ATHERTON v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE MAYOR et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00680
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Washington, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "PETER JAMES ATHERTON"

Toggle Switch Represented by Atherton, Peter James

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER JAMES ATHERTON +1 202 362 0500 +1 202 362 0501
v.
No Logo DANIEL M. ZACHEM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
No Logo DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE MAYOR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Anderson +1 202 724 6607 +1 202 727 3625 steve.anderson@dc.gov
No Logo DUANE DELANEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Anderson +1 202 724 6607 +1 202 727 3625 steve.anderson@dc.gov
No Logo ROY WYNN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven J. Anderson +1 202 724 6607 +1 202 727 3625 steve.anderson@dc.gov
No Logo SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Anderson +1 202 724 6607 +1 202 727 3625 steve.anderson@dc.gov
No Logo SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Anderson +1 202 724 6607 +1 202 727 3625 steve.anderson@dc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 79 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying final order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 9/26/11.(ah)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
    Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DANIEL M. ZACHEM (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of DANIEL M. ZACHEM (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
        MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 57 Notice of Appeal filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded for further proceedings. USCA Case Number 07-5195. (mmh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 56 Order, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, 52] Memorandum & Opinion by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (lc, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 5/21/07.(ah) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
              REPLY to opposition to motion re 53 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
                Memorandum in opposition to re 53 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE MAYOR, SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT, DUANE DELANEY, ROY WYNN, SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES. (Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Alter Judgment by PETER JAMES ATHERTON (lc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order of dismissal issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 4/5/07. (ah) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying 37 Motion to Compel; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing the case for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 4/5/07.(ah) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None
                        SURREPLY to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss, 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Quash filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) . (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Response to defendants replies by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL M. ZACHEM. (lc, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                              Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                Memorandum in opposition to re 33 MOTION to Dismiss by SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 40 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE MAYOR, SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT, DUANE DELANEY, ROY WYNN, SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES. (Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 41 MOTION To Supplement Plaintiff's Response of November 24, 2006 re 40 Memorandum in Opposition,, 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL M. ZACHEM. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION to Compel filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL M. ZACHEM. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                          MOTION To Supplement Plaintiff's Response of November 24, 2006 re 40 Memorandum in Opposition, by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/24/2006, Entered: None
                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss, 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss, 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, 15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Quash filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 1# 2 Affidavit 2# 3 Affidavit 3# 4 Affidavit 4# 5 Exhibit 1# 6 Exhibit 2)(lc, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION to Compel filed by SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT, DIANE DELANEY, ROY WYNN, SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (lc, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                  MOTION to Compel Discovery by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Order advising plaintiff to respond by December 15, 2006, to the Mayor's Office's motion to dismiss or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against this movant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 11/9/06. (ah) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Order advising plaintiff to respond by December 8, 2006, to Superior Court's motion to dismiss or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against this movant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 11/9/06. (ah) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE MAYOR. (Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT. (Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                            ERRATA Correcting Typographical Error by SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES 28 MOTION to Dismiss and 29 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment filed by SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES,. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment# 2 Affidavit Jones affd & plaintiff's proof of service)(Anderson, Steven) Modified on 10/23/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Order advising plaintiff to respond by November 24, 2006, to defendant Bailey-Jones' motion to dismiss or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against the movant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 10/19/06. (ah) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Order advising plaintiff to respond by November 20, 2006, to the federal defendants' motion to dismiss or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against the movants. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 10/19/06. (ah) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Bailey-Jones filed by SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit & plaintiff's proof of service)(Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment by SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit & copy of proof of service)(Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION to Dismiss, 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Quash by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL M. ZACHEM. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Order advising plaintiff to respond by November 17, 2006, to defendant Roy Wynn's dispositive motion or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against the movant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 10/12/06. (ah) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL M. ZACHEM. (Attachments: # 1)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by ROY WYNN. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wynn Affd.)(Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by ROY WYNN. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wynn affd.)(Anderson, Steven) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT, DUANE DELANEY, ROY WYNN, SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, ) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DANIEL M. ZACHEM (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Order advising plaintiff to respond by October 17, 2006, to defendant Duane Delaney's motion to quash and to dismiss or the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the complaint against the movant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 9/13/06. (ah) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE MAYOR served on 8/21/2006, answer due 10/20/2006; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 8/15/2006, answer due 10/16/2006; DANIEL M. ZACHEM served on 8/15/2006, answer due 10/16/2006. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 8/15/2006. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney on 8/15/2006. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, and MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Proof of Service by DUANE DELANEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit and proof of service re Delaney)(lc, ) Modified on 10/10/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Dismiss by DIANE DELANEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affd and proof of service re Delaney)(Anderson, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SUPERIOR COURT OF D.C. OFFICE OF THE CLERK OF COURT served on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006; DUANE DELANEY served on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006; ROY WYNN served on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006; SUZANNE BAILEY-JONES served on 8/22/2006, answer due 9/11/2006 (individuals served in official and individual capacity). (lc, ) Modified on 10/10/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of phone number by PETER JAMES ATHERTON (lc, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy)It is hereby ordered that the motion for summary affirmance be denied and the motion for remand/summary reversal be granted;It is further ordered on the courts own motion that the motion for appointment of counsel be dismissed as moot;USCA#04-5268 (jsc) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/02/04. (jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON; It is hereby ordered, on the courts own motion, that appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the United States District COurt for consideration in the first instance; Further ordered that this case be held in abeyance pending resolution by the district court of appellant's motion;USCA# 04-5268 (jsc) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 6 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. Filing fee $ 0. Copies sent to all parties. (bjsp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 07/15/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying 5 Motion to Alter Judgment . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/27/04. (jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 06/10/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Alter or amend Judgment by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 06/10/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice for lack of subject jurisdiction; granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 . Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 04/15/04. (jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 04/15/04. (jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PETER JAMES ATHERTON. (jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by PETER JAMES ATHERTON.(jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?