Thompson v. Maldonado et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-01454

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 7:14 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Coral M. Thompson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo David P. Marinelli, Defendant
No Logo Roberto Maldonado, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER : A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 10/21/2011 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/21/11. (Constantine, A.)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Coral M. Thompson (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against Roberto Maldonado, David P. Marinelli, filed by Coral M. Thompson.(Williams, John) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 34 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?