WARD v. GATES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-02040
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 10:53 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LISA LYONS WARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LISA LYONS WARD
v.
No Logo JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-X, Defendant
No Logo PETE GEREN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Lanny James Acosta, Jr. +1 202 353 9895 lanny.acosta@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Ann Donnelly +1 202 353 9895 +1 202 514 8780 kathryn.donnelly@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Lanny James Acosta, Jr. +1 202 353 9895 lanny.acosta@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Kathryn Ann Donnelly +1 202 353 9895 +1 202 514 8780 kathryn.donnelly@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting as conceded 28 the defendants' motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/10/11.(lcrmu1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss by 4/23/10 or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Defendants' reply, if any, is due by 5/7/10. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 3/24/10. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Service by JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-X, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN re 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss by JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-X, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-X, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or otherwise Respond by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-X (Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-X filed by LISA LYONS WARD.(tr) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Defendant's Motion for a more definite statement by LISA LYONS WARD (jf, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                        Motion for Extension of Time to file a more definite statement or an amended complaint by LISA LYONS WARD. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 18 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file a more definite statement or an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/28/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to motion for a more definite statement by LISA LYONS WARD (jf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER denying without prejudice defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting defendants' 8 Motion for More Definite Statement, and order plaintiff to file either a more definite statement or an amended complaint by September 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/1/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/1/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathryn Ann Donnelly on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN Substituting for attorney Lanny J. Acosta, Jr. (Donnelly, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN. (Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION for Leave to File Enlargement Motion out of Time by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by LISA LYONS WARD. (td, ) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss or for a more definite statement by LISA LYONS WARD. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss or for a more definite statement by 4/20/2009, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 4/1/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE (Notice of Additional Service) by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN re 8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement (Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for More Definite Statement by ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lanny James Acosta, Jr on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/22/08. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ROBERT M. GATES served on 12/12/2008, answer due 2/10/2009. (tr) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 12/19/2008, answer due 2/17/2009 (tg, ) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PETE GEREN served on 12/22/2008, answer due 2/20/2009. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LISA LYONS WARD (jf, ) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT against ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by LISA LYONS WARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?