Mehdi v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01531
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ajmal Mehdi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mehdi, Ajmal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ajmal Mehdi +1 860 582 2226
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas P. Morabito +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 Douglas.Morabito@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Index to Record on Appeal by Ajmal Mehdi re 36 Notice of Appeal, 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 23, 2009 complete discovery, 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 35 Appearance Pro Se, 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until October 7, 2009 Complete Discovery, 21 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Summons Issued as to USA, 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Summons Issued as to USA, 26 Order, 4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2009 Answer/Respond 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Returned Executed, 33 MOTION for John R. Williams to Withdraw as Attorney Nunc Pro Tunc, 8 Notice of Appearance, 32 Judgment, 1 Complaint, 34 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Judicial Evaluation Program Survey, Summons Issued, 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Set Deadlines/Hearings, 6 Notice of Appearance, 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 10 Answer to Complaint, 31 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
    Docket Entry Correction re 35 Appearance Pro Se. MODIFIED TO CORRECT FILE DATE. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 32 Judgment by Ajmal Mehdi. Filing fee $455, receipt number H031429. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
        Appearance Pro Se by Ajmal Mehdi. (Heard, J.) Modified on 7/29/2010 (Heard, J.). (Heard, J.). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney nunc pro tunc to July 6, 2010. Attorney John R. Williams terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/29/2010. (Cepler, C.) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION for John R. Williams to Withdraw as Attorney Nunc Pro Tunc by Ajmal Mehdi. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT for the defendant.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2010. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/23/2010. (Cepler, C.) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 125 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?