Sannicandro v. Fraser
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-01429-WWE
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 7:22 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo D.L.S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Julie Fraser, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheryle Levine +1 203 259 0599 +1 203 255 2570 sherylelevine@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Neigher +1 203 259 0599 aneigher@snet.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Office New Haven
Filed 9/8/2010
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County XX Outside US
Terminated 7/11/2012
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,EFILE,HBF,MOTREF,REFCNF,REFDIS
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered in favor of D.L.S. against Julie Fraser. See [48] Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2012. (Blough, B.)
    LREF
    Blank  Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
    JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Blough, B.)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/18/2012 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by D.L.S. (Williams, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2012: # (1) Offer of Judgment) (Torrenti, R.).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Offer of Judgment / Compromise
        Sealed Offer of Judgment by Julie Fraser. (Candee, D.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 46 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Status Conference held on 2/2/2012. 15 minutes (Esposito, A.)
            LREF
            Blank 45 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER. A telephone status conference was held on February 2, 2012, to discuss outstanding discovery issues. The discovery deadline is February 15, 2012. Defendant will provide responses to plaintiff's January 17, 2012, requests for production and interrogatory requests on or before February 10, 2012. Counsel will provide the Court with the earliest available date by which plaintiff's deposition can be concluded. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is set 30 days after the completion of plaintiff's deposition. If plaintiff seeks additional time to conduct further discovery after the receipt of defendant's discovery responses, she will seek leave of court to do so with a showing of extenuating circumstances.. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/2/12. (Esposito, A.)
              LREF
              Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings:
              Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/15/2012. (Jaiman, R.)
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status Conference regarding status of discovery set for Thursday 2/2/2012 04:00 PM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Defendant's counsel to initiate telephone call. Once all parties are on the line please contact chambers at (203) 579-5640. (Garcia, M.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [42] Motion for Extension of Time until December 10, 2011 to respond to defendant's first set of interrogatories and requests for production. Counsel are advised that the Court will not contemplate extending the discovery deadline absent extenuating circumstances. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 10/17/2011. (Garcia, M.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011, Terminated: 10/17/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION for Extension of Time until December 10, 2011 To Respond To Defendant's First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production by D.L.S.. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Williams, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: 10/4/2011 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [37] Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part [34] Motion for Order in accordance with the following schedule order. Parties shall exchange initial disclosures by November 1, 2011. Plaintiff shall provide defendant with a damages analysis by November 1, 2011. Discovery shall close February 15, 2011. Dispositive motions, if any, to be filed by March 7, 2011. If no dispositive motions are filed, trial memorandums due April 2, 2011. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extenuating circumstances. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 10/4/2011. (Garcia, M.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: 10/4/2011 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/4/2011. and 13 minutes (Garcia, M.)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 2/15/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2012; Trial Brief due by 4/2/2012. Correction: ORDER granting in part and denying in part [37] Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part [34] Motion for Order in accordance with the following schedule order. Parties shall exchange initial disclosures by November 1, 2011. Plaintiff shall provide defendant with a damages analysis by November 1, 2011. Discovery shall close February 15, 2012. Dispositive motions, if any, to be filed by March 7, 2012. If no dispositive motions are filed, trial memorandums due April 2, 2012. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extenuating circumstances. (Garcia, M.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 39 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference RESCHEDULED to 10/4/2011 10:15 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff is requested to initiate this call. Once all the parties are on the line please contact chambers at (203) 579-5640. The telephone status conference scheduled for September 29, 2011 is CANCELED. (Esposito, A.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 38 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                              AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status/Case management Conference set for 9/28/2011 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULE FOR 9/29/2011 AT 11:30 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Defendant's counsel to initiate phone call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact chambers at (203)579-5640.(Jaiman, R.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion to Compel
                                MOTION to Compel by Julie Fraser.Responses due by 10/12/2011 Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Neigher, Alan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY to Response to [34] MOTION for Modification of Standing Order on Scheduling in Civil Cases Order filed by Julie Fraser. (Neigher, Alan)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/17/2011, Entered: 9/17/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    Memorandum in Opposition re [34] MOTION for Modification of Standing Order on Scheduling in Civil Cases Order filed by D.L.S.. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Original Proposed Rule 26(f) Report)(Williams, John)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011, Terminated: 10/4/2011 Motion for Order
