QASSIM et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00497

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 11:25 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Sabin Willett +1 617 951 8000 +1 617 951 8925 sabin.willett@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR CONSITITUTIONAL RIGHTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by International Human Rights Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Baker Manning +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 292 2286 susan.manning@morganlewis.com
No Logo ABU BAKKER QASSIM, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Sabin Willett +1 617 951 8000 +1 617 951 8925 sabin.willett@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR CONSITITUTIONAL RIGHTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by International Human Rights Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Baker Manning +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 292 2286 susan.manning@morganlewis.com
v.
No Logo BRICE GYURISKO, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE WALKER BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAY HOOD, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 69 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
STATUS REPORT by ABU BAKKER QASSIM. (Manning, Susan)
    LREF
    Blank 68 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
    STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
      LREF
      Blank 67 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER that each of these cases is transferred to Judge Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008, resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 11, 2008. (MT)
        LREF
        Blank 66 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana)
          LREF
          Blank 65 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt, )
            LREF
            Blank 64 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
            N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
              LREF
              Blank 63 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
              MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) It is hereby ordered that the appellees emergency motion to dismiss as moot be granted; It is further ordered that the appellees motion to maintain material in the appellants motion for release pending appeal and response under seal be granted; It is further ordered that the motion for release pending appeal be dismissed as moot; USCA#05-5477 (jsc)
                LREF
                Blank 62 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006
                MANDATE of USCA (certified copy)It is hereby ordered that No# 05-5213, 05-5240 and 05-5249 be dismissed as moot;In light of this ruling, which is on appeal No#05-5477, Qassim v. Bush, the parties agree that their challenges to the interim order are now moot; USCA#05-5213 (jsc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 61 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Court Filing
                  Civil Statement from ABU BAKKER QASSIM and A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Fiat: "Leave to file granted" Judge Robertson".) (lc, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 60 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                    NOTICE of Respondents' Objection to To Order Setting Conference Regarding Petitioners' Motion for an Order Amending Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Henry, Terry)
                      LREF
                      Blank 59 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 58 Order on Motion to Vacate by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 140942. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 58 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part petitioners' motion to vacate the stay order 24 and denying petitioners' petition for a writ of habeas corpus 1 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 22, 2005. (MT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 57 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                          MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 22, 2005. (MT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 56 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                            MEMORANDUM by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                              LREF
                              Blank 55 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                              NOTICE of Filing (document submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Robertson : Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2005 re 44 MOTION to grant Petitioners access to representatives of the United Nations Commission on Human Rights filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM,, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM,. Court denies motion. (Court Reporter Rebecca King.) (alr, ) Modified on 12/14/2005 (zalr, ). (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 53 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005
                                  AFFIDAVIT re 24 MOTION to Vacate 23 Notice (Other) PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH CSO AND CLEARED FOR PUBLIC FILING December 9, 2005, Declaration of Neil McGaraghan by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (McGaraghan, Neil)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 52 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005
                                    NOTICE of Filing (document submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 51 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                      Memorandum in opposition to motion re 44 (Respondents' Opposition to Petitioners' Motion To Grant Them Access to Representatives of the United Nations Commission on Human Rights) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 50 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005
                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 24 MOTION to Vacate 23 Notice (Other) PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH CSO AND CLEARED FOR PUBLIC FILING filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 49 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005
                                          NOTICE of Filing (document submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 48 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 42 filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 47 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 44 MOTION to grant Petitioners access to representatives of the United Nations Commission on Human Rights by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 46 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005
                                                NOTICE of Filing (document submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to motion re 42 Order to Amend Access Procedures Pertaining to Non-Enemy Combatants filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Hood Declaration)(nmw, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                    MOTION to grant Petitioners access to representatives of the United Nations Commission on Human Rights by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005
                                                      NOTICE of Filing (document submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                                        MOTION for Order to Amend Access Procedures Pertaining to Non-Enemy Combatants by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Baker Manning in Support of Motion)(Manning, Susan)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                            NOTICE of Filing (documents submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 24 MOTION to Vacate 23 Notice (Other) PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH CSO AND CLEARED FOR PUBLIC FILING -- Second Supplemental Memorandum filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 September 19, 2005 Declaration of Sabin Willett)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005
