COLTON v. CLINTON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01772
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 9:15 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 202 383 0716 +1 202 637 3593 thomas.bundy@sutherland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher W. Hammond +1 202 383 0249 christopher.hammond@sutherland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Steven Wiener +1 202 383 0140 +1 202 637 3593 lewis.wiener@sutherland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
v.
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas David Zimpleman +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 616 8470 thomas.d.zimpleman@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 39 Notice of Appeal filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON ; USCA Case Number 10-5389. Ordered and Adjudged that the decision of the district court be affirmed. (sth, ) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER of USCA as to 39 Notice of Appeal filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON ; ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel be denied; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for summary affirmance and the motion for summary reversal be denied. USCA Case Number 10-5389. (mmh) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 39 Notice of Appeal. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616034395. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT, For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is this 24th day of September, 2010, hereby ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment 13 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Discovery 19 is DENIED AS MOOT; and it is further ORDERED that the above-captioned case is DISMISSED with prejudice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/24/10. (see final judgment) (kc ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/24/10. (kc ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON re 33 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Writ of Mandamus (Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION to Withdraw 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Mandamus by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                    WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 8/6/2010..... MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Bundy, Thomas) Modified on 8/9/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                        WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 8/6/2010..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Bundy, Thomas). Added MOTION for Writ of Mandamus on 7/26/2010 (znmw, ). Modified on 8/9/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 MOTION to Strike 27 Supplemental Memorandum filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. (Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in opposition to re 28 MOTION to Strike 27 Supplemental Memorandum filed by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Strike 27 Supplemental Memorandum by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Set Forth Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Discovery filed by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON. (Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION for Discovery filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION for Discovery by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Hammond, Christopher) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Discovery filed by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order)(Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Or In the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON. (Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION for Discovery by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Zimpleman on behalf of HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Modify Briefing Schedule by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Discovery by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. (See Docket Entry 18 to view document. Counsel is reminded to file the motion as a separate docket entry in future). (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Or In the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit (A) Rule 56(F) Affidavit)(Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Hammond on behalf of ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Hammond, Christopher) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER, Upon consideration of The Joint Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule and To Modify Case Management Order (the "Joint Motion"), and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED: 1. that Joint Motion is GRANTED; 2. that Plaintiff shall file her opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by February 8, 2010; 3. that Defendant shall file her reply to Plaintiff's opposition 30 days thereafter; and 4. that any conference or related activities under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3 are suspended until 30 days after the Court has ruled upon Defendant's pending motion. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/30/09. (see order.) (kc, ) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule and to Modify Case Management Order by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Or In the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A (Notices of Intent to Sue), # 4 Exhibit B (DeLisi Declaration), # 5 Exhibit C (Alexander Declaration), # 6 Exhibit D (Board Member Declarations), # 7 Exhibit E (Email Dated 5/11/2009))(Bryce, Peter). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 12/22/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Bundy, III on behalf of ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Bundy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E. Huhta on behalf of ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON (Huhta, Susan) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON.(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON served on 9/24/2009, answer due 11/23/2009. (Wiener, Lewis) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON served on 9/24/2009, answer due 11/23/2009 (Wiener, Lewis) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 09/24/2009. (Wiener, Lewis) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/25/09. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 ERRATA
                                                                                  ERRATA by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. re 1 COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Wiener, Lewis) . (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616024088) filed by ELIZABETH OVERTON COLTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 295 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?