Moritz Aerospace, Inc. v. Condatis LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-01498
District Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 4:46 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Moritz Aerospace, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by St. Onge Steward Johnston & Reens LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alyson Jo DiLena +1 203 324 6155 +1 203 327 1096 adilena@ssjr.com
Space Todd M Oberdick +1 203 324 6155 +1 203 327 1096 toberdick@ssjr.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder daldrich@ssjr.com
Space Brian L. Repper +1 203 324 6155 brepper@ssjr.com
v.
No Logo Condatis LLC, Defendant

Represented by Diserio Martin Oconnor & Castiglioni LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy P Moylan +1 203 358 0800 tmoylan@dmoc.com
Space Matthew C. Wagner +1 914 684 0090 +1 914 684 0590 mwagner@dmoc.com
Space Jonathan P. Whitcomb +2033 580 800 x332 jwhitcomb@dmoc.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oberdick, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 33 Defendant's consented to Motion for Extension of Time until October 15, 2011 to provide initial, preliminary, non-binding non-infringement contentions to Plaintiff, in light of the ongoing settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on September 16, 2011. (Lacedonia, J.) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2011 (Unopposed) to provide Intitial, Preliminary, Non-Binding Non-Infringement Contentions to Plaintiff in accordance with 25 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Condatis LLC. (Wagner, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Repper on behalf of Moritz Aerospace, Inc. (Repper, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative transfer venue MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion)(Wagner, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting absent objection 19 Defendant's Motion to Seal Exhibit 2 to its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 20, 2011. (Lacedonia, J.) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER approving the Rule 26(f) report [Doc. 25] and adopting the proposed deadlines set forth therein. The parties shall have until June 15, 2011 to file motions to join additional parties and until November 15, 2011 to file motions to amend the pleadings. Fact discovery shall be complete by February 15, 2012 and expert discovery shall be complete by May 15, 2012. Dispositive motions shall be filed by June 15, 2012. Joint trial memorandum due July 15, 2012 if no dispositive motions are filed. Trial ready date is August 15, 2012. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 11, 2011. (Lacedonia, J.) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File SurReply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. If Defendant wishes to file a response to the SurReply, it may do so on or before June 2, 2011. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 11, 2011. (Lacedonia, J.) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moritz Aerospace, Inc. re 26 MOTION for Leave to File To File A Surreply To Defendant Condatis' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative Transfer Venue (Aldrich, David) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File To File A Surreply To Defendant Condatis' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative Transfer Venue by Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Affidavit of Todd M. Oberdick, # 3 Exhibit A To Declaration of Todd M. Oberdick, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Todd M. Oberdick, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Todd M. Oberdick)(Aldrich, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aldrich, David) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative transfer venue MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative transfer venue MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Alyson J. DiLena, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alyson J. DiLena, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alyson J. DiLena)(Oberdick, Todd) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiff's consented-to 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's response is due on or before April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on April 8, 2011. (Wilson, D.) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative transfer venue MOTION to Transfer to Another District until April 15, 2011 by Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Aldrich, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
Sealed Document: Exhibit 2 Filed under Seal re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative transfer venue MOTION to Transfer to Another District, by Condatis LLC. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Ex 2 to Mtn to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer Venue(Mtn # 18) by Condatis LLC. (Wagner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Condatis LLC.Responses due by 4/8/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Connelly, # 3 Exhs 1,3-6)(Wagner, Matthew). Added MOTION to Transfer to Another District on 3/21/2011 (Malone, P.). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
ORDER granting 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2011 to respond to the Complaint 1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/11. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P Moylan on behalf of Condatis LLC (Moylan, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2011 to respond to the Complaint 1 Complaint by Condatis LLC. (Wagner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Wagner on behalf of Condatis LLC (Wagner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Whitcomb on behalf of Condatis LLC (Whitcomb, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Aldrich on behalf of Moritz Aerospace, Inc. (Aldrich, David) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
Ordered Accordingly re 10 Stipulation filed by Condatis LLC, Moritz Aerospace, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10-1498. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Appear, Answer, or Otherwise Move by Condatis LLC, Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Oberdick, Todd) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson Jo DiLena on behalf of Moritz Aerospace, Inc. (DiLena, Alyson) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. Condatis LLC served on 1/19/2011, answer due 2/9/2011. (Oberdick, Todd) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Condatis LLC. Counsel receiving this electronic notice should download the attached summons for service in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Moritz Aerospace, Inc., 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Moritz Aerospace, Inc., 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moritz Aerospace, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carling Technologies, Inc. for Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 9/21/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/23/2011. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Condatis LLC, filed by Moritz Aerospace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 79 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?