Buck v. AT&T Svc Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01619
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Buck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katrena K. Engstrom +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 kengstrom@johnrwilliams.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "AT&T Svc Inc"
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Vegliante +1 203 771 8818 +1 203 771 6577 dv1793@att.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn William Dowd +1 860 275 0570 +1 860 275 0343 gwdowd@daypitney.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter K. Rydel +1 203 752 5000 +1 203 752 5001 pkrydel@daypitney.com
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/11/2010. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
    Memorandum in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
      Set/Reset Deadlines as to 58 MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/21/2010 (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT entered in favor of AT&T Svc Inc against John Buck.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 7/6/2010. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by John Buck.Responses due by 7/21/2010 (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            RULING granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/25/2010. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 2/26/2010 (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 53 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2010 to file reply to 50 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by AT&T Svc Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/16/2010. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                    First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2010 50 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                      Final Statement of Material Facts re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Buck. (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                        Statement of Material Facts re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Buck. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit index and exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3-4, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 5-7, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 8-12, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 13)(Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in Opposition re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Buck. (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/2/2010. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/18/2009. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment until February 2, 2010 by John Buck. (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Katrena K. Engstrom on behalf of John Buck (Engstrom, Katrena) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                  EXHIBIT Appendix of Unreported Cases (Part 2) by AT&T Svc Inc re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                    EXHIBIT Appendix of Unreported Cases (Part 1) by AT&T Svc Inc re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Barbara Barrett filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Natalie Hunter filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Carla Putnam filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Joan Filibert filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                              Statement of Material Facts re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in Support re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by AT&T Svc Inc.Responses due by 1/4/2010 (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 36 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 14, 2009 For Enlargement of Certain Case Management Deadlines 35 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by AT&T Svc Inc. THIS IS THE FINAL EXTENSION. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/23/2009. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 14, 2009 For Enlargement of Certain Case Management Deadlines 35 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 34 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30, 2009 For Certain Case Management Deadlines by AT&T Svc Inc. Extension is granted to complete plaintiff's deposition and for dispositive motion/pretrial memorandum deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/29/2009. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30, 2009 For Certain Case Management Deadlines 21 Scheduling Order by AT&T Svc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Vegliante on behalf of AT&T Svc Inc (Vegliante, David) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Settlement Conference held on 10/8/2009. Case did not settle. Total Time: 3 hours and 15 minutes (Larsen, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2009 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. (Larsen, M.) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 8/27/2009. 9 minutes (Larsen, M.) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference RESCHEDULED from 8/25/09 to 8/27/2009 04:30 PM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Larsen, M.) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2009 12:15 PM in Clerks Office before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Milligan, C.) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/18/09. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by John Buck. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/25/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT OF COUNSEL by John Buck, AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time until March 27, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/2/09. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until March 27, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production by John Buck. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER re: 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 8/31/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2009 Status Report due by 4/22/2009 Trial Brief due by 10/31/2009. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/22/09. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Amended ANSWER to 18 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by AT&T Svc Inc.(Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Svc Inc, filed by John Buck.(Williams, John) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend/Correct. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/22/2008. (Struck, H.) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Docket Entry Correction re 13 Answer to Complaint MODIFIED TO ADD CORRECTED PDF DOCUMENT TO THE DOCKET ENTRY AND REMOVE THE INCORRECT (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Notice of Removal with Original Complaint annexed by John Buck.Responses due by 1/10/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Williams, John) (Entered: 12/20/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn William Dowd on behalf of AT&T Svc Inc (Dowd, Glenn) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by AT&T Svc Inc.(Rydel, Peter) (Simpson, T.). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/15/08 to respond to Complaint contained in 1 Notice of Removal. There will be no further extensions of this deadline. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/3/08. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2008 To Answer, Move or Otherwise File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint 1 Notice of Removal by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/30/08 to Respond to the Complaint contained in 1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/08. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30, 2008 To Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint 1 Notice of Removal by AT&T Svc Inc. (Rydel, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Rydel on behalf of AT&T Svc Inc (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE Of No Pending Motions by AT&T Svc Inc (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Statement of Removal by AT&T Svc Inc (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF FILING AND SERVICE OF 1 Notice of Removal (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/08. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/08. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/22/09. Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2008 Discovery due by 4/23/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2009. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/08. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven at New Haven Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N025874, filed by AT&T Svc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to State Court of Removal)(Malone, P.) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?