AL-NAJAR v. GATES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-02143
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:37 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramzi Kassem +1 718 340 4558 +1 718 340 4478 ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu
No Logo REDHA AL-NAJAR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel-Honolulu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen A. Kelly +5 234 859 main kkelly@honolulu.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramzi Kassem +1 718 340 4558 +1 718 340 4478 ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu
v.
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Respondent

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Doe #2, Respondent

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo ROBERT GATES, Respondent

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (89 in 1:06-cv-01669-UNA) Notice of Appeal filed by AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH, (32 in 1:10-cv-00758-JDB) Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN, (78 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Notice of Appeal, filed by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, (83 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB) Notice of Appeal, filed by AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgments of the District Court appealed from in these causes be affirmed in Al Maqaleh III (Nos. 12-5404, 12-5401 and 12-5399) and Amanatullah (No. 12-5407); and Hamidullah (No. 12-5410) be remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 12-5404,12-5399,12-5401,12-5407,12-5410. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion)(md, ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 78 Notice of Appeal, ; (dr) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re 78 Notice of Appeal,. (dr) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 73 Memorandum & Opinion, 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (dr) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appeal by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Foster, Tina) Modified on 12/13/2012 (dr). (Entered: 12/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE re 71 Response to Order of the Court, filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(dr) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 53 respondents' motion to dismiss petitioners' amended petitions for habeas corpus. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/19/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/19/2012. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Leave to File Response to Petitioners' Supplemental Materials filed on September 24, 2012 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment 1 (Proposed Response), # 3 Attachment 2 (Exhibits to Proposed Response))(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ramzi Kassem, dated September 24, 2012, # 2 Declaration of Tina M. Foster, dated September 23, 2012)(Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE in Response to the Court's Order of August 28, 2012f by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH re Order, (74 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 81 in 1:06-cv-01669-UNA) Notice (Other) (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MEMORANDUM re (67 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Notice (Other), filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of filing of Supplemental Material by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD re (53 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 59 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 64 in 1:06-cv-01669-UNA) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Memorandum of Understanding and New Procedures by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH re (75 in 1:06-cv-01669-UNA, 69 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 64 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tina M. Foster, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Declaration of Ramzi Kassem, # 4 Exhibit)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE Regarding the March 9, 2012 Memorandum of Understanding Between the Islamic Republic of Afghanistan and the United States of America by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia Royce on behalf of HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR (Royce, Sylvia) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE to Supplemental Declaration of Tina M. Foster (ECF No. 71 in 06-cv-1669) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Lin, Jean) Modified on 10/26/2011 to edit text (dr). (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re (56 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 67 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Further Support of their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH. (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (56 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 67 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Further Support of their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Further Support of their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (56 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB), filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Further Support of their Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Exhibit 1: Supplemental Declaration of Tina M. Foster, dated August 1, 2011, # 2 Supplement Attachments 1-3, # 3 Supplement Attachment 4, # 4 Supplement Attachments 5-8)(Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 53 (53 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment)(Lin, Jean) Modified on 7/19/2011 to add link (dr). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 53 (53 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tina M. Foster, # 2 Declaration of Ramzi Kassem, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Tina) Modified on 7/19/2011 to add link (dr). (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Lietzau, # 2 Declaration of Vice Admiral Robert S. Harward, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                            APPLICATION for Writ of of Habeas Corpus (Amended Petition) by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petitioners' Amended Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY re (49 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 55 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ramzi Kassem, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE to the Court (regarding updated declaration) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Lietzau (Dated Dec. 17, 2010))(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re (44 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION to Amend/Correct Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tina M. Foster, # 2 Exhibit 1-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-17)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (44 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 50 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 50 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB) MOTION to Amend/Correct Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re (44 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 50 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 50 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB) MOTION to Amend/Correct Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Lietzau, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioners' Joint Motion to Amend Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, REDHA AL-NAJAR, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, FADI AL MAQALEH (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, # 2 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, # 3 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION (unclassified). This is the unclassified version of 28 the April 2, 2009 memorandum opinion issued in this case. