GERONIMO et al v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00303
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALBERT PLATTA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo BRYAN RANDALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo CHERISSA MANGAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo EILEEN VIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo EUPHRASIA PLATTA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo FAWN VIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo GINA MAKIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo HARLYN C. GERONIMO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo HARLYN GERONIMO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo JUANITA MAKIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo JUANITA VIA MAKIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo KATE GERONIMO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo KAYLA RANDALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo LYLE GERONIMO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo Murray, Randall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo NORBERT VIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo PERCY PLATTA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo ROBBY MAKIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo SHANNA MAKIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
No Logo VERALYN MENDEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramsey Clark +1 212 989 6613 +1 212 979 1583 lwschilling@earthlink.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
No Logo PETE GEREN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
No Logo BRYAR J. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo EVA ANN GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo HOPE S. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo HOUSTON R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo JOLEEN R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo JONELLE GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo JONITA R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo KRYSTALYNN R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo KYREN W. COMANCHE, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo LARIAT R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo LARRY ALBERT GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo LAUREN M. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo MAVIS L. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo NEIDA R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo PARIS GERONIMO DAVIS, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo ROBERT GERONIMO, JR., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo ROBERT LENSON GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo ROBERT SAMSON GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo SHAIAN R. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo SNYDER GERONIMO, III, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo SNYDER GERONIMO, JR., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo SNYDER GERONIMO, SR., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
No Logo TREY O. GERONIMO, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Racin +1 202 265 2516 +1 202 483 7895 awjrlaw@erols.com
Citation Section 25 U.S.C. § 640
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Robert Geronimo, et al. Intervenor-Plaintiffs (Racin, John) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL ORDER accompanying Memorandum Opinion 33 . Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 07/27/2010. (DCL) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION granting federal defendants' motion 16 to dismiss, and dismissing complaint as to all other defendants. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 07/27/2010. (DCL) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
        MOTION for Hearing re 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to present oral argument of the parties by HARLYN GERONIMO (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
          REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA. (Bair, Ty) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
            ERRATA Correcting Proposed Order by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bair, Ty) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bair, Ty) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bair, Ty) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                  Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Federal Defendants filed by HARLYN GERONIMO. (Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                    Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by ROBERT LENSON GERONIMO. (Racin, John) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss by HARLYN GERONIMO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROBERT GERONIMO, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Racin, John) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FORT SILL APACHE TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Racin, John) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiffs-Intervenors' Complaint by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bair, Ty) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                              SURREPLY to re 6 Fort Sill Apache Tribe ofOklahoma's MOTION to Intervene filed by