Galan-Blair v. Busillo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00295
District Judge Christopher F. Droney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bozena Galan-Blair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John O'Hyun Kim +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jkim@johnrwilliams.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Gerard D. Busillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Corp Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vikki Cooper +1 203 946 7963 +1 203 946 7942 vcooper@newhavenct.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Gerard D. Busillo against Bozena Galan-Blair.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 7/28/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    RULING granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 7/27/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: taking under advisement 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2009 re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerard D. Busillo. 40 minutes(Court Reporter M. Marshall.) (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/6/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by John O'Hyun Kim on behalf of Bozena Galan-Blair (Kim, John) (Entered: 12/06/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
          Statement of Material Facts re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
              Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/9/2009 (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Granting 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant's Objection to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/7/09. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT as to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment until October 9, 2009 by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                    Memorandum in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bozena Galan-Blair. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, Part 1, # 3 Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, Part 2, # 4 Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses)(Williams, John) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Dkt. #29] is set for 12/8/09 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Each side will have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in Support re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerard D. Busillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 11)(Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                          Statement of Material Facts re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gerard D. Busillo.Responses due by 9/21/2009 (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Granting, Absent Objection, 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 7/1/09. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time TO MODIFY Scheduling Order by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER Granting, Absent Objection, 25 MOTION for Extension of Time re Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 5/4/09. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time re scheduling order deadlines by Gerard D. Busillo.(Cooper, Vikki) Briefing deadline terminated and Motion relief Modified on 5/1/2009 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Christopher F. Droney for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 3/10/09. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                        ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time until 4/15/09 to respond to discovery requests. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/09. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production by Bozena Galan-Blair. (Williams, John) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                            Security for Costs in the amount of $500.00 posted by Bozena Galan-Blair. Receipt Number B016685. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Prefiling Conference set 10/6/08 has been RESCHEDULED for 10/29/2008 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 240 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Alan H. Nevas (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 10/6/2008 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 240 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Alan H. Nevas (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Prefiling Conference set for 10/6/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Alan H. Nevas (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal 16 motion to dismiss for failure to comply with 2 order on pretrial deadlines requiring a prefiling conference. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 9/29/2008. (Argo, E.) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Gerard D. Busillo.Responses due by 10/17/2008 (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Gerard D. Busillo.(Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until June 18, 2008. Counsel are hereby notified that further extensions are not likely to be granted. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 5/20/2008. (La Macchia, B.) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time until June 18, 2008 by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER approving 11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 5/1/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 4/25/08. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 04/19/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER granting 9 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/08. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Security for Costs by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2008 to answer and/or respond to 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 3/27/2008. (La Macchia, B.) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2008 to answer and/or respond to complaint by Gerard D. Busillo. (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Vikki Cooper on behalf of Gerard D. Busillo (Cooper, Vikki) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bozena Galan-Blair. Gerard D. Busillo served on 3/10/2008, answer due 3/30/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons & Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Bozena Galan-Blair (Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 2/26/08. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 5/26/08. Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2008 Discovery due by 8/27/2008 Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2008. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/08. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Gerard D. Busillo ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N023849), filed by Bozena Galan-Blair.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?