Andrews v. Peet
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00150
District Judge Christopher F. Droney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 7:05 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deborah Andrews, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katrena K. Engstrom +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 kengstrom@johnrwilliams.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Norman A. Pattis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/27/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Anne Rommel +1 203 393 3017 +1 203 393 9745 krommel@pattislaw.com
v.
No Logo Melodie J. Peet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy A. Brouillet +1 860 808 5340 nancy.brouillet@ct.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Q. Chapple +1 860 808 5315 +1 860 808 5383 margaret.chapple@ct.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Melodie J. Peet against Deborah Andrews.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    RULING granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 7/21/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by Katrena K. Engstrom on behalf of Deborah Andrews (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: taking under advisement 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2010 re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melodie J. Peet. 22 minutes(Court Reporter Martha Marshall.) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF AMENDED E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Dkt. # 47] is set for 4/7/10 at 10:00 AM (rescheduled from 2/19/2010) in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Each side will have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 53 Motion to Continue. Counsel will be advised of the new date for argument. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 2/18/10. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
              MOTION to Continue Oral Argument Scheduled for February 19, 2010 by Melodie J. Peet. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Dkt. # 47] is set for 2/19/10 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Each side will have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE re 48 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Melodie J. Peet. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melodie J. Peet. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Christopher F. Droney for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/4/09. (Houatchanthara, M.) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in Opposition re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah Andrews. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts)(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Melodie J. Peet.Responses due by 11/5/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Index of Evidence, # 4 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Melodie Peet, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 3 - Deposition Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 3 - Deposition Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit B - Part 3 of 3 - Deposition Exhibits, # 8 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Wanda Estrella, # 9 Exhibit Unreported Cases - Part 1 of 2, # 10 Exhibit Unreported Cases - Part 2 of 2)(Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time until October 16, 2009 to file a dispositive motion. If no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by October 16, 2009. This case shall be trial ready November, 2009. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 8/20/09. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until October 16, 2009 to file Motion for Summary Judgment by Melodie J. Peet. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER. A settlement conference was held on July 22, 2009. The case did not settle. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on July 30, 2009. (Chambers, J.) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. A settlement conference has been held. The case has not settled. Another session before Judge Smith is SCHEDULED for July 22, 2009 at 10 a.m.Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on June 22, 2009. (Ennis, C.) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference RESCHEDULED for 6/22/2009 10:00 AM in West Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Thomas P. Smith. Counsel must be accompanied by appropriate persons with authority to settle. See attached Nick v. Morgan's Foods decision. See also attached order requiring the submission of ex parte statements at least 2 days prior to the conference. (Attachments: # 1 Nick v. Morgan's Foods) (Chambers, J.) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2009 at 10:00 AM in West Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Thomas P. Smith. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Nick v. Morgan's Foods) (S-Hayami, B.) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/14/09. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER. This Court hereby vacates the referral order 37 . It also vacates the telephone status conference set for August 12, 2009 before Judge Kravitz 34 with the exception of the parties filing a status report by August 5, 2009. If the parties would like a telephone conference, they should call chambers directly. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/14/09. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito in Hartford for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 5/13/09.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. A telephonic status conference will be held on August 12, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. The parties will file a joint status report (instructions attached) with the Clerk's Office no later than August 5, 2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 3/27/09. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Deborah Andrews, Melodie J. Peet.Responses due by 4/14/2009 (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for June 16, 2009 @ 11:00 AM before the Honorable William I. Garfinkel in courtroom 437, 4th Floor, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT 06604. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. PLEASE REVIEW THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER ATTACHED. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 3/20/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearance of Attorney Kelly Anne Rommel on behalf of Plaintiff is terminated. Plaintiff has continuing alternate legal representation. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 2/27/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Kelly A. Rommel to Withdraw as Attorney by Deborah Andrews. (Rommel, Kelly) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Rommel on behalf of Deborah Andrews (Rommel, Kelly) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                              ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/5/2009 to respond to Interrogatories and Production. Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 5, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production by Deborah Andrews. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Melodie J. Peet.(Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/23/2008. 5 minutes (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Case Management ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/30/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2008 Discovery due by 7/31/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2009 Status Report due by 3/23/2009 Trial Ready Date 10/1/2009 Trial Brief due by 10/1/2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 9/23/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. NOTE NEW DATE/TIME: Telephonic Scheduling Conference previously set for 9/30/2008 is RESET for 9/23/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the telephone conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the telephone conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. Counsel are ordered by the court to be prepared to discuss the merits of all pending motions. Please Note that the parties should commence discovery immediately in accordance with the discovery plan set forth in their 26(f) Report and they should not delay discovery pending the conference scheduled herein or entry of a scheduling order. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time until 10/13/2008 to file responsive pleading. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER granting 18 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2008 to File Responsive Pleading 15 Amended Complaint by Melodie J. Peet. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Security for Costs by Melodie J. Peet. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Brouillet on behalf of Melodie J. Peet (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER. 12 Motion to Set Aside Default is granted on consent. 9 Order granting 8 Motion for Default Entry, dated August 15, 2008, is vacated. 10 Motion for Default Judgment is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/26/2008. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Melodie J. Peet, filed by Deborah Andrews.(Williams, John) (Entered: 08/24/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE re 12 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Deborah Andrews. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/24/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Currently pending before the Court is 12 Motion To Set Aside Entry Of Default. Plaintiff is directed to show cause no later than September 2, 2008, why the Motion To Set Aside Default should not be granted. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/20/2008. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Set Aside Default by Melodie J. Peet. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, # 2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Melodie Peet)(Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Q. Chapple on behalf of Melodie J. Peet (Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melodie J. Peet by Deborah Andrews. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/16/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Ruling and ORDER granting 8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 9/15/2008. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 41(b) FRCP.. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/15/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Melodie Peet by Deborah Andrews. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER directing Plaintiff to move for entry of default on or before 8/21/2008. Failure to do so will result in the Court dismissing the case for failure to prosecute the action on August 22,2008.. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/7/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Andrews. Melodie J. Peet served on 7/1/2008, answer due 7/21/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Stamped Summons)(Williams, John) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE: Proof of service of process due 7/15/08. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 6/27/08. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Deborah Andrews (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 1/29/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/29/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2008 Discovery due by 7/30/2008 Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2008. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Melodie J. Peet ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number NO23582), filed by Deborah Andrews.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 671 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?