HARLYN GERONIMO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 thru 4)(jf, ) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to And To Set Briefing Schedule by SHANNA MAKIL, ROBERT GERONIMO, JR, JONELLE GERONIMO, JONITA R. GERONIMO, ROBERT LENSON GERONIMO, NORBERT VIA, LAUREN M. GERONIMO, KRYSTALYNN R. GERONIMO, ROBERT SAMSON GERONIMO, NEIDA R. GERONIMO, JOLEEN R. GERONIMO, FAWN VIA, LARRY ALBERT GERONIMO, MAVIS L. GERONIMO, KYREN W. COMANCHE, PARIS GERONIMO DAVIS, LARIAT R. GERONIMO, EILEEN VIA, SHAIAN R. GERONIMO, HOUSTON R. GERONIMO, EVA ANN GERONIMO, SNYDER GERONIMO, SR, SNYDER GERONIMO, JR, VERALYN MENDEZ, SNYDER GERONIMO, III, HOPE S. GERONIMO, TREY O. GERONIMO, BRYAR J. GERONIMO, ALBERT PLATTA, PERCY PLATTA, EUPHRASIA PLATTA, CHERISSA MANGAS, MURRAY RANDALL, HARLYN GERONIMO, BRYAN RANDALL, KAYLA RANDALL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN, HARLYN C. GERONIMO, KATE GERONIMO, LYLE GERONIMO, JUANITA VIA MAKIL, GINA MAKIL, JUANITA MAKIL, ROBBY MAKIL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Samantha) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by FORT SILL APACHE TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment)(Racin, John) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by ROBERT GERONIMO, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment)(Racin, John) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SHANNA MAKIL, NORBERT VIA, FAWN VIA, EILEEN VIA, VERALYN MENDEZ, ALBERT PLATTA, PERCY PLATTA, EUPHRASIA PLATTA, CHERISSA MANGAS, MURRAY RANDALL, HARLYN GERONIMO, BRYAN RANDALL, KAYLA RANDALL, HARLYN C. GERONIMO, KATE GERONIMO, LYLE GERONIMO, JUANITA VIA MAKIL, GINA MAKIL, JUANITA MAKIL, ROBBY MAKIL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Thomas Ray Kelly, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Samantha) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Surreply and Supporting Memorandum by HARLYN GERONIMO (Attachments: # 1 Proposed surreply, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibits 1 - 4, # 3 Proposed Order)(Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 MOTION to Intervene filed by FORT SILL APACHE TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEC Form 10Q)(Racin, John) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by ROBERT GERONIMO, JR. (Racin, John) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                ERRATA for DE 10, Opposition by HARLYN GERONIMO 6 MOTION to Intervene filed by FORT SILL APACHE TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA. (Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by ROBERT GERONIMO, JR, JONELLE GERONIMO, JONITA R. GERONIMO, ROBERT LENSON GERONIMO, LAUREN M. GERONIMO, KRYSTALYNN R. GERONIMO, ROBERT SAMSON GERONIMO, NEIDA R. GERONIMO, JOLEEN R. GERONIMO, LARRY ALBERT GERONIMO, MAVIS L. GERONIMO, KYREN W. COMANCHE, PARIS GERONIMO DAVIS, LARIAT R. GERONIMO, SHAIAN R. GERONIMO, HOUSTON R. GERONIMO, EVA ANN GERONIMO, SNYDER GERONIMO, SR, SNYDER GERONIMO, JR, SNYDER GERONIMO, III, HOPE S. GERONIMO, TREY O. GERONIMO, BRYAR J. GERONIMO.(jf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION to Intervene filed by HARLYN GERONIMO. (Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE re 5 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs by Robert Geronimo, Jr. et al filed by HARLYN GERONIMO. (Clark, Ramsey) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Klein, Samantha) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE re 6 MOTION to Intervene, 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN. (Klein, Samantha) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Intervene as a Plaintiff by FORT SILL APACHE TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Intervenor Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs by ROBERT GERONIMO, JR, JONELLE GERONIMO, JONITA R. GERONIMO, ROBERT LENSON GERONIMO, LAUREN M. GERONIMO, KRYSTALYNN R. GERONIMO, ROBERT SAMSON GERONIMO, NEIDA R. GERONIMO, JOLEEN R. GERONIMO, LARRY ALBERT GERONIMO, MAVIS L. GERONIMO, KYREN W. COMANCHE, PARIS GERONIMO DAVIS, LARIAT R. GERONIMO, SHAIAN R. GERONIMO, HOUSTON R. GERONIMO, EVA ANN GERONIMO, SNYDER GERONIMO, SR, SNYDER GERONIMO, JR, SNYDER GERONIMO, III, HOPE S. GERONIMO, TREY O. GERONIMO, BRYAR J. GERONIMO (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Intervenor Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Bair, Ty) (Entered: 04/04/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ty Bair on behalf of BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Bair, Ty) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Klein on behalf of BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN (Klein, Samantha) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT against BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, PETE GEREN, ORDER OF SKULL AND BONES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616018377) filed by SHANNA MAKIL, NORBERT VIA, FAWN VIA, EILEEN VIA, VERALYN MENDEZ, ALBERT PLATTA, PERCY PLATTA, EUPHRASIA PLATTA, CHERISSA MANGAS, MURRAY RANDALL, HARLYN GERONIMO, BRYAN RANDALL, KAYLA RANDALL, HARLYN C. GERONIMO, KATE GERONIMO, LYLE GERONIMO, JUANITA VIA MAKIL, GINA MAKIL, JUANITA MAKIL, ROBBY MAKIL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2009: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jf, ). (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 535 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?