AL-WARAFIE v. OBAMA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-02368

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 7, 2018 at 5:39 PM DT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc D. Falkoff +1 347 564 5043 +1 815 753 9301 mdf19@columbia.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Foster +1 202 662 5255 +1 202 778 5255 bfoster@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip A. Scarborough +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091 pscarborough@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Levine +1 202 662 5718 +1 202 778 5718 jlevine@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Schuyler William Livingston, Jr. +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5380 wlivingston@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Arnold Pemberton +1 202 662 5642 +1 202 778 5642 apemberton@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Remes +1 202 669 6508 remesdh@gmail.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Douglas Levin +1 202 616 9193 +1 202 305 2685 Scott.Levin@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Maloney +1 202 616 1436 sarah.maloney2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Zeidner Marcus +1 202 514 3336 lisa.marcus@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/23/2012 Trish Maskew +1 202 305 7658 trish.maskew@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/31/2012 David Hugh White +1 202 514 3146 +1 202 616 8470 david.white2@usdoj.gov
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. Attorney Philip A. Scarborough terminated. (Scarborough, Philip) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
            MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) ORDERED that the motion be granted and that this appeal be dismissed as moot in light of appellant's transfer from the United States Naval Base at Guantanamo Bay, Cuba as to 97 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. USCA Case Number 15-5266. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Writ
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Granting 81 Joint Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule for Petitioner's Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents shall have until April 17, 2015 to file a response to Petitioner's motion. Petitioner shall have until May 2, 2015 to file a reply memorandum in support of motion. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/15. (mpt, ) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Writ
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian E. Foster (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Memoranda of Understanding and Acknowledgments of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, ALI YAHYA MAHDI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Isabelle Chammas), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Samantha Coffey), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Andrew Garrahan), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Catlin Meade), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Edward Smith))(Foster, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding by Tasnim Motola by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Remes, David) (Entered: 05/31/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 20 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgement of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 11-5276. (md, ) (Entered: 09/14/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Melanie Bellini) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Steven W. Samols) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Emily A. White) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order (Kevin Glandon) by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order (Elle Metzger) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order (Nicole Cahill) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. Attorney David Hugh White terminated. (White, David) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Unclassified MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 31, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Unclassified ORDER granting respondents' Renewed Motion on Remand for Judgment on the Record and denying petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 31, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 58 Notice of Appeal. (rdj) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2685670. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Levine, Jason) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DONNIE THOMAS, BARACK OBAMA, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Public Return for ISN 117 by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing of classified reply brief on remand by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Levine, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Classified Filing by BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of classified opening brief on remand by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Levine, Jason) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Zeidner Marcus on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Classified Filing by BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs. FURTHER ORDERED Petitioner and Respondents cross-briefs due by 7/22/22. FURTHER ORDERED Petitioner and Respondents reply due by 8/9/11. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/13/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Sarah) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Additional Evidence (One Document) Hours Out of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/6/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 34 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/2/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Additional Evidence (One Document) Hours Out of Time by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Sarah) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting re 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Additional Discovery filed by BARACK OBAMA Respondents Reply due by 6/1/2011. Petitioner's rebuttal evidence due by 6/29/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/27/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Government's Motion For An Extension of Time To Complete Production of Additional Evidence filed by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. (Levine, Jason) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Additional Discovery by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Sarah) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Levine on behalf of MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Levine, Jason) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 28, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Douglas Levin on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 20 Notice of Appeal filed by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE ; USCA Case Number 10-5170. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgement of the district court be affirmed in part and the case remanded in part. (zsmm) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Mildred Knowlton) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Matthew Kudzin) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Nina Gleiberman) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 117 filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 with Narrative, # 4 Exhibit 4)(zdr) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 117 by BARACK OBAMA (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Jason Levine of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Kate Mueting of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Mahika Roy of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Roger Ford of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Livingston, Schuyler) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 20 Notice of Appeal. (znmw, ) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 14 Order, 16 Memorandum & Opinion by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2179499. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Scarborough, Philip) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by MUHAMMED RAHIM, HAJJI NASSIM, MUSTAFA FARAJ MOHAMMAD, ABDUL GHANI, NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MOHAMMED HASHIM, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ABDUL HAFIZ, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY, ABDURAHMAN LNU, EDRESS LNU, SHARGOWI LNU, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ABU RAWDA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          UNCLASSIFIED MEMORANDUM OPINION setting forth the Court's reasons for denying petitioner's habeas petition. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/24/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying petitioner's (ISN 117) petition for habeas corpus. A separate classified memorandum setting forth the Court's reasoning was filed with the Court Security Officer. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/24/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying respondents' Motion 9 for Order to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/24/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Order for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Philip) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Maloney on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Maloney, Sarah) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Proposed Reply Memorandum by BARACK OBAMA re 9 MOTION for Order for Leave to File Reply Memorandum (White, David) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Mason on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Mason, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Memorandum on February 2, 2010 by BARACK OBAMA (White, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Hugh White on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (White, David) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Response to Respondents' Supplemental Brief by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Scarborough, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting petitioner's Consent Motion 3 for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file his response to respondents' post-hearing brief on or before February 19, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/16/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respondents' post-hearing brief by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Philip) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that petitioner MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (ISN 117) is transferred by consent of the judges from Judge Kennedy to the undersigned member of this Court; further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall create a new civil action comprised of the captioned petitioner, CA 09-2368; and that any filing made by the petitioner in ABDAH, ET AL v. OBAMA, ET AL., CA 04-1254 (HHK); shall be deemed a part of the record in the new civil action created by the Court.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/09. (ks) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?