USA v. LAN CARGO S.A. et al
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cr-00015
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LAN CARGO S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP - Palo Alto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Marshall Sanford Sinick +1 202 626 6651 msinick@ssd.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE that the Court is in receipt of a wire transfer in the amount of $14,751,550.00 to satisfy the fine obligation as to LAN CARGO. Receipt No.: CQ11461600043. (hsj, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LAN CARGO S.A., AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. before Judge John D. Bates of proceedings held on 2/19/09; Page Numbers: 1 - 46. Date of Issuance:3/10/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2009.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Receipt of $15,000,000.00 as to LAN CARGO S.A. (1) and $4,000,000.00 as to AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. (2) for installment payments of fine. Special Assessment of $400.00 each was also satisfied. (hsj, ) Modified on 3/10/2009 (tnr, ). (Entered: 03/09/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        STATEMENT OF REASONS as to LAN CARGO S.A. and AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. re 10 Judgment; Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/19/09. (tnr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          JUDGMENT as to LAN CARGO S.A. and AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. Statement of Reasons Not Included signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/19/09. (tnr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
            PLEA AGREEMENT as to LAN CARGO S.A. and AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. (tnr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to LAN CARGO S.A. approved by Judge John D. Bates on 2/19/09. (tnr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by LAN CARGO S.A. signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/19/09. (tnr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 2 Motion for Authorization to Give Crime Victims Notification pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3771 as to LAN CARGO S.A. (1) and AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. (2) signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/12/09. (tnr, ) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                    JOINT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by LAN CARGO S.A., USA, AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. as to LAN CARGO S.A., AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. (Grundvig, Mark) Modified on 2/13/2009 (tnr, ). (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                      First MOTION for Victim Rights Notification by USA as to LAN CARGO S.A., AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A.. (Grundvig, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                        INFORMATION as to LAN CARGO S.A. (1) and AEROLINHAS BRASILEIRAS S.A. (2) on Count 1. (tnr, ) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 57 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?