TAC-CRITICAL SYSTEMS, INC. v. INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01512
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TAC-CRITICAL SYSTEMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by dc.bhb.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harvey A. Levin +1 202 659 5800
v.
No Logo INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo MOHAN JACOB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo SUSTAINABLE ENERGY EFFICIENT SOLUTIONS, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 9/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DENYING 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court further ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status hearing in Courtroom 19 on September 14, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/02/2011. (lcjeb2)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT JOINT by MOHAN JACOB. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE DECEMBER 14, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE CONFLICTS by TAC-CRITICAL SYSTEMS, INC. (Levin, Harvey) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Order, Minute Order by INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT The Parties' Joint Status Report by TAC-CRITICAL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Levin, Harvey) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. In the event a settlement is not reached, the Court will hold a status hearing in this case on November 3, 2010 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 27, 2010. (lcegs2 ) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
              MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Levin, Harvey) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION to Quash Subpoena by SUSTAINABLE ENERGY EFFICIENT SOLUTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                  ERRATA Defendants' Corrected Motion and Memorandum by MOHAN JACOB 14 MOTION to Quash and For Protective Order by Integrated Facility Systmes, Inc. and filed by MOHAN JACOB. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Motion to Quash Corrected)(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Quash and For Protective Order by Integrated Facility Systmes, Inc. and by MOHAN JACOB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion To Quash and For Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 Notice of Deposition to IFS, # 4 Exhibit 2 Notice of Deposition to Mohan Jacob, # 5 Exhibit 3 Defendan'ts Objections To Plaintiff Written Discovery Requests)(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE re Order, To Respond to Surreply filed by MOHAN JACOB. (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                        SURREPLY to re Order, filed by TAC-CRITICAL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Levin, Harvey) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by MOHAN JACOB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Levin, Harvey) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Dismiss Reply by MOHAN JACOB (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Kenneth) Modified on 9/22/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (with attached Proposed Order) filed by TAC-CRITICAL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Levin, Harvey) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by MOHAN JACOB by MOHAN JACOB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by MOHAN JACOB (Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC.. Related document: 1 Notice of Removal, filed by MOHAN JACOB, INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC..(Martin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                        Receipt on August 26, 2009 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 09ca5025B. (Attachments: # 1 Superior Court Documents)(rdj) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 9/17/2009., Meet & Confer Statement due by 9/24/2009. Setting forth further instruction to counsel.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/20/09. (clv, ) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                            LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC., MOHAN JACOB identifying Corporate Parent NONE for INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC., MOHAN JACOB. (rdj) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC., MOHAN JACOB from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 09ca5025B. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616023106) filed by INTEGRATED FACILITY SYSTEMS, INC., MOHAN JACOB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Notice to Counsel, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?