D'Amico v. Mendelson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-02137
District Judge Peter C. Dorsey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth D'Amico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Peter Mendelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Q. Chapple +1 860 808 5315 +1 860 808 5383 margaret.chapple@ct.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josephine S. Graff +1 860 808 5340 +1 860 808 5383 Josephine.Graff@ct.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 37 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/16/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 36 Motion to Dismiss, on consent. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/16/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
      MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation and return of bond deposit by Elizabeth D'Amico. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
        Consent MOTION to Dismiss by Elizabeth D'Amico.Responses due by 6/6/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE 41(b) ( Dismissal due by 5/28/2011). Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/29/2011. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time until 4/18/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/9/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time until April 18, 2011 to file Dispositive Motion by Peter Mendelson. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 3/8/2011. Total Time: 1 hour (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/8/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/17/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/19/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time until March 17, 2011 to file Dispositive Motion by Peter Mendelson. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 1-14-11. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          RULING denying 23 Motion for Protective Order; denying 25 Motion to Strike ; denying 25 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12-14-10. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Strike Deposition of Dr. Wolman and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Elizabeth D'Amico. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Strike Deposition of Dr. Wolman and, MOTION for Protective Order by Peter Mendelson.Responses due by 12/21/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A and B)(Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Elizabeth D'Amico. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Protective Order by Peter Mendelson.Responses due by 12/13/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time until February 1, 2011 to file Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/28/2010. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 1, 2011 to file Dispositive Motion by Peter Mendelson. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 17 Motion for Default for Failure to post Security for Costs bond as ordered by the Court re 9 Order on Motion for Security for Costs. Plaintiff posted the bond as security for costs. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/28/2010. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Default for Failure to Post Security for Costs Bond as Ordered by the Court re 9 Order on Motion for Security for Costs,, filed by Elizabeth D'Amico. (Williams, John) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                            Security for Costs in the amount of $ 500.0 posted by Elizabeth D'Amico Receipt Number N029904 (Crite, J) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Default for Failure to Post Security for Costs Bond as Ordered by the Court re 9 Order on Motion for Security for Costs,, by Peter Mendelson.Responses due by 4/14/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time until May 7, 2010 To Respond To Defendaqnt's Interrogatories And Requests For Production. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 3/16/2010. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until May 7, 2010 To Respond To Defendaqnt's Interrogatories And Requests For Production by Elizabeth D'Amico. (Williams, John) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Peter Mendelson.(Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Q. Chapple on behalf of Peter Mendelson , in addition to the appearance of Assistant Attorney General Josephine Graff, already on file, (Chapple, Margaret) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER approving and adopting in part 11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is to be completed by 10/1/2010. Dispositive Motions are to be filed on or before 11/1/2010. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2-23-10. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time until March 8, 2010 to file Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2010. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2010. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until March 8, 2010 to file Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint by Peter Mendelson. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Security for Costs by Peter Mendelson. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine S. Graff on behalf of Peter Mendelson (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth D'Amico. Peter Mendelson served on 1/7/2010, answer due 1/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 12/30/09. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/30/10; Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2010; Discovery due by 7/1/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2010. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/09. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Elizabeth D'Amico (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Peter Mendelson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N029269), filed by Elizabeth D'Amico.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 421 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?