REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE et al v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01953

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo California Republican Party, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bell, McAndrews & Hiltachk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Herbert Bell, Jr. +1 916 442 7757 +1 916 442 7759 cbell@bmhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bopp Coleson & Bostrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2009, PRO HAC VICE Clayton J. Callen +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 2685 ccallen@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Coleson +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 rcoleson@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaylan L. Phillips +1 812 232 2434 kphillips@bopplaw.com
No Logo MICHAEL STEELE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobby Roy Burchfield +1 202 756 8003 +1 202 756 8855

Toggle Switch Represented by Bopp Coleson & Bostrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2009, PRO HAC VICE Clayton J. Callen +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 2685 ccallen@bopplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Coleson +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 rcoleson@bopplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaylan L. Phillips +1 812 232 2434 kphillips@bopplaw.com
No Logo Republican National Committee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bopp Coleson & Bostrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2009, PRO HAC VICE Clayton J. Callen +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 2685 ccallen@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Coleson +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 rcoleson@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaylan L. Phillips +1 812 232 2434 kphillips@bopplaw.com
No Logo Republican Party of San Diego County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bell, McAndrews & Hiltachk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Herbert Bell, Jr. +1 916 442 7757 +1 916 442 7759 cbell@bmhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bopp Coleson & Bostrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2009, PRO HAC VICE Clayton J. Callen +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 2685 ccallen@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Coleson +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 rcoleson@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaylan L. Phillips +1 812 232 2434 kphillips@bopplaw.com
No Logo ROBERT M. DUNCAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bopp Coleson & Bostrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2009, PRO HAC VICE Clayton J. Callen +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 2685 ccallen@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Coleson +1 812 232 2434 +1 812 235 3685 rcoleson@bopplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaylan L. Phillips +1 812 232 2434 kphillips@bopplaw.com
v.
Federal Election Commission Federal Election Commission, Defendant

Represented by Federal Election Commission

No Logo Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher +1 212 373 3238 +1 212 492 0238 srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
No Logo CHRISTOPHER H. SHAYS, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by J. GERALD HEBERT, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Gerald Hebert +1 703 628 4673 +1 202 736 2222 hebert@voterlaw.com
No Logo Common Cause, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher +1 212 373 3238 +1 212 492 0238 srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
No Logo DEMOS: A NETWORK OF IDEAS AND ACTION, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher +1 212 373 3238 +1 212 492 0238 srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
No Logo JOHN S. MCCAIN, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by J. GERALD HEBERT, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Gerald Hebert +1 703 628 4673 +1 202 736 2222 hebert@voterlaw.com
No Logo LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher +1 212 373 3238 +1 212 492 0238 srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
No Logo MARTIN T. MEEHAN, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by J. GERALD HEBERT, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Gerald Hebert +1 703 628 4673 +1 202 736 2222 hebert@voterlaw.com
No Logo RUSSELL D. FEINGOLD, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by J. GERALD HEBERT, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Gerald Hebert +1 703 628 4673 +1 202 736 2222 hebert@voterlaw.com
No Logo U.S. PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher +1 212 373 3238 +1 212 492 0238 srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
No Logo CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/04/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren E. Baer +1 212 230 8826 +1 212 230 8888 lauren.baer@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francesco Valentini +1 202 663 6559 francesco.valentini@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Jay Simon +1 202 682 0240 +1 202 682 0249 dsimon@sonosky.com

