PORTER v. NATSIOS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-01440
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 8:24 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MELVIN PORTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FINRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerard Martin Babendreier +1 240 386 5675 +1 202 303 3974 gerard.babendreier@finra.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas G. Allen +1 202 663 8000 +1 202 663 8007 thomas.allen@pillsburylaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2007 Matthew A. Anzaldi +1 202 663 8941 matthew.anzaldi@pillsburylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Cynamon +1 202 663 8492 +1 202 663 8007 david.cynamon@pillsburylaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/08/2008 Osman Ahmad Handoo +1 202 663 8557 osman.handoo@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
v.
No Logo ALONZO FULGHAM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lo +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 259 6333 mlo@dl.com
No Logo ANDREW S. NATSIOS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uldric L. Fiore, Jr. +1 202 307 0299 +1 202 514 8780 uldric.fiore@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/05/2007 Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo RANDALL TOBIAS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Daniel Shoaibi +1 703 671 8818

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Blake Harwood +1 202 307 0372 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.harwood@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/25/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/07/2007 Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. As explained in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and TERMINATED from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/22/2011. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by ALONZO FULGHAM, MELVIN PORTER. (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Settlement by ALONZO FULGHAM, MELVIN PORTER (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
        Memorandum in opposition to re 76 MOTION in Limine filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement by MELVIN PORTER (Allen, Thomas) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION in Limine by ALONZO FULGHAM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions in Limine and Joint Pretrial Statement by ALONZO FULGHAM, MELVIN PORTER (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER. As explained in the attached Order setting forth the parties' responsibilities in preparing for the pretrial conference in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the following deadlines apply to the filing of motions in limine in this case: 1.Motions in limine shall be filed on or before January 14, 2011; 2.Oppositions shall be filed on or before February 4, 2011; and 3. Replies shall be filed on or before February 11, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the joint pretrial statement described in the attached Order shall be filed on or before January 21, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a pretrial conference shall be held on February 24, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. in the chambers of the Honorable Reggie B. Walton, Room 6403, at the E. Barrett Prettyman United States Courthouse, 333 Constitution Avenue, N.W. Washington, D.C. 20001. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/10/2010. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION to Continue the Status Conference Set for August 26, 2010 by ALONZO FULGHAM (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 72 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lo on behalf of ALONZO FULGHAM (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 69 Notice of Appeal filed by MELVIN PORTER ; USCA Case Number 09-5167. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the summary judgment of the District Court on Counts I-IV, VIII, X, and XII be affirmed, and its judgment on Counts V, VI and XIV be reversed and remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (zkb) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Allen on behalf of MELVIN PORTER (Allen, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Notice of Appeal
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 67 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by MELVIN PORTER. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001837844. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Cynamon, David) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. An Order consistent with the Court's ruling accompanies this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/09/09. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court orders the following: Dismissal is granted on Counts VII, IX, XI, and XIII, as well as on the race discrimination allegation made in Count V, of the plaintiff's second amended complaint with the consent of the plaintiff; summary judgment is granted to the defendant on Counts VIII and X of the plaintiff's second amended complaint because those claims are barred by res judicata; summary judgment is granted to the defendant as to the racial discrimination claims alleged in Counts I and III, and the gender discrimination claim alleged in Count V of the plaintiff's second amended complaint; and summary judgment is granted to the defendant on the retaliation claims alleged in Counts II, IV, VI, XII and XIV of the plaintiff's second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/09/09. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MELVIN PORTER. Attorney Osman Ahmad Handoo terminated. (Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of RANDALL TOBIAS (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Blake Harwood on behalf of RANDALL TOBIAS Substituting for attorney Karen L. Melnik (Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Motion to Continue
                                      Consent MOTION to Continue Pretrial Hearing by RANDALL TOBIAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Melnik, Karen) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                                        NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Karen L. Melnik on behalf of RANDALL TOBIAS Substituting for attorney Peter S. Smith (Melnik, Karen) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Motion to Continue
                                          Consent MOTION to Continue the Pretrial Conference Scheduled for August 23, 2007 by RANDALL TOBIAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Motion to Continue