                                                                NOTICE of Filing (document submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005
                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 24 MOTION to Vacate 23 Notice (Other) PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH CSO AND CLEARED FOR PUBLIC FILING filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 9/19/05 Declaration of Sabin Willett)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                    NOTICE of Filing (2 documents submitted to CSO) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005
                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing (Declaration of P. Sabin Willett submitted to Court Security Officer) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan) Modified on 9/14/2005 (lc, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM ORDER setting hearing for 8/25/05 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 8/19/05. (Robertson, James)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005
                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 32 to Strike Portion of Hood Declaration filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Henry, Terry)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                            MOTION to Strike 27 Memorandum, Ex. 1 - Hood Declaration by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                              SURREPLY to re 27 Memorandum, filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 8/10/05 Declaration of Sabin Willett)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005
                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing (certain pleadings) by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                                                                                    MOTION Accept Filing of Classified Declaration of Ambassador Pierre-Richard Prosper by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katerberg, Robert)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Hood Declaration# 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Prosper Declaration (REDACTED)# 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Excerpt from Detainees' D.C. Cir. Brief# 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Excerpt from U.S.'s D.C. Cir. brief)(Katerberg, Robert)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by ABU BAKKER QASSIM. (Attachments: # 1)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005
                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 24 to Vacate Stay Order and Issue Writ Directing Immediate Release of Petitioners filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bumgarner Decl.)(Katerberg, Robert)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                            MOTION to Vacate 23 Notice (Other) PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH CSO AND CLEARED FOR PUBLIC FILING by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Petitioners' Emergency Motion# 2 Declaration of Sabin Willett# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(White, Edward)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Petition for Mandamus by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM re 14 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Hearing, (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Mandamus (U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit))(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 14 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Hearing, by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. Filing fee $ 0.00. (lc, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005
                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Cross-Appeal by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM re 18 Notice of Appeal, (Manning, Susan) Modified on 6/15/2005 (lc, ).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 14 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Hearing, by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. Filing fee $ 0.00, government appeal, fee not required. (lc, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005
                                                                                                          NOTICE Petitioners' Notice of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER adopting protective order and denying petitioners' motion to "conform" the ruling in this case to those in other cases 15 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 5, 2005. (MT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                              MOTION (1) Modification of Order Holding Motion for Protective Order in Abeyance, and (ii) Entry, Subject to Stay, or Order to Show Cause re 14 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Hearing, by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting respondents' motion for a stay 2 , denying petitioners' motion for preliminary injunction 4 , holding in abeyance petitioners' motion for protective order 5 , granting petitioners' motion for leave to file 9 , and denying petitioners' motion for hearing 13 . The status conference set for May 16, 2005 at 11:30 a.m. has been taken off the calendar . Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 13, 2005. (MT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005
                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Baker Manning# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to motion re 5 for (i) Rule 16 Conference, (ii) Protective Order Protecting Legitimate Security Concerns of Respondents, (iii) Prompt Return, and (iv) Other Procedural Relief filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Noronha, Preeya)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                        SURREPLY to re 2 MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and For Continued Coordination filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Respondents' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Related Appeals and for Continued Coordination by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005
                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 to Stay Pending Related Appeals and for Continued Coordination filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 4 preliminary injunction filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A# 2 Exhibit Ex. B# 3 Exhibit Ex. C# 4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Katerberg, Robert)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Second Declaration of Susan Bakker Manning in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order (i) Rule 16 Conference, (ii) Protective Order Protecting Legitimate Security Concerns of Respondents, (iii) Prompt Return, and (iv) Other Procedural Relief by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Baker Manning in Support of Application# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Susan)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to motion re 2 MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and For Continued Coordination filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Certificate of Service# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and For Continued Coordination by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                                                                                                                          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by ABU BAKKER QASSIM, A'DEL ABDU AL-HAKIM. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Representation Without Compensation)(lc, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?