NEWBY v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01624
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BETTY ANN NEWBY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BETTY ANN NEWBY
v.
No Logo ALBERT GONZALES, Defendant
No Logo ARLEN SPECTER, Defendant
No Logo BRETT KAVANAUGH, Defendant
No Logo DAVID ADDINGTON, Defendant
No Logo DICK CHENEY, Defendant
No Logo EIGHT UNKNOWN COURT SECURITY OFFICERS, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE H. BUSH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
No Logo GEORGE H.W. BUSH, Defendant
No Logo HARRIET MIERS, Defendant
No Logo HENRY HAGER, Defendant
No Logo ISAAC MOORE, Defendant
No Logo JACK POTTER, Defendant
No Logo JENNA BUSH, Defendant
No Logo John Clark, Defendant
No Logo John, Robert S. Jr., Defendant
No Logo JOHN WARNER, Defendant
No Logo KARL ROVE, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo MICHAEL MUKASEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "NANCY PELOSI"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
No Logo PAT ROBERTS, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK LEAHY, Defendant
No Logo PHILIP PERRY, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT GATES, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT MUELLER, Defendant
No Logo SAMUEL ALITO, JR., Defendant
No Logo SEVEN UNKNOWN EXECUTIVE BRANCH AGENTS, Defendant
No Logo TOM RIDGE, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 2, 2010. (lcegs2 ) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss as to all defendants. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 2, 2010. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
      MOTION for Extension of Time to serve defendants by BETTY ANN NEWBY (jf, ) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        Order advising plaintiff to respond to 4 the motion to dismiss or Court may deem matter conceded. A response is due June 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 7, 2009. (lcegs4) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL MUKASEY, GEORGE H. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
            MOTION for Extension of Time to obtain waivers and to serve defendants, MOTION to allow service on members of Congress and Congressional Committees by utilizing message service rather that through certified mail service by BETTY ANN NEWBY (jf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BETTY ANN NEWBY. Case related to Case No. 05-1877, 06-160, 07-1406, 08-983. (tg, ) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against HENRY HAGER, JENNA BUSH, SEVEN UNKNOWN EXECUTIVE BRANCH AGENTS, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, ALBERT GONZALES, TOM RIDGE, JACK POTTER, JOHN ROBERTS, JR, SAMUEL ALITO, JR., BRETT KAVANAUGH, MICHAEL HAYDEN, ROBERT GATES, MICHAEL MUKASEY, ISAAC MOORE, PHILIP PERRY, DAVID ADDINGTON, ARLEN SPECTER, PATRICK LEAHY, PAT ROBERTS, JOHN WARNER, GEORGE H. BUSH, NANCY PELOSI, GEORGE H.W. BUSH, DICK CHENEY, KARL ROVE, HARRIET MIERS, ROBERT MUELLER, EIGHT UNKNOWN COURT SECURITY OFFICERS, JOHN CLARK ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616015165) filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 94 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?