                                            Consent MOTION to Continue Pretrial Hearing and Related Deadlines by RANDALL TOBIAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions in Limine and Joint Pretrial Statement by RANDALL TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELVIN PORTER (Anzaldi, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Joint MOTION Continue Pretrial Hearing by RANDALL TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiff's Additional Material Facts)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                      NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MELVIN PORTER (Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                        MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE Concerning Filing of Bulky Exhibits by MELVIN PORTER re 51 Supplemental Memorandum, (Anzaldi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 49 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Rule 7.1(h) Statement in Response to Defendants Statement of Fact and Additional Material Facts filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anzaldi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion for Summary Judgment by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anzaldi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/16/2006, Entered: 9/16/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Anzaldi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                    Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anzaldi, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE Concerning Bulky Exhibits to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by ANDREW S. NATSIOS (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion and for Entry of Briefing Schedule by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting in part 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, denying without prejudice 26 Motion to Dismiss, denying without prejudice 27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/2/06. (lcrbw1, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery For the Limited Purpose of Serving Two Document Requests filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery For the Limited Purpose of Serving Two Document Requests filed by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript Exerpts)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery For the Limited Purpose of Serving Two Document Requests by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MELVIN PORTER. (Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        Stipulated Privacy Act Protective Order. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/21/05. (mpt, ) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 Rule 56(f) filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                              ERRATA re signature page to be added to Docket No. 29, Part II by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Signature Page)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Response to any document
                                                                                                RESPONSE to Document No. 31 , Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion to Refuse Defendant's Application for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Smith, Peter) Modified on 12/5/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 filed by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 filed by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to motion re 27 Rule 56(f) Motion filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION to Amend/Correct Text of Proposed Order by MELVIN PORTER. (Handoo, Osman) Modified on 11/25/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 26 Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Appendix # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Counts VII Through XIV, or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Barabara Turner# 2 Exhibit 1 A# 3 Exhibit 1 AA# 4 Exhibit 1 B# 5 Exhibit 1 BB# 6 Exhibit 1 C# 7 Exhibit 1 CC# 8 Exhibit 1 D# 9 Exhibit 1 DD# 10 Exhibit 1 E# 11 Exhibit 1 EE# 12 Exhibit 1 F# 13 Exhibit 1 FF# 14 Exhibit 1 G# 15 Exhibit 1 GG# 16 Exhibit 1 H# 17 Exhibit 1 HH# 18 Exhibit 1 I# 19 Exhibit 1 II# 20 Exhibit J# 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit 1 K# 23 Exhibit 1 KK# 24 Exhibit 1 L# 25 Exhibit 1 LL# 26 Exhibit 1 M# 27 Exhibit 1 MM# 28 Exhibit 1 N# 29 Exhibit 1 NN# 30 Exhibit 1 O# 31 Exhibit 1 P# 32 Exhibit 1 Q# 33 Exhibit 1 R# 34 Exhibit 1 S# 35 Exhibit 1 T# 36 Exhibit 1 U# 37 Exhibit 1 V# 38 Exhibit 1 W# 39 Exhibit 1 X# 40 Exhibit 1 Y# 41 Exhibit 1 Z# 42 Exhibit 2# 43 Exhibit 3# 44 Exhibit 4# 45 Exhibit 5# 46 Exhibit 6# 47 Statement of Facts # 48 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Enlarge Briefing Schedule by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANDREW S. NATSIOSfiled by MELVIN PORTER.(td, ) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Amended Complaint by MELVIN PORTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Second Amended Complaint)(Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Rule 26a1 Statement
                                                                                                                        RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Handoo, Osman) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER for pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/1/05. (lcrbw1, ) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/1/05. (lcrbw1, ) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Martin Babendreier on behalf of MELVIN PORTER (Babendreier, Gerard) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Gerard Martin Babendreier (Babendreier, Gerard) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babendreier, Gerard) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name Change by MELVIN PORTER (Babendreier, Gerard) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/29/05. (mpt, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Judge Reggie B. Walton.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/29/05. (mpt, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ANDREW S. NATSIOS.(Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANDREW S. NATSIOSfiled by MELVIN PORTER.(td, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR....RESPONSE to January 18, 2005 Court Order; First Amended Complaint filed by MELVIN PORTER. (Babendreier, Gerard) Modified on 2/15/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 4 Motion to Amend/Correct, granting 4 Motion to Consolidate Cases, and terminating as moot 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/18/05. (lcrbw1, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Uldric L. Fiore, Jr on behalf of ANDREW S. NATSIOS (Fiore, Uldric) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E. Huhta on behalf of MELVIN PORTER (Huhta, Susan) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Martin Babendreier on behalf of MELVIN PORTER (Babendreier, Gerard) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Two Cases and to Amend the Pleadings in Both Cases filed by ANDREW S. NATSIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend pleadings in both cases, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by MELVIN PORTER. (td, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MELVIN PORTER. Case related to Case No. 03-CV-1717 RBW. (td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against ANDREW S. NATSIOS (Filing fee $ 150) filed by MELVIN PORTER.(td, ) Modified on 9/1/2004 (td, ). (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 229 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?