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. Fee Status: no fee paid. Parties have been notified. (USCA Order construed as a Notice of Appeal per the US Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia) (kb) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      USCA ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the petition for permission to appeal be granted; It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to expedite be granted. USCA Case Number 09-8003. (kb) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 31 respondents' motion for certification for appeal and granting 32 respondents' motion for stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/1/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re (36 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 37 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 31 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and for A Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal, (38 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 37 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 32 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION to Stay filed by ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re (36 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 37 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 31 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and for A Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal, (38 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 37 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 32 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION to Stay filed by FADI AL MAQALEH, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, REDHA AL-NAJAR, HOUCINE AL-NAJAR. (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by FADI AL MAQALEH, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, REDHA AL-NAJAR, HOUCINE AL-NAJAR (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (36 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 37 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 31 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and for A Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal, (38 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 37 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 32 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION to Stay by ROBERT GATES, FADI AL MAQALEH, AHMAD AL MAQALEH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, AMIN AL BAKRI, MUHAMMAD AL BAKRI, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, REDHA AL-NAJAR, HOUCINE AL-NAJAR, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ERRATA Regarding Respondents' Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and for a Stay by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (36 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 37 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 31 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and for A Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 1, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, (38 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 37 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 32 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) MOTION to Stay filed by JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 1, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected motion for interlocutory appeal certification and for a stay)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/12/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal (same filing as Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal) by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and for A Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER denying 3 petitioner's motion for a preliminary injuction. See text of the Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/9/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. Attorney John Caviness O'Quinn terminated. (O'Quinn, John) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying 7 respondents' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. See text of the Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying 23 petitioner's motion for extension of the temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction. See text of the Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/24/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION to Expedite, 23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Extension and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction BARRING RESPONDENTS FROM TRANSFERRING PETITIONER TO TUNISIA AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING filed by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION/REQUEST For an Expedited Hearing by REDHA AL-NAJAR (tr)(See Docket Entry 23 to view document) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Extension and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction BARRING RESPONDENTS FROM TRANSFERRING PETITIONER TO TUNISIA AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING by REDHA AL-NAJAR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Davida Brook, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Preliminary Injunction)(Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (30 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 31 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 21 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 28 in 1:06-cv-01697-JDB) Order filed by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Redacted Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel Jeffrey A. Dolsen)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER directing respondents to file additional information. See text of the Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (25 in 1:06-cv-01697-JDB, 28 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 24 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 18 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Order filed by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John D. Bates of proceedings held on 1/7/09; Page Numbers: 1 - 138. Date of Issuance:1/28/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2009.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER inviting respondents to provide the Court with additional information. See text of the Order for more details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/22/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (16 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Order filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Redacted Declaration of Colonel Joe e. Ethridge)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing respondents to file additional information. See text of the Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/7/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Court Regarding Consolidated Oral Argument by REDHA AL-NAJAR (Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John Caviness O'Quinn on behalf of ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (O'Quinn, John) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Wazir Reply Brief), # 2 Exhibit (Wazir Reply Brief-Exhibit A), # 3 Exhibit (Wazir Reply Brief Exhibit B), # 4 Exhibit (Wazir Reply Brief Exhibit C))(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to the Court Regarding Oral Argument Scheduled for January 7, 2009 by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 re Order,, Order,, Order,, (11 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Memorandum in Opposition, (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REDHA AL-NAJAR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barbara Olshansky, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2-7, # 4 Exhibit 8-9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11-16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18-19, # 9 Exhibit 20-24, # 10 Exhibit 25-26, # 11 Exhibit 27-36, # 12 Exhibit 37-39, # 13 Exhibit 40-41)(Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by REDHA AL-NAJAR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathleen Kelly, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kathleen Kelly)(Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting petitioner's opposition date and scheduling argument for January 7, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. See text of the Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/22/08. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Expedite filed by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Proof of Service by REDHA AL-NAJAR re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Expedite (Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting respondents' date for filing their opposition to 3 petitioners' motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, if any, by not later than December 19, 2008. See text of the Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/11/08. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Expedite Hearing by REDHA AL-NAJAR, HOUCINE AL-NAJAR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order -Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order -Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Certificate of Service)(nmw, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by REDHA AL-NAJAR, HOUCINE AL-NAJAR. Case related to Case No. 06-cv-1669. (tr) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616016945.) filed by REDHA AL-NAJAR, HOUCINE AL-NAJAR. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2008: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (nmw, ). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?