Gibbs v. Cessna Aircraft Co et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00556
District Judge Mark R. Kravitz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Andrew John Gibbs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Wolf, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stewart I. Edelstein +1 203 368 0211 sedelstein@cohenandwolf.com
v.
No Logo Cessna Aircraft Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E. Arnold +5253 525 525 3101
No Logo Dukes, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenny, O'Keefe & Usseglio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Kenny +1 860 246 2700 +1 860 246 6480 rkenny@kou-law.com
TERMINATED: 07/02/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett F. O'Keefe +1 860 246 2700 +1 860 246 6480 gokeefe@kou-law.com
No Logo Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hamilton Sundstrand Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Hennessey +1 860 275 0194 +1 860 275 0343 jehennessey@daypitney.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Rotondo +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jhrotondo@daypitney.com
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Honeywell Intl Inc"

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Dietrich Gaukroger +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 egaukroger@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED V.L. Woolston +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 vwoolston@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Hennessey +1 860 275 0194 +1 860 275 0343 jehennessey@daypitney.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Rotondo +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jhrotondo@daypitney.com
No Logo Textron, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, United Industrial Corp /de/

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E. Arnold +5253 525 525 3101
United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "United Tech Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Hennessey +1 860 275 0194 +1 860 275 0343 jehennessey@daypitney.com
TERMINATED: 06/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Rotondo +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jhrotondo@daypitney.com
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. 59 Stipulation and Order of Conditional Dismissal is So Ordered. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice in accordance with the Stipulation. The Clerk is ordered to close the file. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 8/24/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL by Andrew John Gibbs, Cessna Aircraft Co, Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, Honeywell Intl Inc, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Hennessey, James) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Kravitz: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/2009. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
        Set Deadlines as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens and Failure to Join a Necessary and Indispensable Party. Responses due by 8/21/2009 (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          CORRECTED ORDER 55 . For the reasons stated during a telephonic conference with counsel on July 6, 2009, the Court stays all deadlines and stays all merits discovery pending further order of the Court following a ruling on the Defendants' Motion To Dismiss 51 . Plaintiff may engage in discovery focused on the Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Plaintiff's oral motion for an extension of time to file his response to the Motion to Dismiss. The response is due 8/21/2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 7/7/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER. For the reasons stated during a telephonic conference with counsel on July 6, 2009, the Court stays all deadlines and stays all merits discovery pending further order of the Court following a ruling on the Defendants' Motion To Dismiss 52 . Plaintiff may engage in discovery focused on the Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Plaintiff's oral motion for an extension of time to file his response to the Motion to Dismiss. The response is due 8/21/2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 7/7/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT re 52 Memorandum in Support re 51 Motion to Dismiss, (Exhibit 4) Signed By Robert M. Scurfield filed by Cessna Aircraft Co, Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, Honeywell Intl Inc, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Hennessey, James) Modified on 7/7/2009 to create link(Falcone, K.). (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Dukes, Inc. by Andrew John Gibbs (Verna, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                  Memorandum in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens and Failure to Join a Necessary and Indispensable Party filed by Cessna Aircraft Co, Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, Honeywell Intl Inc, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 5, Part 1 of 6, # 5 Exhibit 5, Part 2 of 6, # 6 Exhibit 5, Part 3 of 6, # 7 Exhibit 5, Part 4 of 6, # 8 Exhibit 5, Part 5 of 6, # 9 Exhibit 5, Part 6 of 6, # 10 Exhibit 6, part 1, # 11 Exhibit 6, part 2)(Rotondo, James) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens and Failure to Join a Necessary and Indispensable Party by Cessna Aircraft Co, Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, Honeywell Intl Inc, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.Responses due by 7/20/2009 (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Dukes, Inc. shall file its motion to dismiss no later than July 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 6/26/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 6, 2009 to file a responsive pleading 1 Complaint by Dukes Inc. (O'Keefe, Garrett) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Durham on behalf of Honeywell Intl Inc (Durham, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CORRECTED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. NOTE NEW TIME. Telephonic Scheduling Conference previously set for 8:30 a.m. is RESET for 7/6/2009 at 04:30 PM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the telephone conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. Counsel are ordered by the court to be prepared to discuss the merits of all pending motions. Please Note that the parties should commence discovery immediately in accordance with the discovery plan set forth in their 26(f) Report and they should not delay discovery pending the conference scheduled herein or entry of a scheduling order. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Kravitz. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the telephone conference call. After all of the parties are on the conference call, they should then call chambers at (203) 773-2022 on the above date and time. Counsel are ordered by the court to be prepared to discuss the merits of all pending motions. Please Note that the parties should commence discovery immediately in accordance with the discovery plan set forth in their 26(f) Report and they should not delay discovery pending the conference scheduled herein or entry of a scheduling order. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                  ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs or fees re 42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Textron, Inc., 43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal United Technologies Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/09. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of United Technologies Corporation by Andrew John Gibbs (Verna, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Textron, Inc. by Andrew John Gibbs (Verna, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                        ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Andrew John Gibbs. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                          ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Andrew John Gibbs. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Andrew John Gibbs. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by V.L. Woolston on behalf of Honeywell Intl Inc (Woolston, V.L.) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                26(f) NOTICE : The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(e). Local Rule 26(e) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(e) further provides that, within 10 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before June 23, 2009: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26f report; or (2) a form 26f report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(e). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron Inc. (Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron Inc. (Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of Textron Inc (Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Cessna Aircraft Co.(Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants should not expect further extensions of this deadline. Defendants Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp., United Technologies Corporation and Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than June 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 5/19/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time until June 29, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to complaint 1 Complaint by Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, United Tech Corp, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Hennessey, James) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Dukes, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than June 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 5/15/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 29, 2009 File a responsive pleading 1 Complaint by Dukes Inc. (O'Keefe, Garrett) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett F. O'Keefe on behalf of Dukes Inc (O'Keefe, Garrett) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Verna for Andrew John Gibbs added. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2009. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Verna by Andrew John Gibbs. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N027519. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Honeywell International Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than June 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 5/8/2009. (Carotenuto, R.) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER granting 23 Motion for V.L. Woolston and Elizabeth Dietrich Gaukroger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorneys V.L. Woolston and Elizabeth Dietrich Gaukroger by Honeywell Intl Inc.. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number NO27462. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6-29-09 Respond to Complaint 1 Complaint by Honeywell Intl Inc. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Kenny on behalf of Dukes Inc (Kenny, Richard) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Supplemental Returns of Cessna Aircraft Co care of Agent for Service; Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp; Cessna Aircraft Co care of Tom Wakefield re 6 Summons Returned Executed. Acknowledgment filed by Andrew John Gibbs. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Return of Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp, # 2 Supplemental Return of Cessna Aircraft Co)(Malone, P.) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell Intl Inc. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Honeywell Intl Inc (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER granting 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2009 To Plead. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/09. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2009 To Plead by Cessna Aircraft Co. (Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cessna Aircraft Co identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for Cessna Aircraft Co. (Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of Cessna Aircraft Co (Arnold, Steven) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 29, 2009 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/09. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Hennessey on behalf of Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, United Tech Corp, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Hennessey, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hamilton Sundstrand Corp. (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Tech Corp. (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until May 29, 2009 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, United Tech Corp, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Rotondo on behalf of Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, United Tech Corp, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Rotondo, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew John Gibbs. Cessna Aircraft Co served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009; Textron Inc served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009; Hamilton Sundstrand Corp served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009; United Tech Corp served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009; Dukes Inc served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009; Honeywell Intl Inc served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009; Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp served on 4/8/2009, answer due 4/28/2009. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart I. Edelstein on behalf of Andrew John Gibbs. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 4/7/2009. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Docket Entry Correction re 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. MODIFIED TO INDICATE ORDER SIGNED BY CLERK. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 7/6/2009. Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2009. Discovery due by 10/7/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2009. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2009. (Heard, J.) Modified on 4/7/2009 (Heard, J.). (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Cessna Aircraft Co, Textron Inc, Hamilton Sundstrand Corp, United Tech Corp, Dukes Inc, Honeywell Intl Inc, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Filing fee $350 receipt number B017692), filed by Andrew John Gibbs. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 199 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?