HAMDAN v. RUMSFELD
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-01519
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 2:35 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Swift, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal Katyal +1 202 662 9000 katyaln@law.georgetown.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF CHIEF DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR MILITARY COMMISSIONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Swift

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly Alfred Cameron +1 208 343 3434 +1 208 343 3232 KCameron@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Alfred Cameron +1 208 343 3434 +1 208 343 3232 KCameron@perkinscoie.com
Space Joseph Michael McMillan +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 JMcMillan@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael McMillan +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 JMcMillan@perkinscoie.com
No Logo SALIM AHMED HAMDAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael McMillan +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 JMcMillan@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin S. Sharp +1 202 434 1615 +1 202 434 1690 bsharp@perkinscoie.com
v.
No Logo DONALD H. RUMSFELD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L. Marcus +1 202 662 5892 +1 202 305 2452 jmarcus@cov.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE WALKER BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L. Marcus +1 202 662 5892 +1 202 305 2452 jmarcus@cov.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JAY HOOD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L. Marcus +1 202 662 5892 +1 202 305 2452 jmarcus@cov.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN D ALTENBURG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L. Marcus +1 202 662 5892 +1 202 305 2452 jmarcus@cov.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L. Marcus +1 202 662 5892 +1 202 305 2452 jmarcus@cov.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, Amicus Curiae
No Logo ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Northwestern University School of Law, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "CENTER FOR INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo DAVID M. BRAHMS, Amicus Curiae
No Logo DONALD J. GUTER, Amicus Curiae
No Logo FRITS KALSHOVEN, Amicus Curiae
No Logo GUY S. GOODWIN-GILL, Amicus Curiae
No Logo JAMES P. CULLEN, Amicus Curiae
No Logo JOHN D. HUTSON, Amicus Curiae
No Logo LOUISE DOSWALD-BECK, Amicus Curiae
No Logo MARCO SASSOLI, Amicus Curiae
No Logo MERRILL A. MCPEAK, Amicus Curiae
No Logo MILT BEARDEN, Amicus Curiae
No Logo RICHARD O'MEARA, Amicus Curiae
No Logo UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPEAN PARLIMENTARIANS, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Jean Moltenbrey +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 mjmoltenbrey@paulhastings.com
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Amicus Curiae
No Logo ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, Movant
No Logo BRUCE ACKERMAN, Movant
No Logo CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, Movant
No Logo DAVID C. VLADECK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Vladeck +1 202 662 9540 vladeckd@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo DAVID SCHEFFER, Movant
No Logo DAVID SLOSS, Movant
No Logo DEREK JINKS, Movant
No Logo JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, Movant
No Logo Jonathan Lee Riches, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEXINGTON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN LEE RICHES
No Logo JUDITH RESNIK, Movant
No Logo KEVIN R. JOHNSON, Movant
No Logo LEE F. GUNN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Remes +1 202 669 6508 remesdh@gmail.com
No Logo MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, Movant
No Logo OMAR KHADR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF MILITARY COMMISSIONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca Susan Snyder snyderr@dodgc.osd.mil
No Logo OONA HATHAWAY, Movant
No Logo ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, Movant
No Logo RYAN GOODMAN, Movant
No Logo SARAH H. CLEVELAND, Movant
No Logo WILLIAM S. DODGE, Movant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Termination of Parties and Withdrawal of Counsel by JOHN D ALTENBURG, MILT BEARDEN, DAVID M. BRAHMS, JAMES P. CULLEN, LEE F. GUNN, DONALD J. GUTER, JOHN D. HUTSON, MERRILL A. MCPEAK, RICHARD O'MEARA (Remes, David) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DONALD H. RUMSFELD. Attorney John Caviness O'Quinn terminated. (O'Quinn, John) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DONALD H. RUMSFELD(Attachments: # 1 letter of withdrawal)(Marcus, Jonathan) Modified on 2/6/2009 adding correct filer(td, ). (Entered: 02/05/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. Attorney Neal Katyal terminated. (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Transfer and Release of Petitioner by DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Folio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James Robertson of proceedings held on July 17, 2008; Page Numbers: 1 - 81. Date of Issuance:July 22, 2008. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM ORDER denying motion for preliminary injunction 92 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 18, 2008. (MT) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                  AMICUS BRIEF by AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI. (nmw, ) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT re 104 Reply to opposition to Motion Preliminary Injunction (Declaration of Brian Mizer) by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT re 104 Reply to opposition to Motion Preliminary Injunction (Declaration of Joseph McMillan) by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 92 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by John Caviness O'Quinn on behalf of all defendants (O'Quinn, John) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by OMAR KHADR, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI (nmw, ) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                Memorandum in opposition to re 92 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JOHN D ALTENBURG, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD. (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JOHN D ALTENBURG, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                    ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 89 Notice of Appeal filed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN, it is ORDERED that the motion be granted. (USCA No. 07-5042) (kb, ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                      AMICUS BRIEF by UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPEAN PARLIMENTARIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Amicus)(tg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Party Title, MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by 271 United Kingdom And European Parlimentarians (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Appendix to Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Moltenbrey, Mary) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/7/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT re 92 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 93 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM re 92 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Setting Briefing Schedule)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff by JONATHAN LEE RICHES (tg, ) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                  N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 87 Order by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1110614. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH. Attorney Preeya M. Noronha terminated. (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER that the government's motion to dismiss 75 is granted. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 13, 2006. (MT) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 13, 2006. (MT) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 75 Notice construed as Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Karen L. Hecker)(Lin, Jean) Modified on 12/11/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting in modified form respondents' motion for extension of time 81 and granting respondents' motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 30, 2006. (MT) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (see docket entry #81 for document image). (lc, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Enlargment of Page Limitation filed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of J. McMillan# 2 Exhibit Email)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Enlargment of Page Limitation by DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF by RICHARD O'MEARA, JOHN D. HUTSON, DAVID M. BRAHMS, MERRILL A. MCPEAK, MILT BEARDEN, DONALD J. GUTER, JAMES P. CULLEN. (lc, ) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Petitioner by RICHARD O'MEARA, JOHN D. HUTSON, DAVID M. BRAHMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief of Gen. Merrill A. McPeak et al.)(Remes, David) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 75 Notice construed as Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Petitioner's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles Swift# 2 Exhibit 1-4# 3 Exhibit 5-6# 4 Exhibit 7-10# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillan, Joseph) Modified on 12/11/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER re briefing schedule for notice of filing Military Commission Act 75 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on October 27, 2006. (MT) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph M. McMillan (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Military Commision Act of 2006) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 73 First MOTION for Leave to File For Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Subject Matter Jurisdiction Declaration of Joseph McMillan in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Order Setting Briefing Schedule by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D - 1# 5 Exhibit D - 2)(McMillan, Joseph) Modified on 10/17/2006 (zlc, ). (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    First MOTION for Leave to File For Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Subject Matter Jurisdiction by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Petitioner's Motion Setting Briefing Schedule)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/20/06. (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Order of Court 206 directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt)Associated Cases: (jeb, ) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER directing counsel for petitioners to file a notice by 8/15/06 identifying any petitioner as to whom counsel lacks a good-faith belief that any attorney-client communications occurred prior to 6/18/06; directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel (either through written correspondence or in-person conversation) prior to 6/18/06. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/4/06. (jeb) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE Of Correction by DONALD H. RUMSFELD re 67 NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, and DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jeb, ) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 64 Motion to Compel and for Writ in Aid of Jurisdiction filed by DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....Proposed MOTION for Order Granting Petitioner's Motion To Compel And For Writ Aid Of Jurisdiction by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Sharp, Benjamin) Modified on 12/7/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Compel by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Sharp, Benjamin) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05. (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          USCA Case Number 04-5393 for 61 Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, JOHN D ALTENBURG, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY. (lc, ) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 56 Order by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. Filing fee $0. (nmw, ) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Addressing Designation Procedures for "Protected Information." Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-10-04. (MD) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Designate as "Protected Information" Unclassified Information in Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus That Is Not Filed on the Public Record by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-08-04.(Burgess, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER striking Court's Order of November 5, 2004 due to a computer error in the conversion of WordPerfect file to PDF, portions of certain names were inadvertently modified to inaccurate names and words; directing deputy clerk to delete said order. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on November 8, 2004. (Burgess, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2004) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER that the petition of Salim Ahmed Hamdan for habeas corpus [1-1] is granted in part and that the cross-motion to dismiss of Donald H. Rumsfeld [1-84] is denied. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 8, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 8, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-05-04. (MD)Document deleted pursuant to order of 11/8/04 by Judge Joyce Hens Green) Modified on 11/8/2004 (Burgess, Joe). (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 50 November 1, 2004 Order Regarding Submissions on Proposed Counsel Access Procedures filed by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Affidavit)(Warden, Andrew) Modified on 11/5/2004 (lc, ). (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 50 Petitioner Hamdan's Response to Proposed Procedures for Counsel Access filed by SALIM AHMED HAMDAN. (McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Status Call held on October 20, 2004 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (Transcript located in 02-299) (jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Deadline for Submissions in Response to Motion for an Order Requiring Parties to Abide by Proposed Procedures for Counsel Access. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-01-04. (MD) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER Requiring Submission of Classified Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-29-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Final Deadline for Submission of Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-29-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on October 25, 2004, 1:06 p.m. before Judge James Robertson. Court Reporter: Susan Harris. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (lc, ) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Addressing the Sealing of Material. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-27-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Circumstances by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by CENTER FOR INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS, LOUISE DOSWALD-BECK, GUY S. GOODWIN-GILL, FRITS KALSHOVEN, MARCO SASSOLI. (lc, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 10/13/04 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 41 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion Regarding the Protective Order . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-20-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Order that case not be Governed by Protective Order Entered in Consolidated Proceedings by CHARLES SWIFT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting oral argument for 1:00 p.m. on October 25, 2004. Signed by Judge James Robertson on October 18, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Scheduling October 20, 2004 Hearing on Protective Order Issues. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-18-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Reply to Opposition to Cross-Motion to Dismiss from Respondents. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER (Paperless) GRANTING 27 Unopposed Motion of 271 United Kingdom and European Parlimentarians for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Petitioner and GRANTING 28 Unopposed Motion of Louise Doswald-Beck, Guy S. Goodwin-Gill, Frits Kalshoven, Marco Sassoli, and The Center for International Human Rights of Northwestern University School of Law for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Salim Ahmed Hamdan's Petition . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-13-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Replies to Motions. Petitioners Shall Have Until November 5, 2004 to File Their Replies. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-12-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING 34 Joint Request to Postpone Status Conference and GRANTING 29 Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Submissions Regarding the Proposed Protective Order . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-12-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Postpone Status Conference by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF In Support of Petitioner filed by DAVID M. BRAHMS, LEE F. GUNN, JOHN D. HUTSON, RICHARD O'MEARA. (lc, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF In Support of Petitioner and in Opposition to Respondants' Cross-Motion To Dismiss filed by (16 Law Professors) BRUCE ACKERMAN, ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, SARAH H. CLEVELAND, WILLIAM S. DODGE, MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, RYAN GOODMAN, OONA HATHAWAY, DEREK JINKS, KEVIN R. JOHNSON, JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, JUDITH RESNIK, DAVID SCHEFFER, ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, DAVID SLOSS, CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, DAVID C. VLADECK. (lc, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM from International Law Professors as Amici Curiae In Support of Petitioner. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Authorities# 2 List of Amici)(lc, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in support of Respondents' Cross-Motion To Dismiss filed as Amici Curiae by ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION. (lc, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submissions Regarding the Proposed Protective Order by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION and Brief for Leave to File As Amici Curiae by CENTER FOR INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS, MARCO SASSOLI, FRITS KALSHOVEN, GUY S. GOODWIN-GILL, LOUISE DOSWALD-BECK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, ) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File As Amici Curiae In Support of Petitioner by 271 United Kingdom And European Parlimentarians. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Appendix # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(lc, ) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Clarification Regarding Submission of a Response and Factual Return . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-04-04. (MD) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by RICHARD O'MEARA, JOHN D. HUTSON, LEE F. GUNN, DAVID M. BRAHMS. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief# 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Wu# 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Steeley)(nmw, ) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Clarification Regarding Submission of Response and Factual Return re 11 Order, 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re 19 Petitioner's Consolidated Reply to Respondents' Return and Opposition to Cross Motion to Dismiss filed by CHARLES SWIFT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(McMillan, Joseph) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by BRUCE ACKERMAN, ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, SARAH H. CLEVELAND, WILLIAM S. DODGE, MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, RYAN GOODMAN, OONA HATHAWAY, DEREK JINKS, KEVIN R. JOHNSON, JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, JUDITH RESNIK, DAVID SCHEFFER, ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, DAVID SLOSS, CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, DAVID C. VLADECK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief)(nmw, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Vladeck on behalf of DAVID C. VLADECK, CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, DAVID SLOSS, ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, DAVID SCHEFFER, JUDITH RESNIK, JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, KEVIN R. JOHNSON, DEREK JINKS, OONA HATHAWAY, RYAN GOODMAN, MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, WILLIAM S. DODGE, SARAH H. CLEVELAND, ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, BRUCE ACKERMAN (nmw, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Of International Law Professors For Leave to File a Memorandum As Amici Curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum# 3 Table of Authorities# 4 List of Amici)(lc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHARLES SWIFT. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Harry H. Schneider, Jr.# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Directing Counsel in All Cases to Be As Concise As Possible in All Their Filings; Responsive Filings May Be Up to 75 Pages . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9/29/04. (MD) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates 9/14/2004. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responsive Filing Under Court's Sept. 20, 2004, Order by JOHN D ALTENBURG, GEORGE W. BUSH, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss; Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 09-24-04. (Davidson, Marcia) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter dated 9/3/04 from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ, filed pursuant to Order filed 9/20/04. (lc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting status conference, briefing schedule for protective order, and for notification of released detainees.. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9-20-04. (rew, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 9-20-04 from David Salmons, Esq. and Neal Katyal, Esq. (# 1 Supplement Letter dated 8-31-04 from Thomas Lee, Esq. USDOJ# 2 Supplement Letter dated 9-1-04 from Thomas Lee, Esq. USDOJ# 3 Supplement Letter dated 9-2-04 from Thomas Wilner, Esq.# 4 Supplement Letter dated 8-25-04 from Erwin Chemerinsky, Esq.# 5 Supplement Letter dated 9-17-04 from KELLER AND HECKMAN) (lc, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting filing schedule and directing the filing of corresondence previously submitted to the Court.. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9-20-04. (rew, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting upon condition motions for pro hac vice appearances of Joseph McMillan 6 , LCDR Charles Swift 7 , and Neal Katyal 8 . Plaintiff's request for early status conference 3 is granted. A status conference will be held at 3:00 p.m. on September 14, 2004. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 10, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHARLES SWIFT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Neal Katyal# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHARLES SWIFT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Commander Charles Swift# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHARLES SWIFT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph M. McMillan# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(nmw, ) (Entered: 09/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Price on behalf of ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION (nmw, ) (Entered: 09/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CHARLES SWIFT Petitioner's Request for Early Status Conference (Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Cameron on behalf of CHARLES SWIFT (Cameron, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case transferred in from Western District of Washington at Seattle Division Case Number 04-777. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Mandamus(Dkt#1)# 2 Exhibit Exhibit to (Dkt#1)# 3 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Cdr Charles Swift (Dkt#2)# 4 Exhibit Exhibit J Declaration (Dkt#3)# 5 Exhibit Declaration of Charles P. Schmitz (Dkt#4)# 6 Exhibit Declaration of Charles P. Schmitz Exhibit A and B (Dkt# 5)# 7 Exhibit Declaration of Daryl Matthews (Dkt#6)# 8 Exhibit Certificate of Service (Dkt#7)# 9 Exhibit Application (Dkt#8)# 10 Exhibit Application (Dkt#9)# 11 Exhibit Praecipe (Dkt#10)# 12 Exhibit Memorandum (Dkt#11)# 13 Exhibit Attachment 1 to Dkt#11)# 14 Exhibit Attachment 2 (Dkt#11)# 15 Exhibit Attachment 3 to (Dkt#11)# 16 Exhibit Attachment 4 to (Dkt#11)# 17 Exhibit Appendix (Dkt#12)# 18 Exhibit Attachments: 1 to (Dkt#12)# 19 Exhibit Attachment 2 to (Dkt#12)# 20 Exhibit Attachment 4 to (Dkt#12)# 21 Exhibit Attachment 5 to (Dkt#12)# 22 Exhibit Attachment 6 to (Dkt#12)# 23 Exhibit Attachment 7 to (Dkt#12)# 24 Exhibit Attachment 8 to (Dkt#12)# 25 Exhibit Attachment 9 to (Dkt#12)# 26 Exhibit Attachment 10 to (Dkt#12)# 27 Exhibit Attachment 11 to (Dkt#12)# 28 Exhibit Attachment 12 to (Dkt#12)# 29 Exhibit Attachment 13 to (Dkt#12)# 30 Exhibit Attachment 14 to (Dkt#12)# 31 Exhibit Attachment 15 to (Dkt#12)# 32 Exhibit Attachment 16 to (Dkt#12)# 33 Exhibit Attachment 17 to (Dkt#12)# 34 Exhibit Attachment 18 to (Dkt#12)# 35 Exhibit Attachment 19 to (Dkt#12)# 36 Exhibit Attachment 20 to (Dkt#12)# 37 Exhibit Attachment 21 to (Dkt#12)# 38 Exhibit Motion for Order (Dkt#13)# 39 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#13)# 40 Exhibit Attachment 2 to (Dkt#13)# 41 Exhibit Request (Dkt#14)# 42 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#14)# 43 Exhibit Minute Order (Dkt#15)# 44 Exhibit Response (Dkt#16)# 45 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#16)# 46 Exhibit Declaration (Dkt#17)# 47 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#17)# 48 Exhibit Exhibit A/Declaration (Dkt#18)# 49 Exhibit Declaration (Dkt#19)# 50 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#19)# 51 Exhibit Reply (Dkt#20)# 52 Exhibit Transcript (Dkt#24)# 53 Exhibit Transcript (Dkt#25)# 54 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Hold Petition in Abeyance (Dkt#23)# 55 Exhibit Letter (Dkt#26)# 56 Exhibit Order Unsealing Documents (Dkt#27)# 57 Exhibit Letter (Dkt#28)# 58 Exhibit Motion for Order (Dkt#30)# 59 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#30)# 60 Exhibit Attachment 2 to (Dkt#30)# 61 Exhibit Minute Order (Dkt#31)# 62 Exhibit Notice of Change of Address (32)# 63 Exhibit Motion to dismiss or Transfer (Dkt#34)# 64 Exhibit Scheduling Order (Dkt#35)# 65 Exhibit Response (Dkt#36)# 66 Exhibit Declaration (Dkt#37)# 67 Exhibit Declaration (Dkt# 38)# 68 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt# 38)# 69 Exhibit Motion (Dkt# 39)# 70 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt# 39)# 71 Exhibit Attachment 2 to (Dkt# 39)# 72 Exhibit Reply (Dkt# 40)# 73 Exhibit Surreply (Dkt# 41)# 74 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt# 41)# 75 Exhibit Attachment 2 to (Dkt# 41)# 76 Exhibit Praecipe (Dkt# 42)# 77 Exhibit Response (Dkt#43)# 78 Exhibit Letter (Dkt#44)# 79 Exhibit Mail Returned (Dkt#46)# 80 Exhibit Letter (Dkt#45)# 81 Exhibit Amended Scheduling Order (Dkt#48)# 82 Exhibit Transcript (Dkt#47)# 83 Exhibit Order (Dkt#49)# 84 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss# 85 Exhibit Attachment 1 to (Dkt#50)# 86 Exhibit Attacment 2 (Dkt#2)# 87 Exhibit Order transferring case (Dkt# 51)(rje, ) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?