                                      MOTION for Modification of Standing Order on Scheduling in Civil Cases Order by Julie Fraser. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Neigher, Alan)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Status Report
                                        First STATUS REPORT by Julie Fraser. (Levine, Sheryle)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 32 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status/Case management Conference set for 9/28/2011 11:30 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Defendant's counsel to initiate phone call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact chambers at (203)579-5640. (Garcia, M.)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by D.L.S.. (Williams, John)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: The parties shall file a status report by 9/6/11. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/24/11. (Wilson, J.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/6/2011. (Candee, D.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons to Supervise Discovery and Resolve Discovery Disputes. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/12/2011. (Payton, R.)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Settlement Conference held on 4/28/2011. Parties are to report back in one week. Total Time: 2 hours and 30 minutes (Jaiman, R.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                      AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2011 HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 4/28/2011 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS (Jaiman, R.)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2011 @ 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS (Jaiman, R.)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: 2/16/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2011@ 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS (Jaiman, R.)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [22] Motion to Continue Settlement Conference. The Court will reach out to the parties to reschedule. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/11/2011. (Garcia, M.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Motion including [22] MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/10/2011. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons. (Heard, J.)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011, Terminated: 2/11/2011 Motion to Continue
                                                                MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference by D.L.S.. (Williams, John)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 2/18/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS (Jaiman, R.)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                    CANCELLATION NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2011 at 10:00 AM HAS BEEN CANCELED in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. COUNSEL WILL CONTACT CHAMBERS TO RESCHEDULE. (Jaiman, R.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Remark
                                                                      REMINDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday February 3, 2011 at 10:00AM. Pursuant to the Court's Settlement Conference Order, not later than 14 days before the conference, plaintiff's counsel shall contact defendant's counsel to initiate settlement discussions, if they are not already on-going. At least 5 days before the conference, each party shall provide to the Court, in confidence, a concise statement, no longer than 3 pages in length, of the evidence the party expects to produce at trial. The statements shall outline the settlement negotiations to date, and identify where possible the obstacles or impediments which have so far prevented settlement of the matter. (Garcia, M.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS (Jaiman, R.)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference held on 12/30/2010. 5 minutes (Jaiman, R.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 12/30/2010 @ 10:00 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. (Jaiman, R.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/9/2010. (Heard, J.)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                STIPULATION of Parties of Referral for Conference by Julie Fraser. (Neigher, Alan)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Answer
                                                                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Julie Fraser.(Neigher, Alan)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time until November 15, 2010 to file an answer or otherwise respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/15/2010. (Cepler, C.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                      Answer deadline updated for Julie Fraser to 11/15/2010. (Heard, J.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julie Fraser re [10] Notice of Appearance (Levine, Sheryle)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryle Levine on behalf of Julie Fraser (Levine, Sheryle)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010, Terminated: 10/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until Nover 15, 2010 File an Answer [1] Complaint by Julie Fraser. (Neigher, Alan)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Neigher on behalf of Julie Fraser (Neigher, Alan)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.L.S.. Julie Fraser served on 9/25/2010, answer due 10/16/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Marshal's Return, # (2) Summons)(Williams, John)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Julie Fraser. Counsel receiving this electronic notice should download the attached summons for service in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4. (Kelsey, N.)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/8/2010. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                      Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 12/8/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2010. Discovery due by 3/10/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2011. Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2010. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Electronic Service Documents
                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of [2] Notice of Appearance filed by D.L.S., [1] Complaint filed by D.L.S.. Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2010: # (1) Order on Pretrial Deadlines, # (2) Electronic Filing Order) (Fazekas, J.).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of D.L.S. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Julie Fraser, filed by D.L.S..(Williams, John)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                              Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Bauer, J.)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                Filing fee received from John R. Williams & Associates, LLC: $ 350.00, receipt number N031364 (Torrenti, R.)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?