 95 Amended Complaint by Carol Hawkes, Terry Wells, Linda Rinker, Margaret Grimes, John Wallace, Abe Echevarria, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, filed by Rosalie Appel.(Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 85 Motion to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's claims should be heard on the merits, not barred by technicalities of pleading. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/5/09. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint filed by Linda Rinker, James Schmotter, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULING Denying 91 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of 86 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/16/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re 86 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing, by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.Responses due by 12/31/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of SJ Ruling, # 2 Exhibit exhibits, cases, and transcripts)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 89 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Report Approved. Discovery shall be completed by 12/1/09 and dispositive motions shall be filed by 12/31/09. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/9/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/25/08 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2009. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2008 re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Linda Vaden-Goad, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. Oral ruling issued granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; and case ordered consolidated with 3:07cv1237 for all purposes. Total Time: 1 hour and 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint by Rosalie Appel.Responses due by 12/17/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Rommel on behalf of Rosalie Appel (Rommel, Kelly) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Entry Correction re 82 Reply to Response to Motion. Modified to correct PDF of former exhibit 3 which is now exhibit 5. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Reply, # 2 Exhibit Appel Deposition Testimony, # 4 Exhibit Cases)(Margulies, Beth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2008: # 5 Exhibit Charges and Appel's Preliminary Injunction Testimony) (D'Andrea, S.). Modified on 11/18/2008 (D'Andrea, S.). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/17/08 to File Response/Reply re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/17/2008. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/28/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment until November 17, 2008 by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rosalie Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Plaintiff's 1-29-08 Deposition Part 1, # 3 Plaintiff's 1-29-08 Deposition Part 2, # 4 Plaintiff's 11-21-07 Deposition Part 1, # 5 Plaintiff's 11-21-07 Deposition Part 2, # 6 Plaintiff's 11-21-07 Deposition Part 3, # 7 Plaintiff's 11-21-07 Deposition Part 4, # 8 Plaintiff's 11-21-07 Deposition Part 5, # 9 Plaintiff's Interrogatory Answers, # 10 Plaintiff's Oath)(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/11/2008. 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/9/08 to File Response/Reply re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/9/2008. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/24/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment until October 9, 2008 by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Beth Z. Marguiles dated September 12, 2008 Re: Limited Objection to Consolidation. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Conference re: Status of Case. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/15/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Please see attached calendar for further details. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 67 Motion to Amend 30 Answer. Motion granted during phone conference held on 9/11/08. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/12/08. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Answer to Amended Complaint to add Counterclaim filed by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Spaulding unreported case)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter.Responses due by 9/25/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1-Vaden-Goad PI Testimony with atts., # 5 Exhibit 2-Wiss PI Testimony, part 1 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 2-Wiss PI Testimony with atts., part 2 of 2, # 7 Exhibit 3-Spiridon PI Testimony with atts., # 8 Exhibit 4-Rinker PI Testimony with atts., # 9 Exhibit 5 and 6, Spiridon and Schmotter affidavits, # 10 Exhibit 7-11 includes Plaintiff's deposition, # 11 Exhibit unreported cases, part 1 of 2, # 12 Exhibit unreported cases part 2 of 2)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA dated 8/15/2008 Reversing Order of District Court and Remanding with Instructions to Vacate the Order of the District Court 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Vaden-Goad, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. USCA #06-5723-cv (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Answer to Amended Complaint by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter.Responses due by 9/1/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time until September 4, 2008 to file motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/21/08. (Hollander, A.) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time until September 4, 2008 to file motion for summary judgment by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Vacating re 40 Order Granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/2/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Security for Costs in the amount of $ 500.00 posted by Rosalie Appel, Receipt Number B015384. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time for 30 days after a Second Circuit ruling on appeal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/19/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a Second Circuit Ruling on preliminary injunction to file Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 59 Motion for Extension of Time. Motion is denied, without prejudice to renewal accompanied by an explanation why the issues on appeal of the preliminary injunction ruling are likely to affect the issues to be raised on summary judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/17/07. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after Second Circuit ruling on pending appeal of preliminary injunction in this case , for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 56 Response filed by Linda Vaden-Goad, Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. Treating defendant's Response as a motion to extend time, it is granted. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/14/07. (Penberthy, K.) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time until Thirty-five (35) days to Modify Scheduling Order 16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. SO ORDERED by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9-14-07. (Schmitz, C.) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 55 First MOTION for Extension of Time until Thirty-five (35) days to Modify Scheduling Order 16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time until Thirty-five (35) days to Modify Scheduling Order 16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Index to Record on Appeal by Rosalie Appel re 47 Notice of Appeal, 49 Order on Motion for Contempt,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 42 MOTION for Contempt. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Index to Record on Appeal by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter re 47 Notice of Appeal, 21 Amended Complaint, 41 Transcript, 32 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 51 Order on Motion to Stay, 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 33 Exhibit List, 50 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 38 Letter, 46 Notice of Appearance, 7 Notice of Appearance, 43 MOTION to Stay re 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 1 Complaint, 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 34 Witness List, 22 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 39 Letter, 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Person, 29 Notice of Appearance, 4 Notice of Appearance. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Pretrial Hearing held on November 1, 2006 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULING denying 43 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/21/06. (Cody, C.) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re 43 MOTION to Stay re 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 (Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Injunction and Memorandum of Law)# 2 Supplement Notice of Manual Filing)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM and ORDER Denying without Prejudice 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt; Granting 44 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to December 20, 2006 to File Memorandum. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/18/2006. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : Telephone Status Conference held on 12/18/2006. 15 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. Filing Fee $455, Receipt Number H021273. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Q. Chapple on behalf of Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter (Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status Conference re discovery set for 12/18/2006 at 9:30 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for defendant shall initiate phone call to chambers (203) 579-5714. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2006 to File Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction 43 MOTION to Stay re 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit counsel communications# 2 Exhibit Notice of Appeal)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay re 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter.Responses due by 1/5/2007 (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Contempt by Rosalie Appel.Responses due by 1/4/2007 (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Temporary Injunction Hearing held on November 9, 2006 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULING and ORDER Granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/1/2006. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Beth Z. Marguiles dated November 17, 2006 Re: Related case cites re: P.I. Hearing. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Beth Z. Marguiles Dated November 13, 2006 Re: Plaintiff's Grievance (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : Telephone Status Conference held on 11/1/2006. 30 minutes(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Appel. James Schmotter served on 10/24/2006, answer due 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons re Schmotter# 2 Supplement Marshal's Return re Schmotter)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Appel. Linda Rinker served on 10/24/2006, answer due 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons re Rinker# 2 Supplement Marshal's Return re Rinker)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Marked Witness and Exhibit List. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Marked Exhibit List by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER in open court taking under advisement 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Underhill, J. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : Preliminay Injunction Hearing held on 11/9/2006. Total Time: 4 hours and 35 minutes(Court Reporter Catucci.) (Montz, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad, Linda Rinker, James Schmotter.(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Z. Margulies on behalf of all defendants (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Conference Memorandum and ORDER Denying as Moot 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/3/2006. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Appel. Linda Vaden-Goad served on 10/25/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Marshal's Return re Vaden-Goad# 2 Supplement Summons re Vaden-Goad)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Appel. Charles P. Spiridon served on 10/17/2006, answer due 11/6/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Marshal's Return re Spiridon# 2 Supplement Summons re Spiridon)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Person filed by Rosalie Appel. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill : Telephone Status Conference held on 10/19/2006. 20 minutes (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Telephone Status Conference set for 11/1/2006 at 4:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Motion Hearing Set for November 9, 2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Phone Conference Set for November 1, 2006 at 4:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/19/2006. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Rosalie Appel.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/19/2006 at 9:15 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate phone call to chambers (203) 579-5714. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Vaden-Goad and Spiridon dated September 5, 2006# 2 Affidavit Rinker with exhibits# 3 Exhibit case Bishop# 4 Exhibit cases Fox and Torres# 5 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Vaden-Goad and Spiridon affidavits dated Oct. 4, 2006 with attachments)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER approving 16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 11/1/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2007. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/5/06. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over The Person by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad.Responses due by 10/26/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 2 Affidavit of Vaden Goad and Spiridon# 3 Exhibit unpublished case of Bishop v State of CT)(Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/9/2006.Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/2/06. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction until October 9, 2006 by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 10 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rosalie Appel. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Temporary Injunction)(Williams, John) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Security for Costs . Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2006. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/6/06 to respond to 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/11/06. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rosalie Appel.Responses due by 9/30/2006 (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until October 6, 2006 to file a responsive pleading by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Security for Costs by Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad. (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Z. Margulies on behalf of Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad (Margulies, Beth) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Appel. Charles P. Spiridon served on 8/15/2006, answer due 9/4/2006. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalie Appel. Linda Vaden-Goad served on 8/15/2006, answer due 9/4/2006. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Rosalie Appel (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re: Electronic Filing Procedures. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/31/2006. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/31/2006. Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2006. Discovery due by 1/30/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2007.. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2006. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTED RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/1/2011. (Munoz, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Charles P. Spiridon, Linda Vaden-Goad ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number NO18966), filed by Rosalie Appel.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?