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo Democratic National Committee, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1973
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 103 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion, it is this 26th day of March, 2010, hereby ORDERED that Defendant Federal Election Commission's Motion for Summary Judgment 56 is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 21 is DENIED; it is further ORDERED that Defendant Federal Election Commission's Motion To Dismiss 20 is DENIED AS MOOT; and it is further ORDERED that final judgment be entered for the defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/26/10. (kc ) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/26/10. (kc ) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, MICHAEL STEELE (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 94 Order,,, filed by CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, MICHAEL STEELE. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 94 Order,,, filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 94 Order,,, filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Elias, Marc) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. Werbrock on behalf of DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Werbrock, Andrew) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 94 Order,,, re: Citizens United v. FEC filed by CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, MICHAEL STEELE. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER, It is this 25th day of January 2010 hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit supplemental briefing to discuss the impact on the present litigation, if any, of the Supreme Court's decision in Citizens United v. Federal Election Commission, ___S.Ct.___(2010). The briefing shall be limited strictly to this topic. The plaintiffs shall file a brief not exceeding twenty pages no later than Tuesday, February 2, 2010. The defendant shall file a brief not exceeding twenty pages no later than Tuesday, February 9, 2010. The intervenor-defendants may file a brief not exceeding ten pages no later than Tuesday, February 9, 2010. The plaintiffs may file a reply brief not exceeding ten pages no later than Friday, February 12, 2010. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/25/10. (see order.)(kc) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marc Erik Elias on behalf of DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE Substituting for attorney Robert F. Bauer (Elias, Marc) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Erik Elias on behalf of DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Elias, Marc) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE re 90 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Authority)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/24/09. (see order.)(kc) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. Attorney Clayton J. Callen terminated. (Callen, Clayton) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 61 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM re 84 MOTION for Hearing Date filed by MICHAEL STEELE, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Hearing Date by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1--Steele Deposition Transcript), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2--Steele Deposition Exhibits))(Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 FEC's Supplemented SMF with New Material Highlighted, # 2 FEC S.J. Exh. 42 -- Steele Deposition, # 3 FEC S.J. Exh. 43 (redacted), # 4 FEC S.J. Exh. 44 (redacted), # 5 FEC S.J. Exh. 45 (redacted), # 6 FEC S.J. Exh. 46 (redacted), # 7 FEC S.J. Exh. 47 (redacted), # 8 FEC S.J. Exh. 48 (redacted), # 9 FEC S.J. Exh. 49, # 10 FEC S.J. Exh. 50, # 11 FEC S.J. Exh. 51, # 12 Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 20 MOTION to Dismiss (Supplemental Reply Brief) filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Deeley, Kevin) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Francesco Valentini on behalf of CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (rdj) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby Roy Burchfield on behalf of REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE (rdj) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 75 MOTION to Take Deposition from Representative of Plaintiff Republican National Committee filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 75 MOTION to Take Deposition from Representative of Plaintiff Republican National Committee filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Take Deposition from Representative of Plaintiff Republican National Committee by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Deeley, Kevin) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT Regarding Discovery by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT Regarding Discovery by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT Regarding Discovery by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to 68 Amended Complaint by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE. Related document: 68 Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL STEELE, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE.(Bauer, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 68 Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. Related document: 68 Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL STEELE, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE.(Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY.(jf, ) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE, FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, MICHAEL STEELE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY.(rdj) Modified on 5/7/2009 (rdj). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/5/09. (see stipulation and protective order.)(kc) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, Upon consideration of stipulation of Defendants Representative Christopher Van Hollen, Jr. and the Federal Election Commission and all Plaintiffs to this action, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court enters the Stipulation and Protective Order filed April 9, 2009 55 , attached herewith. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/5/09. (kc) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion 51 for Leave to File Amended Complaint, denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion 52 for a Protective Order Deferring Discovery, and granting Intervenor - Defendant Representative Christopher Van Hollen's Motion 54 to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/5/09. (see order.) (kc) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 52 MOTION for Order Deferring Discovery filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 FEC Exh 26 -- Congress Daily, # 3 FEC Exh 27 -- Shea Declaration, # 4 FEC Exh 28 -- Shea Deposition, # 5 FEC Exh 29 -- Josefiak Deposition (McConnell), # 6 FEC Exh 30 -- Greenwald Declaration, # 7 FEC Exh 31 -- Rozen Declaration, # 8 FEC Exh 32 -- Pls Supplemental Discovery Resps, # 9 FEC Exh 33 -- Biersack Declaration, # 10 FEC Exh 34 -- Hajjar Declaration, # 11 FEC Exh 35 -- RNC Press Release 1, # 12 FEC Exh 36 -- RNC Press Release 2, # 13 FEC Exh 37 -- Erwin Deposition, # 14 FEC Exh 38 -- Philp Deposition, # 15 Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Protective Order by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 7, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 52 MOTION for Order Deferring Discovery and Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 7, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Deferring Discovery by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Docket Sheet Error re 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren E. Baer by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Waxman, Seth) Modified on 3/20/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW, COMMON CAUSE, DEMOS: A NETWORK OF IDEAS AND ACTION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN S. MCCAIN, RUSSELL D. FEINGOLD, CHRISTOPHER H. SHAYS, MARTIN T. MEEHAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting United States Senators John S. McCain and Russell D. Feingold and former United States Representatives Christopher H. Shays and Martin T. Meehan Motion 40 for Leave to appear in this case as amici curiae and granting the Brennan Center for Justice, Common Cause, Demos, US PIRG, and League of Women Voters US Motion 45 for Leave to appear in this case as amici curiae. ORDERED that the amici curiae's memoranda in opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be FILED by the Clerk of this court. