ABDULRAZZAQ v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01462
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2018 at 5:28 PM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Dazey, Jr. +1 317 383 3520 +1 317 383 3525 bill.dazey@fd.org
Space William Thomas Marsh +1 314 241 1255 +1 314 421 3177 william_marsh@fd.org
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Luke M. Jones +1 202 514 3770 luke.jones@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Prince +1 202 305 3654 robert.prince@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo BRUCE VARGO, Respondent
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Brinker International, Inc. Officer/Director, Brinker International, Inc.
Nacco Industries, Inc. Officer/Director, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Parker Drilling Co /de/
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo TOM COPEMAN, Respondent
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
      ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                      Joint MOTION to Vacate Status Conference Scheduled For March 8, 2012 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION to Vacate Status Hearing Scheduled for October 5, 2011 by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Filing by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Filing - Government's Motion For Reconsideration Of Court's April 7, 2011 Minute Order by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unclassified Version of Factual Return by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dazey, William) Modified on 4/6/2011 to enhance docket text (jf, ). (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Filing Factual Return by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                    Joint MOTION to Vacate Status Hearing Scheduled for April 6, 2011 by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Prince on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Filing by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file factual return and adjust schedule by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Marsh, William) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION to Vacate Status Hearing Scheduled for December 14, 2010 by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPEMAN (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/06/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                      SEALED NOTICE of Ex Parte and Under Seal Filing Regarding Task Force Review DOCUMENT filed by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION to Vacate Status Hearing Scheduled for September 9, 2010 by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Luke) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew I. Warden on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                            STATUS REPORT by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO. (Jones, Luke) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Ex Parte and Under Seal Filing Regarding Task Force Review by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Luke) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report pursuant to the Court's Minute Order of August 19, 2009) by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO. (Jones, Luke) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by MUHAMMED RAHIM, HAJJI NASSIM, MUSTAFA FARAJ MOHAMMAD, ABDUL GHANI, NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MOHAMMED HASHIM, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ABDUL HAFIZ, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY, ABDURAHMAN LNU, EDRESS LNU, SHARGOWI LNU, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ABU RAWDA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Luke M. Jones on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Luke) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Dazey, William) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, William) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT filed jointly by petitioner and respondents by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Marsh, William) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT filed jointly by petitioner and respondents by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Dazey, Jr on behalf of NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Dazey, William) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Marsh on behalf of NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Marsh, William) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO. (Marsh, William) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER re appoint of counsel. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 08/03/09. (See Order for Full Detail(s) )(jf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Public Filing of Unclassified Factual Return by TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Narrative, # 2 Exhibits Pt 1, # 3 Exhibits Pt 2, # 4 Exhibits Pt 3, # 5 Exhibits Pt 4, # 6 Exhibits Pt 5)(Jones, Luke) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.) filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. "Leave to file without prepayment of cost GRANTED" by Judge Reggie B. Walton (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 283 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?