BOUMEDIENE et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-01166
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 7, 2017 at 1:39 AM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABASSIA BOUADJMI, Petitioner
No Logo ANELA KOBILICA, Petitioner
No Logo BADRA BAOUCHE, Petitioner
No Logo BELKACEM BENSAYAH, Petitioner
No Logo EMINA LAHMAR, Petitioner
No Logo EMINA PLANJA, Petitioner
No Logo HADJ BOUDELLA, Petitioner
No Logo LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. McKeehan +1 202 663 6719 robert.mckeehan@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Frank Curtis +1 212 230 8802 +1 212 230 8888 douglas.curtis@wilmerhale.com
Space Mark C. Fleming +1 617 526 6909 +1 617 526 5000 mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
Space Christopher J. Herrling +1 202 663 6780 +1 202 663 6363 christopher.herrling@wilmerhale.com
Space Joshua D. Jacobson +1 617 526 6350 +1 617 526 5000
Space Robert C. Kirsch +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 rob.kirsch@wilmerhale.com
Space Stephen H. Oleskey +1 617 526 6544 +1 617 526 5000
Space Allyson Portney allyson.portney@wilmerhale.com
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
Space GREGORY P. TERAN +1 617 526 6574 gregory.teran@wilmerhale.com
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
Space Paul M. Winke +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 paul.winke@wilmerhale.com
No Logo MOHAMMED NECHLA, Petitioner
No Logo MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, Petitioner
No Logo SABER LAHMAR, Petitioner
No Logo SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, Petitioner
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE WALKER BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Edward Ahern +1 202 305 0633 +1 202 616 8470 Paul.Ahern@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Anthony Dean +1 202 514 1280 +1 202 616 8470 paul.dean@usdoj.gov
Space August Edward Flentje +1 202 514 1278 august.flentje@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Charles Folio, III +1 202 305 4968 +1 202 616 8470 joseph.folio@usdoj.gov
Space Norman Christopher Hardee +1 202 305 7498 +1 202 616 8460 Christopher.Hardee2@usdoj.gov
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Douglas Levin +1 202 616 9193 +1 202 305 2685 Scott.Levin@usdoj.gov
Space James C. Luh +1 202 514 4938 james.luh@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Michael Marconda +1 202 305 0169 scott.marconda@usdoj.gov
Space Preeya M. Noronha +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8202 preeya.noronha@usdoj.gov
Space Nicholas Andrew Oldham +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Nicholas.Oldham@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa Ann Olson +1 202 514 5633 +1 202 616 8470 lisa.olson@usdoj.gov
Space Corey Justin Smith +1 202 305 3395 +1 202 305 2685 corey.j.smith2@usdoj.gov
Space Judry Laeb Subar +1 202 514 3969 +1 202 616 8470 judry.subar@usdoj.gov
Space Ronald James Wiltsie +1 202 307 1401 +1 202 616 8470 ronald.wiltsie@usdoj.gov
Space Frederick Sherwood Young +1 202 353 4452 frederick.young@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAY HOOD, Respondent
No Logo NELSON J. CANNON, Respondent
No Logo CHARLES B. GITTINGS, JR., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark C. Perry, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles B. Gittings, Jr. +1 707 888 3561 cbgittings@yahoo.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (324) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM ORDER: It is hereby order that the petitioner's case is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/01/14. (tb, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 281 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by BELKACEM BENSAYAH ; ORDERED that the motion be granted; FURTHER ORDERED that the judgement issued June 28, 2010, be vacated. USCA Case Number 08-5537. (md, ) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
            ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Board Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE Lifting Protected Information Designation of Decisions By The Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force Approving Detainees For Transfer by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Fried Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Chart Listing Current GTMO Detainees Approved For Transfer)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                      ORDER of USCA as to 281 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by BELKACEM BENSAYAH ; USCA Case Number 08-5537. ORDERED that the motion be granted. Any petition for rehearing is now due November 19, 2012. (sth, ) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM of UNDERSTANDING by BELKACEM BENSAYAH. (McKeehan, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM by BELKACEM BENSAYAH. (McKeehan, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM by BELKACEM BENSAYAH. (McKeehan, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Order to Adjourn Status Conference by BELKACEM BENSAYAH (McKeehan, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION to Continue /Postpone Status Conference by BELKACEM BENSAYAH (McKeehan, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner Saber Lahmer (ISN 10002) by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney James C. Luh terminated. (Luh, James) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                        Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 303 Notice of Appeal,. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL re 302 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001994032. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Portney, Allyson) Modified to add link on 10/21/2009 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Filing a classified memorandum order with the Court Security Office. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of filing under seal: Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah's Objection to the Government's Filing of Another Detainee's Factual Return by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 297 Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Paul Edward Ahern terminated. (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE FILED 1/30/09 with the Court Security Office of classified memorandum opinion. (kc) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal: Reply Memorandum of Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah in Support of Motion for Relief From Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(2) by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 295 Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 291 Notice (Other) (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to for Respondents to File Their Opposition to Petitioner's Rule 60 Motion by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to for Respondents to File Their Opposition to Petitioner's Rule 60 Motion by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 292 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of filing under seal: Errata Sheet for Motion of Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah for Relief From Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Hearing in Chambers by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (McKeehan, Robert) Modified on 5/18/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Corey Jason Smith terminated. (Smith, Corey) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER. Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah's Motion to Correct the Government's Inaccurate Translation of Government Exhibit 153 and Certify the Record on Appeal [see Dkt. # 282] is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/13/09. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah's Reply in Support of Motion to Correct the Translation of Government Exhibit 153 and Certify the Record on Appeal by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 283 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: the Government's Opposition to Petitioner Bensayah's Motion to Correct the Translation of Government Exhibit 153 and Certify the Record on Appeal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 282 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah's Motion to Correct the Government's Inaccurate Translation of Government Exhibit 153 and Certify the Record on Appeal by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 276 Memorandum & Opinion, 279 Order by BELKACEM BENSAYAH. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001714330. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal on November 3, 2008: Petitioners' Response to Designation of Fact Issues to be Addressed During the Merits Hearing by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/25/08. (kc ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on November 4, 2008, Submitted to CSO: November 20, 2008. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 11/20/08; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance:11/21/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2009.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM ORDER ruling on detainees' petition for writs of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/20/08. (mpt, ) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT LIST by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE.. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Third MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Third Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 164, # 4 Exhibit 165)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners' Tenth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Second Supplemental Exhibit List re 213 NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 160, # 2 Exhibit 161, # 3 Exhibit 162)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Exhibit List re: 213 NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 158, # 2 Exhibit 159)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners' Response to Government's Request for a Blanket Presumption of Reliability by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal on November 4, 2008: Filing of Classified Declaration by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 250 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Proffered by Respondents to Demonstrate Character or Propensity (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Declarations Regarding the Telephone Call Between the Court and JTF-GTMO on November 6, 2008 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Staff Sergeant, # 2 Declaration Petty Officer, # 3 Declaration Petty Officer 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2nd Supplemental Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 160, # 4 Exhibit 161, # 5 Exhibit 162)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/09/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua D. Jacobson, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - (617) 526-6000. Fax No. - (617) 526-5000 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (McKeehan, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 11/6/08; Page Numbers: 1-41. Date of Issuance:11/6/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2009.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE Notice of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Hardee, Norman) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Jason Smith on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH (Smith, Corey) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE Gov't Resp to Pet's Supp EC Mem filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Hardee, Norman) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 256 MOTION to Strike 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 219 Notice (Other) Portions of Petitioners' Traverse (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 219 Notice (Other) Portions of Petitioners' Traverse by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/27/08, Page Numbers: 1-13. Submitted to CSO: 11/3/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/21/08, Page Numbers: 1-150. Submitted to CSO: 11/30/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ERRATA in Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by MOHAMMED NECHLA, HADJ BOUDELLA, SABER LAHMAR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Petitioners' Supplemental Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 158, # 4 Exhibit 159)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal: Errata Sheet in Petitioners' Classified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 219 Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Proffered by Respondents to Demonstrate Character or Propensity by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing: Petitioners' Signed Declarations for Exhibits 1, 3, 4, and 5 of the Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Government's Response to the Court's Designation of Fact Issues to be Addressed During the Merits Hearing by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 11/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2008. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 222 Response to Order of the Court, 228 Response to Order of the Court Petitioners' Supplemental Memorandum of Law Regarding the Implications of an Enemy Combatant Determination filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 209 MOTION to Strike 161 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Preclude the Government from Submitting Unclassified or Secret Rebuttal Evidence Ex Parte by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/27/08; Page Numbers: 1-8. Date of Issuance:10/30/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/20/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2009.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/23/08; Page Numbers: 1-74. Date of Issuance:10/30/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/20/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2009.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re FOIA Files by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 205 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/17/08, Page Numbers: 1-12. Submitted to CSO: 10/28/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal on October 21, 2008: The Governments Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Defer Hearing Dates by Twenty-One Days by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners' Ninth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/27/08. (kc) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE DIRECTOR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, PORTER J. GOSS, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Subar, Judry) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/15/08, Page Numbers: 1-9. Submitted to CSO: 10/27/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/15/08, Page Numbers: 1-72. Submitted to CSO: 10/27/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 209 MOTION to Strike 161 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Relating to In Camera, Ex Parte Submission filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Al Odah Appellees Supplemental Brief, # 2 Exhibit Boumediene Supreme Court Brief for Respondents Excertps)(Flentje, August) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 230 MOTION to Strike 214 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Solis Declaration Petitioners' Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Gary D. Solis, J.D., Ph.D. filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/14/08, Page Numbers: 1-57. Submitted to CSO: 10/21/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike 214 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Solis Declaration by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Solis)(Dean, Paul) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Dean on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dean, Paul) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Respondents' Memorandum Addressing the Definition of Enemy Combatant filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing: Petitioners' Certificate of Service for Petitioners' Classified Traverse to the Government's Return to the Petition for Habeas Corpus by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 219 Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/20/08, Page Numbers: 1-72. Submitted to CSO: 10/21/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/10/08, Page Numbers: 1-111. Submitted to CSO: 10/17/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Withdrawal of Reliance on Certain Assertions in Amended Factual Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Respondents' Corrections to Amended Factual Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Petitioners' Memorandum Regarding The Standard for Detention of Enemy Combatants filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) Modified on 10/20/2008 to enhance docket text (tr). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing on October 17, 2008: Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal October 17, 2008: Petitioners' Summary of Oral Motions by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal on October 17, 2008: Petitioners' Classified Traverse and Classified Exhibits by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibits 111-116, 118-119, and 121 of Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 110, # 2 Exhibit 112, # 3 Exhibit 113, # 4 Exhibit 114, # 5 Exhibit 115, # 6 Exhibit 116, # 7 Exhibit 118, # 8 Exhibit 119, # 9 Exhibit 121)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibits 89-96 and 98-110 of Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 214 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 89, # 2 Exhibit 90, # 3 Exhibit 91, # 4 Exhibit 92, # 5 Exhibit 93, # 6 Exhibit 94, # 7 Exhibit 95, # 8 Exhibit 96, # 9 Exhibit 98, # 10 Exhibit 99, # 11 Exhibit 100, # 12 Exhibit 101, # 13 Exhibit 102, # 14 Exhibit 103, # 15 Exhibit 104, # 16 Exhibit 105, # 17 Exhibit 106, # 18 Exhibit 107, # 19 Exhibit 108, # 20 Exhibit 109, # 21 Exhibit 110)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibits 64-86 of Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 64, # 2 Exhibit 65, # 3 Exhibit 66, # 4 Exhibit 67, # 5 Exhibit 68, # 6 Exhibit 69, # 7 Exhibit 70, # 8 Exhibit 71, # 9 Exhibit 72, # 10 Exhibit 73, # 11 Exhibit 74, # 12 Exhibit 75, # 13 Exhibit 76, # 14 Exhibit 77, # 15 Exhibit 78, # 16 Exhibit 79, # 17 Exhibit 80, # 18 Exhibit 81, # 19 Exhibit 82, # 20 Exhibit 83, # 21 Exhibit 84, # 22 Exhibit 85, # 23 Exhibit 86)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 45-63 of Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45, # 2 Exhibit 46, # 3 Exhibit 47, # 4 Exhibit 48, # 5 Exhibit 49, # 6 Exhibit 50, # 7 Exhibit 51, # 8 Exhibit 52, # 9 Exhibit 53, # 10 Exhibit 54, # 11 Exhibit 55, # 12 Exhibit 56, # 13 Exhibit 57, # 14 Exhibit 58, # 15 Exhibit 59, # 16 Exhibit 60, # 