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/13/09. (kc) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW, COMMON CAUSE, DEMOS: A NETWORK OF IDEAS AND ACTION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) Modified on 3/12/2009 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for movants :Attorney Name- Monica Youn, :Firm- BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, 12th Floor, New York, NY 10013-1205. Phone No. - (212) 998-6741. Fax No. - (212) 998-6730 by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW, COMMON CAUSE, DEMOS: A NETWORK OF IDEAS AND ACTION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP (nmw, ) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/10/09. (kc) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 4 - 13, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Waxman, Seth) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by JOHN S. MCCAIN, RUSSELL D. FEINGOLD, CHRISTOPHER H. SHAYS, MARTIN T. MEEHAN (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1 -- Josefiak Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit Exh 2 -- Christiansen Dep Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit Exh 3 -- Buettner Dep Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit Exh 4 -- RNC Discovery Responses, # 5 Exhibit RNC Ad 1, # 6 Exhibit Exh 6 -- RNC Ad 2, # 7 Exhibit Exh 7 -- RNC000130, # 8 Exhibit Exh 8 -- RNC Invitations, # 9 Exhibit Exh 9 -- CRP Donors (1), # 10 Exhibit Exh 10 -- CRP Donors (2), # 11 Exhibit Exh 11 -- RPSD Donors (1), # 12 Exhibit Exh 12 -- RPSD Donors (2), # 13 Exhibit Exh 13 -- RNC000106-110, # 14 Exhibit Exh 14 -- CRP Door Hanger, # 15 Exhibit Exh 15 -- Nehring Dec 7 Post, # 16 Exhibit Exh 16 -- Union Tribune Article, # 17 Exhibit Exh 17 -- Josefiak Dep (McConnell) Excerpts, # 18 Exhibit Exh 18 -- Nehring Jan 27 Post, # 19 Exhibit Exh 19 -- Nehring Sep 12 Post, # 20 Exhibit Exh 20 -- RPSD Materials, # 21 Exhibit Exh 21 -- CRP Propositions, # 22 Exhibit Exh 25 -- Rasmussen Poll, # 23 Notice of Filing DVD, # 24 Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibits, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Jay Simon on behalf of CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (Simon, Donald) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Seth P. Waxman on behalf of CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (Waxman, Seth) Modified on 3/9/2009 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Protective Order by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Protective Order by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren E. Baer, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 399 Park Ave., New York, New York 10022. Phone No. - 212-230-8800. Fax No. - 212-230-8888 by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration /Declaration of Lauren Baer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Waxman, Seth) Modified on 3/20/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE.(nmw, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE.(nmw, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Representative Christopher Van Hollen, Jr's Motion 22 to Intervene as defendant and the Democratic National Committee's Motion 23 to Intervene as defendant; and it is further ORDERED that intervenor-defendants' answers shall be FILED by the Clerk of this court. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/19/09. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION to Intervene filed by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(nmw, ) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION to Intervene filed by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Bauer, Robert) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION to Intervene of Democratic National Committee filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Intervene of Rep. Van Hollen filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Intervene, 23 MOTION to Intervene Consenting in Part and Opposing in Part the Motions to Intervene filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by DEMOCRATIC NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(nmw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by CHRISTOPHER VAN HOLLEN, JR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Van Hollen, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Answer, # 4 Certificate of Service)(nmw, ) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Richard J. Leon, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/22/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Expedite filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA filed 11/24/08, designating Circuit Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh and District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer to serve with District Judge Richard J. Leon to hear and determine this case. Judge Kavanaugh will preside. (Signed by David B. Sentelle on 11/24/08. )(ds) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Expedite filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion 2 for Three-Judge Court. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/18/08. (kc) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Adav Noti on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Deeley on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Deeley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Brett Kolker on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Kolker, David) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bopp, James) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Bopp, James) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Bopp, James) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 11/14/2008, answer due 1/13/2009 (Bopp, James) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 11/14/2008. (Bopp, James) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles H. Bell, Jr., :Firm- McAndrews & Hiltachk, LLP, :Address- 455 Capitol Mall, Suite 801, Sacramento, CA 95815. Phone No. - (916) 442-7757. Fax No. - (916) 442-7759 by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clayton J. Callen, Firm Name: Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. Fax No. - (812) 234-3685 by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard E. Coleson, :Firm- Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. Fax No. - (812) 234-3685 by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kaylan L. Phillips, :Firm- Coleson & Bostrom, :Address- 1 South Sixth Street, Terre Haute, Indiana 47807. Phone No. - (812) 232-2434. Fax No. - (812) 234-3685 by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Three-Judge Court by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616016246) filed by REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CALIFORNIA REPUBLICAN PARTY, ROBERT M. DUNCAN, REPUBLICAN PARTY OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?