COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01570
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A. MacIsaac +1 703 228 3100 smacisaac@arlingtonva.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Thomas Proto +1 202 419 4200 +1 202 419 3454
v.
No Logo Federal Highway Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
No Logo PIERCE R. HOMER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzanne T. Ellison +1 804 786 7774 sellison@oag.state.va.us
No Logo RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
No Logo SEAN T. CONNAUGHTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzanne T. Ellison +1 804 786 7774 sellison@oag.state.va.us
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
No Logo VICTOR MENDEZ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
No Logo VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Suzanne T. Ellison +1 804 786 7774 sellison@oag.state.va.us
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365
Nature of Suit 894 - Energy Allocation Act
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stephen A. MacIsaac)(Britton, John) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT (Parties' Statement of the Case) by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER setting initial scheduling conference on May 24, 2010 at 11:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/20/10. (KD) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 the Motion to Dismiss filed by the Virginia Defendants. Counts I, II, III, and VII are dismissed as against the individual defendants in their personal capacity only. The counts otherwise remain. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/15/10. (KD) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/15/10. (KD) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
              SURREPLY to re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA. (Britton, John) Modified on 3/26/2010 to correct linkage (rdj). (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA (Britton, John) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PIERCE R. HOMER, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ellison, Suzanne) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                    Memorandum in opposition to re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Britton, John) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Angeline Purdy on behalf of FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Li, Beverly) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by PIERCE R. HOMER, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Ellison, Suzanne) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss by PIERCE R. HOMER, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Ellison, Suzanne) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Stipulation
                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Notice of Related Case
                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. Case related to Case No. 09-2224. (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Julie S. Thrower on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, VICTOR MENDEZ (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. MacIsaac on behalf of COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA (MacIsaac, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, VICTOR MENDEZ (Li, Beverly) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Thomas Proto on behalf of COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA (Proto, Neil) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to foreign state or agency
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 8/27/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to foreign state or agency
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PIERCE R. HOMER served on 8/27/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by John Burke Britton, Jr on behalf of COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA (Britton, John) Modified on 9/4/2009 (rdj). (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne T. Ellison on behalf of VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, PIERCE R. HOMER (Ellison, Suzanne) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 8/24/2009, answer due 10/23/2009 (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to RAYMOND H. LAHOOD served on 8/27/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION served on 8/24/2009, answer due 10/23/2009. (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to VICTOR MENDEZ served on 8/24/2009, answer due 10/23/2009. (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 08/24/09. (Britton, John) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, RAYMOND H. LAHOOD, FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, VICTOR MENDEZ, VIRGINIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, PIERCE R. HOMER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616023252) filed by COUNTY BOARD OF ARLINGTON VIRGINIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 285 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?