17 Exhibit 61, # 18 Exhibit 62, # 19 Exhibit 63)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibits 14-42 of Petitioners' Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 213 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14, # 2 Exhibit 15, # 3 Exhibit 16, # 4 Exhibit 17, # 5 Exhibit 18, # 6 Exhibit 19, # 7 Exhibit 20, # 8 Exhibit 21, # 9 Exhibit 22, # 10 Exhibit 23, # 11 Exhibit 24, # 12 Exhibit 25, # 13 Exhibit 26, # 14 Exhibit 27, # 15 Exhibit 28, # 16 Exhibit 29, # 17 Exhibit 30, # 18 Exhibit 31, # 19 Exhibit 32, # 20 Exhibit 33, # 21 Exhibit 34, # 22 Exhibit 35, # 23 Exhibit 36, # 24 Exhibit 37, # 25 Exhibit 38, # 26 Exhibit 39, # 27 Exhibit 40, # 28 Exhibit 41, # 29 Exhibit 42)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Traverse by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 161 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/9/08, Page Numbers: 1-67. Submitted to CSO: 10/16/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@cdc.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners' Eighth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery. by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of The Government's Response to Petitioners' Seventh Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 10/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 161 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/8/08, Page Numbers: 1-78. Submitted to CSO: 10/10/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Respondents' Motion 137 for Leave to File Amended Factual Return and Denying Petitioners' Motion 156 for Definite Statement of Allegations and Public Version of Proposed Return. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/10/08. (kc) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Recently Located FOIA Files by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of The Governments Response to Petitioners Sixth Motion For Leave To Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL: PETITIONERS' SEVENTH MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 176 MOTION to Compel COMPEL SIGNATURE OF UNSIGNED NARRATIVE FOR PETITIONERS filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 10/6/08, Page Numbers: 1-65. Submitted to CSO: 10/6/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioners' Sixth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/24/08, Page Numbers: 1-71. Submitted to CSO: 10/3/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM re 196 Memorandum filed by MOHAMMED NECHLA, HADJ BOUDELLA, SABER LAHMAR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) Modified on 10/6/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioners' Sixth Motion For Leave To Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/2/2008. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/22/08, Page Numbers: 1-154. Submitted to CSO: 10/2/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL: Petitioners' Sixth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 176 MOTION to Compel COMPEL SIGNATURE OF UNSIGNED NARRATIVE FOR PETITIONERS filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Folio, Joseph) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/18/08, Page Numbers: 1-53. Submitted to CSO: 9/25/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/15/08, Page Numbers: 1-148. Submitted to CSO: 9/24/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 179 MOTION PETITIONERS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 142 Order, 143 Scheduling Order MOTION PETITIONERS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 142 Order, 143 Scheduling Order filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/12/08, Page Numbers: 1-123. Submitted to CSO: 9/22/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/10/08, Page Numbers: 1-116. Submitted to CSO: 9/22/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/8/08, Page Numbers: 1-118. Submitted to CSO: 9/15/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/3/08, Page Numbers: 1-147. Submitted to CSO: 9/10/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourt.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 9/2/08, Page Numbers: 1-68. Submitted to CSO: 9/9/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 8/27/08, Page Numbers: 1-121. Submitted to CSO: 9/3/08. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal - Government's Response to Petitioners' Fifth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 152 Notice (Other) (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION PETITIONERS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER re 142 Order, 143 Scheduling Order by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kirsch, # 2 Declaration Oleskey, # 3 Declaration Teran, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners' Fifth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery (Interrogatories by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. McKeehan on behalf of LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE (nmw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel COMPEL SIGNATURE OF UNSIGNED NARRATIVE FOR PETITIONERS by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Government's Response to Petitioners' Motion to Strike by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 152 Notice (Other) (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of The Government's Supplemental Response to Petitioners' Fourth Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 73 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Factual Returns filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Correction to Exhibits Submitted With 161 Unclassified Amended Factual Return for Petitioners by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) . (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT , i.e., Response to September 8, 2008 Order Requiring Concise Statement of Definition of "Enemy Combatant" filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: Status Memorandum of August 25, 2008 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL FOURTH MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF STEPHEN H. OLESKEY by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stephen H. Oleskey)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson on behalf of LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Wolfson, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal: The Government's Response To Petitioners' Third Motion For Leave To Take Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re 151 Notice (Other) (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Final Exhibits re 160 NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Amended Factual Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 103-106, # 2 Exhibit 107-134)(Young, Frederick) Modified on 9/8/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Additional Exhibits re 160 NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Amended Factual Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 70-77, # 2 Exhibit 78-85, # 3 Exhibit 86-87)(Young, Frederick) Modified on 9/8/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Additional Exhibits re: 160 NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Amended Factual Return by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43-50, # 2 Exhibit 51-58, # 3 Exhibit 59-65)(Young, Frederick) Modified on 9/8/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Amended Factual Return For Petitioners by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-14, # 3 Exhibit 15-24, # 4 Exhibit 25-28, # 5 Exhibit 29-31)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re (87 in 1:05-cv-01310-RJL, 68 in 1:05-cv-00573-RJL, 47 in 1:06-cv-00619-RJL, 55 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL, 45 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL, 128 in 1:04-cv-01166-RJL) MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Douglas Levin on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 144 Order Corrected Supplemental Brief filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ON AUGUST 26, 2008 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ON AUGUST 26, 2008 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM re 144 Order by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) Modified on 9/4/2008 (tr, ). (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (79 in 1:05-cv-00573-RJL) Order, (22 in 1:08-cv-01173-RJL) Order, (110 in 1:05-cv-00429-RJL) Order, (95 in 1:05-cv-01310-RJL) Order, (144 in 1:04-cv-01166-RJL) Order, (44 in 1:05-cv-01239-RJL) Order, (56 in 1:06-cv-00619-RJL) Order, (64 in 1:05-cv-00431-RJL) Order, (55 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL) Order, (66 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL) Order Addressing Bismullah v. Gates filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES. (Flentje, August) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Brief Statements of the Legal Basis for Detention of Petitioners by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal: Motion to Strike by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal: Petitioners Third Motion For Leave To Take Discovery by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal: Opposition To Respondents' Motion To File Amended Factual Return by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 73 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Factual Returns (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's Brief Statements of its Legal Basis for Detaining Petitioners by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 09/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Sherwood Young on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/08. (kc) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER. Belkacem Bensayah Habeas Hearing set for 10/6/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/27/08. (kc) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/27/08. (kc) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA re 134 Reply to Document, 129 Memorandum (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 128 MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Discovery by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO HOLD EX PARTE MATERIALS UNDER SEAL PENDING AN OPPORTUNITY FOR PETITIONERS TO BE HEARD re 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct 73 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Factual Returns by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 73 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Factual Returns by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Reply Memorandum, # 3 Declaration Robert C. Kirsch Declaration, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit A)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (65 in 1:05-cv-00573-RJL, 51 in 1:05-cv-00431-RJL, 125 in 1:04-cv-01166-RJL, 88 in 1:05-cv-00429-RJL) Order in Opposition to Petitioners' Procedural Framework Brief filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES. (Flentje, August) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY re 131 Response to Order of the Court,,, filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert C. Kirsch, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Portney, Allyson) Modified on 8/20/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portney, Allyson) Modified on 8/20/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 125 Order filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Acknowledgment of Representation for Mustafa Ait Idir, # 2 Acknowledgment of Representation for Belkacem Bensayah, # 3 Acknowledgment of Representation for Hadj Boudella, # 4 Acknowledgment of Representation for Lakhdar Boumediene, # 5 Acknowledgment of Representation for Saber Lahmar, # 6 Acknowledgment of Representation for Mohamed Nechla)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (35 in 1:05-cv-01239-RJL, 53 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL, 84 in 1:05-cv-01310-RJL) Order, (65 in 1:05-cv-00573-RJL, 51 in 1:05-cv-00431-RJL, 125 in 1:04-cv-01166-RJL, 88 in 1:05-cv-00429-RJL) Order, (9 in 1:08-cv-01173-RJL, 45 in 1:06-cv-00619-RJL, 41 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL) Order (Government's Brief Regarding Preliminary and Procedural Framework Issues) filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hodgkinson Decl, # 2 Exhibit Williamson Decl)(Luh, James) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re 125 Order by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Marconda on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark C. Fleming, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 6175266909. Fax No. - 6175265000 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEFING AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/30/08. (kc) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Portney, Allyson) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT for Petitioners by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA. (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul M. Winke, :Firm- Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP, :Address- 399 Park Ave.. Phone No. - 212-230-8800. Fax No. - 212-230-8888 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert C. Kirsch, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6779. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen H. Oleskey, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6544. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edward Ahern on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Oldham on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Oldham, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Status reports due by 7/18/08, status conferences to be held on 7/23/08 and 7/24/08. (See order for full details). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/15/08. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 85 Notice of Appeal, filed by MOHAMMED NECHLA, HADJ BOUDELLA, SABER LAHMAR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA PLANJA, EMINA LAHMAR, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, it is ORDERED on the court's own motion that in light of the Supreme Court's opinion in Boumediene v. Bush, No. 06-1195, et al. (June 12, 2008), the court's judgment filed February 20, 2007, in the above captioned consolidated cases be vacated; further ordered and adjudged that these cases be remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Court's opinion in Boumediene v. Bush. (USCA No. 05-5062) (kb, ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregory P. Teran, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6574. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allyson J. Portney, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6143. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Seth P. Waxman on behalf of LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, HADJ BOUDELLA (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER,Status Conference set for 7/10/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/2/08. (kc) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA filed 7/26/07 recalling mandate as to (107 in 1:04-cv-01166-RJL) USCA Mandate, (89 in 1:04-cv-01142-RJL) USCA Mandate (jeb, ) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/30/07. (whb) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) vacating the judgment of the District Court and dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction as to 85 Notice of Appeal, filed by MOHAMMED NECHLA, HADJ BOUDELLA, SABER LAHMAR, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA PLANJA, EMINA LAHMAR, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE. USCA #05-5062. (cp, ) (MANDATE RECALLED PURSUANT TO USCA ORDER dated 7/26/07) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 103 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Subar, Judry) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 103 MOTION to Dismiss By Respondents filed by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# 2 Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# 3 Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# 4 Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# 5 Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# 6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# 7 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ). (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents. (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH. Attorney Preeya M. Noronha terminated. (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on August 16, 2006 before Judge Richard j. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty A. Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/15/2006) The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (Obrien, Peggy) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING: MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/06. (whb) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Re: MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/06. (whb) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Order of Court 206 directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re 91 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt)Associated Cases: (jeb, ) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re: Oral agrument Procedures on the Motion hearing set for August 16, 2006 @ 2:30 pm . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/9/06. (whb) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Lisa Ann Olson terminated. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE regarding steps taken in the wake of the Supreme Court's recent decision in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld by Respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (jeb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Harry B. Harris# 2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Carol Kishardt# 3 Text of Proposed Order for Briefing# 4 Text of Proposed Order regarding review of detainee materials)Associated Cases: (jeb) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Understanding regarding access to classified National Security Information by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas). (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05. (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 84 Order filed on 02/18/05 by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 132218. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/18/05. (whb) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 80 MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference, Having Been Approved By The CSO As Suitable For Public Filing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/11/05. (whb) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re 50 Order, by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference, Having Been Approved By The CSO As Suitable For Public Filing by LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/05. (whb) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA ORDER re 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/05. (whb) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              .....WITHDRAWN SEE #78 ERRATA ORDER, #79 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Response to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law (#25) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the above-captioned cases be, and hereby are, DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/05. (whb) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/2/04 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 11/19/04 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Supplement the Factual Return to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 12/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under Seal Consistent with Judge Green's December 8, 2004 Order in the Coordinated Cases by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Judge Green's December 8, 2004 Order in the Coordinated Cases)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Amended) In Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Dismiss Or For Judgment As A Matter Of Law, As Referred To In December 13, 2004 Notice Of Secure Filing, And Having Been Approved By The CSO As Suitable For Public Filing filed by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM In Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Dismiss Or For Judgment As Matter Of Law filed by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Respondents' Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Court's Dec. 2, 2004 Order filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduling ORDER re: Oral arguments on Defendant's motion to Dismiss, scheduled for December 2, 2004 @10:00 am . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/1/04. (whb) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Joinder In The Petitioners' November 26, 2004 Supplemental Memorandum In Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Filed In Abdah v. Bush, Case No. 04-CV-1254 by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petitioners' 11/26/04 Supplemental Memorandum)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order Retransferring Cases for All Purposes by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 to dismiss or for judgment as a matter of law filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Understanding from Stephen H. Oleskey. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION Reschedule Status Conference by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as single consolidated reply brief by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Retransferring Cases for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-15-04. (MD) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of Understanding from Robert C. Kirsch. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Addressing Designation Procedures for "Protected Information." Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-10-04. (MD) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 56 filed by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to motion re 25 Amended Memorandum filed by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Designate as "Protected Information" Unclassified Information in Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus That Is Not Filed on the Public Record by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-08-04.(Burgess, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2004) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER striking Court's Order of November 5, 2004 due to a computer error in the conversion of WordPerfect file to PDF, portions of certain names were inadvertently modified to inaccurate names and words; directing deputy clerk to delete said order. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on November 8, 2004. (Burgess, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2004) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 25 Joint Omnibus Brief filed by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Respondents Named in Individual Capacities (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to motion re 25 filed by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16 # 17 # 18 # 19)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-05-04. (MD)(Document deleted pursuant to order of 11/8/04 by Judge Joyce Hens Green) Modified on 11/8/2004 (Burgess, Joe). (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of In Camera Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under Seal by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM from Petitioners Commenting on Proposed Counsel Access Procedures. (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to November 1, 2004 Order Regarding Submissions on Proposed Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Affidavit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Status Call held on October 20, 2004 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (Transcript located in 02-299) (jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Hadj Boudella by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3))(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Deadline for Submissions in Response to Motion for an Order Requiring Parties to Abide by Proposed Procedures for Counsel Access. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-01-04. (MD) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Requiring Submission of Classified Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-29-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Final Deadline for Submission of Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-29-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Mohammed Nechle by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2))(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Addressing the Sealing of Material. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-27-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Mustafa Ait Idir by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2))(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Saber Lahmar by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3))(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae and MOTION for cm/ecf password by CHARLES B. GITTINGS JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief# 2 Exhibit A to the Amicus Brief)(jf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT on the Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 10/13/04 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Scheduling October 20, 2004 Hearing on Protective Order Issues. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-18-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Belkacem Bensayah by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2))(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Lakhdar Boumediene by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Replies to Motions. Petitioners Shall Have Until November 5, 2004 to File Their Replies . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-12-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 28 Joint Request to Postpone Status Conference and GRANTING 26 Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Submissions Regarding the Proposed Protective Order . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-12-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Postpone Status Conference by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss of Individual Respondents, 25 MOTION to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response Pursuant to the Court's Sept. 20, 2004 Order by MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, BADRA BAOUCHE, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, HADJ BOUDELLA, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, MOHAMMED NECHLA, EMINA PLANJA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submissions Regarding the Proposed Protective Order by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response Pursuant to the Court's Sept. 20, 2004 Order by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss of Individual Respondents by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: In the interest of facilitating Judge Green's coordination of these cases, the Court will transfer this case to Judge Green for coordination and management as reflected in the September 15, 2004, Resolution of the Executive Session . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/29/04. (whb) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Directing Counsel in All Cases to Be As Concise As Possible in All Their Filings; Responsive Filings May Be Up to 75 Pages . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9/29/04. (MD) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responsive Filing Under Court's Sept. 20, 2004, Order by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 9/3/04 from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ, filed pursuant to Order filed 9/20/04. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting status conference, briefing schedule for protective order, and for notification of released detainees.. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9-20-04. (rew, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 8/31/04 from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ ; # 1 Supplement Letter dated 9/1/04 from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ# 2 Supplement Letter dated 9/2/04 from Thomas Wilner, Esq.# 3 Supplement Letter dated 8/25/04 from Erwin Chemerinsky, Esq.# 4 Supplement Letter dated 9/17/04 from KELLER AND HECKMAN) (lc, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting filing schedule and directing the filing of correspondence previously submitted to the Court.. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9-20-04. (rew, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by EMINA LAHMAR, SABER LAHMAR, SABIHA DELIC-AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, MUSTAFA AIT IDIR, ANELA KOBILICA, BELKACEM BENSAYAH, EMINA PLANJA, HADJ BOUDELLA, BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H1# 10 Exhibit H2# 11 Exhibit H3# 12 Exhibit H4# 13 Exhibit H5# 14 Exhibit H6)(nmw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting in part Respondents' motion for Joint Case Management Conference, Entry of Coordination Order. Initial Conference set for 8/23/2004 09:30 AM before Joyce Hens Green. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/18/04. (whb) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 the Government's Motion for Entry of Coordination Order . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/17/04. (CS, ) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 12 MOTION Joint Case Management Conference, Entry of Coordination Order, and Request for Expedition filed by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Joint Case Management Conference, Entry of Coordination Order, and Request for Expedition by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B-1# 3 Exhibit B-2# 4 Exhibit B-3# 5 Exhibit B-4# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E)(jf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Frank Curtis on behalf of BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA (Curtis, Douglas) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Pro Hac Vice admission of Melissa Hoffer by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Herrling, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Pro Hac Vice admission of Robert Trenchard by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Herrling, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Pro Hac Vice admission of Peggy Kuo by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Herrling, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Admission of Robert Kirsch by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Herrling, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephen Oleskey by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Herrling, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephen Oleskey by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Herrling, Christopher) Modified on 7/27/2004 (jf, ). (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD of Filing of Motion to Consolidate in Rasul v. Bush, No. 02-0299 (CKK) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by BADRA BAOUCHE, ABASSIA BOUADJMI, LAKHDAR BOUMEDIENE, MOHAMMED NECHLA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C-1# 4 Exhibit C-2# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Affidavit of Stephen H. Oleskey)(jf, ) (Entered: 07/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?